ALLIANCE TO SAVE THE MATTAPONI et al v. UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-01268-HHK
District Judge Henry H. Kennedy, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ALLIANCE TO SAVE THE MATTAPONI, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Chesapeake Bay Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jon A Mueller +1 443 482 2062 +1 410 268 6687 jmueller@cbf.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 434-977-4090

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Deborah M. Murray +1 434 977 4090 dmurray@selcva.org
No Logo CHESAPEAKE BAY FOUNDATION, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Chesapeake Bay Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jon A Mueller +1 443 482 2062 +1 410 268 6687 jmueller@cbf.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Southern Environmental Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Deborah M. Murray +1 434 977 4090 dmurray@selcva.org
No Logo SIERRA CLUB, VIRGINIA CHAPTER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Chesapeake Bay Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jon A Mueller +1 443 482 2062 +1 410 268 6687 jmueller@cbf.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Southern Environmental Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Deborah M. Murray +1 434 977 4090 dmurray@selcva.org
v.
No Logo PETER GEREN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Samantha Klein +1 202 305 0474 samantha.klein@usdoj.gov
No Logo ROBERT L. VAN ANTWERP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Samantha Klein +1 202 305 0474 samantha.klein@usdoj.gov
No Logo STEPHEN L. JOHNSON, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Samantha Klein +1 202 305 0474 samantha.klein@usdoj.gov
Space Angeline Purdy +1 202 514 0996 +1 202 514 8865 angeline.purdy@usdoj.gov
No Logo United States Army Corps of Engineers, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Samantha Klein +1 202 305 0474 samantha.klein@usdoj.gov
Space Devon Lehman McCune +1 303 844 1487 +1 303 844 1350 devon.mccune@usdoj.gov
Space Angeline Purdy +1 202 514 0996 +1 202 514 8865 angeline.purdy@usdoj.gov
United States Environmental Protection Agency United States Environmental Protection Agency, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Samantha Klein +1 202 305 0474 samantha.klein@usdoj.gov
Space Angeline Purdy +1 202 514 0996 +1 202 514 8865 angeline.purdy@usdoj.gov
No Logo WILLIAM T. GRISOLI, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Samantha Klein +1 202 305 0474 samantha.klein@usdoj.gov
Space Devon Lehman McCune +1 303 844 1487 +1 303 844 1350 devon.mccune@usdoj.gov
Space Angeline Purdy +1 202 514 0996 +1 202 514 8865 angeline.purdy@usdoj.gov
No Logo CARL. T. LONE EAGLE CUSTALOW, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by GEORGETOWN LAW

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hope Madeline Babcock +1 202 662 9481 babcock@law.georgetown.edu
Space Melanie Kleiss Boerger +1 202 662 4025 mek67@law.georgetown.edu
No Logo MATTAPONI INDIAN TRIBE, Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by GEORGETOWN LAW

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hope Madeline Babcock +1 202 662 9481 babcock@law.georgetown.edu
Space Melanie Kleiss Boerger +1 202 662 4025 mek67@law.georgetown.edu
No Logo CITY OF NEWPORT NEWS, VIRGINIA, Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space M. Scott Hart +1 757 687 7504 +1 757 687 1515

Toggle Switch Represented by Constangy Brooks & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George Arnold Somerville +1 804 697 1291 +1 804 698 5149 George.Somerville@troutmansanders.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Troutman Sanders, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles Anthony Zdebski +1 202 274 2909 +1 202 654 5632 charles.zdebski@troutmansanders.com
Office Washington, DC
Filed 7/17/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 893 - Environmental Matters
Cause Section 33 U.S.C. § 1319 Clean Water Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TYPE-C
  Entries (156) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Margot Julia Pollans on behalf of CARL. T. LONE EAGLE CUSTALOW, MATTAPONI INDIAN TRIBE Substituting for attorney Margie Sollinger (Pollans, Margot) (Entered: 12/07/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 125 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None
    STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report filed by UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Purdy, Angeline) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
      Case Reassigned to Judge Frederick J. Scullin, Jr. Judge Henry H. Kennedy no longer assigned to the case. (jeb, ) (Entered: 09/15/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER by Chief Justice of the United States Supreme Court directing the designation and assignment of a United States District Judge for service in another circuit; assigning Judge Frederick J. Scullin, Jr. of the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of New York to the following cases:10-1857,04-2205,06-1268,07-2173, and 10-1962. (Entered: 09/15/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 122 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
          MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part 101 , 103 , 107 , 108 plaintiffs' motions for attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on September 13, 2011. (lchhk1) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 6/9/2011, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Appearance by Margie Sollinger on behalf of CARL. T. LONE EAGLE CUSTALOW, MATTAPONI INDIAN TRIBE (Sollinger, Margie) (Main Document 121 replaced on 6/10/2011) (znmw, ). (Entered: 06/09/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: None
              RESPONSE re 118 to Objection to Report and Recommendation filed by CARL. T. LONE EAGLE CUSTALOW, MATTAPONI INDIAN TRIBE. (Babcock, Hope) Modified to add link on 9/29/2010 (znmw, ). (Entered: 09/28/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: None
                REPLY re 117 Report and Recommendation,, 118 Objection to Report and Recommendations filed by ALLIANCE TO SAVE THE MATTAPONI, CHESAPEAKE BAY FOUNDATION, INC.. (Murray, Deborah) (Entered: 09/28/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None
                  OBJECTION to 117 Report and Recommendations filed by UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Purdy, Angeline) (Entered: 09/14/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 117 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                    REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 101 Amended MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by MATTAPONI INDIAN TRIBE, CARL. T. LONE EAGLE CUSTALOW, 103 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by ALLIANCE TO SAVE THE MATTAPONI, CHESAPEAKE BAY FOUNDATION, INC., 107 Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees in preparing fee application filed by ALLIANCE TO SAVE THE MATTAPONI, CHESAPEAKE BAY FOUNDATION, INC., 108 Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by MATTAPONI INDIAN TRIBE, CARL. T. LONE EAGLE CUSTALOW. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 08/31/2010. (lcjmf1, ) (Entered: 08/31/2010)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER denying without prejudice 94 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying without prejudice 96 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 02/23/2010. (lcjmf1) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER re referral to Judge Facciola for all motions for attorneys fees and costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola on 2/2/10. (SP, ) (Entered: 02/02/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                          CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola for all motions for attorneys' fees and costs. (kb) (Entered: 01/27/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER REFERRING MOTIONS. All motions for attorneys fees and costs filed in this case are hereby referred to United States Magistrate Judge John M. Facciola for his Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on January 25, 2010. (NP) (Entered: 01/25/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 1/22/2010, Entered: None
                              REPLY to opposition to motion re 108 Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by CARL. T. LONE EAGLE CUSTALOW, MATTAPONI INDIAN TRIBE. (Babcock, Hope) (Entered: 01/22/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 1/20/2010, Entered: None
                                REPLY to opposition to motion re 107 Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees in preparing fee application filed by ALLIANCE TO SAVE THE MATTAPONI, CHESAPEAKE BAY FOUNDATION, INC.. (Murray, Deborah) (Entered: 01/20/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: None
                                  Memorandum in opposition to re 107 Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees in preparing fee application, 108 Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Purdy, Angeline) (Entered: 01/15/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None
                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 107 Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees in preparing fee application, 108 Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees by UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Purdy, Angeline) (Entered: 12/14/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: None
                                      Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees by CARL. T. LONE EAGLE CUSTALOW, MATTAPONI INDIAN TRIBE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration Supplemental Babcock, # 3 Exhibit 1 Supp. Babcock Decl., # 4 Exhibit 2 Supp. Babcock Decl., # 5 Declaration Supplemental Boerger, # 6 Exhibit 1 Supp. Boerger Decl., # 7 Declaration Sollinger, # 8 Exhibit 1 Sollinger Decl., # 9 Exhibit 2 Sollinger Decl.)(Babcock, Hope) (Entered: 12/11/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: None
                                        Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees in preparing fee application by ALLIANCE TO SAVE THE MATTAPONI, CHESAPEAKE BAY FOUNDATION, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Murray, Deborah) (Entered: 12/11/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: None
                                          REPLY to opposition to motion re 103 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by ALLIANCE TO SAVE THE MATTAPONI, CHESAPEAKE BAY FOUNDATION, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Exhibit)(Murray, Deborah) (Entered: 11/30/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: None
                                            REPLY to opposition to motion re 101 Amended MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by CARL. T. LONE EAGLE CUSTALOW, MATTAPONI INDIAN TRIBE. (Babcock, Hope) (Entered: 11/30/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document 75 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 7/31/2008, Terminated: 7/31/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response and Cross-Motion, and for Extension of Related Deadlines by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Purdy, Angeline)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                Memorandum in opposition to re 101 Amended MOTION for Attorney Fees, 103 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Errata B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Errata E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Purdy, Angeline) (Entered: 11/06/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 7/31/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                  MINUTE ORDER granting [75] United States' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The court adopts and the parties shall be bound by the briefing schedule proposed in the United States' motion. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on July 31, 2008. (NP)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 11/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                    Amended MOTION for Attorney Fees re 96 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by ALLIANCE TO SAVE THE MATTAPONI, CHESAPEAKE BAY FOUNDATION, INC., 102 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 96 MOTION for Attorney FeesUnopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 96 MOTION for Attorney FeesUnopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 96 MOTION for Attorney FeesUnopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 96 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by ALLIANCE TO SAVE THE MATTAPONI, CHESAPEAKE BAY FOUNDATION, INC. by ALLIANCE TO SAVE THE MATTAPONI, CHESAPEAKE BAY FOUNDATION, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Revised Murray Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Murray Resume, # 3 Exhibit Murray Timesheets, # 4 Exhibit Butler Timesheets, # 5 Exhibit Cromer Timesheets, # 6 Exhibit Pratt Timesheets, # 7 Exhibit CPI Table, # 8 Exhibit Summary of Attorneys' Hours, # 9 Exhibit Revised SELC Expenses, # 10 Exhibit Kinko's Invoice, # 11 Declaration Mueller Declaration, # 12 Exhibit Mueller Resume, # 13 Exhibit Mueller Timesheets, # 14 Exhibit CBF Expenses, # 15 Exhibit Revised Summary of Hours and Expenses)(Murray, Deborah) Modified event title on 11/3/2009 (znmw, ). (Entered: 11/02/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document 74 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: 7/24/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER accepting the filing of Alliance's motion for summary judgment, memorandum of points and authorities in support and exhibits. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy on 7/16/08. (tj, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 10/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 96 MOTION for Attorney Fees by ALLIANCE TO SAVE THE MATTAPONI, CHESAPEAKE BAY FOUNDATION, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Fee Application, # 2 Declaration Murray, # 3 Exhibit Murray Resume, # 4 Exhibit Murray Timesheets, # 5 Exhibit Butler Timesheets, # 6 Exhibit Cromer Timesheets, # 7 Exhibit Pratt Timesheets, # 8 Exhibit DC CPI Table, # 9 Exhibit Summary of Attorney Hours, # 10 Exhibit Corrected SELC Expenses, # 11 Exhibit Invoice, # 12 Declaration Mueller Declaration, # 13 Exhibit Mueller Resume, # 14 Exhibit Mueller Timesheets, # 15 Exhibit CBF Expenses, # 16 Exhibit Revised Summary Fees and Expenses, # 17 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Murray, Deborah) (Entered: 10/29/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document 73 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/16/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                          NOTICE Of Late Filing by ALLIANCE TO SAVE THE MATTAPONI, CHESAPEAKE BAY FOUNDATION, INC., SIERRA CLUB, VIRGINIA CHAPTER re [72] MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Murray, Deborah)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 10/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                            Amended MOTION for Attorney Fees by CARL. T. LONE EAGLE CUSTALOW, MATTAPONI INDIAN TRIBE (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Transmittal Letter, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Corrected, # 4 Declaration Babcock Corrected, # 5 Exhibit 1 Babcock Decl. Corrected, # 6 Exhibit 2 Babcock Decl., # 7 Exhibit 3 Babcock Decl., # 8 Exhibit 4 Babcock Decl., # 9 Exhibit 5 Babcock Decl., # 10 Exhibit 6 Babcock Decl., # 11 Declaration Boerger, # 12 Exhibit 1 Boerger Decl., # 13 Exhibit 2 Boerger Decl., # 14 Declaration Garrison, # 15 Declaration Custalow)(Babcock, Hope) (Entered: 10/28/2009)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document 72 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/16/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                              MOTION for Summary Judgment by ALLIANCE TO SAVE THE MATTAPONI, CHESAPEAKE BAY FOUNDATION, INC., SIERRA CLUB, VIRGINIA CHAPTER (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Affidavit, # (3) Affidavit, # (4) Affidavit, # (5) Affidavit, # (6) Affidavit, # (7) Affidavit, # (8) Affidavit, # (9) Text of Proposed Order)(Murray, Deborah)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 10/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                              Joint MOTION Establish Briefing Schedule by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Purdy, Angeline) (Entered: 10/16/2009)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document 71 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                MOTION for Summary Judgment by CARL. T. LONE EAGLE CUSTALOW, MATTAPONI INDIAN TRIBE (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Declaration Standing, # (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Boerger, Melanie)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 8/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to CARL. T. LONE EAGLE CUSTALOW, MATTAPONI INDIAN TRIBE. Attorney Melanie Kleiss Boerger terminated. (Boerger, Melanie) (Entered: 08/18/2009)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 70 Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: 5/1/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    BRIEFING ORDER (Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy on 4/29/08) (tj )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE of Filing Original Custalow Declaration by ALLIANCE TO SAVE THE MATTAPONI, CARL. T. LONE EAGLE CUSTALOW re 94 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Custalow original)(Boerger, Melanie) (Entered: 08/12/2009)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 69 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: 4/28/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                        Joint MOTION Court enter a Briefing Order by CITY OF NEWPORT NEWS, VIRGINIA (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Briefing Order)(Zdebski, Charles)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 7/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                          ERRATA re 95 Joint MOTION to Stay re 94 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs by ALLIANCE TO SAVE THE MATTAPONI, CHESAPEAKE BAY FOUNDATION, INC., SIERRA CLUB, VIRGINIA CHAPTER (Attachments: # 1 Joint Motion to Stay Briefing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Murray, Deborah) Modified on 7/31/2009 to correct docket text (tr, ). (Entered: 07/30/2009)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 68 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: 3/31/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                            NOTICE of filing by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Attachments: # (1) EPA certification, # (2) EPA cross-reference list)(Purdy, Angeline)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 7/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                              MOTION for Attorney Fees by ALLIANCE TO SAVE THE MATTAPONI, CHESAPEAKE BAY FOUNDATION, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Text of Proposed Order)(Murray, Deborah) (Entered: 07/30/2009)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: 3/14/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                MINUTE ORDER granting [67] EPA's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Accordingly, EPA shall complete its production on or before March 27, 2008. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on March 14, 2008. (NP)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 7/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Stay re 94 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs by ALLIANCE TO SAVE THE MATTAPONI, CHESAPEAKE BAY FOUNDATION, INC., SIERRA CLUB, VIRGINIA CHAPTER (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Murray, Deborah) (Entered: 07/30/2009)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 67 Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: 3/13/2008, Terminated: 3/14/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Document Production by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Purdy, Angeline)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                      MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs by CARL. T. LONE EAGLE CUSTALOW, MATTAPONI INDIAN TRIBE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Declaration Babcock, # 4 Exhibit 1 Babcock Decl., # 5 Exhibit 2 Babcock Decl., # 6 Exhibit 3 Babcock Decl., # 7 Exhibit 4 Babcock Decl., # 8 Exhibit 5 Babcock Decl., # 9 Exhibit 6 Babcock Decl., # 10 Declaration Boerger, # 11 Exhibit 1 Boerger Decl., # 12 Exhibit 2 Boerger Decl., # 13 Declaration Garrison, # 14 Declaration Custalow)(Boerger, Melanie) (Entered: 07/29/2009)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: 2/7/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER granting [66] EPA's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Produce Documents. Accordingly, EPA's deadline to produce documents is extended until March 13, 2008. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on February 7, 2008. (NP)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 7/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                          ORDER of USCA (certified copy) as to 90 Notice of Appeal, filed by ROBERT L. VAN ANTWERP, CARL STROCK, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, STEPHEN L. JOHNSON, PETER GEREN, FRANCIS J. HARVEY, UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, WILLIAM T. GRISOLI, 92 Notice of Cross Appeal, filed by MATTAPONI INDIAN TRIBE, CARL. T. LONE EAGLE CUSTALOW, 91 Notice of Cross Appeal, filed by SIERRA CLUB, VIRGINIA CHAPTER, ALLIANCE TO SAVE THE MATTAPONI, CHESAPEAKE BAY FOUNDATION, INC.; The Clerk note the docket that these cases are dismissed. USCA Case Number 09-5201. (hsj, ) (Entered: 07/08/2009)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 66 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: 2/6/2008, Terminated: 2/7/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Produce Documents by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Purdy, Angeline)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 6/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL as to 88 Memorandum & Opinion, 89 Order by CARL. T. LONE EAGLE CUSTALOW, MATTAPONI INDIAN TRIBE. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 00900000000001875203. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Boerger, Melanie) (Entered: 06/12/2009)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 65 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: 1/29/2008 Order on Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                                                                                                MEMORANDUM ORDER granting in part, denying in part, and deferring in part [57] Motion to Compel. The Court denies Plaintiffs' request that the Welsh Declaration be disallowed. Within thirty days from the date of this Memorandum Order, EPA is directed to compile and produce a record as explained herein. In the event that EPA does not produce such a record, the Plaintiffs' request for leave to take discovery will be reconsidered by the Court. The Motion to Compel Agency Record [56] is granted consistent with the above ruling. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 01/29/08. (DM, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 6/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                  NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL as to 88 Memorandum & Opinion, 89 Order by ALLIANCE TO SAVE THE MATTAPONI, CHESAPEAKE BAY FOUNDATION, INC., SIERRA CLUB, VIRGINIA CHAPTER. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 00900000000001874309. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Murray, Deborah) (Entered: 06/12/2009)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 12/19/2007 Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
                                                                                                    NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re [63] Notice (Other), Notice (Other) was entered in error and has been refiled in the correct category by the court in docket entry [64]. (lc, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEAL by CARL STROCK, WILLIAM T. GRISOLI, PETER GEREN, ROBERT L. VAN ANTWERP, STEPHEN L. JOHNSON, UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, FRANCIS J. HARVEY. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Purdy, Angeline) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 64 Filed: 12/18/2007, Entered: 12/19/2007 Administrative Record
                                                                                                        ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by WILLIAM T. GRISOLI, PETER GEREN, ROBERT L. VAN ANTWERP, STEPHEN L. JOHNSON, UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(lc, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/31/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER remanding case for further proceedings consistent with 88 the court's memorandum opinion docketed this same day. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on March 31, 2009. (NP) (Entered: 03/31/2009)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 63 Filed: 12/18/2007, Entered: 12/18/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                            ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Filing of Supplemental Administrative Record by WILLIAM T. GRISOLI, PETER GEREN, ROBERT L. VAN ANTWERP, STEPHEN L. JOHNSON, UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS re [31] Administrative Record (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Klein, Samantha) Modified on 12/19/2007 (lc, ).
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/31/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OPINION granting in part and denying in part 71 , 72 plaintiffs' motions for summary judgment, and granting in part and denying in part 76 , 78 defendants' motions for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on March 31, 2009. (NP) (Entered: 03/31/2009)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 62 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                REPLY to opposition to motion re [57] MOTION to Compel Production of Record or for Leave to Obtain Discovery, and for Protective Order filed by ALLIANCE TO SAVE THE MATTAPONI, CHESAPEAKE BAY FOUNDATION, INC., SIERRA CLUB, VIRGINIA CHAPTER. (Murray, Deborah)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by ALLIANCE TO SAVE THE MATTAPONI, CHESAPEAKE BAY FOUNDATION, INC., SIERRA CLUB, VIRGINIA CHAPTER (Murray, Deborah) (Entered: 02/20/2009)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 61 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                    REPLY to opposition to motion re [56] MOTION to Compel filed by CARL. T. LONE EAGLE CUSTALOW, MATTAPONI INDIAN TRIBE. (Boerger, Melanie)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/5/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by ALLIANCE TO SAVE THE MATTAPONI, CHESAPEAKE BAY FOUNDATION, INC., SIERRA CLUB, VIRGINIA CHAPTER (Attachments: # 1 Attachment to Notice of Supplemental Authority)(Murray, Deborah) (Entered: 02/05/2009)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 60 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                        Memorandum in opposition to re [57] MOTION to Compel Production of Record or for Leave to Obtain Discovery, and for Protective Order, [56] MOTION to Compel filed by STEPHEN L. JOHNSON, UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Declaration of Donald Welsh)(Purdy, Angeline)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing of Joint Appendix by ALLIANCE TO SAVE THE MATTAPONI, CHESAPEAKE BAY FOUNDATION, INC., SIERRA CLUB, VIRGINIA CHAPTER re 82 Reply to opposition to Motion, 72 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 71 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 78 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Statement of Points and Authorities in Support, 76 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support, 79 Reply to opposition to Motion, 80 Reply to opposition to Motion, 83 Reply to opposition to Motion, 77 Memorandum in Opposition (Murray, Deborah) (Entered: 01/09/2009)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: 9/6/2007 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                            Minute order granting [59] unopposed motion for admission pro hac vice of Melanie Kleiss Boerger. Melanie Kleiss Boerger is permitted to appear pro hac vice on behalf of plaintiff-intervenors Carl T. Lone Eagle Custalow and the Mattaponi Indian Tribe, to the Bar of the United States District Court for the District of Columbia. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on September 6, 2007. Official paperless order (FL, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 12/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file Joint Appendix by ALLIANCE TO SAVE THE MATTAPONI, CHESAPEAKE BAY FOUNDATION, INC., SIERRA CLUB, VIRGINIA CHAPTER (Murray, Deborah) (Entered: 12/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 59 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: 9/5/2007, Terminated: 9/6/2007 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Melanie Kleiss Boerger, :Firm- Institute for Public Representation, :Address- 600 New Jersey Avenue NW, Washington DC 200001. Phone No. - (202) 662-4025. Fax No. - (202) 662-9634 by CARL. T. LONE EAGLE CUSTALOW, MATTAPONI INDIAN TRIBE (Attachments: # (1) Declaration)(Babcock, Hope)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  REPLY to opposition to motion re 76 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support Reply Memorandum in Support of United States' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS. (McCune, Devon) (Entered: 12/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 58 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    Order referring [56] and [57] and future discovery disputes to United States Magistrate Judge Alan Kay. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on September 4, 2007. (FL, )
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      REPLY to opposition to motion re 72 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 78 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Statement of Points and Authorities in Support filed by CITY OF NEWPORT NEWS, VIRGINIA. (Zdebski, Charles) (Entered: 12/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: 9/11/2007 Case Referred to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                        CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Alan Kay for motions and future discvoery disputes. (jeb, )
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          ERRATA by ALLIANCE TO SAVE THE MATTAPONI, CHESAPEAKE BAY FOUNDATION, INC., SIERRA CLUB, VIRGINIA CHAPTER 80 Reply to opposition to Motion, filed by SIERRA CLUB, VIRGINIA CHAPTER, ALLIANCE TO SAVE THE MATTAPONI, CHESAPEAKE BAY FOUNDATION, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Revised Table of Authorities, # 2 Exhibit Table of Abbreviations)(Murray, Deborah) (Entered: 11/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 57 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: 8/31/2007, Terminated: 1/29/2008 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Compel Production of Record or for Leave to Obtain Discovery, and for Protective Order by ALLIANCE TO SAVE THE MATTAPONI, CHESAPEAKE BAY FOUNDATION, INC., SIERRA CLUB, VIRGINIA CHAPTER (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit EPA Letter to Corps 5-1-01# (2) Exhibit EPA Letter to Corps 7-25-97# (3) Exhibit Unpublished Court Opinion# (4) Text of Proposed Order)(Murray, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              REPLY to opposition to motion re 72 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 78 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Statement of Points and Authorities in Support, 76 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support filed by ALLIANCE TO SAVE THE MATTAPONI, CHESAPEAKE BAY FOUNDATION, INC., SIERRA CLUB, VIRGINIA CHAPTER. (Murray, Deborah) (Entered: 11/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 56 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: 8/31/2007, Terminated: 1/29/2008 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Compel by CARL. T. LONE EAGLE CUSTALOW, MATTAPONI INDIAN TRIBE (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Granting Intervenor-Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel)(Babcock, Hope)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to opposition to motion re 71 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 78 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Statement of Points and Authorities in Support, 76 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support filed by CARL. T. LONE EAGLE CUSTALOW, MATTAPONI INDIAN TRIBE. (Boerger, Melanie) (Entered: 11/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 55 Filed: 8/16/2007, Entered: 8/16/2007 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to CARL. T. LONE EAGLE CUSTALOW, MATTAPONI INDIAN TRIBE. Attorney Emma E. Garrison terminated. (Garrison, Emma)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 9/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Summary Judgment and Statement of Points and Authorities in Support by CITY OF NEWPORT NEWS, VIRGINIA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zdebski, Charles) (Entered: 09/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 54 Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: 8/10/2007 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Amended Complaint by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS. Related document: [49] Amended Complaint, filed by MATTAPONI INDIAN TRIBE, CARL. T. LONE EAGLE CUSTALOW.(Purdy, Angeline)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 9/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in opposition to re 72 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 71 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS. (Purdy, Angeline) (Entered: 09/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 53 Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: 8/10/2007 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Amended Complaint by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS. Related document: [45] Amended Complaint, filed by SIERRA CLUB, VIRGINIA CHAPTER, ALLIANCE TO SAVE THE MATTAPONI, CHESAPEAKE BAY FOUNDATION, INC..(Purdy, Angeline)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 9/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Purdy, Angeline) (Entered: 09/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 52 Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: 8/10/2007 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Amended Complaint (First) by CITY OF NEWPORT NEWS, VIRGINIA. Related document: [49] Amended Complaint, filed by MATTAPONI INDIAN TRIBE, CARL. T. LONE EAGLE CUSTALOW.(Zdebski, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 51 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/7/2007 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  Amended Scheduling Order re: [50]. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on August 7, 2007. (FL, )
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/7/2007 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                    Minute order granting [50] motion to amend / correct. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on August 7, 2007. (FL, )
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 50 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: 8/6/2007, Terminated: 8/7/2007 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Briefing Schedule by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Purdy, Angeline)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 49 Filed: 7/26/2007, Entered: 7/26/2007 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                        FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against WILLIAM T. GRISOLI, PETER GEREN, ROBERT L. VAN ANTWERP, CITY OF NEWPORT NEWS, VIRGINIA, STEPHEN L. JOHNSON, UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS filed by CARL. T. LONE EAGLE CUSTALOW, MATTAPONI INDIAN TRIBE.(nmw, )
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: 7/23/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Deadlines: Motion to amend the briefing schedule due by 8/6/2007. (gdf)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: 7/23/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                                                                            Minute order granting [48] joint motion for extension of time to file motion to amend briefing schedule. The parties shall have up to and including August 6, 2007, within which to file motion to amend the briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on July 23, 2007. Official paperless order (FL, )
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 48 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: 7/20/2007, Terminated: 7/23/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to move to amend briefing schedule by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Purdy, Angeline)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 47 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: 7/17/2007 Order on Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                Scheduling Order/denying [39] defendant, United States Environmental Protection Agency's motion for partial reconsideration. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on July 17, 2007. (FL, )
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: 7/19/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                  Reset Deadlines: Objections to and/or motions to alter the deadlines set forth in this order due by 7/23/07; Plaintiff-intervenors' amended complaint tud by 7/27/07; Defendants' and defendant-intervenor's motions for summary judgment due by 9/7/07; Plaintiffs' and plaintiff-intervenors' motions for summary judgment and oppositions due by 9/28/07; Defendants' and defendant-intervenor's oppositions/replies due by 10/19/07; Plaintiffs' and plaintiff-intervenors' replies due cy 10/31/07. (tj )
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 46 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: 7/13/2007 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Amended Complaint by CITY OF NEWPORT NEWS, VIRGINIA. Related document: [45] Amended Complaint, filed by SIERRA CLUB, VIRGINIA CHAPTER, ALLIANCE TO SAVE THE MATTAPONI, CHESAPEAKE BAY FOUNDATION, INC..(Zdebski, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: 7/11/2007 Summons Reissued as to AUSA
                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS (8) REISSUED as to WILLIAM T. GRISOLI, PETER GEREN, ROBERT L. VAN ANTWERP, STEPHEN L. JOHNSON, UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, and non-parties U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (lc, )
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 45 Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: 7/3/2007 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                        FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against PETER GEREN, ROBERT L. VAN ANTWERP, WILLIAM T. GRISOLI, STEPHEN L. JOHNSON, UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS filed by ALLIANCE TO SAVE THE MATTAPONI, CHESAPEAKE BAY FOUNDATION, INC., SIERRA CLUB, VIRGINIA CHAPTER.(nmw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 44 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: 6/29/2007 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to opposition to motion re [39] MOTION for Reconsideration re [36] Memorandum & Opinion partially denying motion to dismiss filed by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Purdy, Angeline)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 43 Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: 6/27/2007, Terminated: 6/27/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Federal Defendants' Second Unopposed Motion for Addional Time to Answer the Tribe's Complaint by CARL STROCK, WILLIAM T. GRISOLI, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, FRANCIS J. HARVEY (McCune, Devon)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: 6/27/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute order granting [43] federal defendants' second unopposed motion for additional time to answer the Tribe's complaint. Defendants shall have up to and including ten (10) days after the Tribe files an amended complaint. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on June 27, 2007. Official paperless order (FL, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 42 Filed: 6/25/2007, Entered: 6/25/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in opposition to re [39] MOTION for Reconsideration re [36] Memorandum & Opinion partially denying motion to dismiss filed by CARL. T. LONE EAGLE CUSTALOW, MATTAPONI INDIAN TRIBE. (Garrison, Emma)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 41 Filed: 6/25/2007, Entered: 6/25/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in opposition to re [39] MOTION for Reconsideration re [36] Memorandum & Opinion partially denying motion to dismiss filed by ALLIANCE TO SAVE THE MATTAPONI, CHESAPEAKE BAY FOUNDATION, INC., SIERRA CLUB, VIRGINIA CHAPTER. (Murray, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/18/2007, Entered: 6/25/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 6/27/2007. (ztj, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/18/2007, Entered: 6/18/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute order granting [40] plaintiffs' unopposed second motion for an extension of time to file any motion regarding completeness of the administrative record. The parties shall have up to and including June 29, 2007, within which to file any motions regarding the completeness of the administrative record. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on June 18, 2007. Official paperless order (FL, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 40 Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: 6/15/2007, Terminated: 6/18/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file motion regarding completeness of the record by ALLIANCE TO SAVE THE MATTAPONI, CHESAPEAKE BAY FOUNDATION, INC., SIERRA CLUB, VIRGINIA CHAPTER (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order granting extension of time)(Murray, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 39 Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: 6/13/2007, Terminated: 7/17/2007 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Reconsideration re [36] Memorandum & Opinion partially denying motion to dismiss by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Purdy, Angeline)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: 6/13/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute order granting [38] federal defendants' unopposed motion for additional time to answer the tribe's complaint. Defendants shall have up to and including June 27, 2007, within which to serve an answer, move, or otherwise plead to plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on June 13, 2007. Official paperless order (FL, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 38 Filed: 6/12/2007, Entered: 6/12/2007, Terminated: 6/13/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Federal Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Additional Time to Answer the Tribe's Complaint by CARL STROCK, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, FRANCIS J. HARVEY (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(McCune, Devon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute order granting [37] plaintiffs' unopposed motion for an extension of time to file motion regarding completeness of the administrative record. Plaintiffs shall have an additional two-week extension until June 15, 2007, to file any motion to add documents to the administrative record. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on June 1, 2007. Official paperless order (FL, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 37 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: 5/31/2007, Terminated: 6/1/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to FILE MOTION REGARDING COMPLETENESS OF THE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by ALLIANCE TO SAVE THE MATTAPONI, CHESAPEAKE BAY FOUNDATION, INC., SIERRA CLUB, VIRGINIA CHAPTER (Murray, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 36 Filed: 5/30/2007, Entered: 5/30/2007 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on May 30, 2007. (FL, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/30/2007, Entered: 5/30/2007 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute order granting [35] motion for Jon. [sic] A. Mueller to appear pro hac vice. Jon A. Mueller is permitted to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Alliance to Save the Mattaponi, the Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc. and the Sierra Club, Virginia Chapter, to the Bar of the United States District Court for the District of Columbia. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on May 30, 2007. Official paperless order (FL, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 35 Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: 5/9/2007, Terminated: 5/30/2007 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jon A. Mueller, :Firm- Chesapeake Bay Foundation, Inc., :Address- 6 Herndon Ave., Annapolis, MD 21403. Phone No. - 443.482.2062. Fax No. - 410.268-6687 by ALLIANCE TO SAVE THE MATTAPONI, CHESAPEAKE BAY FOUNDATION, INC., SIERRA CLUB, VIRGINIA CHAPTER (Murray, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: 5/7/2007 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for Proceedings held before Judge Henry H. Kennedy : Motion Hearing held on 5/7/2007 re [24] defendants motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and plaintiff's motion for Leave to file an Amended Complaint. Oral argument held; Ruling reserved. (Court Reporter Annie Shaw.) (ztj, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: 5/3/2007 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute order granting [34] motion for George A. Somerville to appear pro hac vice. George A. Somerville is permitted to appear pro hac vice on behalf of intervenor-defendant, City of Newport News, Virginia, to the Bar of the United States District Court for the District of Columbia. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on May 3, 2007. Official paperless order (FL, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: 5/3/2007 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute order granting [33] motion for M. Scott Hart to appear pro hac vice. M. Scott Hart is permitted to appear pro hac vice on behalf of intervenor-defendant, City of Newport News, Virginia, to the Bar of the United States District Court for the District of Columbia. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on May 3, 2007. Official paperless order (FL, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 34 Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: 5/2/2007, Terminated: 5/3/2007 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- George A. Somerville, :Firm- Troutman Sanders LLP, :Address- P.O. Box 1122, Richmond, Virginia 23218-1122. Phone No. - 804-697-1291. Fax No. - 804-698-5149 by CITY OF NEWPORT NEWS, VIRGINIA (Zdebski, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 33 Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: 5/2/2007, Terminated: 5/3/2007 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- A. Scott Hart, :Firm- Troutman Sanders LLP, :Address- 222 Central Park Avenue, Suite 2000, Virginia Beach, Virgina 23462. Phone No. - 757-687-7504. Fax No. - 757-687-1515 by CITY OF NEWPORT NEWS, VIRGINIA (Zdebski, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 32 Filed: 4/20/2007, Entered: 4/20/2007 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to opposition to motion re [24] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction And Memorandum In Support filed by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS. (Purdy, Angeline)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/4/2007, Entered: 4/4/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE: Parties will be given 15 minutes per side for oral argument on motion to dismiss and motion to amend. (tj )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/4/2007, Entered: 4/4/2007 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set Motion Hearing: Oral argument on defendants motion to dismiss and plaintiffs motion to amend will held on Monday, May 7, 2007 @ 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27A before Judge Henry H. Kennedy. (tj )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 31 Filed: 4/2/2007, Entered: 4/2/2007 Administrative Record
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD (Notice of Filing) by UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Certification of Administrative Record)(Purdy, Angeline)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 30 Filed: 3/30/2007, Entered: 3/30/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in opposition to re [24] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction And Memorandum In Support filed by CARL. T. LONE EAGLE CUSTALOW, MATTAPONI INDIAN TRIBE. (Garrison, Emma)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: 3/22/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff- intervenors shall have up to and including March 30, 2007, to fie an opposition to the defendants' partial motion to dismiss. Defendants' reply is due April 20, 2007 (tj )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/19/2007, Entered: 3/19/2007 Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re [28] Response to any document, was entered in error and refiled correctly by the Court [29]. (lc, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 29 Filed: 3/16/2007, Entered: 3/19/2007 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to opposition to motion re [21] MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by ALLIANCE TO SAVE THE MATTAPONI, CHESAPEAKE BAY FOUNDATION, INC., SIERRA CLUB, VIRGINIA CHAPTER. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Unpublished Court Decision)(lc, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 28 Filed: 3/16/2007, Entered: 3/16/2007 Response to any document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENTERED IN ERROR.....RESPONSE to Federal Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss and in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Complaint filed by ALLIANCE TO SAVE THE MATTAPONI, CHESAPEAKE BAY FOUNDATION, INC., SIERRA CLUB, VIRGINIA CHAPTER. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Unpublished Court Decision)(Murray, Deborah) Modified on 3/19/2007 (lc, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: 3/15/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute order granting [27] plaintiff-intervenors' unopposed motion for an extension of time to respond to United States partial motion to dismiss. Plaintiff- intervenors shall have up to and including March 30, 2007, to fie an opposition to the defendants' partial motion to dismiss. Defendants' reply is due April 20, 2007. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on March 15, 2007. Official paperless order (FL, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 27 Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: 3/9/2007, Terminated: 3/15/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to [24] United States' Partial Motion to Dismiss by CARL. T. LONE EAGLE CUSTALOW, MATTAPONI INDIAN TRIBE. (Attachments: # (1))(Garrison, Emma) Modified on 3/12/2007 (zlc, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 26 Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: 3/5/2007 Response to any document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to [24] United States' Partial Motion to Dismiss filed by CITY OF NEWPORT NEWS, VIRGINIA. (Zdebski, Charles) Modified on 3/6/2007 (lc, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 25 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: 2/23/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in opposition to re [21] MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS. (Purdy, Angeline)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 24 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: 2/23/2007, Terminated: 5/30/2007 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction And Memorandum In Support by UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Purdy, Angeline)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 23 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: 2/5/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Briefing Order. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on February 5, 2007. (FL, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: 2/6/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff to file a motion to amend by 2/2/2007; Dispositive Motions due by 2/23/2007. Response to Dispositive Motions due by 3/16/2007. Reply to Dispositive Motions due by 3/30/2007. (tj, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 22 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: 1/31/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of filing of proposed briefing schedule by UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Briefing Schedule)(Purdy, Angeline)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 21 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: 1/31/2007, Terminated: 5/30/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by ALLIANCE TO SAVE THE MATTAPONI, CHESAPEAKE BAY FOUNDATION, INC., SIERRA CLUB, VIRGINIA CHAPTER. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Proposed amended complaint# (2) Text of Proposed Order for leave to file proposed amended complaint)(Murray, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 20 Filed: 1/25/2007, Entered: 1/25/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Emma E. Garrison on behalf of CARL. T. LONE EAGLE CUSTALOW, MATTAPONI INDIAN TRIBE (Garrison, Emma)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 19 Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: 12/11/2006 Answer to Intervenor Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to [17] Intervenor Complaint in Intervention of Intervening Plaintiffs Mattaponi Indian Tribe, et al. by CITY OF NEWPORT NEWS, VIRGINIA.(Zdebski, Charles) Modified on 12/12/2006 (lc, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 18 Filed: 12/4/2006, Entered: 12/4/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha Klein on behalf of all defendants (Klein, Samantha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: 11/20/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute order granting [16] the parties' joint motion for additional time to file joint proposed briefing schedule. The parties shall have up to and including January 31, 2007, to file a joint proposed briefing schedule. The defendant, United States, response to the plaintiffs' complaint is stayed until all jurisdictional issues can be briefed simultaneously. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on November 20, 2006. Official paperless order (FL, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 16 Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: 11/17/2006, Terminated: 11/20/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Briefing Schedule by UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS. (Purdy, Angeline)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 17 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: 11/28/2006 Intervenor Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Intervenor COMPLAINT filed by CARL. T. LONE EAGLE CUSTALOW, MATTAPONI INDIAN TRIBE.(lc, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 15 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: 11/16/2006 Order on Motion to InterveneCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order granting [14] plaintiffs' motion to intervene. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on November 16, 2006. (FL, ) Modified on 11/16/2006 (FL, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 14 Filed: 11/8/2006, Entered: 11/9/2006, Terminated: 11/16/2006 Motion to Intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Intervene as Plaintiffs by CARL. T. LONE EAGLE CUSTALOW, MATTAPONI INDIAN TRIBE. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Proposed Complaint# (2) Text of Proposed Order)(nmw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/20/2006, Entered: 10/20/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute order granting [13] the parties' joint motion for additional time to file joint proposed briefing schedule. The parties are granted an additional thirty (30) days until October 18, 2006, to file a joint proposed briefing schedule for the filing of dispositive motions and any responses. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on October 20, 2006. Official paperless order (FL, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 13 Filed: 10/18/2006, Entered: 10/18/2006, Terminated: 10/20/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule by CARL STROCK, WILLIAM T. GRISOLI, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, FRANCIS J. HARVEY. (McCune, Devon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 12 Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: 10/12/2006 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by CITY OF NEWPORT NEWS, VIRGINIA to Joint the Mattaponi Indian Tribe as a Defendant (Zdebski, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 11 Filed: 10/6/2006, Entered: 10/6/2006 Substitution of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Charles Anthony Zdebski on behalf of CITY OF NEWPORT NEWS, VIRGINIA Substituting for attorney Stuart F. Pierson (Zdebski, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 10 Filed: 10/6/2006, Entered: 10/6/2006, Terminated: 10/12/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                WITHDRAWN pursuant to Notice filed 10/12/2006.....MOTION to Join the Mattaponi Indian Tribe as a Defendant by CITY OF NEWPORT NEWS, VIRGINIA. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) Exhibit 1# (3) Exhibit 2)(Pierson, Stuart) Modified on 10/13/2006 (zlc, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 9 Filed: 9/19/2006, Entered: 9/19/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Angeline Purdy on behalf of all defendants (Purdy, Angeline)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: 9/18/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER; By no later than Octiober 18, 2006, the parties shall file a joint proposed briefing schedule for the filing of dispositive motions and any response thereto. In the event agreement cannot be reached with respect to a briefing schedule, each party shall file its own proposed briefing schedule. (Kennedy, Henry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 8 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: 9/15/2006 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    United States Army Corps of Engineers et al. ANSWER to Complaint by CARL STROCK, WILLIAM T. GRISOLI, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, FRANCIS J. HARVEY. Related document: [1] Complaint filed by CHESAPEAKE BAY FOUNDATION, INC.,, ALLIANCE TO SAVE THE MATTAPONI,, SIERRA CLUB, VIRGINIA CHAPTER,.(McCune, Devon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 7 Filed: 9/1/2006, Entered: 9/5/2006 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint by CITY OF NEWPORT NEWS, VIRGINIA. Related document: [1] Complaint filed by CHESAPEAKE BAY FOUNDATION, INC., ALLIANCE TO SAVE THE MATTAPONI, SIERRA CLUB, VIRGINIA CHAPTER,.(lc, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 6 Filed: 9/1/2006, Entered: 9/5/2006 LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Aff
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LCvR 7.1 - CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITY OF NEWPORT NEWS, VIRGINIA (lc, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 5 Filed: 9/1/2006, Entered: 9/1/2006 Order on Motion to InterveneCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order granting [4] motion to intervene. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on September 1, 2006. (FL, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/23/2006, Entered: 8/24/2006, Terminated: 9/1/2006 Motion to Intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Intervene as a Defendant by CITY OF NEWPORT NEWS, VIRGINIA. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support# (2) Certificate of Facts# (3) Order# (4) Answer)(nmw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: 8/21/2006 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to ALLIANCE TO SAVE THE MATTAPONI, CHESAPEAKE BAY FOUNDATION, INC., SIERRA CLUB, VIRGINIA CHAPTER. Attorney Austin Donald Gerken, Jr terminated. (Gerken, Austin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: 8/21/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah M. Murray on behalf of all plaintiffs (Murray, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: 7/18/2006 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT against CARL STROCK, WILLIAM T. GRISOLI, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, FRANCIS J. HARVEY (Filing fee $ 350) filed by ALLIANCE TO SAVE THE MATTAPONI, CHESAPEAKE BAY FOUNDATION, INC., SIERRA CLUB, VIRGINIA CHAPTER.(lc, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: 7/18/2006 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS(6) Issued as to CARL STROCK, WILLIAM T. GRISOLI, UNITED STATES ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS, FRANCIS J. HARVEY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (lc, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 166 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?