UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $14,028.68 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-00927-RWR
District Judge Richard W. Roberts, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
Space Barry Wiegand +1 202 514 7315 william.b.wiegand@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo $14,028.68 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Kevin Dorsey +1 202 347 9000 +1 202 783 5407 dorseylaw@aol.com
Space Harry Tun +1 202 393 2882 +1 202 783 5407 tunharry@aol.com
Office Washington, DC
Filed 5/16/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 625 - Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause Section 10 U.S.C. § 1006 Review of Agency Decision
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Plaintiff
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County 11001
Terminated 4/26/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, TYPE-E
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 17 Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: 4/26/2007 OrderCourt Filing
FINAL ORDER OF FORFEITURE. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 4/23/07. (lin, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 16 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: 4/23/2007, Terminated: 4/26/2007 Motion for Forfeiture of Property
    Proposed MOTION for Forfeiture of Property Proposed Final Order of Forfeiture by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Wiegand, Barry)
      LREF
      Legal Document 15 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: 4/23/2007 Stipulation
      STIPULATION Stipulated Settlement by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Wiegand, Barry)
        LREF
        Legal Document 14 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: 3/15/2007 Status Report
        STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Wiegand, Barry)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: 2/16/2007 Order
          MINUTE ORDER: In light of parties' report that they are close to settlement, it is hereby ORDERED that parties shall file a joint status report in thirty days, by March 16, 2007, updating the court on the status of settlement discussions. Issued by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 2/16/07. (lcrwr1)
            LREF
            Legal Document 13 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: 2/15/2007, Terminated: 4/24/2007 Motion to Continue
            Joint MOTION to Continue Status Conference by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Wiegand, Barry)
              LREF
              Legal Document 12 Filed: 1/25/2007, Entered: 1/25/2007 Notice of Appearance/
              NOTICE of Appearance by Barry Wiegand on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Wiegand, Barry)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 1/25/2007, Entered: 1/25/2007 Order on Motion to Continue
                MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that defendant's motion [10] to continue be, and hereby is, GRANTED nunc pro tunc. Issued by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 1/25/07. (lcrwr1)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 11 Filed: 10/18/2006, Entered: 10/18/2006 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                  SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 10/17/06. (lcrwr1)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: 10/17/2006 Status Conference
                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard W. Roberts : Status Conference held on 10/17/2006. Discovery due by 2/14/2007. Dispositive Motions due by 3/19/2007. Status Conference set for 2/16/2007 09:15 AM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Richard W. Roberts. (Court Reporter Scott Wallace.) (lin, )
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: 10/10/2006 Notice of Hearing.
                      NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 10/17/2006 11:30 AM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Richard W. Roberts. (lin, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 10 Filed: 9/22/2006, Entered: 9/22/2006, Terminated: 1/25/2007 Motion to Continue
                        Consent MOTION to Continue by $14,028.68 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Dorsey, Daniel)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 9 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: 9/20/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER SETTING INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE for 10/6/06 at 9:45 a.m. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 9/18/06. (lcrwr1)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 8 Filed: 8/10/2006, Entered: 8/10/2006 Meet and Confer Statement
                          MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: # (1))(Kidwell, Judith)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 7 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: 6/29/2006 ~Notice (other)
                            NOTICE by $14,028.68 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY re [4] Answer to Complaint (Attachments: # (1))(Dorsey, Daniel)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 6 Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: 6/22/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                              NOTICE of Appearance by Harry Tun on behalf of $14,028.68 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY (Tun, Harry)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 5 Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: 6/22/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Kevin Dorsey on behalf of $14,028.68 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY (Dorsey, Daniel)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: 6/22/2006 Answer
                                  ANSWER to Complaint by $14,028.68 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY. Related document: [1] Complaint filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,.(Dorsey, Daniel)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 5/18/2006, Entered: 5/22/2006 Writ Executed
                                    Warrant Returned Executed on 05/17/06 upon $14,028.68 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY. (jf, )
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 5/16/2006, Entered: 5/17/2006 Notice of Related Case
                                      NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Case related to Criminal Case No. 05-256. (jf, )
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/16/2006, Entered: 5/17/2006 Complaint
                                        COMPLAINT against $14,028.68 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY (Filing fee $ 0.00) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(jf, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/16/2006, Entered: 5/17/2006 Summons Issued
                                          Summons (1) Issued as to $14,028.68 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY., WARRANT (1) of of Arrest In Rem issued (jf, )
                                            LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 88 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?