RAHMATTULLAH et al v. BUSH et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-01681-JDB
District Judge John D. Bates, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo HAJI NAQIBULLAH, Petitioner

Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

No Logo SANGAR YAR MULLAH RAHMATTULLAH, Petitioner

Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

v.
No Logo DONALD RUMSFELD, Respondent

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Bush, George Walker Bush, George Walker, Respondent
Officially listed as "GEORGE W. BUSH"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo HARRY B. HARRIS, JR., Respondent

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo WADE F. DAVIS, Respondent

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Office Washington, DC
Filed 9/29/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County 99999
Terminated 7/16/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, GITMO, HABEAS, TYPE-G
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 14 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/16/2008 OrderCourt Filing
DISMISSAL ORDER. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 7/16/2008. (CK)
    LREF
    Legal Document 13 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 Status Report
    STATUS REPORT by SANGAR YAR MULLAH RAHMATTULLAH, HAJI NAQIBULLAH. (Kadidal, Shayana)
      LREF
      Legal Document 12 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 Status Report
      STATUS REPORT In Response To Court's July 3, 2008 Order by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew)
        LREF
        Legal Document 11 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER by Judge Thomas F. Hogan IN RE: PETITIONERS SEEKING HABEAS CORPUS RELIEF IN RELATION TO PRIOR DETENTIONS AT GUANTANAMO BAY; status reports due by 5:30 p.m. on Monday, July 14, 2008. (gt )
          LREF
          Legal Document 10 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER transferring case to Senior Judge Thomas F. Hogan for coordination and management as reflected in the July 1, 2008 Resolution of the Executive Session. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 7/3/2008. (lcjdb2)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008 Order
            MINUTE ORDER advising the parties that the Court has been alerted to a number of cases that were identified in the July 3, 2008 order that previously were dismissed by the Judge to whom the case originally was assigned. Accordingly, if a petitioner's case previously was dismissed the parties may disregard the July 3, 2008 order and need not file the required status report. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on July 3, 2008. (lctfh2) (Entered: 07/03/2008)
              LREF
              Legal Document 9 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: 5/5/2008 ~Notice (other)
              NOTICE Of Transfer Of Petitioner by WADE F. DAVIS, GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew)
                LREF
                Legal Document 8 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/13/2008 ~Notice (other)
                N0TICE Of Report Regarding Preservation Filed by GEORGE BUSH, et al.(jeb, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 7 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: 5/3/2007 Response to any document
                  RESPONSE to [5] Motion to Dismiss filed by SANGAR YAR MULLAH RAHMATTULLAH, HAJI NAQIBULLAH. (Kadidal, Shayana) Modified on 5/4/2007 (lc, ).
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 6 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: 5/3/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                    NOTICE of Appearance by Shayana Devendra Kadidal on behalf of SANGAR YAR MULLAH RAHMATTULLAH, HAJI NAQIBULLAH (Kadidal, Shayana)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 5 Filed: 4/19/2007, Entered: 4/19/2007, Terminated: 7/16/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                      MOTION to Dismiss by Respondents. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-Second Declaration of Karen L. Hecker# (2) Exhibit B-List of Released Enemy Combatant Detainees# (3) Exhibit C-List of Released-No Longer Enemy Combatant Detainees# (4) Exhibit D-USCA Judgment-Kiyemba# (5) Exhibit E-USCA Judgment re: Paracha# (6) Exhibit F-Declaration of Matthew C. Waxman# (7) Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK et al.(jeb) (jeb, ).
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/25/2007, Entered: 1/25/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                        NOTICE of Appearance by Judry Laeb Subar on behalf of respondents.
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 3 Filed: 12/19/2006, Entered: 12/19/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                          NOTICE of Appearance by Terry Marcus Henry on behalf of Respondents
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 2 Filed: 10/18/2006, Entered: 10/18/2006 ~Notice (other)
                            NOTICE of Filing Military Commission Act by Respondents. (Attachments: # (1) Military Commision Act of 2006)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 10/2/2006 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
                              PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5.) filed by SANGAR YAR MULLAH RAHMATTULLAH, HAJI NAQIBULLAH.(lc, )
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 84 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?