COCHISE v. NORTON
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-00980-RJL
District Judge Richard J. Leon, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo RENE COCHISE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Gregory Weaver (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frazer Walton, Jr. +1 202 584 7572 +1 202 398 8920 frawalton@verizon.net
v.
No Logo GALE A. NORTON, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 5/26/2006
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $300000
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags JURY, TYPE-H
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 18 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008 Reply to opposition to Motion
REPLY to opposition to motion re [13] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by RENE COCHISE. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Rene Cochise)(Walton, Frazer)
    LREF
    Legal Document 17 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008 Reply to opposition to Motion
    REPLY to opposition to motion re [14] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GALE A. NORTON. (Natiello, Christian)
      LREF
      Legal Document 16 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
      Memorandum in opposition to re [13] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by GALE A. NORTON. (Natiello, Christian)
        LREF
        Legal Document 15 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
        Memorandum in opposition to re [14] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by RENE COCHISE. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit # 5 with Missing Star Award Included)(Walton, Frazer)
        LREF
        Legal Document 14 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: 6/6/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
        MOTION for Summary Judgment by GALE A. NORTON (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A through L (complete set))(Natiello, Christian)
          LREF
          Legal Document 13 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: 6/5/2008 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
          MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by RENE COCHISE (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit and Order, # (2) Exhibit)(Walton, Frazer)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: 4/15/2008 Scheduling Order
          SCHEDULING ORDER: Dispositive Motions due by 6/6/2008. Oppositions to Dispositive Motions or Cross-Dispositive Motions due by 7/21/2008. Reply to Dispositive Motions due by 8/21/2008. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 04/15/08. (lcrjl3)
            LREF
            Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008 Notice of Proposed Order
            NOTICE of Proposed Order for scheduling of dispositive motions and responses thereto by RENE COCHISE, GALE A. NORTON (Natiello, Christian)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 3/27/2008, Entered: 3/31/2008 Status Conference
              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Status Conference held on 3/27/2008. Parties to file joint proposed scheduling Order. (Court Reporter Patty Gels.) (whb)
                LREF
                Legal Document 11 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: 3/25/2008 Substitution of Counsel
                NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Christian Alexander Natiello on behalf of GALE A. NORTON Substituting for attorney Claire Whitaker (Natiello, Christian)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 1/24/2008, Entered: 1/24/2008 Set/Reset Hearings
                  Notice of Rescheduled Hearings: Status Conference set for 3/28/08 is RESCHEDULED to 3/27/2008 04:30 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (whb)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: 1/18/2008 Order on Motion to Continue
                    MINUTE ORDER granting [10] Consent MOTION to Continue February 8, 2008, Status Conference by GALE A. NORTON. It is hereby ORDERED that the status conference scheduled for 2/8/08 at 2:30PM is rescheduled to 3/28/08 at 11:30AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 1/18/08.(lcrjl2, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 10 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: 1/16/2008, Terminated: 1/18/2008 Motion to Continue
                      Consent MOTION to Continue February 8, 2008, Status Conference by GALE A. NORTON (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Whitaker, Claire)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 11/5/2007, Entered: 11/6/2007 Status Conference
                      Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon : Status Conference held on 11/5/2007.Status Conference set for 2/8/2008 02:30 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (Court Reporter Patty Gels.) (whb)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/21/2007 Set Hearings
                        SCHEDULING NOTICE. A Status Conference is set for 11/5/2007 at 3:30 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 9/21/07. (lcrjl2, )
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: 6/11/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                          Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery due by 9/7/2007. (whb)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: 6/8/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete
                            MINUTE ORDER granting [9] Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. It is hereby ORDERED that discovery will close 9/7/07. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 6/7/07. (lcrjl2, )
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 9 Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: 6/6/2007, Terminated: 6/8/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                              Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by GALE A. NORTON (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Whitaker, Claire)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 3/30/2007, Entered: 3/30/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery due by 6/19/2007. (whb)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/30/2007, Entered: 3/30/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete
                                  MINUTE ORDER granting [8] Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties have until 6/19/07 to complete discovery. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 3/30/07. (lcrjl2)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 8 Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: 3/27/2007, Terminated: 3/30/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by GALE A. NORTON (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Whitaker, Claire)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/26/2007, Entered: 1/26/2007 Set Deadlines
                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that amendments to the pleadings are due by 10/10/2006; exchange of expert witness reports will be completed by 2/23/07; discovery shall commence immediately and will be completed by 3/27/07; dispositive motions will be due by 5/14/2007. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 1/26/07. (lcrjl2 )
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 7 Filed: 11/10/2006, Entered: 11/10/2006 Request for Production of Documents
                                        REQUEST for Production of Documents by RENE COCHISE.(Walton, Frazer)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 6 Filed: 11/10/2006, Entered: 11/10/2006 Request for Admissions
                                          REQUEST for Admissions by RENE COCHISE.(Walton, Frazer)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 5 Filed: 10/6/2006, Entered: 10/6/2006 Meet and Confer Statement
                                            MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Walton, Frazer)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 4 Filed: 9/5/2006, Entered: 9/5/2006 Answer
                                              ANSWER to Complaint by GALE A. NORTON. Related document: [1] Complaint filed by RENE COCHISE,.(Whitaker, Claire)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/27/2006, Entered: 7/27/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Claire M. Whitaker on behalf of GALE A. NORTON (Whitaker, Claire)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 5/30/2006, Entered: 5/30/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 5/30/2006. (CMcP, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/26/2006, Entered: 5/30/2006 Complaint
                                                    COMPLAINT against GALE A. NORTON (Filing fee $ 350) filed by RENE COCHISE.(jf, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/26/2006, Entered: 5/30/2006 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                                      SUMMONS (3) Issued as to GALE A. NORTON, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf, )
                                                        LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 751 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?