BUESGENS v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-01558-RCL
District Judge Royce C. Lamberth, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Michael L. Buesgens, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo All Defendants, Defendant
No Logo ALPHONSO JACKSON, Defendant
No Logo AMANDA WILSON-TORRES, Defendant
No Logo ANGELIA GOODEY-DOYLE, Defendant
No Logo ANNA MEDLOCK, Defendant
No Logo ARMBRUST R. BROWN, LLP, Defendant
No Logo BEN FLOREY, JR., Defendant
No Logo CARI M. DOMINGUEZ, Defendant
No Logo CHARLES E. BROWN, P.C., Defendant
No Logo CHARLES G. HERNDON, Defendant
No Logo CHARLES WASHINGTON, JR., Defendant
No Logo CHERYL VUILLERMIER, Defendant
No Logo COLLEEN M. KELLEY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by National Treasury Employees Union

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory O'Duden +1 202 572 5500 +1 202 572 5645 greg.oduden@nteu.org
No Logo COMMISSIONER OF INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen L. Melnik +1 202 307 0338 karen.melnik@usdoj.gov
No Logo Crady, Jewett & McCulley, LLP, Defendant
No Logo DANIEL PALACIOS, Defendant
No Logo DEBI WEHMEIER, Defendant
No Logo DENNIS COLLINS, Defendant
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Defendant
Officially listed as "DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen L. Melnik +1 202 307 0338 karen.melnik@usdoj.gov
No Logo DEREK HOWARD, Defendant
No Logo DONALD R. TAWNEY, Defendant
No Logo DORIENNE BONILLA, Defendant
No Logo F. RUSSELL GEORGE, Defendant
No Logo FALCON APARTMENTS OF AUSTIN I, INC., Defendant
No Logo Federal Labor Relations Authority, Defendant
No Logo Greg Abbott, Defendant
No Logo GREP GENERAL PARTNER LLC, Defendant
No Logo GREYSTAR MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LP, Defendant
No Logo EVALUESERVE, Defendant
Officially listed as "JAMES PARKER"
No Logo JOHN W. SNOW, Defendant
No Logo KATYE DUDERSTADT, Defendant
No Logo KAY COLES JAMES, Defendant
No Logo MANDY ROGERS, Defendant
No Logo MARCIA H. COATES, Defendant
No Logo MARGERET WAITES, Defendant
No Logo MARTHA SCHANHALS, Defendant
No Logo MARY E. CARROLL, Defendant
No Logo MARY-ELLAN KRCHA, Defendant
No Logo MEGAN GOERES, Defendant
No Logo MELINDA ESTRADA, Defendant
No Logo MICHAEL SALYARDS, Defendant
No Logo NANCY SESSION, Defendant
No Logo OSCAR LEAL, Defendant
No Logo RICHARD R. AUBY, Defendant
No Logo ROBERT E. POWELL, Defendant
No Logo THOMAS LEGER, Defendant
No Logo THOMAS THEIS, Defendant
United States of America United States of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen L. Melnik +1 202 307 0338 karen.melnik@usdoj.gov
No Logo United States Office Of Special Counsel, Defendant
United States Postal Service United States Postal Service, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen L. Melnik +1 202 307 0338 karen.melnik@usdoj.gov
No Logo VICTOR REYES, Defendant
Office Washington, DC
Filed 9/1/2006
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County 88888
Terminated 11/14/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, JURY, PROSE-NP, TRANSFERRED, TYPE-F
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 18 Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: 7/18/2007 Appeal Remark
USCA MANDATE (certified copy) dismissing appeal for lack of prosecution as to USCA #07-5011. (cp, )
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 12/28/2006, Entered: 12/28/2006 Receipt for Transfer Papers
    Receipt on 12/19/06 of Acknowledgment of Receipt of Transfer Papers. Other Court Number A06CA967 LY sent by U.S. District Court for the Westerd District of Texas. (tg, )
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 12/5/2006, Entered: 12/5/2006 Case Transferred Out
      Case transferred out to the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas, pursuant to Order filed 11/13/2006; sent by certified mail. (tg, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 17 Filed: 11/27/2006, Entered: 11/27/2006 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
        ORDER denying [16] Motion to Stay Order transferring case to Western District of Texas, denying [16] Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 11/27/2006. (lcrcl1, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 16 Filed: 11/22/2006, Entered: 11/27/2006, Terminated: 11/27/2006 Motion to Stay
          MOTION to Stay re [15] Order on Motion to Transfer Case; MOTION for Reconsideration re [15] Order on Motion to Transfer Case by MICHAEL L. BUESGENS. (Attachments: # (1) Continuation of Motion# (2) Attachment (part 1)# (3) Attachment (part 2)# (4) Attachment (part 3)# (5) Attachment (part 4))(tg, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 15 Filed: 11/13/2006, Entered: 11/13/2006 Order on Motion to Reassign CaseCourt Filing
            ORDER DENYING [4] plaintiff's Motion to Reassign Case; GRANTING [5] defendant Kelley's Motion to Dismiss on Collateral Estoppel grounds; GRANTING the Federal defendants' Motion to Transfer Case [9], ORDERING that this case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas, and noting that the Federal defendants' Motion to Dismiss on other grounds remains pending before the transferee Court; DENYING [11] plaintiff's Motion for admission of discovery exhibits to be included in the record; DENYING [12] plaintiff's Motion to Add Parties; DISMISSING any Action purporting to be brought by Rudolfo Lizcano on the grounds that plaintiff Buesgens has no authority to appear as counsel for Mr. Lizcano, and accordingly FINDING that the Clerk properly processed and docketed the Complaint only as to plaintiff Buesgens. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 11/13/06. (lcrcl2, )
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 11/13/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006 Leave to File Denied
              "Leave to File Denied" by Judge Royce C. Lamberth. Initial Disclosures to National Treasury Employees Union. "See Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). Initial Discovery Disclosures Are Not Filed." (Document returned to filer). (tg, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 14 Filed: 11/9/2006, Entered: 11/9/2006 Reply to opposition to Motion
                REPLY to opposition to motion re [9] MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative MOTION to Transfer Case MOTION to Transfer Case MOTION to Transfer Case filed by UNITED STATES OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL, COMMISSIONER OF INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Melnik, Karen)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 13 Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: 11/8/2006 Memorandum in Opposition
                  Memorandum in opposition to re [9] MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative MOTION to Transfer Case MOTION to Transfer Case MOTION to Transfer Case filed by MICHAEL L. BUESGENS. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment (part 1)# (2) Attachment (part 2)# (3) Attachment (part 3)# (4) Attachment (part 4)# (5) Attachment (part 5)# (6) Attachment (part 6))(tg, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 12 Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: 11/8/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                    MOTION to Add Parties for Just Adjudication of Complaint by MICHAEL L. BUESGENS.# (1) Attachment (tg, )
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 11/3/2006, Entered: 11/3/2006 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                      Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff Responses due by 11/16/2006. (rje)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 10 Filed: 11/2/2006, Entered: 11/2/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER informing pro se plaintiffs that defendants have filed a motion to dismiss, and informing them of the consequences of a failure to respond within 14 days. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 11/2/2006. (lcrcl1, )
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 11 Filed: 11/1/2006, Entered: 11/7/2006, Terminated: 11/13/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                          MOTION for Admission of Discovery Exhibits to be Included in the Record by MICHAEL L. BUESGENS. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibits)(tg, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 9 Filed: 11/1/2006, Entered: 11/1/2006, Terminated: 11/14/2006 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                            MOTION to Dismiss or, in the alternative, MOTION to Transfer Case by COMMISSIONER OF INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 (Notice of Hearing Session)# (2) Exhibit 2 (Order Deeming Motion Moot)# (3) Exhibit 3 (Salyards Declaration)# (4) Exhibit 4 (Texas Complaint)# (5) Exhibit 5 (Motion to Dismiss)# (6) Exhibit 6 (Order of Judge Sparks)# (7) Exhibit 7 (Judgment))(Melnik, Karen)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 8 Filed: 11/1/2006, Entered: 11/1/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                              NOTICE of Appearance by Karen L. Melnik on behalf of COMMISSIONER OF INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Melnik, Karen)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 10/19/2006, Entered: 10/19/2006 Summons Issued
                                Summons (1) Issued as to MEGAN GOERES. (tg, )
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 7 Filed: 10/18/2006, Entered: 10/18/2006 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                  REPLY to opposition to motion re [5] MOTION to Dismiss on the basis of collateral estoppel filed by COLLEEN M. KELLEY. (Wilson, Julie)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 6 Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: 10/18/2006 Response to Document
                                    RESPONSE re [5] MOTION to Dismiss on the basis of collateral estoppel filed by MICHAEL L. BUESGENS. (Attachments: # (1) Attachments (part 1)# (2) Attachments (part 2))(tg, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 10/6/2006, Entered: 10/6/2006 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                      SUMMONS (1) Issued as to U.S. Attorney. (tg, )
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 10/4/2006, Entered: 10/4/2006, Terminated: 11/13/2006 Motion to Dismiss
                                        MOTION to Dismiss on the basis of collateral estoppel by COLLEEN M. KELLEY. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order for Mtn to Dismiss)(O'Duden, Gregory)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: 9/25/2006, Terminated: 11/13/2006 Motion to Reassign CaseCourt Filing
                                          MOTION to Reassign Case to Another Judge at the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia by MICHAEL L. BUESGENS. (tg, )
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: 9/25/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                            NOTICE of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service for Summons by MICHAEL L. BUESGENS (ztg, )
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 9/1/2006, Entered: 9/7/2006 Notice of Related Case
                                              NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by MICHAEL L. BUESGENS. Case related to Case No. 05-2334. (tg, )
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/1/2006, Entered: 9/7/2006 Complaint
                                                COMPLAINT against COLLEEN M. KELLEY, FEDERAL LABOR RELATIONS AUTHORITY, CARI M. DOMINGUEZ, KAY COLES JAMES, DONALD R. TAWNEY, MARGERET WAITES, JOHN W. SNOW, THOMAS THEIS, OSCAR LEAL, UNITED STATES OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL, ANNA MEDLOCK, F. RUSSELL GEORGE, NANCY SESSION, CHARLES WASHINGTON, JR, ANGELIA GOODEY-DOYLE, COMMISSIONER OF INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, MARY E. CARROLL, MARTHA SCHANHALS, JAMES PARKER, VICTOR REYES, CHERYL VUILLERMIER, DENNIS COLLINS, ROBERT E. POWELL, KATYE DUDERSTADT, MARY-ELLAN KRCHA, FALCON APARTMENTS OF AUSTIN I, INC., AMANDA WILSON-TORRES, DORIENNE BONILLA, MEGAN GOERES, MANDY ROGERS, DEBI WEHMEIER, CHARLES E. BROWN, P.C., GREP GENERAL PARTNER LLC, GREYSTAR MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LP, RICHARD R. AUBY, THOMAS LEGER, DANIEL PALACIOS, ARMBRUST R. BROWN, LLP, BEN FLOREY, JR, DEREK HOWARD, CRADY, JEWETT & MCCULLEY, LLP, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, ALPHONSO JACKSON, GREG ABBOTT, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE, ALL DEFENDANTS, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, MICHAEL SALYARDS, MARCIA H. COATES, CHARLES G. HERNDON, MELINDA ESTRADA (Filing fee $ 350) filed by MICHAEL L. BUESGENS. (Attachments: # (1) Table of contents# (2) Attachment 3# (3) Attachment 4# (4) Attachment 5, 6, and 7# (5) Attachment 8# (6) Attachment 9# (7) Attachment 10)(tg, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 9/1/2006, Entered: 9/7/2006 Summons Not Issued
                                                SUMMONS Not Issued as to COLLEEN M. KELLEY, FEDERAL LABOR RELATIONS AUTHORITY, CARI M. DOMINGUEZ, KAY COLES JAMES, DONALD R. TAWNEY, MARGERET WAITES, JOHN W. SNOW, THOMAS THEIS, OSCAR LEAL, UNITED STATES OFFICE OF SPECIAL COUNSEL, ANNA MEDLOCK, F. RUSSELL GEORGE, NANCY SESSION, CHARLES WASHINGTON, JR, ANGELIA GOODEY-DOYLE, COMMISSIONER OF INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, MARY E. CARROLL, MARTHA SCHANHALS, JAMES PARKER, VICTOR REYES, CHERYL VUILLERMIER, DENNIS COLLINS, ROBERT E. POWELL, KATYE DUDERSTADT, MARY-ELLAN KRCHA, FALCON APARTMENTS OF AUSTIN I, INC., AMANDA WILSON-TORRES, DORIENNE BONILLA, MEGAN GOERES, MANDY ROGERS, DEBI WEHMEIER, CHARLES E. BROWN, P.C., GREP GENERAL PARTNER LLC, GREYSTAR MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LP, RICHARD R. AUBY, THOMAS LEGER, DANIEL PALACIOS, ARMBRUST R. BROWN, LLP, BEN FLOREY, JR, DEREK HOWARD, CRADY, JEWETT & MCCULLEY, LLP, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, ALPHONSO JACKSON, GREG ABBOTT, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE, ALL DEFENDANTS, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, MICHAEL SALYARDS, MARCIA H. COATES, CHARLES G. HERNDON, MELINDA ESTRADA (tg, )
                                                  LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 146 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?