UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $19,873.94 IN FUNDS SEIZED FROM WACHOVIA BANK ACCOUNT #XXXXXXXXX7137
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-01449-TFH
District Judge Thomas F. Hogan, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Rakestraw Cowden +1 202 514 7700 +1 202 514 8780 william.cowden@usdoj.gov
Space Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo $19,873.94 IN FUNDS SEIZED FROM WACHOVIA BANK ACCOUNT #XXXXXXXXX7137, Defendant
Office Washington, DC
Filed 8/17/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 690 - Forfeiture/Penalty: Other
Cause Section 18 U.S.C. § 1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Plaintiff
Disposition Judgment - Judgment on Consent
County 11001
Terminated 9/4/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, TYPE-E
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 9 Filed: 3/7/2007, Entered: 3/7/2007 Order on Motion for Judgment of ForfeitureCourt Filing
ORDER; granting [#8] Motion for Judgment of Forfeiture, Signed by Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 3/6/07. (hs,)
    LREF
    Legal Document 8 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: 2/16/2007, Terminated: 3/7/2007 Motion for Judgment of Forfeiture
    MOTION for Judgment of Forfeiture by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order # (2) Exhibit 1# (3) Exhibit 2a# (4) Exhibit 2b# (5) Exhibit 2c# (6) Exhibit 2d# (7) Exhibit 2e# (8) Exhibit 2f# (9) Exhibit 3# (10) Exhibit 4)(Cowden, William)
    LREF
    Legal Document 7 Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: 2/6/2007 Set DeadlinesCourt Filing
    ORDER Show Cause why Court should not enter default judgment due by 3/5/2007. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 2/5/07. (lctfh1)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 12/29/2006, Entered: 1/3/2007 Case Assigned/Reassigned
      Case Reassigned to Judge Thomas F. Hogan. Judge Richard W. Roberts no longer assigned to the case. (lc, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 6 Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: 12/11/2006 Clerks Entry of Default*
        Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to $19,873.94 IN FUNDS SEIZED FROM WACHOVIA BANK ACCOUNT #XXXXXXXXX7137 (nmw, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 5 Filed: 12/7/2006, Entered: 12/11/2006 Affidavit for Default
          AFFIDAVIT FOR DEFAULT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (nmw, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 4 Filed: 12/7/2006, Entered: 12/7/2006 Notice of Appearance/
            NOTICE of Appearance by William Rakestraw Cowden on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Cowden, William)
              LREF
              Legal Document 3 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: 9/1/2006 Summons Returned Executed
              Warrant Executed. $19,873.94 IN FUNDS SEIZED FROM WACHOVIA BANK ACCOUNT #XXXXXXXXX7137 served on 8/29/2006, response due 9/18/2006 (jf, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: 8/21/2006 Notice of Related Case
                NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Case related to Case No. 05cr0205. (jf, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: 8/21/2006 Complaint
                  COMPLAINT against $19,873.94 IN FUNDS SEIZED FROM WACHOVIA BANK ACCOUNT #XXXXXXXXX7137 (Filing fee $ 0.00) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(jf, )
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: 8/21/2006 Summons Issued
                    Summons (1) Issued as to $19,873.94 IN FUNDS SEIZED FROM WACHOVIA BANK ACCOUNT #XXXXXXXXX7137. (jf, )
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: 8/21/2006 Warrant Issued
                      WARRANT (1) for arrest in rem issued (jf, )
                        LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 47 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?