SUGARMAN v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-00708-RWR
District Judge Richard W. Roberts, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo NEIL PARIS SUGARMAN, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 4/20/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Transfer to Another District
County 88888
Terminated 12/31/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, PROSE-PR, TRANSFERRED, TYPE-F
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 1/24/2007, Entered: 1/24/2007 Case Transferred Out
Case transferred out to the USDC for the Central District of California, pursuant to Court's order dated 12/21/06. Sent by certified mail. (jf, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 17 Filed: 1/4/2007, Entered: 1/4/2007 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
    MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER deferring ruling on [7] Plaintiff's Motion to Hold In Abeyance, granting [9] Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or Transfer, granting [11] Plaintiff's Motion to Amend/Correct, and TRANSFERRING case to Central District of California. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 12-21-06.(jpm)
      LREF
      Legal Document 16 Filed: 12/4/2006, Entered: 12/4/2006 Notice of Appearance/
      NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Kidwell on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Kidwell, Judith)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 11/7/2006, Entered: 11/7/2006 Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
        NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document no. re [12] MOTION to Dismiss was entered in error due to clerical error and will be refiled under the correct category.(jf, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 14 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: 9/25/2006 Reply to opposition to Motion
          REPLY to opposition to motion re [9] MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative MOTION to Change Venue filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Konopka, Kathleen)
            LREF
            Legal Document 15 Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: 11/7/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
            OBJECTION to re [9] MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative MOTION to Change Venue filed by NEIL PARIS SUGARMAN. (jf, )
              LREF
              Blank 13 Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: 9/13/2006 Notice of Change of Address
              NOTICE of Change of Address by NEIL PARIS SUGARMAN (to view document, click on link # [12] ) (jf, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 12 Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: 9/13/2006 Motion to Dismiss
                ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION to Dismiss by NEIL PARIS SUGARMAN. (jf, ) Modified on 11/7/2006 (jf, ).
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 11 Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: 8/9/2006, Terminated: 1/4/2007 Motion to Amend/Correct
                  MOTION to Amend/Correct Records to Conform with Filing by NEIL PARIS SUGARMAN. (lc, )
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 7/27/2006, Entered: 7/27/2006 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Dispositive Motions due by 8/25/2006. (lin, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 10 Filed: 7/25/2006, Entered: 7/25/2006 Fox/Neal OrderCourt Filing
                      Order advising plaintiff to respond to defendant's motion to dismiss by 8-25-06 or Court may deem matter as conceded. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 7-25-06. (jpm)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 9 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: 7/24/2006, Terminated: 1/4/2007 Motion to Dismiss
                        MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, MOTION to Change Venue by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit One# (2) Exhibit Two# (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Konopka, Kathleen)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 8 Filed: 7/11/2006, Entered: 7/11/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                          NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen M. Konopka on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Konopka, Kathleen)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 7 Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: 6/12/2006 Motion to Stay
                            MOTION to hold case in abeyance for (90) ninety days by NEIL PARIS SUGARMAN. (jf, )
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 6 Filed: 5/26/2006, Entered: 5/30/2006 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                              RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 5/23/06., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA served on 5/23/2006, answer due 7/24/2006 (jf, )
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: 5/22/2006 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                SUMMONS (2) Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf, )
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 5 Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: 5/22/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                  JUDICIAL NOTICE by NEIL PARIS SUGARMAN (jf, )
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: 4/21/2006 Order Directing Prisoner PaymentCourt Filing
                                    ORDER Directing Monthly Payments in the amount of $41.34 be made from Prison Account of Neil Paris Sugarman; further ordered, granting [2] MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 04/10/06. (jf, )
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: 4/21/2006 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
                                      PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by NEIL PARIS SUGARMAN (jf, )
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: 4/21/2006, Terminated: 4/20/2006 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                                        MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by NEIL PARIS SUGARMAN. (jf, )
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: 4/21/2006 Complaint
                                          COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Filing fee $ 0.00) filed by NEIL PARIS SUGARMAN. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C)(jf, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: 4/21/2006 Summons Not Issued
                                          SUMMONS Not Issued as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (jf, )
                                            LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 88 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?