ST. AGNES MEDICAL CENTER et al v. LEAVITT
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-00820-PLF
District Judge Paul L. Friedman, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DAMERON MEDICAL CENTER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of David L. Shulman PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Erling Hansen +1 202 969 8220 +1 202 969 8224 ehansen@a-dlaw.com
No Logo EMMANUAL MEDICAL CENTER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of David L. Shulman PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Erling Hansen +1 202 969 8220 +1 202 969 8224 ehansen@a-dlaw.com
No Logo MADERA COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of David L. Shulman PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Erling Hansen +1 202 969 8220 +1 202 969 8224 ehansen@a-dlaw.com
No Logo MARIN GENERAL HOSPITAL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of David L. Shulman PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Erling Hansen +1 202 969 8220 +1 202 969 8224 ehansen@a-dlaw.com
No Logo SALEM HOSPITAL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of David L. Shulman PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Erling Hansen +1 202 969 8220 +1 202 969 8224 ehansen@a-dlaw.com
No Logo ST. AGNES MEDICAL CENTER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of David L. Shulman PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Erling Hansen +1 202 969 8220 +1 202 969 8224 ehansen@a-dlaw.com
v.
No Logo MICHAEL O. LEAVITT, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter Bryce +1 202 616 8335 +1 202 616 8470 peter.bryce@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 5/3/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 151 - Contract: Medicare Act
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1395 HHS
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Statistical Closing
County 88888
Terminated 9/29/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, TYPE-C
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 15 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: 9/12/2008 Motion for Leave to File
MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by ST. AGNES MEDICAL CENTER (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Memorandum in Support)(Hansen, Erling)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff to submit proposed amended complaint to defendant by 7/16/2008; By 8/4/2008, Plaintiff shall either file the amended complaint, with a proposed order permitting the amendment, or will move for leave to file the proposed amended pleading. (mm)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008 Order on Motion for Order
    MINUTE ORDER granting [14] joint motion regarding case management. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on July 3, 2008. (MA)
      LREF
      Legal Document 14 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008, Terminated: 7/3/2008 Motion for Order
      Joint MOTION for Order Regarding Case Management by ST. AGNES MEDICAL CENTER (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Hansen, Erling)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: 6/19/2008 Status Conference
      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul L. Friedman: Status Conference held on 6/18/2008. Parties to submit joint proposal to Court regarding suggestion as to how to proceed with case. (Court Reporter Linda Russo) (mm)
        LREF
        Legal Document 13 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: 6/11/2008 Substitution of Counsel
        NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Peter Bryce on behalf of MICHAEL O. LEAVITT Substituting for attorney Christopher B. Harwood (Bryce, Peter)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008 Order
          MINUTE ORDER: A Status Conference is set for 6/18/2008 @ 3:30 p.m. in Courtroom 29A before Judge Paul L. Friedman. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 6/2/2008. (mm)
            LREF
            Legal Document 12 Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: 3/17/2008 Stipulation
            STIPULATION by PLAINTIFF(S) IN RE: MEDICARE REIMBURSEMENT LITIGATION. This case is not dismissed in its entirety.(jeb, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 11 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: 2/25/2008 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
              NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by EMMANUAL MEDICAL CENTER, SALEM HOSPITAL, ST. AGNES MEDICAL CENTER, DAMERON MEDICAL CENTER, MARIN GENERAL HOSPITAL, MADERA COMMUNITY HOSPITAL (Hansen, Erling)
                LREF
                Legal Document 10 Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: 12/6/2007 Substitution of Counsel
                NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Christopher Blake Harwood on behalf of MICHAEL O. LEAVITT Substituting for attorney Charlotte A. Abel (Harwood, Christopher)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 9 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007 Substitution of Counsel
                  NOTICE of Subtitution of Counsel by Charlotte A. Abel on behalf of MICHAEL O. LEAVITT Substituting for attorney Peter S. Smith (Abel, Charlotte)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 8 Filed: 10/13/2006, Entered: 10/13/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER that, for management and administrative purposes, to administratively close each of the individual civil action cases that are consolidated under Miscellaneous No. 03-0090. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on October 13, 2006. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on October 13, 2006. Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00601-PLF,1:02-cv-00683-PLF,1:02-cv-01373-PLF,1:02-cv-01380-PLF,1:02-cv-01635-PLF,1:02-cv-01731-PLF,1:02-cv-01890-PLF,1:02-cv-01891-PLF,1:02-cv-01892-PLF,1:02-cv-01893-PLF,1:02-cv-01899-PLF,1:02-cv-01900-PLF,1:02-cv-01901-PLF,1:02-cv-01902-PLF,1:02-cv-01903-PLF,1:02-cv-01905-PLF,1:02-cv-01907-PLF,1:02-cv-01908-PLF,1:02-cv-01910-PLF,1:02-cv-01911-PLF,1:02-cv-01912-PLF,1:02-cv-01913-PLF,1:02-cv-01914-PLF,1:02-cv-01915-PLF,1:02-cv-01916-PLF,1:02-cv-01918-PLF,1:02-cv-01919-PLF,1:02-cv-01920-PLF,1:02-cv-01921-PLF,1:02-cv-01924-PLF,1:02-cv-01926-PLF,1:02-cv-01927-PLF,1:02-cv-02350-PLF,1:02-cv-02409-PLF,1:03-cv-00221-PLF,1:03-cv-00245-PLF,1:03-cv-00267-PLF,1:03-cv-00280-PLF,1:03-cv-00297-PLF,1:03-cv-00298-PLF,1:03-cv-00299-PLF,1:03-cv-00301-PLF,1:03-cv-00312-PLF,1:03-cv-00315-PLF,1:03-cv-00316-PLF,1:03-cv-00317-PLF,1:03-cv-00318-PLF,1:03-cv-00319-PLF,1:03-cv-00320-PLF,1:03-cv-00321-PLF,1:03-cv-00322-PLF,1:03-cv-00323-PLF,1:03-cv-00332-PLF,1:03-cv-00333-PLF,1:03-cv-00334-PLF,1:03-cv-00335-PLF,1:03-cv-00336-PLF,1:03-cv-00337-PLF,1:03-cv-00339-PLF,1:03-cv-00340-PLF,1:03-cv-00341-PLF,1:03-cv-00342-PLF,1:03-cv-00343-PLF,1:03-cv-00345-PLF,1:03-cv-00346-PLF,1:03-cv-00347-PLF,1:03-cv-00348-PLF,1:03-cv-00349-PLF,1:03-cv-00350-PLF,1:03-cv-00351-PLF,1:03-cv-00352-PLF,1:03-cv-00354-PLF,1:03-cv-00355-PLF,1:03-cv-00356-PLF,1:03-cv-00358-PLF,1:03-cv-00359-PLF,1:03-cv-00363-PLF,1:03-cv-00364-PLF,1:03-cv-00391-PLF,1:03-cv-00392-PLF,1:03-cv-00393-PLF,1:03-cv-00394-PLF,1:03-cv-00395-PLF,1:03-cv-00396-PLF,1:03-cv-00397-PLF,1:03-cv-00398-PLF,1:03-cv-00399-PLF,1:03-cv-00400-PLF,1:03-cv-00401-PLF,1:03-cv-00403-PLF,1:03-cv-00404-PLF,1:03-cv-00405-PLF,1:03-cv-00406-PLF,1:03-cv-00407-PLF,1:03-cv-00409-PLF,1:03-cv-00410-PLF,1:03-cv-00411-PLF,1:03-cv-00412-PLF,1:03-cv-00418-PLF,1:03-cv-00419-PLF,1:03-cv-00420-PLF,1:03-cv-00422-PLF,1:03-cv-00423-PLF,1:03-cv-00424-PLF,1:03-cv-00425-PLF,1:03-cv-00428-PLF,1:03-cv-00429-PLF,1:03-cv-00430-PLF,1:03-cv-00436-PLF,1:03-cv-00437-PLF,1:03-cv-00446-PLF,1:03-cv-00447-PLF,1:03-cv-00448-PLF,1:03-cv-00449-PLF,1:03-cv-00450-PLF,1:03-cv-00451-PLF,1:03-cv-00452-PLF,1:03-cv-00453-PLF,1:03-cv-00454-PLF,1:03-cv-00455-PLF,1:03-cv-00456-PLF,1:03-cv-00457-PLF,1:03-cv-00458-PLF,1:03-cv-00459-PLF,1:03-cv-00468-PLF,1:03-cv-00469-PLF,1:03-cv-00470-PLF,1:03-cv-00471-PLF,1:03-cv-00472-PLF,1:03-cv-00473-PLF,1:03-cv-00474-PLF,1:03-cv-00475-PLF,1:03-cv-00476-PLF,1:03-cv-00477-PLF,1:03-cv-00478-PLF,1:03-cv-00479-PLF,1:03-cv-00480-PLF,1:03-cv-00481-PLF,1:03-cv-00482-PLF,1:03-cv-00483-PLF,1:03-cv-00484-PLF,1:03-cv-00485-PLF,1:03-cv-00486-PLF,1:03-cv-00487-PLF,1:03-cv-00488-PLF,1:03-cv-00489-PLF,1:03-cv-00490-PLF,1:03-cv-00491-PLF,1:03-cv-00492-PLF,1:03-cv-00493-PLF,1:03-cv-00494-PLF,1:03-cv-00497-PLF,1:03-cv-00498-PLF,1:03-cv-00499-PLF,1:03-cv-00500-PLF,1:03-cv-00501-PLF,1:03-cv-00502-PLF,1:03-cv-00503-PLF,1:03-cv-00504-PLF,1:03-cv-00505-PLF,1:03-cv-00506-PLF,1:03-cv-00507-PLF,1:03-cv-00508-PLF,1:03-cv-00509-PLF,1:03-cv-00510-PLF,1:03-cv-00511-PLF,1:03-cv-00512-PLF,1:03-cv-00513-PLF,1:03-cv-00514-PLF,1:03-cv-00516-PLF,1:03-cv-00517-PLF,1:03-cv-00518-PLF,1:03-cv-00519-PLF,1:03-cv-00521-PLF,1:03-cv-00522-PLF,1:03-cv-00523-PLF,1:03-cv-00525-PLF,1:03-cv-00526-PLF,1:03-cv-00528-PLF,1:03-cv-00529-PLF,1:03-cv-00530-PLF,1:03-cv-00531-PLF,1:03-cv-00532-PLF,1:03-cv-00533-PLF,1:03-cv-00534-PLF,1:03-cv-00535-PLF,1:03-cv-00536-PLF,1:03-cv-00537-PLF,1:03-cv-00538-PLF,1:03-cv-00539-PLF,1:03-cv-00540-PLF,1:03-cv-00541-PLF,1:03-cv-00542-PLF,1:03-cv-00543-PLF,1:03-cv-00544-PLF,1:03-cv-00545-PLF,1:03-cv-00546-PLF,1:03-cv-00547-PLF,1:03-cv-00548-PLF,1:03-cv-00549-PLF,1:03-cv-00550-PLF,1:03-cv-00551-PLF,1:03-cv-00552-PLF,1:03-cv-00553-PLF,1:03-cv-00554-PLF,1:03-cv-00555-PLF,1:03-cv-00558-PLF,1:03-cv-00559-PLF,1:03-cv-00561-PLF,1:03-cv-00562-PLF,1:03-cv-00563-PLF,1:03-cv-00564-PLF,1:03-cv-00565-PLF,1:03-cv-00566-PLF,1:03-cv-00567-PLF,1:03-cv-00568-PLF,1:03-cv-00569-PLF,1:03-cv-00570-PLF,1:03-cv-00571-PLF,1:03-cv-00572-PLF,1:03-cv-00573-PLF,1:03-cv-00574-PLF,1:03-cv-00575-PLF,1:03-cv-00576-PLF,1:03-cv-00577-PLF,1:03-cv-00578-PLF,1:03-cv-00579-PLF,1:03-cv-00580-PLF,1:03-cv-00581-PLF,1:03-cv-00582-PLF,1:03-cv-00583-PLF,1:03-cv-00584-PLF,1:03-cv-00585-PLF,1:03-cv-00586-PLF,1:03-cv-00587-PLF,1:03-cv-00588-PLF,1:03-cv-00589-PLF,1:03-cv-00590-PLF,1:03-cv-00591-PLF,1:03-cv-00592-PLF,1:03-cv-00593-PLF,1:04-cv-01400-PLF,1:06-cv-00440-PLF,1:06-cv-00796-PLF,1:06-cv-00797-PLF,1:06-cv-00798-PLF,1:06-cv-00799-PLF,1:06-cv-00800-PLF,1:06-cv-00801-PLF,1:06-cv-00804-PLF,1:06-cv-00820-PLF(MA, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 7 Filed: 6/20/2006, Entered: 6/20/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                      NOTICE of Appearance by Peter S. Smith on behalf of MICHAEL O. LEAVITT (Smith, Peter)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 6 Filed: 5/15/2006, Entered: 5/15/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER sua sponte that St. Agnes Medical Center v. Leavitt, Civil Action No. 06-0820 is consolidated with those actions previously consolidated with Baystate Health State v. Leavitt, Civil ACtion No. 02-0601. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on May 15, 2006. (MA)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 5/15/2006, Entered: 5/16/2006 Create Case Association
                          Cases consolidated pursuant to order of 5/15/06. ALL FILING ARE TO BE MADE IN THE LEAD CASE NO. 02-601. (td, )
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 5/15/2006, Entered: 5/15/2006 Create Case Association
                            Cases consolidated pursuant to order of 5/15/06. ALL FILIGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE LEAD CASE NO. 02-601. (td, )
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 5 Filed: 5/10/2006, Entered: 5/11/2006 Amended Complaint
                              FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against MICHAEL O. LEAVITT filed by EMMANUAL MEDICAL CENTER, SALEM HOSPITAL, ST. AGNES MEDICAL CENTER, DAMERON MEDICAL CENTER, MARIN GENERAL HOSPITAL, MADERA COMMUNITY HOSPITAL.(jf, )
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 4 Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: 5/5/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER that plaintiff shall file an amended complaint that includes in the caption plaintiff's phone number and full residence address on or before May 12, 2006. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on May 5, 2006. (MA)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 5/3/2006, Entered: 5/4/2006 LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Aff
                                  LCvR 7.1 - CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by EMMANUAL MEDICAL CENTER, SALEM HOSPITAL, ST. AGNES MEDICAL CENTER, DAMERON MEDICAL CENTER, MARIN GENERAL HOSPITAL, MADERA COMMUNITY HOSPITAL (td, )
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 5/3/2006, Entered: 5/4/2006 Notice of Related Case
                                    NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by EMMANUAL MEDICAL CENTER, SALEM HOSPITAL, ST. AGNES MEDICAL CENTER, DAMERON MEDICAL CENTER, MARIN GENERAL HOSPITAL, MADERA COMMUNITY HOSPITAL. Case related to Case No. 03-90. (td, )
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/3/2006, Entered: 5/4/2006 Complaint
                                      COMPLAINT against MICHAEL O. LEAVITT (Filing fee $ 350) filed by EMMANUAL MEDICAL CENTER, SALEM HOSPITAL, ST. AGNES MEDICAL CENTER, DAMERON MEDICAL CENTER, MARIN GENERAL HOSPITAL, MADERA COMMUNITY HOSPITAL.(td, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/3/2006, Entered: 5/8/2006 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                        SUMMONS (3) Issued as to MICHAEL O. LEAVITT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (td, )
                                          LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 124 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?