SHEPPARD v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-00855-RBW
District Judge Reggie B. Walton, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo KEVIN LAMONT SHEPPARD, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Mark Nester +1 202 783 4474 +1 202 628 2881 nesterak@aol.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter S. Smith +1 202 514 7065 +1 202 514 8779 peter.smith@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 5/8/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand $5000000
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Transfer to Another District
County 88888
Terminated 3/30/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, TRANSFERRED, TYPE-B
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/12/2007, Entered: 4/12/2007 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 12, 2007. (lcrbw3, )
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: 4/11/2007 Receipt for Transfer Papers
    Receipt on 4/11/07 of Transfer Papers. Other Court Number AW-07-9 sent by USDC FOR Maryland (Greenbelt). (td, )
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 4/10/2007, Entered: 4/10/2007 Case Transferred Out
      Case transferred out electronically, pursuant to order filed 3/30/07, to the United States District Court for the District of Maryland (Greenbelt). (td, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 10 Filed: 3/30/2007, Entered: 3/30/2007 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
        ORDER granting in part and denying in part [4] Motion to Dismiss. The plaintiff's claims against the United States Marshals Service are hereby dismissed. This matter is hereby transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Maryland. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on March 30, 2007. (lcrbw3, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 9 Filed: 9/19/2006, Entered: 9/19/2006 Reply to opposition to Motion
          REPLY to opposition to motion re [4] MOTION to Dismiss filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Smith, Peter)
            LREF
            Legal Document 8 Filed: 8/30/2006, Entered: 8/30/2006, Terminated: 8/30/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 8/30/2006, Entered: 8/30/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
              MINUTE ORDER granting [8] Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The defendant shall reply to the plaintiff's opposition to the motion to dismiss by September 19, 2006. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on August 30, 2006. (lcrbw3, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 7 Filed: 8/23/2006, Entered: 8/23/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
                Memorandum in opposition to re [4] MOTION to Dismiss filed by KEVIN LAMONT SHEPPARD. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Nester, David)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: 8/17/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                  MINUTE ORDER granting [6] Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. The plaintiff shall respond to the defendant's motion to dismiss by August 23, 2006. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on August 17, 2006. (lcrbw3, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 6 Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: 8/15/2006, Terminated: 8/17/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [4] MOTION to Dismiss by KEVIN LAMONT SHEPPARD. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Nester, David)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: 8/14/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                      MINUTE ORDER granting [5] Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. The plaintiff shall respond to the government's motion to dismiss by August 16, 2006. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on August 14, 2006. (lcrbw3, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: 8/7/2006, Terminated: 8/14/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [4] MOTION to Dismiss Defendant by KEVIN LAMONT SHEPPARD. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Nester, David)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: 7/31/2006, Terminated: 3/30/2007 Motion to Dismiss
                          MOTION to Dismiss by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit # (2) Exhibit # (3) Exhibit # (4) Exhibit # (5) Exhibit # (6) Exhibit # (7) Exhibit # (8) Exhibit # (9) Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: 7/7/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                          MINUTE ORDER granting [3] Consent Motion for Extension of Time. The defendant shall respond to the plaintiff's complaint by July 31, 2006. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 7, 2006. (lcrbw3, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/6/2006, Entered: 7/6/2006, Terminated: 7/7/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 2 Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: 5/17/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                            NOTICE of Appearance by Peter S. Smith on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Smith, Peter)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: 5/9/2006 Complaint
                              COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Filing fee $ 350) filed by KEVIN LAMONT SHEPPARD.(jf, )
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: 5/9/2006 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                SUMMONS (2) Issued as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf, ) .
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 134 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?