USA v. ROSS
Criminal Case District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:06-cr-00100-JDB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Denise Cheung +1 202 307 2845 +1 202 307 6059 denise.cheung@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Washington, DC
Filed 4/21/2006
County 11001
Terminated 9/8/2006
Reopened
Magistrate Case
106-mj-00115-JMF
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 871.F
Offense Level 4
18871; THREATS AGAINST PRESIDENT AND SUCCESSORS TO PRESIDENT; Threats Against the President.
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flags CAT A, CLOSED
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 21 Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: 9/20/2007 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER: Upon discussion the Court has had with the Probation Office as to JOHN R. ROSS release conditions; it is hereby ordered that the Probation Office, through Darryl Hughess, shall cause a copy of this Order and attachment Judgment be served on defendant forthwith. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 09/19/07. (Attachments: # (1) Judgment and Commitment) (tb, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 20 Filed: 9/8/2006, Entered: 9/8/2006 Judgment*Court Filing
    JUDGMENT as to JOHN R. ROSS Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 9/8/06. (tnr, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 19 Filed: 9/7/2006, Entered: 9/7/2006 Receipt and Acknowledgment of Presentence Investig
      Receipt and Acknowledgment of Presentence Investigation Report by JOHN R. ROSS. (tb, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 18 Filed: 9/7/2006, Entered: 9/7/2006 Receipt and Acknowledgment of Presentence Investig
        Receipt and Acknowledgment of Presentence Investigation Report by USA as to JOHN R. ROSS (tb, )
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 9/7/2006, Entered: 9/8/2006 Sentencing
          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John D. Bates :Sentencing held on 9/7/2006 as to JOHN R. ROSS (1). Count 1: Defendant Sentenced to Twenty-One (21) Months Imprisonment and Thirty-Six (36) Months of Supervised Release. Special Assessment of $100.00 Imposed. Bond Status of Defendant: Defendant Committed; Commitment Issued. (Court Reporter: Bryan Wayne Defense Attorney: Dani Jahn; US Attorney: Denise Cheung; Prob Officer: Michael Penders) (tnr, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 17 Filed: 9/5/2006, Entered: 9/5/2006, Terminated: 9/8/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
            MOTION FOR DOWNWARD ADJUSTMENT AND MEMORANDUM IN AID OF SENTENCING by USA as to JOHN R. ROSS. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Cheung, Denise)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 9/5/2006, Entered: 9/5/2006 Set/Reset Hearings
              Set/Reset Hearings as to JOHN R. ROSS: Sentencing reset for 9/7/2006 10:15 AM in Courtroom 8 before Judge John D. Bates. (tb)
                LREF
                Legal Document 16 Filed: 9/1/2006, Entered: 9/1/2006 Sentencing Memorandum
                SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by JOHN R. ROSS (Jahn, Danielle)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 15 Filed: 9/1/2006, Entered: 9/1/2006 Sentencing Memorandum
                  SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by USA as to JOHN R. ROSS (Attachments: # (1)Exhibit )(Cheung, Denise)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: 7/14/2006 Order on Motion for Disclosure
                    MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of [14] the government's motion for authorization to disclose the presentence investigation report to Dr. Robert T.M. Phillips and/or any designated individual of the United States Secret Service solely for use in preparing a threat assessment of the defendant, and the oral representation from defense counsel that the motion is unopposed, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED.Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 07/14/06. (tb, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 14 Filed: 7/11/2006, Entered: 7/11/2006, Terminated: 7/14/2006 Motion for Disclosure
                      MOTION for Disclosure Presentence Investigation Report by USA as to JOHN R. ROSS. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Order)(Cheung, Denise)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: 7/7/2006 Set/Reset Hearings
                        Set/Reset Hearings as to JOHN R. ROSS: Sentencing set for 9/7/2006 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 before Judge John D. Bates. (tb, )
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: 7/7/2006 Order on Motion to Continue
                          MINUTE ORDER : Upon consideration of defendant's [13] Motion to Continue Sentencing date as to JOHN R. ROSS (1); it is hereby ordered that the motion is GRANTED. Sentencing is now set for 9:30 a.m. on 09/07/06 before Judge John D. Bates.Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 07/07/06. (tb, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 13 Filed: 7/6/2006, Entered: 7/6/2006, Terminated: 7/7/2006 Motion to Continue
                            Unopposed MOTION to Continue Sentencing Date by JOHN R. ROSS. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Jahn, Danielle)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 12 Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: 5/9/2006 Waiver of IndictmentCourt Filing
                              WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by JOHN R. ROSS Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 5/8/06. (tnr, )
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 11 Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: 5/9/2006 Waiver of Trial by JuryCourt Filing
                                WAIVER of Right to Trial by Jury as to JOHN R. ROSS Approved by Judge John D. Bates on 5/8/06. (tnr, )
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 10 Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: 5/9/2006 Statement of Facts in Support of Plea Agreement
                                  STATEMENT OF OFFENSE as to JOHN R. ROSS. (tnr, )
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 9 Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: 5/9/2006 Plea Agreement
                                    PLEA AGREEMENT as to JOHN R. ROSS. (tnr, )
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 8 Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: 5/9/2006 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                      MINUTE ORDER : Upon consideration of defendant's [7] Motion as to JOHN R. ROSS (1)to transfer; it is hereby ordered that the motion is GRANTED; The defendant should be transported to the Correction Treatment Facility; defendant should not be placed in protective custody, administrative segregation, nor any other segregation. The defendant should be placed in general population and held there until his case is completed.Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 05/08/06. (tb)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 7 Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: 5/8/2006, Terminated: 5/8/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                        Unopposed MOTION Transfer Mr. John Ross to CTF by JOHN R. ROSS. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Jahn, Danielle)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: 5/9/2006 Arraignment
                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John D. Bates :Arraignment as to JOHN R. ROSS (1) Count 1 held on 5/8/2006; Defendant Sworn, Plea of Guilty entered as to Count 1, REFERRAL TO PROBATION OFFICE for Presentence Investigation, Sentencing set for 8/3/2006 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8 before Judge John D. Bates. Defendant Committed; Commitment Issued. (Court Reporter Bryan Wayne) (Defense Attorney Dani Jahn; US Attorney Denise Cheung) (tnr, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 4/26/2006, Entered: 4/26/2006 Set/Reset Hearings
                                            Set/Reset Hearings as to JOHN R. ROSS: Plea Agreement Hearing set for 5/8/2006 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 before Judge John D. Bates. All necessary documents should be faxed to Chambers not later than May 4, 2006. (tb)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 6 Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: 4/21/2006 Information - Felony
                                              INFORMATION as to JOHN R. ROSS (1) count 1. (tnr, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: 4/21/2006 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                Attorney update in case as to JOHN ROBERT ROSS. Attorney Denise Cheung for USA added. (tnr, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 5 Filed: 4/19/2006, Entered: 4/19/2006, Terminated: 9/8/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                  Unopposed MOTION Transfer to CTF by JOHN ROBERT ROSS. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Jahn, Danielle)[1:06-mj-00115-JMF]
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/18/2006, Entered: 4/18/2006 Waiver of Speedy Trial
                                                    WAIVER of Speedy Trial by JOHN ROBERT ROSS excluding 21 days in the interest of justice. (lm, )[1:06-mj-00115-JMF]
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/18/2006, Entered: 4/18/2006 Status Conference
                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson :Status Conference as to JOHN ROBERT ROSS held on 4/18/2006. Speedy Trial waiver excluding 21 days in the Interest of Justice. Defendant committed/commitment issued. Preliminary/Detention Hearing set for 5/8/2006 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 before Magistrate Judge Alan Kay. (Defense Attorney Danielle Jahn; US Attorney Denise Cheung) (Court Reporter Pro-Typists) (lm, )[1:06-mj-00115-JMF]
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/10/2006, Entered: 4/11/2006 Status Conference
                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson :Status Conference as to JOHN ROBERT ROSS held on 4/10/2006. Joint request for speedy trial waiver excluding 8 days until 4/18/06 granted by the court. Preliminary/Detention/Status Hearing set for 4/18/2006 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4 before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson. Defendant committed/commitment issued. (Defense Attorney DANIELLE JAHN; US Attorney ANGELA GEORGE) (Court Reporter Pro-typists) (lm )[1:06-mj-00115-JMF]
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: 3/27/2006 Status Conference
                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola :Status Conference as to JOHN ROBERT ROSS held on 3/27/2006. Speedy Trial Waiver excluding 14 days in the interest of justice X-T; Preliminary Hearing set for 4/10/2006 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4 before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson; defendant committed/commitment issued; (Court Reporter Pro Typist) (Defense Attorney Dani Jahn; US Attorney Denise Chung) (ldc, )[1:06-mj-00115-JMF]
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 3/23/2006, Entered: 3/23/2006 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Danielle Courtney Jahn appearing for JOHN ROBERT ROSS (Jahn, Danielle)[1:06-mj-00115-JMF]
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 3/16/2006, Entered: 3/16/2006 Substitution of Counsel
                                                              NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL as to JOHN ROBERT ROSS. Substituting for attorney Angela George (Cheung, Denise)[1:06-mj-00115-JMF]
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/16/2006, Entered: 3/16/2006 Status Conference
                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola :Status Conference as to JOHN ROBERT ROSS held on 3/16/2006; Speedy Trial Waiver excluding 10 days in the interest of justice X-T; Preliminary Hearing set for 3/27/2006 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4 before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola; defendant committed/commitment issued; (Court Reporter Pro Typist) (Defense Attorney Carlos Vanegas for Dani Jahn; US Attorney Angela George, Denise Chung) (ldc, )[1:06-mj-00115-JMF]
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/14/2006, Entered: 3/14/2006 Complaint
                                                                  COMPLAINT as to JOHN ROBERT ROSS. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit in Support of Criminal Complaint) (tnr, )[1:06-mj-00115-JMF]
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/14/2006, Entered: 3/14/2006 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                  Attorney update in case as to JOHN ROBERT ROSS. Attorney Angela S. George for USA added. (ldc, )[1:06-mj-00115-JMF]
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/14/2006, Entered: 3/14/2006 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                    Attorney update in case as to JOHN ROBERT ROSS. Attorney Danielle Courtney Jahn for JOHN ROBERT ROSS added. (ldc, )[1:06-mj-00115-JMF]
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/14/2006, Entered: 3/14/2006 Initial Appearance
                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola :Initial Appearance as to JOHN ROBERT ROSS held on 3/14/2006; The Court appointed counsel; three day hold imposed; Preliminary/Detention Hearing set for 3/16/2006 01:45 PM in Courtroom 4 before Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola; defendant held without bond; committed/commitment issued; (Court Reporter Pro Typist) (Defense Attorney Dani Jahn; US Attorney Angela George and Denise Chung; Pretrial Officer Jeremy Schumacher) (ldc, )[1:06-mj-00115-JMF]
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/13/2006, Entered: 3/14/2006 Arrest
                                                                        Arrest of JOHN ROBERT ROSS. (tnr, )[1:06-mj-00115-JMF]
                                                                          LREF

                                                                          Statistics

                                                                          This case has been viewed 31 times.

                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                          Space
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                           
                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                          Need Password Help?