DEMARTINO v. F.B.I. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-00879-RJL
District Judge Richard J. Leon, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 4, 2017 at 3:50 PM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo VINCENT DEMARTINO, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF US ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John G. Interrante +1 202 514 7220 +1 202 514 8780 john.interrante@usdoj.gov
Space Cindy S. Owens +1 202 616 2257 cindy.owens@usdoj.gov
Federal Bureau of Investigation Federal Bureau of Investigation, Defendant
Officially listed as "F.B.I."

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John G. Interrante +1 202 514 7220 +1 202 514 8780 john.interrante@usdoj.gov
Space Cindy S. Owens +1 202 616 2257 cindy.owens@usdoj.gov
No Logo F.B.I. O.C.DIV., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John G. Interrante +1 202 514 7220 +1 202 514 8780 john.interrante@usdoj.gov
Space Cindy S. Owens +1 202 616 2257 cindy.owens@usdoj.gov
Federal Bureau of Prisons Federal Bureau of Prisons, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John G. Interrante +1 202 514 7220 +1 202 514 8780 john.interrante@usdoj.gov
Space Cindy S. Owens +1 202 616 2257 cindy.owens@usdoj.gov
No Logo N.C.I.C., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John G. Interrante +1 202 514 7220 +1 202 514 8780 john.interrante@usdoj.gov
Space Cindy S. Owens +1 202 616 2257 cindy.owens@usdoj.gov
No Logo U.s. Probation Office, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John G. Interrante +1 202 514 7220 +1 202 514 8780 john.interrante@usdoj.gov
Space Cindy S. Owens +1 202 616 2257 cindy.owens@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 5/10/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags PROSE-PR, TYPE-I
  Entries (58) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 48 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/9/2008 Notice of Appearance/
NOTICE of Appearance by Cindy S. Owens on behalf of F.B.I., N.C.I.C., EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF US ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, F.B.I. O.C.DIV., F.B.I. O.C. DIV., FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, US PROBATION OFFICE (Owens, Cindy)
    LREF
    Legal Document 47 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: 4/9/2008 Supplemental Memorandum
    SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to [45] RESPONSE re [40] MOTION for Summary Judgment in Part filed by VINCENT DEMARTINO. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(jf, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 46 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008 Reply to opposition to Motion
      REPLY to opposition to motion re [40] MOTION for Summary Judgment in Part filed by F.B.I.. (Interrante, John)
        LREF
        Legal Document 45 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: 3/24/2008 Response to Document
        RESPONSE re [40] MOTION for Summary Judgment in Part filed by VINCENT DEMARTINO. (jf, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 44 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: 2/28/2008 Substitution of Counsel
          NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by John G. Interrante on behalf of F.B.I., N.C.I.C., EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF US ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, F.B.I. O.C.DIV., F.B.I. O.C. DIV., FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, US PROBATION OFFICE Substituting for attorney Karen L. Melnik (Interrante, John)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: 2/25/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
            Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/25/2008. (whb)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: 2/25/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
              MINUTE ORDER granting [43] Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for extension of time is GRANTED and that plaintiff has up to and including March 25, 2008 to file an opposition to defendants' motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 2/25/2008. (lcrjl1)
                LREF
                Legal Document 43 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/22/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to
                MOTION for Extension of Time to file a response to motion for summary judgment by VINCENT DEMARTINO (jf, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 42 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008 Response to DocumentCourt Filing
                  RESPONSE to [40] MOTION for Summary Judgment in Part filed by VINCENT DEMARTINO. "Leave to File Granted" Judge Richard J. Leon (jf, ) Modified on 2/20/2008 (nmw, ).
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 41 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/4/2008 Fox/Neal OrderCourt Filing
                    Order advising plaintiff to respond or Court may deem matter as conceded Responses to the FBI' s motion for summary judgment due by 3/11/2008. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 2/4/08. (whb)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 40 Filed: 1/31/2008, Entered: 1/31/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
                      MOTION for Summary Judgment in Part by F.B.I. (Attachments: # (1) Statement of Facts, # (2) Text of Proposed Order, # (3) Fifth Hardy Declaration, # (4) DeStefano Declaration)(Melnik, Karen)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 39 Filed: 1/24/2008, Entered: 1/24/2008 Reply to opposition to Motion
                        REPLY to opposition to motion re [35] MOTION for Summary Judgment in Part filed by F.B.I.. (Melnik, Karen)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 38 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: 1/23/2008 Response to Document
                          RESPONSE to [35] MOTION for Summary Judgment in Part filed by VINCENT DEMARTINO. (tg, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 37 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: 1/4/2008 Fox/Neal OrderCourt Filing
                            Order advising plaintiff to respond or Court may deem matter as conceded Responses due by 2/4/2008. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 1/3/08. (whb)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 36 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: 1/4/2008 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER granting [34] MOTION for Order Preserving Certain Exemptions by F.B.I. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 1/3/08. (whb)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 35 Filed: 12/26/2007, Entered: 12/26/2007 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                MOTION for Summary Judgment in Part by F.B.I. (Attachments: # (1) Statement of Facts # (2) Text of Proposed Order # (3) Fourth Hardy Declaration# (4) Exhibit A - Part 1# (5) Exhibit A - Part 2# (6) Exhibit A - Part 3# (7) Exhibit A - Part 4# (8) Exhibit A - Part 5 and Exhibit B)(Melnik, Karen)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 34 Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: 12/17/2007, Terminated: 1/4/2008 Motion for Order
                                  MOTION for Order Preserving Certain Exemptions by F.B.I. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order # (2) Third Hardy Declaration)(Melnik, Karen)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: 10/31/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant F.B.I.'s Summary Judgment motions due by 12/26/2007. (whb)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 10/30/2007, Entered: 10/30/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                                      MINUTE ORDER granting [33] Motion for an Enlargement of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that defendant FBI's motion is GRANTED and that defendant FBI has up to and including December 26, 2007, to file a motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/30/07. (lcrjl1)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 33 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: 10/26/2007, Terminated: 10/30/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Motion for Summary Judgment by F.B.I., F.B.I. O.C.DIV., F.B.I. O.C. DIV. (Attachments: # (1) Bellando Declaration)(Melnik, Karen)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 32 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                          MOTION for ripeness by VINCENT DEMARTINO (jf, )
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 31 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: 9/27/2007 Order on Motion for Partial Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                            ORDER granting [22] Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 9/27/07. (whb)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 30 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: 9/27/2007 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                              MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 9/27/07. (whb)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 29 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: 6/11/2007 Notice of Change of Address
                                                NOTICE of Change of Address by VINCENT DEMARTINO (jf, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 28 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: 5/4/2007 Notice of Change of Address
                                                  NOTICE of Change of Address by VINCENT DEMARTINO (tg, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 27 Filed: 12/26/2006, Entered: 1/3/2007 Affidavit
                                                    DECLARATION by VINCENT DEMARTINO. (jf, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 26 Filed: 12/13/2006, Entered: 12/13/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time toCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER granting [24] 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to file a response to Defendant's motion for summary judgment by VINCENT DEMARTINO. Plaintiff's shall respond by 12/28/06. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 12/12/06. (whb)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 25 Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: 12/6/2006 Status Report
                                                        STATUS REPORT by F.B.I., N.C.I.C., EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF US ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, F.B.I. O.C.DIV., F.B.I. O.C. DIV., FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, US PROBATION OFFICE. (Attachments: # (1) Second Hardy Declaration and Exhibits thereto# (2) Second Roberts Declaration and Exhibits thereto)(Melnik, Karen)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 24 Filed: 11/22/2006, Entered: 11/27/2006, Terminated: 12/13/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to file a response to Defendant's motion for summary judgment by VINCENT DEMARTINO. (jf, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 23 Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: 10/26/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER granting defendant's request to file a status report by December 6, 2006, regarding plaintiff's payment of processing fees to the Federal Bureau of Investigation and the United States Parole Commission . Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/25/06. (whb)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: 10/26/2006 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's response to Defendant's motion for Summary Judgment due by 11/28/2006. (whb)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 22 Filed: 10/18/2006, Entered: 10/18/2006, Terminated: 9/27/2007 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by F.B.I., N.C.I.C., EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF US ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, F.B.I. O.C.DIV., F.B.I. O.C. DIV., FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, US PROBATION OFFICE. (Attachments: # (1) Statement of Facts # (2) Text of Proposed Order # (3) Hardy Declaration and Exhibits thereto# (4) Roberts Declaration and Exhibit thereto# (5) Boseker Declaration and Exhibits thereto# (6) Hauck-DeCuir Declaration and Exhibits thereto# (7) Exhibit 1# (8) Exhibit 2# (9) Exhibit 3# (10) Exhibit 4# (11) Exhibit 5# (12) Exhibit 6# (13) Exhibit 7# (14) Exhibit 8# (15) Exhibit 9# (16) Exhibit 10# (17) Exhibit 11# (18) Exhibit 12# (19) Exhibit 13# (20) Exhibit 14# (21) Exhibit 15)(Melnik, Karen)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 21 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 9/29/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time toCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER granting [19] Defendant's motion for Extension of Time to file dispositive motions. Defendant's dispositive motions deadline is 10/25/06 . Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 9/29/06. (whb)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 9/29/2006 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's dispositive Motions due by 10/25/2006. (whb)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 20 Filed: 9/22/2006, Entered: 9/25/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                    Memorandum in opposition to re [19] MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Dispositive Motion filed by VINCENT DEMARTINO. (jf, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 19 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: 9/20/2006, Terminated: 9/29/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Dispositive Motion by F.B.I., N.C.I.C., EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF US ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, F.B.I. O.C.DIV., F.B.I. O.C. DIV., FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, US PROBATION OFFICE. (Melnik, Karen)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 18 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: 9/19/2006 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to US PROBATION OFFICE served on 8/28/2006, answer due 10/27/2006. (jf, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 17 Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: 9/12/2006 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC
                                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney. F.B.I.; F.B.I. O.C.DIV. ; F.B.I. O.C. DIV.; US PROBATION OFFICE served on 8/21/2006, answer due 10/20/2006 (jf, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 16 Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: 9/12/2006 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                                            RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF US ATTORNEY'S OFFICE and FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS served on 8/21/2006, answer due 10/20/2006. (jf, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 15 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: 9/6/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time toCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting [13] MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Dispositive Motion by F.B.I., N.C.I.C., EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF US ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, F.B.I. O.C.DIV., F.B.I. O.C. DIV., FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, US PROBATION OFFICE. Defendants have until 9/25/06, to file a dispositive motion. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 9/1/06. (whb)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 14 Filed: 8/30/2006, Entered: 8/31/2006 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 8/21/06., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to N.C.I.C. served on 8/21/2006, answer due 10/20/2006. (jf, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 13 Filed: 8/22/2006, Entered: 8/22/2006, Terminated: 9/6/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Dispositive Motion by F.B.I., N.C.I.C., EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF US ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, F.B.I. O.C.DIV., F.B.I. O.C. DIV., FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, US PROBATION OFFICE. (Melnik, Karen)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: 8/15/2006 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                                                                    SUMMONS (9) Issued as to F.B.I., N.C.I.C., EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF US ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, F.B.I. O.C.DIV., F.B.I. O.C. DIV., FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, US PROBATION OFFICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 12 Filed: 8/9/2006, Entered: 8/9/2006 Order on Motion for DiscoveryCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER granting [5] MOTION for enlargement of time to file a dispositive motion by VINCENT DEMARTINO. Dispositive motions deadline: 8/24/06 . Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 8/4/06. (whb)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 8/3/2006, Entered: 8/3/2006 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Answer or response to the complaint due by 8/24/2006. (whb)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: 8/2/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                          ORDER granting nunc pro tunc [11] MOTION for Extension of Time. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall file an answer, or otherwise respond to the complaint, on or before August 24, 2006. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 8/2/06. (lcrjl1)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 11 Filed: 7/18/2006, Entered: 7/18/2006, Terminated: 8/2/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Dispositive Motion by F.B.I., N.C.I.C., EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF US ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, F.B.I. O.C.DIV., F.B.I. O.C. DIV., FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, US PROBATION OFFICE. (Melnik, Karen)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 10 Filed: 7/18/2006, Entered: 7/18/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Karen L. Melnik on behalf of F.B.I., N.C.I.C., EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF US ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, F.B.I. O.C.DIV., F.B.I. O.C. DIV., FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, US PROBATION OFFICE (Melnik, Karen)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 9 Filed: 5/26/2006, Entered: 5/30/2006 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                                                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 5/23/06., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney served on 5/23/2006, answer due 7/24/2006;. (jf, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 8 Filed: 5/26/2006, Entered: 5/30/2006 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to F.B.I. served on 5/23/2006, answer due 7/24/2006; EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF US ATTORNEY'S OFFICE served on 5/23/2006, answer due 7/24/2006; FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS served on 5/23/2006, answer due 7/24/2006. (jf, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 5/24/2006, Entered: 5/25/2006 Summons Returned Unexecuted
                                                                                                    Summons Returned Unexecuted as to F.B.I. O.C.DIV.(E.D.N.Y.). (jf, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 5/22/2006, Entered: 5/23/2006 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to F.B.I. O.C.DIV. served on 5/15/2006, answer due 7/14/2006. (jf, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: 5/22/2006, Terminated: 8/9/2006 Motion for Discovery
                                                                                                        MOTION for Discovery by VINCENT DEMARTINO. (jf, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 5/10/2006, Entered: 5/12/2006 Order Directing Prisoner PaymentCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER Directing Monthly Payments in the amount of $62.00 be made from Prison Account of Vincent De Martino; further ordered granting [2] MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 30, 2006. (jf, )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/10/2006, Entered: 5/12/2006 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
                                                                                                            PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by VINCENT DEMARTINO (jf, )
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 5/10/2006, Entered: 5/12/2006, Terminated: 5/10/2006 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by VINCENT DEMARTINO. (jf, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/10/2006, Entered: 5/12/2006 Complaint
                                                                                                                COMPLAINT against F.B.I., N.C.I.C., EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF US ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, F.B.I. O.C.DIV., F.B.I. O.C. DIV., FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, US PROBATION OFFICE (Filing fee $ 0.00) filed by VINCENT DEMARTINO.(jf, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/10/2006, Entered: 5/12/2006 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                                                                                                  SUMMONS (9) Issued as to F.B.I., N.C.I.C., EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF US ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, F.B.I. O.C.DIV., F.B.I. O.C. DIV., FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, US PROBATION OFFICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf, )
                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 272 times.

                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?