BROTHERHOOD OF MAINTENANCE OF WAY EMPLOYES DIVISION, IBT v. NATIONAL MEDIATION BOARD et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-01532-CKK
District Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo BROTHERHOOD OF MAINTENANCE OF WAY EMPLOYES DIVISION, IBT, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by O'DONNELL, SCHWARTZ & ANDERSON, P.C

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard S. Edelman +1 202 898 1707 +1 202 682 9276 REdelman@odsalaw.com
v.
No Logo Csx Transportation, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ronald Maurice Johnson, I +1 202 887 4114 +1 202 887 4288 rmjohnson@akingump.com
No Logo National Mediation Board, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter Bryce +1 202 616 8335 +1 202 616 8470 peter.bryce@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 8/30/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 740 - Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause Section 45 U.S.C. § 151 Railway Labor Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County 88888
Terminated 8/31/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, TYPE-K
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 14 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: 8/31/2007 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by BROTHERHOOD OF MAINTENANCE OF WAY EMPLOYES DIVISION, IBT (Edelman, Richard)
    LREF
    Legal Document 13 Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: 1/19/2007 ERRATA
    ERRATA Corrected Powers Declaration by BROTHERHOOD OF MAINTENANCE OF WAY EMPLOYES DIVISION, IBT [9] Memorandum in Opposition filed by BROTHERHOOD OF MAINTENANCE OF WAY EMPLOYES DIVISION, IBT,, [10] Memorandum in Opposition filed by BROTHERHOOD OF MAINTENANCE OF WAY EMPLOYES DIVISION, IBT,. (Attachments: # (1))(Edelman, Richard)
      LREF
      Legal Document 12 Filed: 1/5/2007, Entered: 1/5/2007 Reply to opposition to Motion
      REPLY to opposition to motion re [5] MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by CSX TRANSPORTATION INC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C)(Johnson, Ronald) Modified on 1/8/2007 (lc, ).
      LREF
      Legal Document 11 Filed: 1/5/2007, Entered: 1/5/2007 Reply to opposition to Motion
      REPLY to opposition to motion re [4] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by NATIONAL MEDIATION BOARD. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Second Declaration of Roland Watkins & Attachments)(Bryce, Peter)
        LREF
        Legal Document 10 Filed: 12/8/2006, Entered: 12/8/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
        Memorandum in opposition to re [5] MOTION to Dismiss of CSXT filed by BROTHERHOOD OF MAINTENANCE OF WAY EMPLOYES DIVISION, IBT. (Attachments: # (1))(Edelman, Richard)
        LREF
        Legal Document 9 Filed: 12/8/2006, Entered: 12/8/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
        Memorandum in opposition to re [4] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction of NMB filed by BROTHERHOOD OF MAINTENANCE OF WAY EMPLOYES DIVISION, IBT. (Attachments: # (1))(Edelman, Richard)
          LREF
          Legal Document 8 Filed: 12/8/2006, Entered: 12/8/2006 Response to any document
          RESPONSE to [4] National Mediation Board's Motion to Dismiss filed by CSX TRANSPORTATION INC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A to CSXT's Response to NMB's Motion to Dismiss# (2) Exhibit Exhibit B to CSXT's Response to NMB's Motion to Dismiss)(Johnson, Ronald) Modified on 12/11/2006 (nmw, ).
            LREF
            Legal Document 7 Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: 11/15/2006, Terminated: 11/15/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [4] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, [5] MOTION to Dismiss by BROTHERHOOD OF MAINTENANCE OF WAY EMPLOYES DIVISION, IBT. (Edelman, Richard)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: 11/16/2006 Set/Reset Deadlines:
              Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Motions to dismiss due by 12/8/2006. Reply to Motions to dismiss due by 1/5/2007. (dot, )
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: 11/15/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                MINUTE ENTRY ORDER (paperless) granting [7] Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Briefing Schedule on Motions for Dismissal. Plaintiff's response to Defendants' motions to dismiss shall be filed on or before December 8, 2006; Defendants' replies in support of their motions to dismiss shall be filed on or before January 5, 2007. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on November 15, 2006. (lcckk2)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 11/9/2006, Entered: 11/9/2006 LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Aff
                  LCvR 7.1 - CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CSX TRANSPORTATION INC (Johnson, Ronald)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 11/9/2006, Entered: 11/9/2006, Terminated: 8/31/2007 Motion to Dismiss
                    MOTION to Dismiss by CSX TRANSPORTATION INC. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order # (2) Exhibit A to CSXT's Motion to Dismiss# (3) Exhibit B to CSXT's Motion to Dismiss)(Johnson, Ronald)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 11/9/2006, Entered: 11/9/2006, Terminated: 8/31/2007 Motion to Dismiss
                      MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by NATIONAL MEDIATION BOARD. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, Declaration of Roland Watkins# (2) Attachment 1# (3) Attachment 2# (4) Attachment 3# (5) Attachment 4# (6) Attachment 5# (7) Attachment 6# (8) Attachment 7# (9) Attachment 8# (10) Attachment 9# (11) Attachment 10# (12) Attachment 11# (13) Attachment 12# (14) Attachment 13)(Bryce, Peter)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 3 Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: 11/6/2006, Terminated: 11/6/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [1] Complaint by CSX TRANSPORTATION INC. (Johnson, Ronald)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: 11/6/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                        MINUTE ENTRY ORDER (paperless) granting [3] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time. Defendants shall have until Thursday, November 9, 2006 to file their answers or responsive pleadings. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on November 6, 2006. (lcckk2)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: 10/30/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                          MINUTE ENTRY ORDER (paperless) granting [2] Defendant CSX Transportation, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant CSX Transportation, Inc.'s answer or other responsive pleading shall be filed on or before November 6, 2006. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on October 30, 2006. (lcckk2)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 2 Filed: 10/27/2006, Entered: 10/27/2006, Terminated: 10/30/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by CSX TRANSPORTATION INC. (Johnson, Ronald)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/30/2006, Entered: 8/31/2006 Complaint
                              COMPLAINT against NATIONAL MEDIATION BOARD, CSX TRANSPORTATION INC (Filing fee $ 350) filed by BROTHERHOOD OF MAINTENANCE OF WAY EMPLOYES DIVISION, IBT.(td, )
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 8/30/2006, Entered: 8/31/2006 Summons Issued
                                Summons (4) Issued as to NATIONAL MEDIATION BOARD, CSX TRANSPORTATION INC. (td, )
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 189 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?