WAZIR et al v. RUMSFELD et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-01697-RBW
District Judge Reggie B. Walton, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 26, 2017 at 7:59 AM EDT (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo ABDUL HADI, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Board Of Trustees Of The Leland Stanford Junior University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathleen A. Kelly +1 650 721 5885 +1 650 723 4426 kkelly@law.stanford.edu
Space Barbara J. Olshansky +1 650 736 2312 +1 650 725 8509 bolshansky@law.stanford.edu

Toggle Switch Represented by INTERNATIONAL JUSTICE NETWORK

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tina M. Foster +1 917 442 9580 tina.foster@ijnetwork.org
No Logo Baz, Mohammad, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Board Of Trustees Of The Leland Stanford Junior University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathleen A. Kelly +1 650 721 5885 +1 650 723 4426 kkelly@law.stanford.edu
Space Barbara J. Olshansky +1 650 736 2312 +1 650 725 8509 bolshansky@law.stanford.edu

Toggle Switch Represented by INTERNATIONAL JUSTICE NETWORK

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tina M. Foster +1 917 442 9580 tina.foster@ijnetwork.org
No Logo GUL MOHAMMAD, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Board Of Trustees Of The Leland Stanford Junior University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathleen A. Kelly +1 650 721 5885 +1 650 723 4426 kkelly@law.stanford.edu
Space Barbara J. Olshansky +1 650 736 2312 +1 650 725 8509 bolshansky@law.stanford.edu

Toggle Switch Represented by INTERNATIONAL JUSTICE NETWORK

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tina M. Foster +1 917 442 9580 tina.foster@ijnetwork.org
No Logo HAJI NAQIB, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Board Of Trustees Of The Leland Stanford Junior University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathleen A. Kelly +1 650 721 5885 +1 650 723 4426 kkelly@law.stanford.edu
Space Barbara J. Olshansky +1 650 736 2312 +1 650 725 8509 bolshansky@law.stanford.edu

Toggle Switch Represented by INTERNATIONAL JUSTICE NETWORK

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tina M. Foster +1 917 442 9580 tina.foster@ijnetwork.org
No Logo HAJI WAZIR, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Board Of Trustees Of The Leland Stanford Junior University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathleen A. Kelly +1 650 721 5885 +1 650 723 4426 kkelly@law.stanford.edu
Space Barbara J. Olshansky +1 650 736 2312 +1 650 725 8509 bolshansky@law.stanford.edu

Toggle Switch Represented by INTERNATIONAL JUSTICE NETWORK

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tina M. Foster +1 917 442 9580 tina.foster@ijnetwork.org
No Logo MOHAMMAD MURAD, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Board Of Trustees Of The Leland Stanford Junior University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathleen A. Kelly +1 650 721 5885 +1 650 723 4426 kkelly@law.stanford.edu
Space Barbara J. Olshansky +1 650 736 2312 +1 650 725 8509 bolshansky@law.stanford.edu

Toggle Switch Represented by INTERNATIONAL JUSTICE NETWORK

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tina M. Foster +1 917 442 9580 tina.foster@ijnetwork.org
No Logo MOHAMMAD OMAR, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Board Of Trustees Of The Leland Stanford Junior University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathleen A. Kelly +1 650 721 5885 +1 650 723 4426 kkelly@law.stanford.edu
Space Barbara J. Olshansky +1 650 736 2312 +1 650 725 8509 bolshansky@law.stanford.edu

Toggle Switch Represented by INTERNATIONAL JUSTICE NETWORK

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tina M. Foster +1 917 442 9580 tina.foster@ijnetwork.org
No Logo MOHAMMAD SHARIF, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Board Of Trustees Of The Leland Stanford Junior University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathleen A. Kelly +1 650 721 5885 +1 650 723 4426 kkelly@law.stanford.edu
Space Barbara J. Olshansky +1 650 736 2312 +1 650 725 8509 bolshansky@law.stanford.edu

Toggle Switch Represented by INTERNATIONAL JUSTICE NETWORK

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tina M. Foster +1 917 442 9580 tina.foster@ijnetwork.org
v.
No Logo DONALD RUMSFELD, Respondent

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo John Doe, Respondent

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo John Doe #2, Respondent

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Office Washington, DC
Filed 9/29/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Statistical Closing
County 99999
Terminated 1/31/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags GITMO, HABEAS, TYPE-G
  Entries (54) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 47 Filed: 5/21/2010, Entered: 5/24/2010 USCA Order
ORDER of USCA as to 41 Notice of Appeal filed by MOHAMMAD SHARIF, HAJI WAZIR ; ORDERED that the motion to dismiss be granted and the appeal be dismissed as moot; FURTHER ORDERED that the motion for vacatur be granted. USCA Case Number 09-5303. (mmh, ) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: 3/24/2010 Stipulation
    STIPULATION Regarding Bagram Theater Internment Facility by MIKE BUMGARNER, GEORGE W. BUSH, JAY HOOD, DONALD RUMSFELD, MICHAEL I. BUMGARNER. (Lin, Jean) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: 12/30/2009 ~Notice (other)
      NOTICE to the Court by BARACK OBAMA, ROBERT GATES (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Major General Curtis M. Scaparrotti)(Lin, Jean) (Entered: 12/30/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/24/2009, Entered: 11/24/2009 USCA Order
        ORDER of USCA as to 41 Notice of Appeal filed by MOHAMMAD SHARIF, HAJI WAZIR ; USCA Case Number 09-5303. It is ORDERED, on the courts own motion, that this case be held in abeyance pending further order of the court. (kb) (Entered: 11/24/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/16/2009, Entered: 9/16/2009 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
          MEMORANDUM OPINION (unclassified). This is the unclassified version of 31 the April 2, 2009 memorandum opinion issued in this case. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 4/2/09. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 09/16/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/28/2009, Entered: 8/28/2009 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
            Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by HAJI WAZIR (Foster, Tina) (Entered: 08/28/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/26/2009, Entered: 8/26/2009 Notice of Appeal
              NOTICE OF APPEAL by HAJI WAZIR, MOHAMMAD SHARIF. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Foster, Tina) (Entered: 08/26/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 40 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: 6/29/2009 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 6/29/09. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 06/29/2009)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: 6/29/2009 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of JurisdictionCourt Filing
                  ORDER granting 12 respondents' motion to dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 6/29/09. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 06/29/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/15/2009, Entered: 6/15/2009 Reply to opposition to Motion
                    REPLY to opposition to motion re 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Respondents' Reply to Petitioner's Brief In Response to Respondents' Supplemental Brief) filed by JOHN DOE, JOHN DOE 2. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lin, Jean) (Entered: 06/15/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/4/2009, Entered: 6/4/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in opposition to Petitioner's brief in response to respondents' supplemental brief ordered by this Court by DONALD RUMSFELD, JOHN DOE, JOHN DOE 2 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lin, Jean) (Entered: 06/04/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/30/2009, Entered: 5/30/2009 Motion for Order
                        Unopposed MOTION for Order to Enlarge Page Limit by HAJI WAZIR (Foster, Tina) (Entered: 05/30/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank 35 Filed: 5/29/2009, Entered: 5/30/2009 Response to Document
                          RESPONSE re 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction --Petitioners' Supplemental Brief as per Order of Court filed by HAJI WAZIR. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Tina Monshipour Foster, # 2 Exhibit Foster Declaration Exhibits 1-2)(Foster, Tina) (Entered: 05/30/2009)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/15/2009, Entered: 5/15/2009 Supplemental Memorandum
                            SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by DONALD RUMSFELD, JOHN DOE, JOHN DOE 2. (Lin, Jean) (Entered: 05/15/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: 4/14/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to
                              Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Briefing Regarding United States v. Klein by DONALD RUMSFELD, JOHN DOE, JOHN DOE 2 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lin, Jean) (Entered: 04/14/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/8/2009, Entered: 4/8/2009 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to ROBERT GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, JOHN DOE, JOHN DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, JOHN DOE 1, JOHN DOE 2, ROBERT GATES, GEORGE W. BUSH, JOHN DOE 1, JOHN DOE 2. Attorney John Caviness O'Quinn terminated. (O'Quinn, John) (Entered: 04/08/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/2/2009, Entered: 4/2/2009 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                  MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 4/2/09. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 04/02/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/2/2009, Entered: 4/2/2009 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of JurisdictionCourt Filing
                                    ORDER reserving ruling on 12 respondents' motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction and ordering further briefing. See text of the Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 4/2/09. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 04/02/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/10/2009, Entered: 3/10/2009 Response to Order of the Court
                                      RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re (30 in 1:08-cv-01307-JDB, 31 in 1:06-cv-01669-JDB, 21 in 1:08-cv-02143-JDB, 28 in 1:06-cv-01697-JDB) Order filed by ROBERT GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, ROBERT GATES, GEORGE W. BUSH. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Redacted Declaration of Lieutenant Colonel Jeffrey A. Dolsen)(Lin, Jean) (Entered: 03/10/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: 3/2/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER directing respondents to file additional information. See text of the Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 3/2/09. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 03/02/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: 2/20/2009 Response to Order of the Court
                                          RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re (25 in 1:06-cv-01697-JDB, 28 in 1:06-cv-01669-JDB, 24 in 1:08-cv-01307-JDB, 18 in 1:08-cv-02143-JDB) Order filed by ROBERT GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, JOHN DOE, JOHN DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, JOHN DOE 1, JOHN DOE 2, ROBERT GATES, GEORGE W. BUSH, JOHN DOE 1, JOHN DOE 2. (Lin, Jean) (Entered: 02/20/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/28/2009, Entered: 1/28/2009 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                            TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge John D. Bates of proceedings held on 1/7/09; Page Numbers: 1 - 138. Date of Issuance:1/28/09. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bryan A. Wayne, Telephone number 202-354-3186, Court Reporter Email Address : bryanawayne@verizon.net.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 2/18/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/2/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/28/2009.(Wayne, Bryan) (Entered: 01/28/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: 1/22/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER inviting respondents to provide the Court with additional information. See text of the Order for more details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 1/22/09. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 01/22/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: 1/16/2009 Response to Order of the Court
                                                RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re (16 in 1:08-cv-02143-JDB) Order filed by DONALD RUMSFELD, JOHN DOE, JOHN DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, JOHN DOE 1, JOHN DOE 2, ROBERT GATES, GEORGE W. BUSH, JOHN DOE 1, JOHN DOE 2. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Redacted Declaration of Colonel Joe e. Ethridge)(Lin, Jean) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/7/2009, Entered: 1/7/2009 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER directing respondents to file additional information. See text of the Order for details. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 1/7/09. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 01/07/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: 1/6/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                    NOTICE to Court Regarding Consolidated Oral Argument by HAJI WAZIR (Kelly, Kathleen) (Entered: 01/06/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: 1/6/2009 Notice of Appearance/
                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by John Caviness O'Quinn on behalf of DONALD RUMSFELD, JOHN DOE, JOHN DOE 2 (O'Quinn, John) (Entered: 01/06/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/5/2009, Entered: 1/5/2009 ~Notice (other)
                                                        NOTICE to the Court Regarding Oral Argument Scheduled for January 7, 2009 by ROBERT GATES, DONALD RUMSFELD, JOHN DOE, JOHN DOE 2, JOHN DOE 2, GEORGE W. BUSH, ROBERT GATES, JOHN DOE 1, JOHN DOE 2, ROBERT GATES, GEORGE W. BUSH, JOHN DOE 1, JOHN DOE 2 re Order,, Order,, Order,, (11 in 1:08-cv-02143-JDB) Memorandum in Opposition, (Lin, Jean) (Entered: 01/05/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: 11/17/2008 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                          Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply to Petitioner's Opposition to Respondents' Motion to Dismiss by DONALD RUMSFELD, JOHN DOE, JOHN DOE 2 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lin, Jean) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: 11/17/2008 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                            REPLY to opposition to motion re 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by DONALD RUMSFELD, JOHN DOE, JOHN DOE 2. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Lin, Jean) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: 11/14/2008 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                              Case Reassigned to Judge John D. Bates. Judge Reggie B. Walton no longer assigned to the case. (jeb, ) (Entered: 11/14/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/4/2008, Entered: 11/4/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                ENTERED IN ERROR.....Memorandum in opposition to re 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Declaration of Barbara Olshansky filed by HAJI WAZIR. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2-7, # 3 Exhibit 8-9, # 4 Exhibit 10, # 5 Exhibit 11-16, # 6 Exhibit 17, # 7 Exhibit 18-19, # 8 Exhibit 20-24, # 9 Exhibit 25-26, # 10 Exhibit 27-36, # 11 Exhibit 37-39, # 12 Exhibit 40-41)(Kelly, Kathleen) Modified on 11/5/2008 (td, ). (Entered: 11/04/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008 Status Conference
                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Reggie B. Walton: Status Conference held on 9/5/2008, ( Government's Brief due by 10/3/2008, Plaintiff's Brief and Opposition due by 11/3/08, Government's Reply due by 11/17/08) Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2008 09:30 AM in Courtroom 16 before Judge Reggie B. Walton.). (Court Reporter Phyllis Merana.) (mpt, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 11/4/2008, Entered: 11/4/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                    Memorandum in opposition to re 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by HAJI WAZIR. (Kelly, Kathleen) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/5/2008: # 1 Declaration Barbara Olshansky, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2-7, # 4 Exhibit 8-9, # 5 Exhibit 10, # 6 Exhibit 11-16, # 7 Exhibit 17, # 8 Exhibit 18-19, # 9 Exhibit 20-24, # 10 Exhibit 25-26, # 11 Exhibit 27-36, # 12 Exhibit 37-39, # 13 Exhibit 40-41) (td, ). (Entered: 11/04/2008)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: 8/19/2008 Status Conference
                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Reggie B. Walton: Status Conference held on 8/19/2008, (Further Status Conference set for 9/5/2008 12:00 PM in Courtroom 16 before Judge Reggie B. Walton.). (Court Reporter Phyllis Merana.) (mpt, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/28/2008, Entered: 10/28/2008 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                        Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by HAJI WAZIR (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kathleen Kelly)(Kelly, Kathleen) (Entered: 10/28/2008)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: 8/7/2008 Status Conference
                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Reggie B. Walton: Status Conference held on 8/7/2008, (Further Status Conference set for 8/19/2008 11:30 AM in Courtroom 16 before Judge Reggie B. Walton.). (Court Reporter Lisa Hand.) (mpt, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: 10/17/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                            TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Reggie B. Walton of proceedings held on 8-6-08; Page Numbers: 1-12. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Hand, Telephone number 202-354-3269, Court Reporter Email Address : lisa_hand@dcd.uscourts.gov.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 11/7/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/17/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/15/2009.(Courtrep, ) (Entered: 10/17/2008)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 9 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: 8/6/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                                              NOTICE of Correction regarding Joint Status Report filed July 28, 2008 by DONALD RUMSFELD, JOHN DOE, JOHN DOE 2, HAJI WAZIR re [6] Status Report (Lin, Jean)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: 10/3/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by DONALD RUMSFELD, JOHN DOE, JOHN DOE 2 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-2, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lin, Jean) (Entered: 10/03/2008)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: 7/29/2008 Order
                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER re [6] Status Report filed by GUL MOHAMMAD, JOHN DOE 2, ABDUL HADI, JOHN DOE, MOHAMMAD SHARIF, HAJI WAZIR, HAJI NAQIB, DONALD RUMSFELD, MOHAMMAD MURAD, BAZ MOHAMMAD, MOHAMMAD OMAR. In light of the represenations made by the parties in their joint status report filed on July 28, 2008, it is ORDERED that the parties shall appear before the Court on August 6, 2008, at 2:00 p.m. for a status hearing. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 7/29/08. (lcrbw3, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/24/2008, Entered: 9/24/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Reggie B. Walton of proceedings held on 9-05-08; Page Numbers: 1-12. Court Reporter/Transcriber Phyllis Merana, Telephone number 202-354-3243, Court Reporter Email Address : phyllis_merana@dcd.uscourts.gov.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 10/15/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/27/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/23/2008.(Merana, Phyllis) (Entered: 09/24/2008)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 8 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/29/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen A. Kelly on behalf of GUL MOHAMMAD, HAJI NAQIB, BAZ MOHAMMAD, HAJI WAZIR, MOHAMMAD SHARIF, MOHAMMAD OMAR, MOHAMMAD MURAD, ABDUL HADI (ks)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/24/2008, Entered: 9/24/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Reggie B. Walton of proceedings held on 8-19-08; Page Numbers: 1-7. Court Reporter/Transcriber Phyllis Merana, Telephone number 202-354-3243, Court Reporter Email Address : phyllis_merana@dcd.uscourts.gov.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 10/15/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/27/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/23/2008.(Merana, Phyllis) (Entered: 09/24/2008)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 7 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/29/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara J. Olshansky on behalf of GUL MOHAMMAD, HAJI NAQIB, BAZ MOHAMMAD, HAJI WAZIR, MOHAMMAD SHARIF, MOHAMMAD OMAR, MOHAMMAD MURAD, ABDUL HADI (ks)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 6 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Status Report
                                                                                            STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by GUL MOHAMMAD, HAJI NAQIB, BAZ MOHAMMAD, DONALD RUMSFELD, JOHN DOE, JOHN DOE 2, HAJI WAZIR, MOHAMMAD SHARIF, MOHAMMAD OMAR, MOHAMMAD MURAD, ABDUL HADI. (Lin, Jean)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008 Order
                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER re [4] Status Report filed by JOHN DOE 2, JOHN DOE, DONALD RUMSFELD. Based upon the parties' representations in their Joint Status Report filed on June 27, 2008, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report updating the Court with respect to the matters discussed in their prior joint status report on or before July 28, 2008. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 7/08/08. (lcrbw3, ) Modified on 7/28/2008 (lcrbw3, ).
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008 Order
                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER. It is ORDERED that this case is ADMINISTRATIVELY REOPENED. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 7/03/08. (lcrbw3, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 5 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Jean Lin on behalf of DONALD RUMSFELD, JOHN DOE, JOHN DOE 2 (Lin, Jean)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 4 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008 Status Report
                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT (Joint) by DONALD RUMSFELD, JOHN DOE, JOHN DOE 2. (Lin, Jean)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: 6/24/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/27/2008 (mpt, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER. On or before June 27, 2008, the parties shall file a joint status report updating the Court as to the status of each of the petitioners in this case (e.g., whether the petitioner has been released from the custody of the United States government or transferred to another facility or country, whether the petitioner has filed duplicative petitions in this or any other case, etc.). If the parties are unable to provide such information by the date specified above, they shall indicate the earliest possible date by which they can comply with the Court's directive. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 6/20/08. (lcrbw3, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: 1/31/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER. This matter is administratively closed until such time as the District of Columbia Circuit resolves the jurisdictional questions raised by the Military Commissions Act of 2006. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on January 31, 2007. (lcrbw3, )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 10/3/2006 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
                                                                                                            PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 138989.)filed by GUL MOHAMMAD, HAJI NAQIB, BAZ MOHAMMAD, HAJI WAZIR, MOHAMMAD SHARIF, MOHAMMAD OMAR, MOHAMMAD MURAD, ABDUL HADI.(td, )
                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 213 times.

                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                               
                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                              Need Password Help?