WELZEL et al v. UNITED STATES GOVERNMENT
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-00838-RBW
District Judge Reggie B. Walton, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo LISA L. WELZEL, Plaintiff
No Logo ROBERT J. WELZEL, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "UNITED STATES GOVERNMENT"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Pat S. Genis +1 202 307 6390 +1 202 514 6866 pat.genis@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 5/5/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 875 - Taxes: Customer Challenge
Cause Section 26 U.S.C. § 7422 Civil Actions by Taxpayers for Refund of Taxes
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County 88888
Terminated 3/30/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, PROSE-NP, TYPE-F
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 8/28/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
Set/Reset Deadlines: Dispositive Motions due by 9/29/2008. Opposition to Dispositive Motions due by 10/29/2008. Replies to Dispositive Motions due by 11/12/2008. (mpt, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 20 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: 8/27/2008 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
    MEMORANDUM AND OPINION in accordance with [17] as to ruling on [14] and [16]. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 8/27/08. (lcrbw2)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: 8/27/2008 Order on Motion to Dismiss
      MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice [18]Motion to Dismiss. In light of the issuance of the Court's Memorandum Opinion, any dispostive motions shall be filed by September 29, 2008; any oppositions shall be filed by October 29, 2008; and any replies thereto shall be filed by November 12, 2008. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 8/27/08. (lcrbw2)
        LREF
        Legal Document 19 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: 8/27/2008 Response to Document
        RESPONSE re [18] Second MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by ROBERT J. WELZEL. (td, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 18 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: 7/29/2008, Terminated: 8/27/2008 Motion to Dismiss
          Second MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by UNITED STATES GOVERNMENT (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Genis, Pat)
            LREF
            Legal Document 17 Filed: 3/28/2008, Entered: 3/28/2008 Order on Motion to VacateCourt Filing
            ORDER denying as moot [14] Motion to Vacate; granting in part and denying in part [16] Motion to Amend/Correct. The plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend Motion for Relief from Order of Dismissal Under [Federal Rules of Civil Procedure] 60(b)(3), [60(b)](6) is GRANTED. The plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Relief from Order of Dismissal Under [Federal Rules of Civil Procedure] 60(b)(3), [60(b)](6) and Amended Memorandum in Support of Motion for Relief from Order of Dismissal Under [Federal Rules of Civil Procedure] 60(b)(3), [60(b)](6) are deemed filed. The plaintiffs' Motion for Relief from Order of Dismissal Under [Federal Rules of Civil Procedure] [60(b)](6) is DENIED AS MOOT. The plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Relief from Order of Dismissal Under [Federal Rules of Civil Procedure] 60(b)(3), [60(b)](6) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 3/28/08. (lcrbw2)
              LREF
              Legal Document 16 Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007 Motion to Amend/Correct
              MOTION to Amend/Correct [14] MOTION for relief from order of dismissal under Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(b)(30,(6) by ROBERT J. WELZEL (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Amended Motion for Relief)(td, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 15 Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007 Notice of Change of Address
                NOTICE of Change of Address by ROBERT J. WELZEL, LISA L. WELZEL (td, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 14 Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: 6/7/2007, Terminated: 3/28/2008 Motion to Vacate
                  MOTION for Relief From Order of Dismissal [13] Order by ROBERT J. WELZEL, LISA L. WELZEL (Attachments: # (1) Attachments (part 1)# (2) Attachments (part 2)# (3) Attachments (part 3)# (4) Attachments (part 4)# (5) Attachments (part 5))(tg, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 13 Filed: 3/30/2007, Entered: 3/30/2007 Order on Motion to VacateCourt Filing
                  ORDER granting [8] Motion to Vacate Entry of Default and Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 3/30/07. (lcrbw2)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 12 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: 3/1/2007 Supplemental Memorandum
                    SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re [10] Response to Document filed by ROBERT J. WELZEL, LISA L. WELZEL. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit # (2) Exhibit)(td, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 11 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: 11/27/2006 Notice of Change of Address
                    NOTICE of Change of Address by ROBERT J. WELZEL, LISA L. WELZEL (td, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 10 Filed: 8/16/2006, Entered: 8/17/2006 Response to Document
                      RESPONSE to [8] MOTION to Vacate Entry of Default & Motion to Dismiss filed by ROBERT J. WELZEL, LISA L. WELZEL. (tg, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 9 Filed: 8/16/2006, Entered: 8/16/2006 Reply to opposition to Motion
                        REPLY to opposition to motion re [8] MOTION to Vacate Entry of Default & Motion to Dismiss filed by UNITED STATES GOVERNMENT. (Genis, Pat)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 8 Filed: 7/27/2006, Entered: 7/27/2006, Terminated: 3/30/2007 Motion to Vacate
                          MOTION to Vacate Entry of Default & Motion to Dismiss by UNITED STATES GOVERNMENT. (Attachments: # (1) brief# (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Genis, Pat)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 7 Filed: 7/13/2006, Entered: 7/14/2006 Clerks Entry of Default*
                            VACATED PURSUANT TO ORDER DATED 3/30/2007.....Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to UNITED STATES GOVERNMENT (lc, ) Modified on 4/2/2007 (nmw, ).
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 6 Filed: 7/13/2006, Entered: 7/14/2006 Affidavit for Default
                              AFFIDAVIT FOR DEFAULT by ROBERT J. WELZEL, LISA L. WELZEL as to UNITED STATES GOVERNMENT. (lc, )
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 5 Filed: 6/28/2006, Entered: 6/29/2006 ERRATA
                                ERRATA by ROBERT J. WELZEL, LISA L. WELZEL [1] Complaint filed by ROBERT J. WELZEL,, LISA L. WELZEL,. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(td, )
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: 6/26/2006 ERRATA
                                  ERRATA verified addendum to complaint by ROBERT J. WELZEL, LISA L. WELZEL [1] Complaint filed by ROBERT J. WELZEL,, LISA L. WELZEL,. (td, )
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 5/15/2006, Entered: 5/16/2006 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC
                                    RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney served on 5/10/2006, answer due 7/10/2006 (td, )
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 5/12/2006, Entered: 5/16/2006 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                                      RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 5/10/06. (td, )
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: 5/12/2006 Complaint
                                        COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES GOVERNMENT (Filing fee $ 350) filed by ROBERT J. WELZEL, LISA L. WELZEL.(jf, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: 5/12/2006 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                          SUMMONS (2) Issued as to UNITED STATES GOVERNMENT and U.S. Attorney General (jf, )
                                            LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 239 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?