SHARP v. THE STATE OF NEW YORK et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-01267-EGS
District Judge Emmet G. Sullivan, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo LINDA SHARP, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo CHARLES HYNES, Defendant
No Logo ELLIOT L. SPITZER, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the New York Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Constantine Speres +1 212 416 8567 +1 212 416 6009 constantine.speres@oag.state.ny.us
No Logo GEORGE E. PATAKI, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the New York Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Constantine Speres +1 212 416 8567 +1 212 416 6009 constantine.speres@oag.state.ny.us
No Logo JONATHAN LIPPMAN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the New York Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Constantine Speres +1 212 416 8567 +1 212 416 6009 constantine.speres@oag.state.ny.us
No Logo JUDITH A. PASCALE, Defendant
No Logo JUDITH S. KAYE, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the New York Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Constantine Speres +1 212 416 8567 +1 212 416 6009 constantine.speres@oag.state.ny.us
No Logo KATHLEEN RICE, Defendant
No Logo MARTHA E. STARK, Defendant
Bloomberg, Michael Rubens Bloomberg, Michael Rubens, Defendant
Officially listed as "MICHAEL R. BLOOMBERG"
No Logo SHAUN DONOVAN, Defendant
No Logo State of New York, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the New York Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Constantine Speres +1 212 416 8567 +1 212 416 6009 constantine.speres@oag.state.ny.us
No Logo STEVE LEVY, Defendant
No Logo The State Of New York, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Michael Joseph Myers

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Constantine Speres +1 212 416 8567 +1 212 416 6009 constantine.speres@oag.state.ny.us
No Logo THOMAS J. SPOTA, III, Defendant
No Logo WILLIAM THOMPSON, JR.,, Defendant
Office Washington, DC
Filed 7/17/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand $60000000
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause Section 18 U.S.C. § 1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Transfer to Another District
County 88888
Terminated 8/15/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, PROSE-NP, TRANSFERRED, TYPE-F
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: 9/18/2006 Case Transferred Out
Case transferred out to the Eastern District of New York, pursuant to Court's order dated August 15, 2006. Sent to court electronically. (jf, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 11 Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: 8/15/2006 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER transferring this case to the Eastern District of New York. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on August 15, 2006. (lcegs1)
      LREF
      Legal Document 10 Filed: 8/10/2006, Entered: 8/10/2006, Terminated: 8/15/2006 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
      ENTERED IN ERROR..... MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Anthony P. Moncayo. :Address- Suffolk County Attorney, P.O. Box 6100, 100 Veterans Memorial Highway, Hauppauge, NY 11788. Phone No. - 631 853-4055. Fax No. - 631 853-5833 by THOMAS J. SPOTA, III, JUDITH A. PASCALE(Clerk of the County of Suffolk of the State of New York), STEVE LEVY, JUDITH A. PASCALE. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4) # (5) # (6))(Kiley, Francis) Modified on 8/11/2006 (nmw, ).
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: 8/8/2006 Set/Reset Deadlines:
      Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 9/13/2006. (clv, )
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: 8/8/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
        MINUTE ORDER granting [7] Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's response to the complaint is due no later than September 13, 2006. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on August 8, 2006. (lcegs1)
          LREF
          Legal Document 9 Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: 8/7/2006 ~Notice (other)
          NOTICE Certificate of Service by JUDITH S. KAYE, THE STATE OF NEW YORK, GEORGE E. PATAKI, ELLIOT L. SPITZER, JONATHAN LIPPMAN re [7] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Dismiss the Complaint, [8] Affidavit, (Speres, Constantine)
            LREF
            Legal Document 8 Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: 8/7/2006 Affidavit
            AFFIDAVIT re [7] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Dismiss the Complaint Affirmation in Support of Motion for Extension of Time by JUDITH S. KAYE, THE STATE OF NEW YORK, GEORGE E. PATAKI, ELLIOT L. SPITZER, JONATHAN LIPPMAN. (Speres, Constantine)
              LREF
              Legal Document 7 Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: 8/7/2006, Terminated: 8/8/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to
              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Dismiss the Complaint by JUDITH S. KAYE, THE STATE OF NEW YORK, GEORGE E. PATAKI, ELLIOT L. SPITZER, JONATHAN LIPPMAN. (Speres, Constantine)
                LREF
                Legal Document 6 Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: 8/7/2006 ~Notice (other)
                NOTICE Certificate of Service of Notice of Appearance by JUDITH S. KAYE, THE STATE OF NEW YORK, GEORGE E. PATAKI, ELLIOT L. SPITZER, JONATHAN LIPPMAN re [5] Notice of Appearance (Speres, Constantine)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 5 Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: 8/7/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                  NOTICE of Appearance by Constantine Speres on behalf of JUDITH S. KAYE, THE STATE OF NEW YORK, GEORGE E. PATAKI, ELLIOT L. SPITZER, JONATHAN LIPPMAN (Speres, Constantine)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 4 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: 8/3/2006 Motion to Appoint Counsel
                    MOTION to Appoint Counsel by LINDA SHARP. (jf, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/31/2006, Entered: 7/31/2006, Terminated: 8/15/2006 Motion for TRO
                      MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by LINDA SHARP. (td, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 7/25/2006, Entered: 7/28/2006 Summons Returned Executed
                        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JUDITH A. PASCALE served on 7/21/2006, answer due 8/10/2006; SHAUN DONOVAN served on 7/19/2006, answer due 8/8/2006; CHARLES HYNES served on 7/21/2006, answer due 8/10/2006; KATHLEEN RICE served on 7/19/2006, answer due 8/8/2006; THOMAS J. SPOTA, III served on 7/18/2006, answer due 8/7/2006; JUDITH A. PASCALE(Clerk of the County of Suffolk of the State of New York) served on 7/21/2006, answer due 8/10/2006; STEVE LEVY served on 7/18/2006, answer due 8/7/2006; JUDITH S. KAYE served on 7/21/2006, answer due 8/10/2006; THE STATE OF NEW YORK served on 7/19/2006, answer due 8/8/2006; GEORGE E. PATAKI served on 7/19/2006, answer due 8/8/2006; ELLIOT L. SPITZER served on 7/19/2006, answer due 8/8/2006; MICHAEL R. BLOOMBERG served on 7/19/2006, answer due 8/8/2006; JONATHAN LIPPMAN served on 7/19/2006, answer due 8/8/2006; WILLIAM THOMPSON, JR served on 7/19/2006, answer due 8/8/2006; MARTHA E. STARK served on 7/19/2006, answer due 8/8/2006 (jf, )
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: 7/18/2006 Complaint
                          COMPLAINT against SHAUN DONOVAN, CHARLES HYNES, KATHLEEN RICE, THOMAS J. SPOTA, III, JUDITH A. PASCALE, STEVE LEVY, JUDITH S. KAYE, THE STATE OF NEW YORK, GEORGE E. PATAKI, ELLIOT L. SPITZER, MICHAEL R. BLOOMBERG, JONATHAN LIPPMAN, WILLIAM THOMPSON, JR, MARTHA E. STARK (Filing fee $ 350) filed by LINDA SHARP. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(td, )
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: 7/18/2006 Summons Issued
                          Summons (14) Issued as to SHAUN DONOVAN, CHARLES HYNES, KATHLEEN RICE, THOMAS J. SPOTA, III, JUDITH A. PASCALE, STEVE LEVY, JUDITH S. KAYE, THE STATE OF NEW YORK, GEORGE E. PATAKI, ELLIOT L. SPITZER, MICHAEL R. BLOOMBERG, JONATHAN LIPPMAN, WILLIAM THOMPSON, JR, MARTHA E. STARK. (td, )
                            LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 114 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?