NORTHWEST AUSTIN MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NUMBER ONE v. GONZALES
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-01384-PLF-EGS-DST

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo NORTHWEST AUSTIN MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NUMBER ONE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by esjpc.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Erik Scott Jaffe +1 202 237 8165 +1 202 237 8166 jaffe@esjpc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Yetter & Warden, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory S Coleman +1 512 533 0150 +1 512 533 0120 gcoleman@yettercoleman.com
Space Christian J. Ward +1 512 533 0150 cward@yetterwarden.com
v.
No Logo MICHAEL B. MUKASEY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Christian Herren, Jr. +1 202 514 1416 +1 202 307 3961 chris.herren@usdoj.gov
No Logo ANGIE GARCIA, Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kristen M. Clarke +1 202 682 1300 +1 202 682 1312 kclarke@naacpldf.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Public Citizen, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael T. Kirkpatrick +1 202 588 1000 +1 202 588 7795 mkirkpatrick@citizen.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Southern Migrant Legal Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jose Garza +1 210 392 2856 +1 210 212 3772 jgarza@trla.org
Space George Joseph Korbel +1 210 212 3600 +1 210 212 3772 gkorbel@trla.org
Space Judith A. Sanders-Castro +1 210 212 3725 +1 210 212 3772 jcastro@trla.org
No Logo AUSTIN BRANCH OF THE NAACP, Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dennis C. Hayes +1 410 580 5777

Toggle Switch Represented by Debevoise & Plimpton LLP (919 Third Ave)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Reinherz Quitma Wolfson +1 202 663 6390 +1 202 663 6363 paul.wolfson@wilmerhale.com
Space Ariel Bernard Waldman +1 202 663 6063 +1 202 663 6363 ariel.waldman@wilmerhale.com
Space Seth P. Waxman +1 202 663 6000 +1 202 663 6363 seth.waxman@wilmerhale.com

Represented by Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

Toggle Switch Represented by Miner Barnhill & Galland

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin Jay Blustein +1 312 751 1170 bblustein@lawmbg.com

Toggle Switch Represented by NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kristen M. Clarke +1 202 682 1300 +1 202 682 1312 kclarke@naacpldf.org
No Logo DAVID DIAZ, Intervenor-Defendant

Represented by MALDEF

Toggle Switch Represented by NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kristen M. Clarke +1 202 682 1300 +1 202 682 1312 kclarke@naacpldf.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Sandler, Reiff, Young & Lamb, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph E. Sandler +1 202 479 1111 +1 202 479 1115 sandler@sandlerreiff.com
No Logo Gabriel Diaz, Intervenor-Defendant

Represented by MALDEF

Toggle Switch Represented by NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kristen M. Clarke +1 202 682 1300 +1 202 682 1312 kclarke@naacpldf.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Sandler, Reiff, Young & Lamb, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph E. Sandler +1 202 479 1111 +1 202 479 1115 sandler@sandlerreiff.com
No Logo JAMAL RICHARDSON, Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Samuel Spital +1 212 513 3200 +1 212 385 9010

Toggle Switch Represented by NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Debo P. Adegbile +1 212 965 2200 +1 212 226 7592 dadegbile@naacpldf.org
Space Kristen M. Clarke +1 202 682 1300 +1 202 682 1312 kclarke@naacpldf.org
Space Jenigh J. Garrett +1 212 965 2200 +1 212 226 7592
Space Ryan P. Haygood +1 212 965 2200 +1 212 226 7592 rhaygood@naacpldf.org
No Logo JOVITA CASARES, Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kristen M. Clarke +1 202 682 1300 +1 202 682 1312 kclarke@naacpldf.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Public Citizen, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael T. Kirkpatrick +1 202 588 1000 +1 202 588 7795 mkirkpatrick@citizen.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Southern Migrant Legal Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jose Garza +1 210 392 2856 +1 210 212 3772 jgarza@trla.org
Space George Joseph Korbel +1 210 212 3600 +1 210 212 3772 gkorbel@trla.org
Space Judith A. Sanders-Castro +1 210 212 3725 +1 210 212 3772 jcastro@trla.org
No Logo LISA DIAZ, Intervenor-Defendant

Represented by MALDEF

Toggle Switch Represented by NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kristen M. Clarke +1 202 682 1300 +1 202 682 1312 kclarke@naacpldf.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Sandler, Reiff, Young & Lamb, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph E. Sandler +1 202 479 1111 +1 202 479 1115 sandler@sandlerreiff.com
No Logo MARISA RICHARDSON, Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Samuel Spital +1 212 513 3200 +1 212 385 9010

Toggle Switch Represented by NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Debo P. Adegbile +1 212 965 2200 +1 212 226 7592 dadegbile@naacpldf.org
Space Kristen M. Clarke +1 202 682 1300 +1 202 682 1312 kclarke@naacpldf.org
Space Jenigh J. Garrett +1 212 965 2200 +1 212 226 7592
Space Ryan P. Haygood +1 212 965 2200 +1 212 226 7592 rhaygood@naacpldf.org
No Logo NATHANIEL LESANE, Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arthur B. Spitzer +2024 570 800 x113 +1 202 452 1868 artspitzer@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation Of Northern California

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Moffatt Laughlin McDonald +1 404 523 2721 lmcdonald@aclu.org

Toggle Switch Represented by KATOR, PARKS & WEISER, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J. Kator +1 202 898 4800 +1 202 289 1389 mkator@katorparks.com

Toggle Switch Represented by NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kristen M. Clarke +1 202 682 1300 +1 202 682 1312 kclarke@naacpldf.org
No Logo NICOLE LOUIS, Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Samuel Spital +1 212 513 3200 +1 212 385 9010

Toggle Switch Represented by NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Debo P. Adegbile +1 212 965 2200 +1 212 226 7592 dadegbile@naacpldf.org
Space Kristen M. Clarke +1 202 682 1300 +1 202 682 1312 kclarke@naacpldf.org
Space Jenigh J. Garrett +1 212 965 2200 +1 212 226 7592
Space Ryan P. Haygood +1 212 965 2200 +1 212 226 7592 rhaygood@naacpldf.org
No Logo OFELIA ZAPATA, Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kristen M. Clarke +1 202 682 1300 +1 202 682 1312 kclarke@naacpldf.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Public Citizen, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael T. Kirkpatrick +1 202 588 1000 +1 202 588 7795 mkirkpatrick@citizen.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Southern Migrant Legal Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jose Garza +1 210 392 2856 +1 210 212 3772 jgarza@trla.org
Space George Joseph Korbel +1 210 212 3600 +1 210 212 3772 gkorbel@trla.org
Space Judith A. Sanders-Castro +1 210 212 3725 +1 210 212 3772 jcastro@trla.org
No Logo People for the American Way, Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kristen M. Clarke +1 202 682 1300 +1 202 682 1312 kclarke@naacpldf.org

Toggle Switch Represented by pfaw.org Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Judith Ellen Schaeffer +1 202 467 2381 +1 202 293 2672 jschaeffer@pfaw.org
No Logo RODNEY LOUIS, Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Samuel Spital +1 212 513 3200 +1 212 385 9010

Toggle Switch Represented by NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Debo P. Adegbile +1 212 965 2200 +1 212 226 7592 dadegbile@naacpldf.org
Space Kristen M. Clarke +1 202 682 1300 +1 202 682 1312 kclarke@naacpldf.org
Space Jenigh J. Garrett +1 212 965 2200 +1 212 226 7592
Space Ryan P. Haygood +1 212 965 2200 +1 212 226 7592 rhaygood@naacpldf.org
No Logo TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES, Intervenor-Defendant

Represented by Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

Toggle Switch Represented by Miner Barnhill & Galland

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin Jay Blustein +1 312 751 1170 bblustein@lawmbg.com

Toggle Switch Represented by NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kristen M. Clarke +1 202 682 1300 +1 202 682 1312 kclarke@naacpldf.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Reinherz Quitma Wolfson +1 202 663 6390 +1 202 663 6363 paul.wolfson@wilmerhale.com
Space Ariel Bernard Waldman +1 202 663 6063 +1 202 663 6363 ariel.waldman@wilmerhale.com
Space Seth P. Waxman +1 202 663 6000 +1 202 663 6363 seth.waxman@wilmerhale.com
No Logo Travis County Attorney Office, Intervenor-Defendant
Officially listed as "TRAVIS COUNTY, TEXAS"

Toggle Switch Represented by J. GERALD HEBERT, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Gerald Hebert +1 703 628 4673 +1 202 736 2222 hebert@voterlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Max Renea Hicks

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Max Renea Hicks +1 512 480 8231 +1 512 480 9105 rhicks@renea-hicks.com

Toggle Switch Represented by NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kristen M. Clarke +1 202 682 1300 +1 202 682 1312 kclarke@naacpldf.org
No Logo WENDY RICHARDSON, Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Samuel Spital +1 212 513 3200 +1 212 385 9010

Toggle Switch Represented by NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Debo P. Adegbile +1 212 965 2200 +1 212 226 7592 dadegbile@naacpldf.org
Space Kristen M. Clarke +1 202 682 1300 +1 202 682 1312 kclarke@naacpldf.org
Space Jenigh J. Garrett +1 212 965 2200 +1 212 226 7592
Space Ryan P. Haygood +1 212 965 2200 +1 212 226 7592 rhaygood@naacpldf.org
No Logo WINTHROP GRAHAM, Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Samuel Spital +1 212 513 3200 +1 212 385 9010

Toggle Switch Represented by NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Debo P. Adegbile +1 212 965 2200 +1 212 226 7592 dadegbile@naacpldf.org
Space Kristen M. Clarke +1 202 682 1300 +1 202 682 1312 kclarke@naacpldf.org
Space Jenigh J. Garrett +1 212 965 2200 +1 212 226 7592
Space Ryan P. Haygood +1 212 965 2200 +1 212 226 7592 rhaygood@naacpldf.org
No Logo YVONNE GRAHAM, Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Samuel Spital +1 212 513 3200 +1 212 385 9010

Toggle Switch Represented by NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Debo P. Adegbile +1 212 965 2200 +1 212 226 7592 dadegbile@naacpldf.org
Space Kristen M. Clarke +1 202 682 1300 +1 202 682 1312 kclarke@naacpldf.org
Space Jenigh J. Garrett +1 212 965 2200 +1 212 226 7592
Space Ryan P. Haygood +1 212 965 2200 +1 212 226 7592 rhaygood@naacpldf.org
No Logo Brennan Center for Justice at NYU School of Law, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul March Smith +1 202 639 6060 +1 202 639 6066 psmith@jenner.com
No Logo WINTHROP GRAHAM, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Debo P. Adegbile +1 212 965 2200 +1 212 226 7592 dadegbile@naacpldf.org
Office Washington, DC
Filed 8/4/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 441 - Civil Rights: Voting
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1973 Voting Rights Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County 88888
Terminated 5/30/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags 3JUD-PANEL, APPEAL, CLOSED, TYPE-N
  Entries (188) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 143 Filed: 9/11/2008, Entered: 9/11/2008 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
SECOND AMENDED MEMORANDUM OPINION of Original Opinion filed 5/30/08 denying plaintiff's motion for summary judgment and granting defendant's and defendant-intervenors' motions for summary judgment. Signed by Three-Judge Court (Judge Paul L. Friedman, Judge Emmet G. Sullivan, and Judge David S. Tatel)(signed 9/8/08)(jeb, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 142 Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: 9/4/2008 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
    AMENDED MEMORANDUM OPINION of Original Opinion filed 5/30/08 denying plaintiff's motion for summary judgment and granting defendant's and defendant-intervenors' motions for summary judgment. Signed by Three-Judge Court (Judge Paul L. Friedman, Judge Emmet G. Sullivan, and Judge David S. Tatel)(signed 9/3/08)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
      MINUTE ORDER: The defendant intervenors have filed a second joint consent motion to extend the deadline for filing any petition for attorneys' fees and costs and to hold in abeyance all proceedings on such petition [141]. The motion hereby is granted. The Court finds that in the interests of justice, the petition for attorneys' fees and costs should be held in abeyance pending the outcome of the appeal. See Local Civil Rule 54.2(b). Signed by Three-Judge Court (Judge Paul L. Friedman, Judge Emmet G. Sullivan, and Judge David S. Tatel) on July 21, 2008. (lcplf1)
        LREF
        Legal Document 141 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: 7/17/2008, Terminated: 7/21/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File
        Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Any Petition for Attorneys' Fees and Costs and To Hold in Abeyance All Proceedings on Any Such Petition by AUSTIN BRANCH OF THE NAACP (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Waldman, Ariel)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet
          Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Supreme Court re [140] Notice of Appeal. (jf, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 140 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008 Notice of Appeal
            NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Supreme Court as to [134] Order, by NORTHWEST AUSTIN MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NUMBER ONE. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (jf) Modified on 7/15/2008 (jf, ). Modified on 8/22/2008 (jf, ).
              LREF
              Legal Document 139 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008 ~Notice (other)
              NOTICE of Intent to Appeal by NORTHWEST AUSTIN MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NUMBER ONE (Ward, Christian)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: 6/18/2008 Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
                NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Docket entry [137] text modified to reflect correct title of document. (mm)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: 6/18/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                  Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff to inform the Court whether or not it intends to appeal on or before 7/29/2008. If plaintiff notifies the Court that it intends to appeal, the intervenors may file a renewed motion under Rule 54.2(b) on or before 7/31/2008. If plaintiff notifies the Court that it does not intend to appeal, the intervenors' petition(s) shall be filed on or before 8/29/2008.(mm)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: 6/17/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                    MINUTE ORDER: The defendant intervenors have filed a joint consent motion to extend the deadline for filing any petition for attorneys' fees and costs and to hold in abeyance all proceedings on such petition [138]. The motion hereby is granted. Local Civil Rule 54.2(b) provides that "[i]f a party has not finally decided whether to appeal, the court may allow the party reasonable additional time to reach such a decision. After a decision has been made that there will be an appeal, the court shall make a specific determination as to whether, in the interest of justice, the fee issues, in whole or in part, should be considered or be held in abeyance pending the outcome of the appeal." Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff shall inform the Court whether or not it intends to appeal on or before July 29, 2008. If plaintiff notifies the Court that it intends to appeal, the intervenors may file a renewed motion under Rule 54.2(b) on or before July 31, 2008. If plaintiff notifies the Court that it does not intend to appeal, the intervenors' petition(s) shall be filed on or before August 29, 2008. Signed by Three-Judge Court (Judge Paul L. Friedman, Judge Emmet G. Sullivan, and Judge David S. Tatel) on June 17, 2008. (lcplf1)
                      LREF
                      Blank 138 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to
                      Joint Consent MOTION for Extend the deadline for filing any petition for attorney's fees and costs by NATHANIEL LESANE, GABRIEL DIAZ, JOVITA CASARES, ANGIE GARCIA, OFELIA ZAPATA, YVONNE GRAHAM, WENDY RICHARDSON, JAMAL RICHARDSON, MARISA RICHARDSON, WINTHROP GRAHAM, AUSTIN BRANCH OF THE NAACP, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES, NICOLE LOUIS, RODNEY LOUIS, DAVID DIAZ, LISA DIAZ, PEOPLE FOR THE AMERICAN WAY, TRAVIS COUNTY, TEXAS; (See Docket Entry No. [137] to view document. (ztd, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 137 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: 6/13/2008, Terminated: 6/18/2008 Motion to Amend/Correct
                        Amended Joint Consent Motion to Hold in Abeyance All Proceedings on Any Petition for Attorneys' Fees and Costs by NATHANIEL LESANE, GABRIEL DIAZ, JOVITA CASARES, ANGIE GARCIA, OFELIA ZAPATA, YVONNE GRAHAM, WENDY RICHARDSON, JAMAL RICHARDSON, MARISA RICHARDSON, WINTHROP GRAHAM, AUSTIN BRANCH OF THE NAACP, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES, NICOLE LOUIS, RODNEY LOUIS, DAVID DIAZ, LISA DIAZ, PEOPLE FOR THE AMERICAN WAY, TRAVIS COUNTY, TEXAS (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Waldman, Ariel) Modified on 6/18/2008 (mm).
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 136 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: 6/13/2008, Terminated: 6/13/2008 Motion to Hold in Abeyance
                          MOTION to Hold in Abeyance Any Petition for Attorney's Fees & Costs by NATHANIEL LESANE, GABRIEL DIAZ, JOVITA CASARES, ANGIE GARCIA, OFELIA ZAPATA, YVONNE GRAHAM, WENDY RICHARDSON, JAMAL RICHARDSON, MARISA RICHARDSON, WINTHROP GRAHAM, AUSTIN BRANCH OF THE NAACP, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES, NICOLE LOUIS, RODNEY LOUIS, DAVID DIAZ, LISA DIAZ, PEOPLE FOR THE AMERICAN WAY, TRAVIS COUNTY, TEXAS (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Waldman, Ariel)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 135 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008 Notice of Change of Address
                            NOTICE of Change of Address by Paul March Smith (Smith, Paul)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 134 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER AND JUDGMENT denying plaintiff's motion for summary judgment and granting defendant's and defendant-intervenors' motions for summary judgment. Signed by Three-Judge Court (Judge Paul L. Friedman, Judge Emmet G. Sullivan, and Judge David S. Tatel) on May 30, 2008.(lcplf1)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 133 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                OPINION denying plaintiff's motion for summary judgment and granting defendant's and defendant-intervenors' motions for summary judgment. Signed by Three-Judge Court (Judge Paul L. Friedman, Judge Emmet G. Sullivan, and Judge David S. Tatel) on May 30, 2008. (lcplf1) (Opinion amended 9/4/08)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008 Order
                                  MINUTE ORDER: Under Rule 25(d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Attorney General Michael B. Mukasey has been substituted for former Attorney General Alberto Gonzales as the defendant in this matter. Signed by Three-Judge Court (Judge Paul L. Friedman, Judge Emmet G. Sullivan, and Judge David S. Tatel) on May 30, 2008.(lcplf1)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 132 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: 4/15/2008 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                    NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to AUSTIN BRANCH OF THE NAACP, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES. Attorney Daniel A. Zibel terminated. (Waldman, Ariel)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 131 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: 2/29/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Judith Ellen Schaeffer on behalf of PEOPLE FOR THE AMERICAN WAY (Schaeffer, Judith)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 130 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: 2/7/2008 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                        NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to AUSTIN BRANCH OF THE NAACP, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES. Attorney John Payton terminated. (Zibel, Daniel)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 129 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: 1/15/2008 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                          NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to AUSTIN BRANCH OF THE NAACP, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES. Attorney Michael J. Gottlieb terminated. (Zibel, Daniel)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 126 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 12/19/2007 Memorandum
                                            RESPONSE re [127] by NORTHWEST AUSTIN MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NUMBER ONE. (Ward, Christian) Modified event and link on 12/20/2007 (nmw, ).
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: 12/11/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                              Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 12/19/2007 (lin, )
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 128 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: 12/27/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                NOTICE of Post-Argument Submission by GABRIEL DIAZ, ANGIE GARCIA, DAVID DIAZ, LISA DIAZ (td, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 127 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: 12/20/2007 Memorandum
                                                  MEMORANDUM re Post-Argument Submission by GABRIEL DIAZ, ANGIE GARCIA, DAVID DIAZ, LISA DIAZ. (nmw, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: 12/10/2007 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                                    MINUTE ORDER: The Diaz and Garcia defendant-intervenors have filed a motion for leave to file a post-argument submission [125]. The Court issued a Minute Order setting a December 7, 2007 deadline for the filing of any opposition briefs. No opposition having been filed, the Diaz and Garcia defendant-intervenors' motion for leave to file a post-argument submission is GRANTED. See Local Civil Rule 7(b). Plaintiff may file a response to the post-argument submission on or before December 19, 2007. Signed by Three Judge Panel (Judge David S. Tatel, Judge Paul L. Friedman and Judge Emmet G. Sullivan) on December 10, 2007. (lcplf1)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: 12/4/2007 Order
                                                      MINUTE ORDER: The Diaz and Garcia defendant-intervenors have filed a motion for leave to file a post-argument submission. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7(m), counsel informed the Court that they conferred with counsel for the other parties, and counsel for plaintiff indicated that the motion would be opposed. If plaintiff would like to file an opposition to the pending motion for leave to file, plaintiff should do so on or before December 7, 2007. Signed by Three Judge Panel (Judge David S. Tatel, Judge Paul L. Friedman and Judge Emmet G. Sullivan) on December 4, 2007. (lcplf1)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 125 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: 12/3/2007, Terminated: 12/10/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Post-Argument Submission by GABRIEL DIAZ, JOVITA CASARES, ANGIE GARCIA, OFELIA ZAPATA, DAVID DIAZ, LISA DIAZ (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Text of Proposed Order To Motion For Leave to File Post-Argument Submission)(Perales, Nina)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 10/23/2007, Entered: 10/23/2007 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                          MINUTE ORDER: Attorney Norman J. Chachkin's motion to withdraw as counsel [124] is granted. Signed by Three Judge Panel (Judge David S. Tatel, Judge Paul L. Friedman and Judge Emmet G. Sullivan) on October 23, 2007. (lcplf1)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 124 Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: 10/22/2007, Terminated: 10/23/2007 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                            MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant-Intervenors by YVONNE GRAHAM, WENDY RICHARDSON, JAMAL RICHARDSON, MARISA RICHARDSON, WINTHROP GRAHAM, NICOLE LOUIS, RODNEY LOUIS (Chachkin, Norman)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 123 Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: 9/19/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen M. Clarke on behalf of YVONNE GRAHAM, WENDY RICHARDSON, JAMAL RICHARDSON, MARISA RICHARDSON, WINTHROP GRAHAM, NICOLE LOUIS, RODNEY LOUIS (Clarke, Kristen)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: 9/17/2007 Motion Hearing
                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before U. S. District Judge Paul L. Friedman, U. S. District Judge Emmet G. Sullivan, U. S. Circuit Court Judge David S. Tatel: Three-Judge Motion Hearing held on 9/17/2007 re [101] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GABRIEL DIAZ, LISA DIAZ, DAVID DIAZ, [96] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by TRAVIS COUNTY, TEXAS, [100] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ALBERTO GONZALES, WINTHROP GRAHAM, MARISA RICHARDSON, JOVITA CASARES, TRAVIS COUNTY, TEXAS, WINTHROP GRAHAM, YVONNE GRAHAM, WENDY RICHARDSON, DAVID DIAZ, NICOLE LOUIS, AUSTIN BRANCH OF THE NAACP, ANGIE GARCIA, JAMAL RICHARDSON, LISA DIAZ, NATHANIEL LESANE, GABRIEL DIAZ, RODNEY LOUIS, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES, PEOPLE FOR THE AMERICAN WAY, OFELIA ZAPATA, [98] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ALBERTO GONZALES, [99] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by NORTHWEST AUSTIN MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NUMBER ONE. Motions [96], [98], [99], [100], [101] heard and taken under advisement. (Court Reporter Linda Russo) (mm)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 122 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: 9/13/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                  NOTICE Regarding Rebuttal Time by NORTHWEST AUSTIN MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NUMBER ONE re Order, (Ward, Christian)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/14/2007 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                    Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 9/17/2007 @ 08:00 AM in Ceremonial Courtroom before Judge Paul L. Friedman. (mm)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/12/2007 Order
                                                                      MINUTE ORDER: The Court directs that each side shall spend no more than fifteen (15) minutes of its eighty (80) minutes during oral argument on the bailout issue. Plaintiff shall inform the Court by noon on Friday how much time plaintiff intends to reserve for rebuttal. Signed by Three Judge Panel (Judge David S. Tatel, Judge Paul L. Friedman and Judge Emmet G. Sullivan) on September 12, 2007. (lcplf1)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/12/2007 Order
                                                                        NOTICE: In light of the rescheduling of oral argument on Monday, September 17, the following arrangements have been made. The 3rd Street entrance to the courthouse is the only available entrance before 8:00 a.m. That entrance will be open at 7:00 a.m. on the day of the argument. Courtroom 20, the Ceremonial Courtroom on the 6th floor, will be open at 7:30 a.m. Argument will begin promptly at 8:00 a.m. (lcplf1)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/12/2007 Order
                                                                          MINUTE ORDER: In order to permit the judges of this Court, members of the Bar, and interested members of the public to attend the memorial service for the Honorable John Garrett Penn, former Chief Judge of this Court, oral argument in this case will begin promptly at 8:00 a.m. on Monday, September 17 in Courtroom 20, rather than at the previously announced time. Plaintiffs shall have eighty (80) minutes in total, including any time reserved for rebuttal. Defendant Attorney General Gonzales and the defendant-intervenors combined shall have eighty (80) minutes in total. There will be one ten (10) minute recess. Signed by Three Judge Panel (Judge David S. Tatel, Judge Paul L. Friedman and Judge Emmet G. Sullivan) on September 12, 2007. (lcplf1)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 121 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007 Memorandum
                                                                            MEMORANDUM re [118] Order by ALBERTO GONZALES. (Herren, Thomas)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 120 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007 Memorandum
                                                                              MEMORANDUM re [118] Order by NORTHWEST AUSTIN MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NUMBER ONE. (Ward, Christian)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 119 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: 8/24/2007 Status Report
                                                                                STATUS REPORT by ALBERTO GONZALES. (Herren, Thomas)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 118 Filed: 8/22/2007, Entered: 8/22/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER regarding forthcoming article. Signed by Three Judge Panel (Judge David S. Tatel, Judge Paul L. Friedman and Judge Emmet G. Sullivan) on 8/22/07. (lcplf1)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/22/2007, Entered: 8/22/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Any party unable to obtain article should so advise the Court by 4:00 p.m., 9/4/2007. Parties may file any comments they wish to submit on the article by 4:00 p.m., 9/10/2007. (mm)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                      Set Deadlines/Hearings: Parties' supplemental report due by 8/24/2007; Motions Hearing set for 9/17/2007 @ 09:30 AM in Ceremonial Courtroom before Judge Paul L. Friedman. (mm)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: 8/8/2007 Order
                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER that oral argument on the pending motions for summary judgment, formerly scheduled to begin at 10:00 a.m., will begin promptly at 9:30 a.m. on September 17, 2007. Plaintiffs shall have 90 minutes in total, including any time reserved for rebuttal. Defendant Attorney General Gonzales and the defendent-intervenors combined shall have 90 minutes in total. The Court will take one 15-minute break during the morning. The parties shall submit a supplemental report to this Court on or before August 24, 2007 setting forth (1) how defendant and defendant-intervenors will divide the time between them, including whether defendant-intervenors will subdivide their time; and (2) which counsel will be presenting oral argument on behalf of plaintiff, defendant, and defendant-intervenors. Signed by Three Judge Panel (Judge David S. Tatel, Judge Paul L. Friedman and Judge Emmet G. Sullivan)on 8/8/07. (lcplf2)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 117 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: 7/31/2007 Status Report
                                                                                          STATUS REPORT Responding to Order of July 17, 2007 by NORTHWEST AUSTIN MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NUMBER ONE. (Ward, Christian)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 116 Filed: 7/27/2007, Entered: 7/30/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                            NOTICE of filing of corrected docket entries pursuant to Minute Order filed 7/27/07; (SEE DOCUMENT NO. [115] to view corrected documents) (td, ).
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 7/27/2007, Entered: 7/27/2007 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER granting [115] defendant-intervenors' unopposed motion for leave to file corrected documents. Signed by Three Judge Panel (Judge David S. Tatel, Judge Paul L. Friedman and Judge Emmet G. Sullivan) on 7/27/07. (lcplf1)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 115 Filed: 7/25/2007, Entered: 7/25/2007, Terminated: 7/27/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Documents by NATHANIEL LESANE, GABRIEL DIAZ, JOVITA CASARES, ANGIE GARCIA, OFELIA ZAPATA, WINTHROP GRAHAM, YVONNE GRAHAM, WENDY RICHARDSON, JAMAL RICHARDSON, MARISA RICHARDSON, WINTHROP GRAHAM, AUSTIN BRANCH OF THE NAACP, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES, NICOLE LOUIS, RODNEY LOUIS, DAVID DIAZ, LISA DIAZ, PEOPLE FOR THE AMERICAN WAY, TRAVIS COUNTY, TEXAS (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Proposed Corrected Exhibit 2-A to the May 15, 2007 Declaration of Paul R.Q. Wolfson# (2) Exhibit A - Proposed Corrected Exhibit 2-B to the May 15, 2007 Declaration of Paul R.Q. Wolfson# (3) Exhibit A - Proposed Corrected Exhibit 2-C - 2-I to the May 15, 2007 Declaration of Paul R.Q. Wolfson# (4) Exhibit A - Proposed Corrected Exhibit 2-J - 2-P to the May 15, 2007 Declaration of Paul R.Q. Wolfson# (5) Exhibit B - Proposed Corrected Memorandum in Support of Defendant-Intervenors' Motion for Summary Judgment# (6) Exhibit C - Proposed Corrected Memorandum by Defendant-Intervenors in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment)(Zibel, Daniel)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: 7/18/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines: Report due by 7/31/2007. (lin, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: 7/17/2007 Order
                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER that on or before July 31, 2007 the parties shall jointly file a report setting forth the total amount of time requested for oral argument for each side and how the defendant and defendant-intervenors propose to subdivide their time. Signed by Three Judge Panel (Judge David S. Tatel, Judge Paul L. Friedman and Judge Emmet G. Sullivan) on 7/17/07. (lcplf1)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 114 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: 7/6/2007 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                      REPLY to opposition to motion re [98] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ALBERTO GONZALES. (Herren, Thomas)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 113 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: 7/6/2007 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                        REPLY to opposition to motion re [101] MOTION for Summary Judgment, [100] MOTION for Summary Judgment, [96] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by NATHANIEL LESANE, GABRIEL DIAZ, JOVITA CASARES, ANGIE GARCIA, OFELIA ZAPATA, WINTHROP GRAHAM, YVONNE GRAHAM, WENDY RICHARDSON, JAMAL RICHARDSON, MARISA RICHARDSON, WINTHROP GRAHAM, AUSTIN BRANCH OF THE NAACP, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES, NICOLE LOUIS, RODNEY LOUIS, DAVID DIAZ, LISA DIAZ, PEOPLE FOR THE AMERICAN WAY, TRAVIS COUNTY, TEXAS. (Zibel, Daniel)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 112 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: 7/6/2007 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                          REPLY to opposition to motion re [99] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by NORTHWEST AUSTIN MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NUMBER ONE. (Ward, Christian)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/18/2007, Entered: 6/18/2007 Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
                                                                                                            NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re [110] Response to Document, was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile with the correct main document and using the correct category. (lc, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 111 Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: 6/18/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                              Memorandum in opposition to re [99] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by NATHANIEL LESANE, GABRIEL DIAZ, JOVITA CASARES, ANGIE GARCIA, OFELIA ZAPATA, WINTHROP GRAHAM, YVONNE GRAHAM, WENDY RICHARDSON, JAMAL RICHARDSON, MARISA RICHARDSON, WINTHROP GRAHAM, AUSTIN BRANCH OF THE NAACP, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES, NICOLE LOUIS, RODNEY LOUIS, DAVID DIAZ, LISA DIAZ, PEOPLE FOR THE AMERICAN WAY, TRAVIS COUNTY, TEXAS. (Attachments: # (1) Clarke Declaration# (2) Clarke Declaration Exhibit 1-3# (3) Clarke Declaration Exhibit 4 Part 1# (4) Clarke Declaration Exhibit 4 Part 2# (5) Clarke Declaration Exhibit 4 Part 3# (6) Clarke Declaration Exhibit 5-6# (7) Wolfson Declaration# (8) Wolfson Declaration Exhibits)(Waldman, Ariel) Modified on 6/18/2007 (lc, ).
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 110 Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: 6/15/2007 Response to Document
                                                                                                                ENTERED IN ERROR.....RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by NATHANIEL LESANE, GABRIEL DIAZ, JOVITA CASARES, ANGIE GARCIA, OFELIA ZAPATA, WINTHROP GRAHAM, YVONNE GRAHAM, WENDY RICHARDSON, JAMAL RICHARDSON, MARISA RICHARDSON, WINTHROP GRAHAM, AUSTIN BRANCH OF THE NAACP, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES, NICOLE LOUIS, RODNEY LOUIS, ALBERTO GONZALES, DAVID DIAZ, LISA DIAZ, PEOPLE FOR THE AMERICAN WAY, TRAVIS COUNTY, TEXAS. (Attachments: # (1) Supplement Declaration of Kristen Clarke# (2) Exhibit Clarke Declaration Exhibit 1-3# (3) Exhibit Declaration of Kristen Clarke Exhibit 4, part 1# (4) Exhibit Declaration of Kristen Clarke Exhibit 4 Part 2# (5) Exhibit Declaration of Kristen Clarke Exhibit 4 Part 3# (6) Exhibit Declaration of Kristen Clarke Exhibit 5-6# (7) Supplement Memorandum of Points and Authorities# (8) Appendix Declaration of Paul Wolfson)(Waldman, Ariel) Modified on 6/18/2007 (lc, ).
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 109 Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: 6/15/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                  Memorandum in opposition to re [99] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ALBERTO GONZALES. (Herren, Thomas)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 108 Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: 6/15/2007 Response to Document
                                                                                                                    RESPONSE [107]to Plaintiff's Statement of Material Facts filed by NATHANIEL LESANE, GABRIEL DIAZ, JOVITA CASARES, ANGIE GARCIA, OFELIA ZAPATA, WINTHROP GRAHAM, YVONNE GRAHAM, WENDY RICHARDSON, JAMAL RICHARDSON, MARISA RICHARDSON, WINTHROP GRAHAM, AUSTIN BRANCH OF THE NAACP, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES, NICOLE LOUIS, RODNEY LOUIS, ALBERTO GONZALES, DAVID DIAZ, LISA DIAZ, PEOPLE FOR THE AMERICAN WAY, TRAVIS COUNTY, TEXAS. (Waldman, Ariel) Modified on 6/18/2007 (td, ).
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 107 Filed: 6/15/2007, Entered: 6/15/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                      Memorandum in opposition to re [101] MOTION for Summary Judgment, [100] MOTION for Summary Judgment, [98] MOTION for Summary Judgment, [96] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by NORTHWEST AUSTIN MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NUMBER ONE. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit No. 1# (2) Exhibit No. 2# (3) Text of Proposed Order # (4) Statement of Facts Opposition)(Ward, Christian)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/12/2007, Entered: 6/12/2007 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER granting [106] unopposed joint motion for leave to file excess pages. Defendant Attorney General Gonzales may file a memorandum of points and authorities in opposition to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment in excess of 45 pages, but not to exceed 65 pages. A consolidated group of defendant-intervenors may file a memorandum of points and authorities in opposition to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment in excess of 45 pages, but not to exceed 65 pages. Signed by Three Judge Panel (Judge David S. Tatel, Judge Paul L. Friedman and Judge Emmet G. Sullivan) on 6/12/07. (lcplf2)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 106 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007, Terminated: 6/12/2007 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by NATHANIEL LESANE, GABRIEL DIAZ, JOVITA CASARES, ANGIE GARCIA, OFELIA ZAPATA, WINTHROP GRAHAM, YVONNE GRAHAM, WENDY RICHARDSON, JAMAL RICHARDSON, MARISA RICHARDSON, WINTHROP GRAHAM, AUSTIN BRANCH OF THE NAACP, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES, NICOLE LOUIS, RODNEY LOUIS, ALBERTO GONZALES, DAVID DIAZ, LISA DIAZ, PEOPLE FOR THE AMERICAN WAY, TRAVIS COUNTY, TEXAS (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Zibel, Daniel)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 105 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007 Response to Order of the Court
                                                                                                                            RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re [95] Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, Defendants' Report in Response to the Court's Order of May 11, 2007 filed by NATHANIEL LESANE, GABRIEL DIAZ, JOVITA CASARES, ANGIE GARCIA, OFELIA ZAPATA, WINTHROP GRAHAM, YVONNE GRAHAM, WENDY RICHARDSON, JAMAL RICHARDSON, MARISA RICHARDSON, WINTHROP GRAHAM, AUSTIN BRANCH OF THE NAACP, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES, NICOLE LOUIS, RODNEY LOUIS, ALBERTO GONZALES, DAVID DIAZ, LISA DIAZ, PEOPLE FOR THE AMERICAN WAY, TRAVIS COUNTY, TEXAS. (Zibel, Daniel)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 104 Filed: 5/24/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007 Amicus Brief
                                                                                                                              AMICUS BRIEF by BRENNAN CENTER FOR JUSTICE AT NYU SCHOOL OF LAW. (lc, )
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/24/2007, Entered: 5/24/2007 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER granting [102] The Brennan Center for Justice at NYU School of Law's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Memorandum of Law as Amicus Curiae. Signed by Three Judge Panel (Judge David S. Tatel, Judge Paul L. Friedman and Judge Emmet G. Sullivan) on 5/24/07. (lcplf2)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 101 Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: 5/16/2007, Terminated: 3/6/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Summary Judgment by GABRIEL DIAZ, DAVID DIAZ, LISA DIAZ (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Memorandum in Support# (2) Exhibit Memorandum in Support Part 1# (3) Exhibit Memorandum in Support Part 2# (4) Exhibit Exh. 1 Part A# (5) Exhibit Exh. 1 Part B# (6) Exhibit Exh. 1 Part c# (7) Exhibit Exh. 2# (8) Exhibit Exh. 3# (9) Exhibit Exh. 4# (10) Exhibit Exh. 5 part a# (11) Exhibit Exh. 5 part b# (12) Exhibit Exh. 6 part a# (13) Exhibit Exh. 6 part b# (14) Exhibit Exh. 6 part c# (15) Exhibit Exh. 7 part a# (16) Exhibit Exh. 7 part b# (17) Exhibit Exh 7 part c# (18) Exhibit Exh. 7 part d# (19) Exhibit Exh. 8 part a# (20) Exhibit Exh. 8 part b# (21) Exhibit Exh. 8 part c# (22) Exhibit Exh. 8 part d# (23) Exhibit Exh. 8 part e# (24) Exhibit Exh. 9 part a# (25) Exhibit Exh. 9 part b# (26) Exhibit Exh. 10 part a# (27) Exhibit Exh. 10 part b# (28) Exhibit Exh. 11 part a# (29) Exhibit Exh. 11 part b# (30) Exhibit Exh. 12# (31) Exhibit Exh. 13# (32) Exhibit Exh. 14-15# (33) Exhibit Exh. 16-21# (34) Exhibit Exh. 22-24# (35) Exhibit Exh. 25# (36) Exhibit Exh. 26# (37) Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Summary Judgment# (38) Declaration in Support of Motion)(Perales, Nina)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: 5/16/2007 Order
                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER that the parties shall provide two (2) courtesy copies of each motion, opposition, and reply, as well as any attached exhibits and statements of material facts, including the DVD submissions, to each of the three judges' chambers (6 copies in total). Signed by Three Judge Panel (Judge David S. Tatel, Judge Paul L. Friedman and Judge Emmet G. Sullivan) on 5/16/07. (lcplf2)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 103 Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: 5/22/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Paul March Smith on behalf of BRENNAN CENTER FOR JUSTICE AT NYU SCHOOL OF LAW (nmw, )
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 102 Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: 5/22/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by BRENNAN CENTER FOR JUSTICE AT NYU SCHOOL OF LAW (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Amicus Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment# (2) Text of Proposed Order)(nmw, )
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 100 Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: 5/15/2007, Terminated: 3/6/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment by NATHANIEL LESANE, GABRIEL DIAZ, JOVITA CASARES, ANGIE GARCIA, OFELIA ZAPATA, WINTHROP GRAHAM, YVONNE GRAHAM, WENDY RICHARDSON, JAMAL RICHARDSON, MARISA RICHARDSON, WINTHROP GRAHAM, AUSTIN BRANCH OF THE NAACP, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES, NICOLE LOUIS, RODNEY LOUIS, ALBERTO GONZALES, DAVID DIAZ, LISA DIAZ, PEOPLE FOR THE AMERICAN WAY, TRAVIS COUNTY, TEXAS (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed order for Summary Judgment# (2) Affidavit Declaration of Paul R Q Wolfson# (3) Exhibit Declaration Exhibit 1# (4) Exhibit Declaration Exhibit 2A-2B# (5) Exhibit Declaration Exhibit 2C-2K# (6) Exhibit Declaration Exhibit 2L-2P# (7) Exhibit Declaration Exhibit 3-4# (8) Exhibit Declaration Exhibit 5# (9) Exhibit Declaration Exhibit 6# (10) Exhibit Declaration Exhibit 7# (11) Exhibit Declaration Exhibit 8# (12) Exhibit Declaration Exhibit 9# (13) Supplement Statement of Material Facts 01# (14) Supplement Statement of Material Facts 2# (15) Supplement Statement of Material Facts 03# (16) Supplement Statement of Material Facts 04# (17) Supplement Statement of Material Facts 05# (18) Supplement Statement of Material Facts 06# (19) Supplement Statement of Material Facts 07# (20) Supplement Statement of Material Facts 08# (21) Supplement Statement of Material Facts 09# (22) Supplement Statement of Material Facts 10# (23) Supplement Memorandum of Law in Support)(Waldman, Ariel)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 99 Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: 5/15/2007, Terminated: 3/6/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment by NORTHWEST AUSTIN MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NUMBER ONE (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 2-Part A# (4) Exhibit 3# (5) Exhibit 4# (6) Exhibit 5# (7) Exhibit 6# (8) Exhibit 7# (9) Exhibit 8# (10) Exhibit 2-Part B# (11) Exhibit 2-Part c# (12) Exhibit 9# (13) Exhibit 10# (14) Exhibit 11# (15) Exhibit 12# (16) Exhibit 13# (17) Exhibit 14# (18) Exhibit 15# (19) Exhibit 16# (20) Exhibit 17# (21) Exhibit 18# (22) Exhibit 19# (23) Exhibit 20# (24) Exhibit 21# (25) Exhibit 22# (26) Exhibit 23# (27) Exhibit 24# (28) Exhibit 25# (29) Exhibit 26# (30) Exhibit 27# (31) Exhibit 28# (32) Exhibit 29# (33) Exhibit 30# (34) Exhibit 31# (35) Exhibit 32# (36) Exhibit 32-Part a# (37) Exhibit 33# (38) Exhibit 34# (39) Exhibit 35# (40) Exhibit 36 Part a# (41) Exhibit 36 part b# (42) Exhibit part c# (43) Exhibit 36 d# (44) Exhibit 36e# (45) Exhibit 37# (46) Text of Proposed Order # (47) Statement of Facts)(Ward, Christian)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 98 Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: 5/15/2007, Terminated: 3/6/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment by ALBERTO GONZALES (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Memoranda of Points & Authorities# (2) Statement of Facts # (3) Affidavit # (4) Text of Proposed Order # (5) Exhibit Notice of Filing Exhibits# (6) Exhibit Certificate of Service)(Herren, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 97 Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: 5/15/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Lodging by NATHANIEL LESANE, GABRIEL DIAZ, JOVITA CASARES, ANGIE GARCIA, OFELIA ZAPATA, WINTHROP GRAHAM, YVONNE GRAHAM, WENDY RICHARDSON, JAMAL RICHARDSON, MARISA RICHARDSON, WINTHROP GRAHAM, AUSTIN BRANCH OF THE NAACP, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES, NICOLE LOUIS, RODNEY LOUIS, ALBERTO GONZALES, DAVID DIAZ, LISA DIAZ, PEOPLE FOR THE AMERICAN WAY, TRAVIS COUNTY, TEXAS (Waldman, Ariel)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 96 Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: 5/15/2007, Terminated: 3/6/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Summary Judgment by TRAVIS COUNTY, TEXAS (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Hicks, Max)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 95 Filed: 5/11/2007, Entered: 5/11/2007 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [90] Joint Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defendants shall file no later than 10 days after service of Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment a supplemental statement stating how many opposition briefs they anticipate filing and what page limitations they request. Signed by Three Judge Panel (Judge David S. Tatel, Judge Paul L. Friedman and Judge Emmet G. Sullivan)on 5/11/07. (lcplf2)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 94 Filed: 5/10/2007, Entered: 5/10/2007 Response to Order of the Court
                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order,, filed by NATHANIEL LESANE, GABRIEL DIAZ, JOVITA CASARES, ANGIE GARCIA, OFELIA ZAPATA, WINTHROP GRAHAM, YVONNE GRAHAM, WENDY RICHARDSON, JAMAL RICHARDSON, MARISA RICHARDSON, WINTHROP GRAHAM, NORTHWEST AUSTIN MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NUMBER ONE, AUSTIN BRANCH OF THE NAACP, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES, NICOLE LOUIS, RODNEY LOUIS, ALBERTO GONZALES, DAVID DIAZ, LISA DIAZ, PEOPLE FOR THE AMERICAN WAY, TRAVIS COUNTY, TEXAS. (Zibel, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: 5/8/2007 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER granting [91] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting [92] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting [93] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Three Judge Panel (Judge David S. Tatel, Judge Paul L. Friedman and Judge Emmet G. Sullivan) on 5/8/07. (lcplf2)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 93 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: 5/7/2007, Terminated: 5/8/2007 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jenigh J. Garrett, :Firm- NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc., :Address- 99 Hudson Street, Suite 1600, New York, NY 10013. Phone No. - 212-965-2200. Fax No. - 212-226-7592 by YVONNE GRAHAM, WENDY RICHARDSON, JAMAL RICHARDSON, MARISA RICHARDSON, WINTHROP GRAHAM, NICOLE LOUIS, RODNEY LOUIS. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Declaration of Jenigh J. Garrett# (2) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing# (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Chachkin, Norman)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 92 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: 5/7/2007, Terminated: 5/8/2007 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Samuel Spital, :Firm- Holland & Knight, LLP, :Address- 195 Broadway, 24th Floor, New York, NY 10007. Phone No. - 212-513-3200. Fax No. - 212-385-9010 by YVONNE GRAHAM, WENDY RICHARDSON, JAMAL RICHARDSON, MARISA RICHARDSON, WINTHROP GRAHAM, NICOLE LOUIS, RODNEY LOUIS. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Declaration of Samuel Spital# (2) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing# (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Chachkin, Norman)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 91 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: 5/7/2007, Terminated: 5/8/2007 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Ryan P. Haygood, :Firm- NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc., :Address- 99 Hudson Street, Suite 1600, New York, NY 10013. Phone No. - 212-965-2200. Fax No. - 212-226-7592 by YVONNE GRAHAM, WENDY RICHARDSON, JAMAL RICHARDSON, MARISA RICHARDSON, WINTHROP GRAHAM, NICOLE LOUIS, RODNEY LOUIS. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Declaration of Ryan P. Haygood# (2) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing# (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Chachkin, Norman).
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: 5/7/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Supplemental Report due by 5/10/2007. (gdf)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: 5/7/2007 Order
                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER that the parties shall submit on or before May 10, 2007 a joint supplemental report to their May 2, 2007 joint motion setting forth the following: (1) how many oppositions to plaintiff's dispositive motion the defendants and defendant-intervenors anticipate filing; and (2) whether the plaintiff anticipates filing a single, consolidated reply brief in response to defendants' oppositions, or multiple reply briefs. The parties should also state the estimated length of the aforementioned briefs. Signed by Three Judge Panel (Judge David S. Tatel, Judge Paul L. Friedman and Judge Emmet G. Sullivan) on 5/7/07. (lcplf2)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 90 Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: 5/2/2007, Terminated: 5/11/2007 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by NATHANIEL LESANE, GABRIEL DIAZ, JOVITA CASARES, ANGIE GARCIA, OFELIA ZAPATA, WINTHROP GRAHAM, YVONNE GRAHAM, WENDY RICHARDSON, JAMAL RICHARDSON, MARISA RICHARDSON, WINTHROP GRAHAM, NORTHWEST AUSTIN MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NUMBER ONE, AUSTIN BRANCH OF THE NAACP, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES, NICOLE LOUIS, RODNEY LOUIS, ALBERTO GONZALES, DAVID DIAZ, LISA DIAZ, PEOPLE FOR THE AMERICAN WAY, TRAVIS COUNTY, TEXAS (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Zibel, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 89 Filed: 4/9/2007, Entered: 4/9/2007 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                Private Defendant-Intervenors' ANSWER to Amended Complaint by NATHANIEL LESANE, GABRIEL DIAZ, JOVITA CASARES, ANGIE GARCIA, OFELIA ZAPATA, WINTHROP GRAHAM, YVONNE GRAHAM, WENDY RICHARDSON, JAMAL RICHARDSON, MARISA RICHARDSON, WINTHROP GRAHAM, AUSTIN BRANCH OF THE NAACP, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES, NICOLE LOUIS, RODNEY LOUIS, DAVID DIAZ, LISA DIAZ, PEOPLE FOR THE AMERICAN WAY. Related document: [83] Amended Complaint filed by NORTHWEST AUSTIN MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NUMBER ONE.(Zibel, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 88 Filed: 4/5/2007, Entered: 4/5/2007 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Amended Complaint by ALBERTO GONZALES. Related document: [83] Amended Complaint filed by NORTHWEST AUSTIN MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NUMBER ONE.(Herren, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 87 Filed: 4/5/2007, Entered: 4/5/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 83.2(g) by JOVITA CASARES, ANGIE GARCIA, OFELIA ZAPATA (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Attorneys' Certification Local Rule 83.2(g))(Kirkpatrick, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 86 Filed: 4/2/2007, Entered: 4/2/2007 Order on Motion to StrikeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER that [68] plaintiff's motion to strike the expert designation of defendant-intervenors the Texas State Conference of NAACP Branches and the Austin Branch of the NAACP is DENIED; [77] plaintiff's motion to strike the expert designation of the Garcia defendant-intervenors [77] is DENIED. Signed by Three Judge Panel (Judge David S. Tatel, Judge Paul L. Friedman and Judge Emmet G. Sullivan) on 4/2/07. (lcplf2). Modified on 4/3/2007 (lcplf2).
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 85 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: 3/27/2007 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint by YVONNE GRAHAM, WENDY RICHARDSON, JAMAL RICHARDSON, MARISA RICHARDSON, WINTHROP GRAHAM. Related document: [1] Complaint filed by NORTHWEST AUSTIN MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NUMBER ONE.(jf, )
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 84 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: 3/26/2007 Order on Motion to InterveneCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [70] Motion to Intervene. Signed by Three Judge Panel (Judge David S. Tatel, Judge Paul L. Friedman and Judge Emmet G. Sullivan) on 3/26/07.(lcplf2) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/26/2007 (lcplf2, ).
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 82 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: 3/23/2007 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint First Amended Complaint by TRAVIS COUNTY, TEXAS. Related document: [83] Amended Complaint filed by NORTHWEST AUSTIN MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NUMBER ONE.(Hicks, Max) Modified on 3/23/2007 (nmw, ).
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 83 Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: 3/23/2007 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                              FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against ALBERTO GONZALES filed by NORTHWEST AUSTIN MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NUMBER ONE.(nmw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: 3/22/2007 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER that plaintiff's [65] motion to amend the complaint is GRANTED. Signed by Three Judge Panel (Judge David S. Tatel, Judge Paul L. Friedman and Judge Emmet G. Sullivan) on 3/22/07. (lcplf2)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 81 Filed: 3/21/2007, Entered: 3/21/2007 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to opposition to motion re [77] MOTION to Strike Expert Designation of Garcia Intervenors filed by NORTHWEST AUSTIN MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NUMBER ONE. (Ward, Christian)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 80 Filed: 3/16/2007, Entered: 3/16/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time toCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting in part and denying in part [78] defendant-intervenors' motion to extend the briefing schedule. Dispositive motions are due on or before May 15, 2007; oppositions are due on or before June 15, 2007; and replies, if any, are due on or before July 6, 2007. Signed by Three Judge Panel (Judge David S. Tatel, Judge Paul L. Friedman, and Judge Emmet G. Sullivan) on 3/16/07.(lcplf2)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 79 Filed: 3/16/2007, Entered: 3/16/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in opposition to re [77] MOTION to Strike Expert Designation of Garcia Intervenors filed by JOVITA CASARES, ANGIE GARCIA, OFELIA ZAPATA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1# (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Kirkpatrick, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/16/2007, Entered: 3/19/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Dispositive Motions due by 5/15/2007; Responses to Dispositive Motions due by 6/15/2007; Replies to Dispositive Motions due by 7/6/2007. (mm)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 78 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: 3/15/2007, Terminated: 3/16/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Dispositive Motions by NATHANIEL LESANE, GABRIEL DIAZ, JOVITA CASARES, ANGIE GARCIA, OFELIA ZAPATA, AUSTIN BRANCH OF THE NAACP, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES, NICOLE LOUIS, RODNEY LOUIS, DAVID DIAZ, LISA DIAZ, PEOPLE FOR THE AMERICAN WAY, TRAVIS COUNTY, TEXASMotions referred to Emmet G. Sullivan. (Attachments: # (1) Statement of Facts Memorandum in Support of Unopposed Motion to Extend Briefing Schedule# (2) Text of Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Extend Briefing Schedule)(Clarke, Kristen)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 77 Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: 3/5/2007, Terminated: 4/2/2007 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Strike Expert Designation of Garcia Intervenors by NORTHWEST AUSTIN MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NUMBER ONE. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A# (2) Text of Proposed Order Order of Motion to Strike Expert)(Ward, Christian)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 76 Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: 3/5/2007 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to opposition to motion re [68] MOTION to Strike Expert Designation filed by NORTHWEST AUSTIN MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NUMBER ONE. (Ward, Christian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 75 Filed: 3/1/2007, Entered: 3/1/2007 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to opposition to motion re [70] MOTION to Intervene of Winthrop Graham, et al. filed by WINTHROP GRAHAM. (Adegbile, Debo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/1/2007, Entered: 3/1/2007 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Hearings: Oral argument on dispositive motions set for 9/17/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 29A before Judge Paul L. Friedman. (mm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 74 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: 2/26/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in opposition to re [68] MOTION to Strike Expert Designation filed by AUSTIN BRANCH OF THE NAACP, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibits A-D# (2) Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order# (3) Affidavit Declaration of Paul Wolfson)(Waldman, Ariel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 73 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: 2/26/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in opposition to re [70] MOTION to Intervene of Winthrop Graham, et al. filed by NORTHWEST AUSTIN MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NUMBER ONE. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed order denying Graham intervention)(Ward, Christian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 70 Filed: 2/14/2007, Entered: 2/14/2007, Terminated: 3/26/2007 Motion to Intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Intervene of Winthrop Graham, et al. by WINTHROP GRAHAM, YVONNE GRAHAM, WENDY RICHARDSON, JAMAL RICHARDSON, MARISA RICHARDSON. (Attachments: # (1) Statement of Points and Authorities# (2) Text of Proposed Order # (3) Proposed Answer)(Adegbile, Debo) Modified on 2/15/2007 (nmw, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 69 Filed: 2/14/2007, Entered: 2/14/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Nina Perales on behalf of GABRIEL DIAZ, DAVID DIAZ, LISA DIAZ (Perales, Nina)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 68 Filed: 2/13/2007, Entered: 2/13/2007, Terminated: 4/2/2007 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Strike Expert Designation by NORTHWEST AUSTIN MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NUMBER ONE. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Text of Proposed Order Proposed order granting motion to strike)(Ward, Christian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 67 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: 2/12/2007 Response to Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE re [65] MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by ALBERTO GONZALES. (Herren, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 66 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: 2/5/2007 Order on Motion forJoinderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying [63] Motion for Joinder. Signed by Three Judge Panel (Judge David S. Tatel, Judge Paul L. Friedman, and Judge Emmet G. Sullivan) on 2/5/07. (lcplf2) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/5/2007 (lcplf2, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: 2/5/2007 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Oral argument on dispositive motions is set for September 17, 2007 at 10:00 a.m. in the Ceremonial Courtroom, Courtroom #20. Signed by Three Judge Panel (Judge David S. Tatel, Judge Paul L. Friedman, and Judge Emmet G. Sullivan) on February 5, 2007. (MA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 65 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: 2/1/2007, Terminated: 3/22/2007 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by NORTHWEST AUSTIN MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NUMBER ONE. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed order granting leave to amend# (2) First Amended Complaint)(Ward, Christian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 64 Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: 1/19/2007 Response to Order of the Court
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT Parties' Joint Report in Response to December 6, 2006 Order filed by AUSTIN BRANCH OF THE NAACP, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES. (Zibel, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 63 Filed: 12/22/2006, Entered: 12/22/2006, Terminated: 2/5/2007 ~Motion for Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Joinder of Additional Parties as Defendant Intervenors by RODNEY LOUIS. (Adegbile, Debo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 62 Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: 12/20/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Reinherz Quitma Wolfson on behalf of AUSTIN BRANCH OF THE NAACP, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES (Wolfson, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 61 Filed: 12/19/2006, Entered: 12/19/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by John Payton on behalf of AUSTIN BRANCH OF THE NAACP, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES (Payton, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 60 Filed: 12/19/2006, Entered: 12/19/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel A. Zibel on behalf of AUSTIN BRANCH OF THE NAACP, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES (Zibel, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 59 Filed: 12/19/2006, Entered: 12/19/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Jay Blustein on behalf of AUSTIN BRANCH OF THE NAACP, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES (Blustein, Benjamin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 12/19/2006, Entered: 12/19/2006 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER granting [56] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, granting [57] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Three Judge Panel (Judge David S. Tatel, Judge Paul L. Friedman, and Judge Emmet G. Sullivan)on December 19, 2006. (MA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 58 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: 12/18/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Ariel B. Waldman on behalf of AUSTIN BRANCH OF THE NAACP (Waldman, Ariel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 57 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: 12/18/2006, Terminated: 12/19/2006 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Dennis C. Hayes. :Address- 4805 Mt. Hope Dr. Baltimore, MD 21215. Phone No. - 410-580-5777. by AUSTIN BRANCH OF THE NAACP. (Waldman, Ariel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 56 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: 12/15/2006, Terminated: 12/19/2006 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Michael Gottlieb. :Address- Wilmer Hale 1875 Pennsylvania Ave., NW Washington, DC 20006. Phone No. - 202-663-6834. Fax No. - 202-663-6363 by AUSTIN BRANCH OF THE NAACP, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration of Michael Gottlieb# (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Waldman, Ariel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 55 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: 12/15/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER that all parties shall cease filing discovery with the Court. Signed by Three Judge Panel (Judge David S. Tatel, Judge Paul L. Friedman, and Judge Emmet G. Sullivan) on December 15, 2006. (MA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 54 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: 12/15/2006 Rule 26a1 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RULE 26a1 STATEMENT. (Ward, Christian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 53 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: 12/15/2006 Rule 26a1 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RULE 26a1 STATEMENT. (Mincberg, Elliot)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: 12/6/2006 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set Deadline: Joint Report due by 1/19/2007. (mm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: 12/6/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER that in view of the parties' stated position in their Local Rule 16.3 Report that they are unsure whether experts are necessary to this litigation, the parties shall file on or before January 19, 2007 a joint report informing the Court whether they intend to proceed with expert discovery, and, if they do not, the parties shall jointly propose a new briefing schedule for dispositive motions. Signed by Three Judge Panel (Judge David S. Tatel, Judge Paul L. Friedman, and Judge Emmet G. Sullivan) on 12/6/06. (lcplf2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 52 Filed: 12/1/2006, Entered: 12/1/2006 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Three Judge Panel (Judge David S. Tatel, Judge Paul L. Friedman, and Judge Emmet G. Sullivan) on 12/1/06. (lcplf2) Modified on 12/1/2006 (lcplf2).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 12/1/2006, Entered: 12/4/2006 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 2/1/2007; Joinder of Parties by 2/1/2007; Fact Discovery to commence 12/18/2006 and be completed by 3/1/2007; Disclosures pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) shall be made by 12/15/2006; Disclosures of all parties' retained experts pursuant to Rule 26(a)(2)(A) due by 1/16/2007; Disclosures of any rebuttal experts pursuant to Rule 26(a)(2)(B) due 2/16/2007; Expert Discovery and depositions of each party's retained experts to be completed by 4/9/2007; Dispositive Motions due by 4/16/2007; Responses to Dispositive Motions due by 5/16/2007; Replies to Dispositive Motions due by 6/6/2007. (mm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 50 Filed: 11/29/2006, Entered: 11/29/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Jon M. Greenbaum on behalf of AUSTIN BRANCH OF THE NAACP, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES (Greenbaum, Jon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 11/29/2006, Entered: 11/29/2006 Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re [48] Response to Order of the Court was entered in error and re-filed under the correct category.(jf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 51 Filed: 11/28/2006, Entered: 11/29/2006 Meet and Confer Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: # (1) Scheduling Order# (2) Schdueling Order of Defendant and Defendat-Intervenors)(jf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 49 Filed: 11/28/2006, Entered: 11/28/2006 Response to Order of the Court
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT Defendant's Report filed by ALBERTO GONZALES. (Herren, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 48 Filed: 11/28/2006, Entered: 11/28/2006 Response to Order of the Court
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENTERED IN ERROR.....RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT Parties Joint Local Rule 16.3 Report filed by ALBERTO GONZALES. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Herren, Thomas) Modified on 11/29/2006 (jf, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 47 Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: 11/27/2006 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint by JOVITA CASARES, ANGIE GARCIA, OFELIA ZAPATA. Related document: [1] Complaint filed by NORTHWEST AUSTIN MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NUMBER ONE,.(td, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 46 Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: 11/17/2006 Order on Motion to InterveneCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [32] motion of Angie Garcia, et al. to intervene. Signed by Three Judge Panel (Judge David S. Tatel, Judge Paul L. Friedman, and Judge Emmet G. Sullivan) on November 17, 2006. (MA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 45 Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: 11/17/2006 Response to any document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion to Intervene # [32] filed by ALBERTO GONZALES. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Herren, Thomas).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 44 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: 11/16/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER sua sponte that the defendant and intervenor-defendants shall submit a report on or about November 28, 2006 discussin what steps will be taken to avoid duplication of effort by defendants. Signed by Three Judge Panel (Judge David S. Tatel, Judge Paul L. Friedman, and Judge Emmet G. Sullivan) on November 16, 2006. (MA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: 11/21/2006 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set Deadline: Defendant and Intervenor-Defendants' Report due by 11/28/2006. (mm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: 11/16/2006 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [34] motion of Ferdose al-Taie to withdraw as counsel for plaintiff. Signed by Three Judge Panel (Judge David S. Tatel, Judge Paul L. Friedman, and Judge Emmet G. Sullivan) on November 16, 2006. (MA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 43 Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: 11/16/2006 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint by NATHANIEL LESANE. Related document: [1] Complaint filed by NORTHWEST AUSTIN MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NUMBER ONE,.(jf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 42 Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: 11/16/2006 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint by PEOPLE FOR THE AMERICAN WAY. Related document: [1] Complaint filed by NORTHWEST AUSTIN MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NUMBER ONE,.(jf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 41 Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: 11/16/2006 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint by TRAVIS COUNTY, TEXAS. Related document: [1] Complaint filed by NORTHWEST AUSTIN MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NUMBER ONE,.(jf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 40 Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: 11/15/2006 Order on Motion to InterveneCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [28] Motion to Intervene, granting [19] Motion to Intervene, granting [23] Motion to Intervene. Signed by Three Judge Panel (Judge David S. Tatel, Judge Paul L. Friedman, and Judge Emmet G. Sullivan) on November 15, 2006. (MA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 39 Filed: 11/13/2006, Entered: 11/13/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in opposition to re [23] MOTION to Intervene by Travis County filed by NORTHWEST AUSTIN MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NUMBER ONE. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed order denying motion to intervene by Travis County)(Ward, Christian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 38 Filed: 11/13/2006, Entered: 11/13/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in opposition to re [28] MOTION to Intervene by Nathaniel Lesane filed by NORTHWEST AUSTIN MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NUMBER ONE. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed order denying motion to intervene by Nathaniel Lesane)(Ward, Christian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 37 Filed: 11/13/2006, Entered: 11/13/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in opposition to re [32] MOTION to Intervene by Angie Garcia, Jovita Casares, and Ofelia Zapata filed by NORTHWEST AUSTIN MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NUMBER ONE. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed order denying motion to intervene by Garcia et al.)(Ward, Christian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 36 Filed: 11/13/2006, Entered: 11/13/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in opposition to re [19] MOTION to Intervene by People for the American Way filed by NORTHWEST AUSTIN MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NUMBER ONE. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed order denying PFAW motion to intervene)(Ward, Christian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 35 Filed: 11/13/2006, Entered: 11/13/2006 Response to any document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to Combined Response to Motions to Intervene (Docket #[19], [23], [28]) filed by ALBERTO GONZALES. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Herren, Thomas) Modified on 11/14/2006 (td, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 34 Filed: 11/10/2006, Entered: 11/10/2006, Terminated: 11/16/2006 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Ferdose al-Taie by NORTHWEST AUSTIN MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NUMBER ONE. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(al-Taie, Ferdose)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 72 Filed: 11/9/2006, Entered: 2/16/2007 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint by NICOLE LOUIS, RODNEY LOUIS. Related document: [1] Complaint filed by NORTHWEST AUSTIN MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NUMBER ONE,.(td, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 71 Filed: 11/9/2006, Entered: 2/16/2007 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint by AUSTIN BRANCH OF THE NAACP, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES. Related document: [1] Complaint filed by NORTHWEST AUSTIN MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NUMBER ONE,.(td, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 33 Filed: 11/9/2006, Entered: 11/9/2006 Order on Motion to InterveneCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [9] Motion to Intervene, granting [10] Motion to Intervene, granting [13] Motion to Intervene, granting [22] Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Three Judge Panel (Judge David S. Tatel, Judge Paul L. Friedman and Judge Emmet G. Sullivan) on November 9, 2006. (MA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 11/9/2006, Entered: 11/9/2006 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER granting [29] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, granting [11] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, granting [12] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, granting [24] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Three Judge Panel (Judge David S. Tatel, Judge Paul L. Friedman, and Judge Emmet G. Sullivan) on November 9, 2006. (MA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 32 Filed: 11/8/2006, Entered: 11/9/2006, Terminated: 11/17/2006 Motion to Intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Intervene as Defendants by JOVITA CASARES, ANGIE GARCIA, OFELIA ZAPATA. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support# (2) Text of Proposed Order # (3) Exhibit Proposed Answer# (4) Certificate of Service)(nmw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 30 Filed: 11/8/2006, Entered: 11/8/2006 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            corrected ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of Diaz Internvenors by DAVID DIAZ, LISA DIAZ, GABRIEL DIAZ. Related document: [1] Complaint filed by NORTHWEST AUSTIN MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NUMBER ONE,.(Sandler, Joseph) Modified on 2/16/2007 (td, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 27 Filed: 11/7/2006, Entered: 11/7/2006 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ENTERED IN ERROR. . . .REPLY to opposition to motion re [10] MOTION to Intervene filed by NICOLE LOUIS, RODNEY LOUIS. (nmw, ) Modified on 11/7/2006 (td, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 26 Filed: 11/7/2006, Entered: 11/7/2006 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to opposition to motion re [10] MOTION to Intervene as Defendants filed by NICOLE LOUIS, RODNEY LOUIS. (Chachkin, Norman)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 31 Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: 11/9/2006 Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Attorney Fees by GABRIEL DIAZ, DAVID DIAZ, LISA DIAZ. (SEE DOCUMENT NO. [30] FOR IMAGE) (td, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 25 Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: 11/6/2006 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to opposition to motion re [9] MOTION to Intervene filed by AUSTIN BRANCH OF THE NAACP, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES. (znmw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 24 Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: 11/6/2006, Terminated: 11/9/2006 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Max Renae Hicks. :Address- 1250 Norwood Tower, 114 West 7th Street, Austun TX 78801. Phone No. - (512) 480-8231. Fax No. - (512) 480-9105 by TRAVIS COUNTY, TEXAS. (Attachments: # (1) Hicks Declaration# (2) Text of Proposed Order)(znmw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 23 Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: 11/6/2006, Terminated: 11/15/2006 Motion to Intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Intervene as Defendant by TRAVIS COUNTY, TEXAS. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Proposed Answer# (2) Text of Proposed Order)(znmw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 22 Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: 11/6/2006, Terminated: 11/9/2006 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Amend/Correct Application to Intervene by DAVID DIAZ. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Sandler, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 21 Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: 11/6/2006 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to opposition to motion re [13] MOTION to Intervene as Defendants by David & Lisa Diaz filed by DAVID DIAZ. (Sandler, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 20 Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: 11/6/2006 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ENTERED IN ERROR. . . .ANSWER to Complaint by Diaz Internvenors by LISA DIAZ. Related document: [1] Complaint filed by NORTHWEST AUSTIN MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NUMBER ONE,.(Sandler, Joseph) Modified on 11/7/2006 (td, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: 11/7/2006 Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re [20] Answer to Complaint was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading. (td, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 29 Filed: 11/3/2006, Entered: 11/7/2006 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Laughlin McDonald. :Address- American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, Inc., 2600 Marquis One Tower, 245 Peachtree Center Avenue, Atlanta, GA 30303-1227. Phone No. - (404) 523-2721. by NATHANIEL LESANE. (td, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 28 Filed: 11/3/2006, Entered: 11/7/2006, Terminated: 11/15/2006 Motion to Intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Intervene as a defendant by NATHANIEL LESANE. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order # (2) Brief In Support of Motion# (3) Exhibit Answer# (4) Certificate of Service)(td, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 19 Filed: 11/2/2006, Entered: 11/3/2006 Motion to Intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Intervene as a Defendant by PEOPLE FOR THE AMERICAN WAY. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order # (2) Exhibit Answer)(nmw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 18 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: 10/30/2006 Response to any document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motions to Intervene [9], [10] , [13] ) filed by ALBERTO GONZALES. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order # (2) Appendix Unpublished Orders)(Herren, Thomas).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 17 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: 10/30/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in opposition to re [10] MOTION to Intervene by Rodney and Nicole Louis filed by NORTHWEST AUSTIN MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NUMBER ONE. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Denying Louis Motion to Intervene)(Jaffe, Erik)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 16 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: 10/30/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in opposition to re [13] MOTION to Intervene of David and Lisa Diaz filed by NORTHWEST AUSTIN MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NUMBER ONE. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Denying Diaz Motion to Intervene)(Jaffe, Erik)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 15 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: 10/30/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in opposition to re [9] MOTION to Intervene of the NAACP filed by NORTHWEST AUSTIN MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NUMBER ONE. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Denying NAACP Motion to Intervene)(Jaffe, Erik)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 14 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: 10/30/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Erik Scott Jaffe on behalf of NORTHWEST AUSTIN MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NUMBER ONE (Jaffe, Erik)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 13 Filed: 10/18/2006, Entered: 10/23/2006 Motion to Intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Intervene as defendants by DAVID DIAZ, LISA DIAZ. (td, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 12 Filed: 10/18/2006, Entered: 10/23/2006 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kirsten M. Clarke. :Address- 1444 Eye Street NW, Washington DC 20005. Phone No. - (202) 216-5569. Fax No. - (202) 682-1312 by NICOLE LOUIS, RODNEY LOUIS. (td, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 11 Filed: 10/18/2006, Entered: 10/23/2006 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Debo P. Adegbile. :Address- 99 Hudson Street, Suite 1600, New York, NY 10013. Phone No. - (212) 965-2200. Fax No. - (212) 226-7592 by NICOLE LOUIS, RODNEY LOUIS. (td, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 10 Filed: 10/18/2006, Entered: 10/23/2006, Terminated: 11/9/2006 Motion to Intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Intervene as defendants by NICOLE LOUIS, RODNEY LOUIS. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Answer)(td, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/23/2006 (td, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 9 Filed: 10/18/2006, Entered: 10/23/2006, Terminated: 11/9/2006 Motion to Intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Intervene as defendants by AUSTIN BRANCH OF THE NAACP, TEXAS STATE CONFERENCE OF NAACP BRANCHES. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Text of Proposed Order # (6) Exhibit Local Rule 7.1)(td, ) Modified on 10/23/2006 (td, ). Modified on 10/24/2006 (td, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 10/18/2006, Entered: 10/24/2006 Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re [9] MOTION to Intervene. Filed date has been corrected to read 10/18/06 instead of 10/16/06 per counsel.(td, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 8 Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: 10/16/2006 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint by ALBERTO GONZALES. Related document: [1] Complaint filed by NORTHWEST AUSTIN MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NUMBER ONE,.(Herren, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 7 Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: 9/11/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order filed in USCA dated September 6, 2006, designating Circuit Judge David S. Tatel and District Judge Emmet G. Sullivan to serve with District Judge Paul L. Friedman to hear and determine this case; directing that Judge Tatel will preside. (Signed by Chief Judge Douglas H. Ginsburg, U.S. Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit on 9/6/06) (jeb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/30/2006, Entered: 8/30/2006 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER granting [6] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Christian J. Ward. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 8/30/06. (lcplf2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/30/2006, Entered: 8/30/2006 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER granting [5] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Gregory S. Coleman. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 8/30/06. (lcplf2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 6 Filed: 8/29/2006, Entered: 8/29/2006, Terminated: 8/30/2006 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Christian J. Ward. :Address- 8911 Capital of Texas Highway, Suite 1350, Austin, Texas 78759. Phone No. - 512-349-1930. by NORTHWEST AUSTIN MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NUMBER ONE. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Christian J. Ward# (2) Text of Proposed Order)(al-Taie, Ferdose)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 5 Filed: 8/29/2006, Entered: 8/29/2006, Terminated: 8/30/2006 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Gregory S. Coleman. :Address- 8911 Capital of Texas Highway, Suite 1350, Austin, Texas 78759. Phone No. - 512-349-1930. by NORTHWEST AUSTIN MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NUMBER ONE. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Gregory S. Coleman# (2) Text of Proposed Order)(al-Taie, Ferdose)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/29/2006, Entered: 8/29/2006 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney. NORTHWEST AUSTIN MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NUMBER ONE served on 8/15/2006, answer due 10/16/2006 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(al-Taie, Ferdose)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 3 Filed: 8/29/2006, Entered: 8/29/2006 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 8/9/06. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(al-Taie, Ferdose)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: 8/7/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for a three judge panel by NORTHWEST AUSTIN MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NUMBER ONE. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum# (2) Text of Proposed Order)(td, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: 8/7/2006 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against ALBERTO GONZALES (Filing fee $ 350) filed by NORTHWEST AUSTIN MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NUMBER ONE.(td, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/4/2006, Entered: 8/7/2006 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS (2) Issued as to ALBERTO GONZALES, U.S. Attorney (td, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 292 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?