VOINCHE v. EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE PRESIDENT et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-01272-RJL
District Judge Richard J. Leon, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Woody Voinche, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Executive Office Of The President, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter S. Smith +1 202 514 7065 +1 202 514 8779 peter.smith@usdoj.gov
No Logo GEORGE BUSH, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter S. Smith +1 202 514 7065 +1 202 514 8779 peter.smith@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 7/17/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County 88888
Terminated 11/26/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, PROSE-NP, TYPE-I
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 14 Filed: 6/12/2007, Entered: 6/12/2007 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
ORDER granting Defendants' motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 6/11/07. (whb)
    LREF
    Legal Document 13 Filed: 6/12/2007, Entered: 6/12/2007 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
    MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 6/11/07. (whb)
      LREF
      Legal Document 12 Filed: 12/13/2006, Entered: 12/13/2006, Terminated: 6/12/2007 Motion to Strike
      MOTION to Strike [11] Surreply by EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE PRESIDENT, GEORGE BUSH. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter)
      LREF
      Legal Document 11 Filed: 12/1/2006, Entered: 12/8/2006 Surreply
      SURREPLY to re [7] MOTION to Dismiss filed by WOODY VOINCHE. (jf, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 10 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: 10/30/2006 Reply to opposition to Motion
        REPLY to opposition to motion re [7] MOTION to Dismiss filed by EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE PRESIDENT, GEORGE BUSH. (Smith, Peter)
          LREF
          Legal Document 9 Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: 10/18/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
          Memorandum in opposition to re [7] MOTION to Dismiss filed by WOODY VOINCHE. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(jf, )
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 10/14/2006, Entered: 10/14/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
            MINUTE ORDER granting nunc pro tunc [5] First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to [1] Complaint; and granting nunc pro tunc [6] Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to [1] Complaint by EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE PRESIDENT, GEORGE BUSH. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall have up to and including 10/6/06 in which to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/14/06. (lcrjl2)
              LREF
              Legal Document 8 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: 10/10/2006 Large Additional Attachment(s)
              ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT (Proposed Order) by EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE PRESIDENT, GEORGE BUSH [7] MOTION to Dismiss filed by EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE PRESIDENT,, GEORGE BUSH,. (Smith, Peter)
                LREF
                Legal Document 7 Filed: 10/6/2006, Entered: 10/6/2006, Terminated: 6/12/2007 Motion to Dismiss
                MOTION to Dismiss by EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE PRESIDENT, GEORGE BUSH. (Smith, Peter)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 9/26/2006, Entered: 9/26/2006, Terminated: 10/14/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                  Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE PRESIDENT, GEORGE BUSH. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 8/23/2006, Entered: 8/23/2006, Terminated: 10/14/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                    First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE PRESIDENT, GEORGE BUSH. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/23/2006, Entered: 8/23/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                      NOTICE of Appearance by Peter S. Smith on behalf of EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE PRESIDENT, GEORGE BUSH (Smith, Peter)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 8/21/2006, Entered: 8/21/2006 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 07/31/06., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to GEORGE BUSH served on 8/4/2006, answer due 10/3/2006. (jf, )
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 7/19/2006, Entered: 7/19/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                          STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 07/19/2006. (CMcP, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: 7/19/2006 Complaint
                            COMPLAINT against EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE PRESIDENT, GEORGE BUSH (Filing fee $ 350) filed by WOODY VOINCHE.(jf, )
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: 7/19/2006 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                              SUMMONS (4) Issued as to EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE PRESIDENT, GEORGE BUSH, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf, )
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 111 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?