ZEIGLER v. POTTER
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-01385-RMC
District Judge Rosemary M. Collyer, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JAMES E. ZEIGLER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF JOHN P. RACIN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Debra Koh +1 301 424 8757 +1 301 762 9324 dkohesq@verizon.net
Space Patricia Koh +1 301 424 8757 pkoh@erols.com
v.
No Logo JOHN E. POTTER, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cindy S. Owens +1 202 616 2257 cindy.owens@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 8/4/2006
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $300000
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 29 U.S.C. § 791 Job Discrimination (Rehabilitation Act)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags JURY, TYPE-H
  Entries (47) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008 Notice of Hearing.
NOTICE of Hearing: A Status Conference is set for 10/23/2008 at 4:30 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (cdw)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: 7/30/2008 Notice of Hearing.
    NOTICE of Hearing: The Post-discovery Status Conference is reset for 10/9/2008 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (cdw)
      LREF
      Legal Document 30 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: 7/29/2008, Terminated: 7/29/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
      Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by JOHN E. POTTER (Owens, Cindy)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: 7/30/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
        Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery closes 10/2/2008. (cdw)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: 7/29/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete
          MINUTE ENTRY ORDER granting [30] Joint Motion for an Enlargement of Time for Discovery. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file his designation of experts no later than August 20, 2008; and it is further ORDERED that discovery shall be completed no later than October 2, 2008. It is further ORDERED that the post-discovery status conference currently set for September 5, 2008 is VACATED; and a new post-discovery status conference shall be set by the Deputy Clerk of the Court. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 07/29/08. (lcrmc1)
            LREF
            Legal Document 29 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: 7/22/2008 Substitution of Counsel
            NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Cindy S. Owens on behalf of JOHN E. POTTER Substituting for attorney Raymond A. Martinez (Owens, Cindy)
              LREF
              Legal Document 28 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008 Rule 26a2 Statement
              RULE 26a2 STATEMENT. (Koh, Patricia)
                LREF
                Legal Document 27 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: 5/23/2008 Order on Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
                ORDER granting in part and denying in part [17] Plaintiff's Motion for Clarification and/or Reconsideration of the Court's Memorandum Opinion and Order, filed on September 6, 2007 [14] [15]. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for clarification is granted and Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration is denied. See attached Order for further details. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 05/23/08. (lcrmc1)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 26 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: 5/23/2008 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                  MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 05/23/08. (lcrmc1)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/12/2008 Notice of Hearing.
                    NOTICE of Hearing: A post-discovery is Status Conference set for 9/5/2008 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (cdw)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: 5/1/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                      Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Plaintiff's and designation of experts and reports due by 6/30/2008. Defendant's and designation of experts and reports due by 7/30/2008. Discovery closes 9/2/2008. (cdw)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: 4/30/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete
                        MINUTE ENTRY ORDER granting [25] Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's designations of experts and reports shall be completed no later than June 30, 2008; Defendant's designation of experts and reports shall be completed no later than July 30, 2008; and all discovery shall be completed no later than September 2, 2008. It is further ORDERED that the post-discovery status conference currently scheduled for July 18, 2008 is vacated; and the Deputy Clerk of the Court shall reschedule a post-discovery status conference for a date after September 2, 2008. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 04/30/08. (lcrmc1)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 25 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: 4/28/2008, Terminated: 4/30/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                          MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by JAMES E. ZEIGLER (Koh, Patricia)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 24 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: 1/29/2008 Substitution of Counsel
                            NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Raymond A. Martinez on behalf of JOHN E. POTTER Substituting for attorney Andrea McBarnette (Martinez, Raymond)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 23 Filed: 12/20/2007, Entered: 12/20/2007 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                              SCHEDULING ORDER. All discovery shall be completed no later than June 14, 2008. A post-discovery status conference is scheduled for 10:15 a.m. on July 18, 2008. See attached Order for further details. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 12/20/07. (lcrmc1)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 12/20/2007, Entered: 12/20/2007 Scheduling Conference
                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 12/20/2007. A scheduling order will be issued by the Court. (Court Reporter: Crystal Pilgrim) (cdw)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 12/18/2007, Entered: 12/18/2007 Notice of Hearing.
                                  NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Scheduling Conference reset for 12/20/2007 at 12:15 PM in Courtroom 2, main building, 2nd floor, before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (cdw)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 22 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 11/28/2007 Meet and Confer Statement
                                    MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (McBarnette, Andrea)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 21 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: 10/31/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER FOR INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. An Initial Scheduling Conference in this matter is set for December 12, 2007 at 10:15 a.m. See attached Order for further details. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 10/31/07. (lcrmc1)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 20 Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: 10/22/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                        NOTICE of Filing of Exhibits by JOHN E. POTTER re [19] Memorandum in Opposition (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1-2)(McBarnette, Andrea)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 19 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                          Memorandum in opposition to re [17] MOTION for Reconsideration filed by JOHN E. POTTER. (McBarnette, Andrea)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 18 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007 Answer
                                            ANSWER to Complaint by JOHN E. POTTER. Related document: [1] Complaint filed by JAMES E. ZEIGLER.(McBarnette, Andrea)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 17 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: 9/20/2007, Terminated: 5/23/2008 Motion for Reconsideration
                                              MOTION for Reconsideration by JAMES E. ZEIGLER (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Koh, Patricia)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 16 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/12/2007, Terminated: 9/12/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by JOHN E. POTTER (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(McBarnette, Andrea)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/18/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                  Set Deadlines/Hearings: Answer to complaint due by 10/19/2007. (cdw)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/12/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                    MINUTE ENTRY ORDER granting [16] Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint no later than October 19, 2007. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 09/12/07. (lcrmc1)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 15 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: 9/6/2007 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER granting in part and denying in part [7] Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, or in the alternative for Summary Judgment. Count 1 and Count 2 of Plaintiff's Complaint are DISMISSED and the Defendant's motion is DENIED with respect to Count 3 of the Complaint. See attached Order for further details. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 09/06/07. (lcrmc1)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 14 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: 9/6/2007 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                                        MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 09/06/07. (lcrmc1)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: 5/3/2007 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                          MINUTE ENTRY ORDER granting [13] Plaintiff's Motion for Admission of Counsel Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Debra Koh is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Plaintiff in this case, nunc pro tunc to 1/8/07. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 5/3/07. (bcs)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 13 Filed: 1/8/2007, Entered: 1/8/2007, Terminated: 5/3/2007 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Debra Koh. :Address- 3 Leonard Court, Rockville, MD 20850. Phone No. - (301) 424-8757. Fax No. - (301) 762-9324 by JAMES E. ZEIGLER. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Koh, Patricia)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 12/22/2006, Entered: 12/22/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                            MINUTE ENTRY ORDER granting, nunc pro tunc to December 15, 2006, [11] Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's [12] Reply shall be deemed timely filed. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 12/22/06. (ebb)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 12 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: 12/18/2006 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                              REPLY to opposition to motion re [7] MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JOHN E. POTTER. (McBarnette, Andrea)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 11 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: 12/15/2006, Terminated: 12/22/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Reply by JOHN E. POTTER. (McBarnette, Andrea)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 11/30/2006, Entered: 11/30/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                                                                  MINUTE ENTRY ORDER granting Defendant's [10] Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendant's Reply in support of its [7] Motion to Dismiss or, in the alternative, for Summary Judgment, and Response to Plaintiff's [9] Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, shall be filed no later than December 15, 2006. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 11/30/06. (ebb)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 10 Filed: 11/28/2006, Entered: 11/28/2006, Terminated: 11/30/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss by JOHN E. POTTER. (McBarnette, Andrea)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: 11/22/2006 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                      MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by JAMES E. ZEIGLER. (Please see Document No. [8] for scanned images). (nmw, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: 11/21/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                        Memorandum in opposition to re [7] MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by JAMES E. ZEIGLER. (Koh, Patricia)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 7 Filed: 11/3/2006, Entered: 11/3/2006, Terminated: 9/6/2007 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative,, MOTION for Summary Judgment by JOHN E. POTTER. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(McBarnette, Andrea)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: 10/20/2006 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                            Set Deadlines/Hearings: Answer to complaint due by 11/3/2006. (cdw)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: 10/17/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                              MINUTE ENTRY ORDER granting, nunc pro tunc to October 13, 2006, [6] Defendant's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's Answer shall be filed no later than November 3, 2006. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 10/17/06. (ebb)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 6 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: 10/10/2006, Terminated: 10/17/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by JOHN E. POTTER. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(McBarnette, Andrea)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 5 Filed: 9/5/2006, Entered: 9/5/2006 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to JOHN E. POTTER served on 8/14/2006, answer due 10/16/2006. (Koh, Patricia)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 4 Filed: 9/5/2006, Entered: 9/5/2006 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC
                                                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney. JOHN E. POTTER served on 8/15/2006, answer due 10/16/2006 (Koh, Patricia)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 3 Filed: 9/5/2006, Entered: 9/5/2006 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General August 15, 2006. (Koh, Patricia)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: 8/24/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea McBarnette on behalf of JOHN E. POTTER (McBarnette, Andrea)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: 8/7/2006 Complaint
                                                                                          COMPLAINT against JOHN E. POTTER (Filing fee $ 350) filed by JAMES E. ZEIGLER.(jf, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: 8/7/2006 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                                                                            SUMMONS (3) Issued as to JOHN E. POTTER, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf, )
                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                              This case has been viewed 449 times.

                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                              Space
                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                               
                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                              Need Password Help?