ANDERSON et al v. SPELLINGS
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-01565-RMC
District Judge Rosemary M. Collyer, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 26, 2016 at 3:42 PM DT (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ALL PLAINTIFFS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by KALIJARVI, CHUZI & NEWMAN & FITCH, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George Michael Chuzi +1 202 331 9260 +1 866 455 1504 gchuzi@kcnlaw.com
Space Heather G. White +1 202 331 9260 +1 202 331 9261 hwhite@kcnlaw.com
No Logo BRUCE J. ROSE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by KALIJARVI, CHUZI & NEWMAN & FITCH, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George Michael Chuzi +1 202 331 9260 +1 866 455 1504 gchuzi@kcnlaw.com
Space Heather G. White +1 202 331 9260 +1 202 331 9261 hwhite@kcnlaw.com
No Logo BRYAN BASHIN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by KALIJARVI, CHUZI & NEWMAN & FITCH, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George Michael Chuzi +1 202 331 9260 +1 866 455 1504 gchuzi@kcnlaw.com
Space Heather G. White +1 202 331 9260 +1 202 331 9261 hwhite@kcnlaw.com
No Logo CHARLES LINSTER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by KALIJARVI, CHUZI & NEWMAN & FITCH, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George Michael Chuzi +1 202 331 9260 +1 866 455 1504 gchuzi@kcnlaw.com
Space Heather G. White +1 202 331 9260 +1 202 331 9261 hwhite@kcnlaw.com
No Logo DIANA KORESKI, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by KALIJARVI, CHUZI & NEWMAN & FITCH, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George Michael Chuzi +1 202 331 9260 +1 866 455 1504 gchuzi@kcnlaw.com
Space Heather G. White +1 202 331 9260 +1 202 331 9261 hwhite@kcnlaw.com
No Logo JACQUELYN TELLIER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by KALIJARVI, CHUZI & NEWMAN & FITCH, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George Michael Chuzi +1 202 331 9260 +1 866 455 1504 gchuzi@kcnlaw.com
Space Heather G. White +1 202 331 9260 +1 202 331 9261 hwhite@kcnlaw.com
No Logo JANETTE SHELL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by KALIJARVI, CHUZI & NEWMAN & FITCH, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George Michael Chuzi +1 202 331 9260 +1 866 455 1504 gchuzi@kcnlaw.com
Space Heather G. White +1 202 331 9260 +1 202 331 9261 hwhite@kcnlaw.com
No Logo JEFFREY MITCHELL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by KALIJARVI, CHUZI & NEWMAN & FITCH, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George Michael Chuzi +1 202 331 9260 +1 866 455 1504 gchuzi@kcnlaw.com
Space Heather G. White +1 202 331 9260 +1 202 331 9261 hwhite@kcnlaw.com
No Logo JOHN NELSON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by KALIJARVI, CHUZI & NEWMAN & FITCH, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George Michael Chuzi +1 202 331 9260 +1 866 455 1504 gchuzi@kcnlaw.com
Space Heather G. White +1 202 331 9260 +1 202 331 9261 hwhite@kcnlaw.com
No Logo JOSEPH CORDOVA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by KALIJARVI, CHUZI & NEWMAN & FITCH, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George Michael Chuzi +1 202 331 9260 +1 866 455 1504 gchuzi@kcnlaw.com
Space Heather G. White +1 202 331 9260 +1 202 331 9261 hwhite@kcnlaw.com
No Logo JOSEPH FARRELL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by KALIJARVI, CHUZI & NEWMAN & FITCH, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George Michael Chuzi +1 202 331 9260 +1 866 455 1504 gchuzi@kcnlaw.com
Space Heather G. White +1 202 331 9260 +1 202 331 9261 hwhite@kcnlaw.com
No Logo KATHLEEN NIEMI, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by KALIJARVI, CHUZI & NEWMAN & FITCH, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George Michael Chuzi +1 202 331 9260 +1 866 455 1504 gchuzi@kcnlaw.com
Space Heather G. White +1 202 331 9260 +1 202 331 9261 hwhite@kcnlaw.com
No Logo LOERANCE DEAVER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by KALIJARVI, CHUZI & NEWMAN & FITCH, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George Michael Chuzi +1 202 331 9260 +1 866 455 1504 gchuzi@kcnlaw.com
Space Heather G. White +1 202 331 9260 +1 202 331 9261 hwhite@kcnlaw.com
No Logo MARIAN FULLER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by KALIJARVI, CHUZI & NEWMAN & FITCH, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George Michael Chuzi +1 202 331 9260 +1 866 455 1504 gchuzi@kcnlaw.com
Space Heather G. White +1 202 331 9260 +1 202 331 9261 hwhite@kcnlaw.com
No Logo MARTHA GARBER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by KALIJARVI, CHUZI & NEWMAN & FITCH, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George Michael Chuzi +1 202 331 9260 +1 866 455 1504 gchuzi@kcnlaw.com
Space Heather G. White +1 202 331 9260 +1 202 331 9261 hwhite@kcnlaw.com
No Logo MICHAEL EVANS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by KALIJARVI, CHUZI & NEWMAN & FITCH, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George Michael Chuzi +1 202 331 9260 +1 866 455 1504 gchuzi@kcnlaw.com
Space Heather G. White +1 202 331 9260 +1 202 331 9261 hwhite@kcnlaw.com
No Logo NOEL NIGHTINGALE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by KALIJARVI, CHUZI & NEWMAN & FITCH, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George Michael Chuzi +1 202 331 9260 +1 866 455 1504 gchuzi@kcnlaw.com
Space Heather G. White +1 202 331 9260 +1 202 331 9261 hwhite@kcnlaw.com
No Logo RALPH PACINELLI, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by KALIJARVI, CHUZI & NEWMAN & FITCH, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George Michael Chuzi +1 202 331 9260 +1 866 455 1504 gchuzi@kcnlaw.com
Space Heather G. White +1 202 331 9260 +1 202 331 9261 hwhite@kcnlaw.com
No Logo RICHARD ANDERSON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by KALIJARVI, CHUZI & NEWMAN & FITCH, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George Michael Chuzi +1 202 331 9260 +1 866 455 1504 gchuzi@kcnlaw.com
Space Heather G. White +1 202 331 9260 +1 202 331 9261 hwhite@kcnlaw.com
No Logo SEYMOUR LEVY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by KALIJARVI, CHUZI & NEWMAN & FITCH, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George Michael Chuzi +1 202 331 9260 +1 866 455 1504 gchuzi@kcnlaw.com
Space Heather G. White +1 202 331 9260 +1 202 331 9261 hwhite@kcnlaw.com
v.
No Logo MARGARET SPELLINGS, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Heather D. Graham-Oliver +1 202 305 1334 +1 202 514 8180 heather.graham-oliver@usdoj.gov
Space Michelle Nicole Johnson +1 202 514 7139 +1 202 514 7880 michelle.johnson@usdoj.gov
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 9/6/2006
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 29 U.S.C. § 633 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 11001
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case
Related Case
105-cv-01855-RMC
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags JURY, TYPE-H
  Entries (60) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Status Report
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: None Status Report
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None Status Report
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 9/29/2015, Entered: None Status Report
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Mediation
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None Status Report
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 12/29/2014, Entered: None Status Report
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None Status Report
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None Status Report
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 85 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                      MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 12/3/2012. (lcrmc1)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: 8/12/2008 Telephone Conference
                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer: Telephone Conference held on 8/12/2008. (Court Reporter: Crystal Pilgrim) (cdw)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: 8/12/2008 Order
                          MINUTE ENTRY ORDER. Pursuant to the telephone conferences held on August 5, 2008 and August 12, 2008 among the parties and the Court, it is hereby ORDERED that the Defendant shall respond to Plaintiffs' discovery requests no later than October 27, 2008. It is further ORDERED that the [17] Scheduling Order, filed on May 20, 2008 is amended as follows: the deposition of Dr. Joanne Wilson shall be completed no later than February 28, 2009. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 08/12/08. (lcrmc1)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: 8/6/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                            Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: A Telephone Conference is set for 8/12/2008 at 9:30 AM before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (cdw)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: 8/6/2008 Telephone Conference
                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer: Telephone Conference held on 8/5/2008. (cdw)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: 8/5/2008 Order
                                MINUTE ENTRY ORDER. Pursuant to the telephone conference held on August 5, 2008 among the parties and the Court, it is hereby ORDERED that a further telephone conference is set for August 12, 2008 at 9:30 a.m. for the purpose of discussing the format of electronic discovery. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 08/05/08. (lcrmc1)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: 6/25/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Defendant's Partial Summary Judgment motion due by 8/29/2008. Plaintiff's Response to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment due by 9/29/2008. Telephone Conference set for 7/29/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (cdw)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: 6/24/2008 Scheduling Order
                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiffs shall provide a list of the types of additional documents that they request from Defendant and the parties shall confer regarding that document request list prior to July 29, 2008; a further telephone status conference is set for July 29, 2008 at 10:00 a.m. It is further ORDERED that Defendant's motion(s) for partial summary judgment shall be filed no later than August 29, 2008; Plaintiff shall respond to such motion(s) no later than September 29, 2008; replies may be filed according to the Local Rules of this Court. It is further ORDERED that, except for those deadlines which are inconsistent with the deadlines set forth herein, the [17] Scheduling Order, dated May 20, 2008, shall remain in effect. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 06/24/08. (lcrmc1)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 Telephone Conference
                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer: Telephone Conference held on 6/20/2008. (cdw)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 18 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: 5/29/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Christian Alexander Natiello on behalf of MARGARET SPELLINGS (Natiello, Christian)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/21/2008, Entered: 5/21/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                          Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery closes 7/23/2009. Dispositive Motions due by 7/25/2008. Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(2) due by 1/15/2009. Defendant's Rule 26(a)(2) due by 3/15/2009. (cdw)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 17 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: 5/20/2008 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                            SCHEDULING ORDER. A telephone conference is set for 2:30 p.m. on June 20, 2008. See attached Order for further details. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 05/20/08. (lcrmc1)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: 5/16/2008 Scheduling Conference
                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer: Scheduling Conference held on 5/16/2008. A Scheduling Order will be issued by the Court. (Court Reporter: Crystal Pilgrim) (cdw)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 16 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/12/2008 Meet and Confer Statement
                                                MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Graham-Oliver, Heather)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/27/2008, Entered: 3/27/2008 Status Conference
                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer: Status Conference held on 3/27/2008. The parties shall submit their reports by 5/12/2008. A Scheduling Conference is set for 5/16/2008 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (Court Reporter: Pro Typists) (cdw)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/27/2008, Entered: 3/27/2008 Order
                                                    MINUTE ENTRY ORDER. Pursuant to the discussions with the parties during the status conference held in open court on March 27, 2008, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit a Joint Discovery Plan no later than May 12, 2008. A scheduling conference is set for May 16, 2008 at 10:15 AM. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 3/27/08. (lcrmc1)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/18/2008 Notice of Hearing.
                                                      NOTICE of Hearing: The Status Conference in this matter is reset for 3/27/2008 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. Please make note of the change.(cdw)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/11/2008, Entered: 1/14/2008 Status Conference
                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer: Status Conference held on 1/11/2008. A further Status Conference is set for 3/17/2008 at 4:30 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (Court Reporter: Crystal Pilgrim) (cdw)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 15 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: 11/29/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Nicole Johnson on behalf of MARGARET SPELLINGS (Johnson, Michelle)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: 12/3/2007 Status Conference
                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer: Status Conference held on 11/29/2007. A further Status Conference is set for 1/11/2008 at 2:15 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (Court Reporter: Pro Typists) (cdw)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: 10/17/2007 Status Conference
                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer: Status Conference held on 10/17/2007. A further Status Conference is set for 11/29/2007 at 4:30 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (Court Reporter: Crystal Pilgrim) (cdw)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference reset for 10/17/2007 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 2, main building, 2nd floor, before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (cdw)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 14 Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: 7/11/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  STIPULATED PRIVACY ACT AND CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on July 5, 2007. (cdw)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: 7/9/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                    Set Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery closes by 3/28/2008. Status Conference set for 10/5/2007 11:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (cdw)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: 7/6/2007 Status Conference
                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer: Status Conference held on 7/6/2007. (Court Reporter: Crystal Pilgrim) (cdw)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: 7/6/2007 Order
                                                                        MINUTE ENTRY ORDER. Pursuant to the proceedings held in open court on July 6, 2007, the [10] Scheduling Order as amended on 3/21/07 will remain in effect. All discovery shall be completed no later than March 28, 2008. A status conference is set for October 5, 2007, at 11 a.m., at which time, the parties will inform the Court as to the progress of the review of electronic documents and the indexing of the 1200 boxes from the Regional Offices. Counsel are reminded to conduct themselves in a civil, polite, and professional manner and confer in good faith in an effort to resolve any discovery dispute before bringing it to the Court's attention. In the event that counsel are unable to resolve a dispute, counsel shall contact Chambers to arrange for a telephone conference with the Court. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 07/06/07. (lcrmc1)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 13 Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: 7/5/2007 Stipulation
                                                                          STIPULATION Of Privacy Act and Confidentiality Order by MARGARET SPELLINGS. (Graham-Oliver, Heather)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: 7/3/2007 Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
                                                                            NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re [12] Joint MOTION for Protective Order was entered in error. Counsel did not upload the motion. Counsel was instructed to refile said pleading. (tg, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 12 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: 7/2/2007, Terminated: 7/3/2007 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                              ENTERED IN ERROR.....Joint MOTION for Protective Order by MARGARET SPELLINGS (Graham-Oliver, Heather) Modified on 7/3/2007 (tg, ).
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/21/2007, Entered: 3/21/2007 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                MINUTE ENTRY ORDER granting [11] Defendant's Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order. The [10] Scheduling Order is further amended to allow Defendant to propound 25 interrogatories and 25 requests for admission, including discrete subparts, to each Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 3/21/07. (ebb)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 11 Filed: 3/19/2007, Entered: 3/19/2007, Terminated: 3/21/2007 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Number of Depositions Set in March 6, 2006 Initial Scheduling Order by MARGARET SPELLINGS (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Graham-Oliver, Heather)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/19/2007, Entered: 3/19/2007 Order
                                                                                  MINUTE ENTRY ORDER. Upon the parties' joint request via telephone, the [10] Scheduling Order is amended to allow each side twenty-five depositions, as there are nineteen Plaintiffs in this case. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 3/19/07. (ebb)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 10 Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: 3/6/2007 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 3/6/07. (ebb)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: 3/19/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                      Set Deadlines/Hearings: Dispositive Motions due by 6/3/2008. Response to Dispositive Motions due by 7/3/2008. Reply to Dispositive Motions due by 7/14/2008. (cdw)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: 3/9/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                        Set Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery closes 3/28/2008. Dispositive Motions due by 6/3/2008. Response to Dispositive Motions due by 7/14/2008. Status Conference set for 7/6/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (cdw)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: 3/5/2007 Scheduling Conference
                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 3/2/2007. A scheduling order will be issued by the Court. A Status Conference is set for 7/6/2007 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (Court Reporter: Crystal Pilgrim) (cdw)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 9 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: 2/26/2007 Status Report
                                                                                            STATUS REPORT Supplemental Statement of the Case by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (White, Heather)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 8 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: 2/26/2007 ERRATA
                                                                                              ERRATA w/ Proposed Order by MARGARET SPELLINGS [7] Meet and Confer Statement. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Graham-Oliver, Heather)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 7 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: 2/23/2007 Meet and Confer Statement
                                                                                                MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Graham-Oliver, Heather)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: 2/22/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Heather G. White on behalf of all plaintiffs (White, Heather)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: 1/3/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER setting initial scheduling conference on March 2, 2007 at 10:30 a.m. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 1/3/07. (KD)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: 1/5/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                      Set Deadlines/Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/2/2007 10:30 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (cdw)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 4 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: 12/18/2006 Answer
                                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint by MARGARET SPELLINGS. Related document: [1] Complaint, filed by JOHN NELSON,, RICHARD ANDERSON,, BRYAN BASHIN,, JOSEPH CORDOVA,, LOERANCE DEAVER,, MICHAEL EVANS,, JOSEPH FARRELL,, MARIAN FULLER,, MARTHA GARBER,, DIANA KORESKI,, SEYMOUR LEVY,, CHARLES LINSTER,, JEFFREY MITCHELL,, KATHLEEN NIEMI,, NOEL NIGHTINGALE,, RALPH PACINELLI,, BRUCE J. ROSE,, JANETTE SHELL,, JACQUELYN TELLIER,.(Graham-Oliver, Heather)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: 11/21/2006 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                          Set Deadlines/Hearings: Answer to complaint due by 12/18/2006. (cdw)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: 11/20/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                                                            MINUTE ENTRY ORDER. The Government has requested a 30-day extension so that counsel can have more time to review and investigate Plaintiffs' complaint. Plaintiffs consent. Having requested 30 days, the Government is granted 30 days; its answer shall be filed no later than December 18, 2006. The Court assumes that the time requested will be fully sufficient, the answer will be timely filed, and no further extensions will be requested or needed. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 11/20/06. (ebb)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 3 Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: 11/17/2006, Terminated: 11/20/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                              Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Complaint by MARGARET SPELLINGS. (Graham-Oliver, Heather)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: 9/15/2006 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                Case Reassigned to Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. Judge John D. Bates no longer assigned to the case. (lc, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: 9/7/2006 Notice of Related Case
                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by all plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 05-1855. (lc, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: 9/7/2006 Complaint
                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against MARGARET SPELLINGS (Filing fee $ 350) filed by LOERANCE DEAVER, MICHAEL EVANS, JOSEPH FARRELL, MARIAN FULLER, MARTHA GARBER, DIANA KORESKI, SEYMOUR LEVY, CHARLES LINSTER, JEFFREY MITCHELL, JOHN NELSON, KATHLEEN NIEMI, NOEL NIGHTINGALE, RALPH PACINELLI, BRUCE J. ROSE, JANETTE SHELL, JACQUELYN TELLIER, RICHARD ANDERSON, BRYAN BASHIN, JOSEPH CORDOVA.(lc, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: 9/7/2006 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                                                                                                      SUMMONS (3) Issued as to MARGARET SPELLINGS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (lc, )
                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 179 times.

                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?