TOUKH et al v. BUSH et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-01687-ESH
District Judge Ellen Segal Huvelle, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo AMEENULLAH TOUKH, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shayana Devendra Kadidal +1 212 614 6438 +1 212 614 6499 kadidal@ccrjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Foliart Huff Ottaway & Bottom

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Larry D. Ottaway +1 405 232 4633 +1 405 232 3462 larryottaway@oklahomacounsel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The West Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Terry W. West +1 405 275 0040 +1 405 275 0052 terry@thewestlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by University of Oklahoma

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Randall T. Coyne +1 405 325 4646 +1 405 325 0389 rcoyne@ou.edu
No Logo NASIR AHMAD, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shayana Devendra Kadidal +1 212 614 6438 +1 212 614 6499 kadidal@ccrjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Foliart Huff Ottaway & Bottom

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Larry D. Ottaway +1 405 232 4633 +1 405 232 3462 larryottaway@oklahomacounsel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The West Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Terry W. West +1 405 275 0040 +1 405 275 0052 terry@thewestlawfirm.com
v.
No Logo DONALD RUMSFELD, Respondent

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Bush, George Walker Bush, George Walker, Respondent
Officially listed as "GEORGE W. BUSH"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo HARRY B. HARRIS, JR., Respondent

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo WADE F. DAVIS, Respondent

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Office Washington, DC
Filed 9/29/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County 99999
Terminated 12/26/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, GITMO, HABEAS, TYPE-G
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 21 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/14/2008 Status Report
STATUS REPORT (Supplemental) by AMEENULLAH TOUKH, NASIR AHMAD, PETITIONERS SEEKING HABEAS CORPUS RELIEF IN RELATION TO PRIOR DETENTIONS AT GUANTANAMO BAY. (Kadidal, Shayana)
    LREF
    Legal Document 20 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 Status Report
    STATUS REPORT by AMEENULLAH TOUKH. (Kebriaei, Pardiss)
      LREF
      Legal Document 19 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 Status Report
      STATUS REPORT In Response To Court's July 3, 2008 Order by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew)
        LREF
        Legal Document 18 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER transferring case to Senior Judge Thomas F. Hogan for coordination and management. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 7/7/2008. (VT)
          LREF
          Legal Document 17 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER by Judge Thomas F. Hogan IN RE: PETITIONERS SEEKING HABEAS CORPUS RELIEF IN RELATION TO PRIOR DETENTIONS AT GUANTANAMO BAY; status reports due by 5:30 p.m. on Monday, July 14, 2008. (gt )
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008 Order
            MINUTE ORDER advising the parties that the Court has been alerted to a number of cases that were identified in the July 3, 2008 order that previously were dismissed by the Judge to whom the case originally was assigned. Accordingly, if a petitioner's case previously was dismissed the parties may disregard the July 3, 2008 order and need not file the required status report. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on July 3, 2008. (lctfh2) (Entered: 07/03/2008)
              LREF
              Legal Document 16 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/13/2008 ~Notice (other)
              NOTICE Of Report Regarding Preservation Filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, et al. (jeb, )
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 12/26/2007, Entered: 12/26/2007 Order
                MINUTE ORDER: In light of [15] respondents' Notice of Transfer of Petitioner, the above-captioned case should be administratively closed and removed from the Court's docket. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 12/26/2007. (lcesh2)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 15 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007 ~Notice (other)
                  NOTICE Of Transfer Of Petitioner by HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD (Warden, Andrew)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 14 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Substitution of Counsel
                    NOTICE of Subtitution of Counsel by Shayana Devendra Kadidal on behalf of AMEENULLAH TOUKH, NASIR AHMAD Substituting for attorney William H. Goodman (Kadidal, Shayana)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: 7/5/2007 Order on Motion to Dismiss
                      MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice [10] Respondents' Motion to Dismiss pending the Supreme Court's decision in Boumediene, et al. v. Bush, et al., No. 06-1195, and Al Odah, et al. v. United States, et al., No. 06-1196. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 7/5/2007. (lcesh2)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 13 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: 5/14/2007 Reply to opposition to Motion
                        REPLY to opposition to motion re [10] MOTION to Dismiss filed by HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Luh, James)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 12 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: 5/3/2007 ERRATA
                          ERRATA to Opposition by AMEENULLAH TOUKH [10] MOTION to Dismiss filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR.. (Coyne, Randall)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 11 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: 5/3/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                            Memorandum in opposition to re [10] MOTION to Dismiss filed by AMEENULLAH TOUKH. (Coyne, Randall)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/19/2007, Entered: 4/19/2007, Terminated: 7/5/2007 Motion to Dismiss
                              MOTION to Dismiss by Respondents. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-Second Declaration of Karen L. Hecker# (2) Exhibit B-List of Released Enemy Combatant Detainees# (3) Exhibit C-List of Released-No Longer Enemy Combatant Detainees# (4) Exhibit D-USCA Judgment-Kiyemba# (5) Exhibit E-USCA Judgment re: Paracha# (6) Exhibit F-Declaration of Matthew C. Waxman# (7) Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK et al.(jeb) (jeb, ).
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 9 Filed: 1/25/2007, Entered: 1/25/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                NOTICE of Appearance by Judry Laeb Subar on behalf of respondents.
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 8 Filed: 12/19/2006, Entered: 12/19/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Terry Marcus Henry on behalf of Respondents
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: 12/18/2006 Memorandum
                                    MEMORANDUM of Understanding and Acknowledgment by AMEENULLAH TOUKH. (Attachments: # (1) Acknowledgment)(nmw, )
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: 12/11/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                      NOTICE of Appearance of Larry Ottaway by NASIR AHMAD (Coyne, Randall)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: 12/11/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                        NOTICE of Appearance of Terry West by NASIR AHMAD (Coyne, Randall)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: 12/11/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                          NOTICE of Appearance of Larry Ottaway by AMEENULLAH TOUKH (Coyne, Randall)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: 12/11/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                            NOTICE of Appearance of Terry West by AMEENULLAH TOUKH (Coyne, Randall)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 10/18/2006, Entered: 10/18/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                              NOTICE of Filing Military Commission Act by Respondents. (Attachments: # (1) Military Commision Act of 2006)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 10/2/2006 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
                                                PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5.) filed by AMEENULLAH TOUKH, NASIR AHMAD.(jf, )
                                                  LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 176 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?