PETER B. v. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-01652-RWR
District Judge Richard W. Roberts, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 15, 2016 at 5:48 AM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo PETER B., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by MARK S. ZAID, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bradley P. Moss +1 202 907 7945 +1 202 330 5610 brad@markzaid.com
Space Mark Steven Zaid +1 202 454 2809 +1 202 330 5610 Mark@MarkZaid.com
v.
United States Central Intelligence Agency United States Central Intelligence Agency, Defendant
Officially listed as "CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marcia Kay Sowles +1 202 514 4960 +1 202 616 8470 marcia.sowles@usdoj.gov
No Logo DOES 1-10, Defendant
No Logo MARGARET PEGGY LYONS, Defendant
Hayden, Michael V. Hayden, Michael V., Defendant
Officially listed as "MICHAEL V. HAYDEN"
Motorola, Inc. Unknown Role, Motorola, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marcia Kay Sowles +1 202 514 4960 +1 202 616 8470 marcia.sowles@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 9/19/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 11001
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case
Related Case
105-cv-02189-RWR
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TYPE-C
  Entries (69) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None Judgment - Clerk
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Richard W. Roberts held on 11-3-09; Page Numbers: 1-37. Date of Issuance:12-19-12. Court Reporter/Transcriber Scott Wallace, Telephone number 202-354-3196, Court Reporter Email Address : scott.l.wallace@dcd.uscourts.gov.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 2/19/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/1/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/29/2013.(Wallace, Scott) (Entered: 01/29/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
          REPLY re 49 Response to Order of the Court filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN. (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
            Memorandum in opposition to re 48 MOTION Serve Defendant Margaret "Peggy" Lyons Beyond Initial 120 Period filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN. (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None
              RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re 47 Order,, filed by PETER B.. (Zaid, Mark) (Entered: 12/20/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: None
                MOTION Serve Defendant Margaret "Peggy" Lyons Beyond Initial 120 Period by PETER B. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Mark S. Zaid, Esq., # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Zaid, Mark) (Entered: 12/17/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER that Pltf shall file a motion for an extension of time to serve Margaret Peggy Lyons by 12/17/2012, if Pltf intends to continue this action against her. If a motion is filed, response due 12/24/2012. Any papers supporting Pltf's position that there are issues of fact requiring additional discovery shall be submitted to Deft for review as to confidentiality by 12/17/2012. This review shall be completed by 12/24/2012. Pltf shall file any submissions within 2 days upon completion of the review but no later than 12/27/2012. Pltfs request for discovery is Reserved until the Court reviews Plfts submissions.. Signed by Judge Frederick J. Scullin, Jr on 12/13/2012. (Scullin, Frederick) (Entered: 12/14/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                    Case Reassigned to Judge Frederick J. Scullin, Jr. Judge Richard W. Roberts no longer assigned to the case. (jeb, ) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER by Chief Justice of the United States Supreme Court directing the designation and assignment of a United States District Judge for service in another circuit; assigning Judge Frederick J. Scullin, Jr. of the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of New York to the following cases: 10cv1646,08cv1199,09cv1482,10cv985,10cv2109,09cv96,06cv1216,02cv603,08cv77,and 06cv1652. (Signed by Chief Justice John D. Roberts on 7/1/11) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: None
                        REPLY to opposition to motion re 35 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN. (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 04/09/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/1/2010, Entered: None
                          NOTICE of Filing of Second Rule 56 (f) Declaration of Mark S. Zaid, Esq. by PETER B. re 39 Memorandum in Opposition, (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Second Rule 56(f) Declaration of Mark S. Zaid, Esq.)(Zaid, Mark) (Entered: 04/01/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: None
                            STIPULATION re 40 MOTION for Leave to File Second Rule 56(f) Declaration of Mark S. Zaid, Esq. to allow Plaintiff to Withdraw the Motion to Seal and to place the Declaration on the public record by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN. (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: None
                              ERRATA by PETER B. 39 Memorandum in Opposition, filed by PETER B.. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts Response)(Zaid, Mark) (Entered: 03/16/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/12/2010, Entered: None
                                MOTION for Leave to File Second Rule 56(f) Declaration of Mark S. Zaid, Esq. by PETER B. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Placeholder for Sealed Document, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Zaid, Mark) (Entered: 03/12/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: None
                                  Memorandum in opposition to re 35 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by PETER B.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Peter B. Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1A - Article, # 3 Exhibit 1B - Article, # 4 Exhibit 2 - Hesterberg Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 3 - Zaid 56(f) Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 3A - Letter to CIA, # 7 Exhibit 3B - CIA Secrecy Requirements, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Zaid, Mark) (Entered: 03/10/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE --Consent Notice Regarding Deadline for Filing Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN re Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 03/04/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE of Submission to CIA of Opposition Brief for Classification Review by PETER B. (Zaid, Mark) (Entered: 02/01/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document 23 Filed: 8/15/2007, Entered: 8/15/2007 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                        REPLY to opposition to motion re [14] MOTION to Transfer Case filed by MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Sowles, Marcia)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None
                                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 35 MOTION for Summary Judgment by PETER B. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zaid, Mark) (Entered: 12/14/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document 22 Filed: 8/15/2007, Entered: 8/15/2007 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                            REPLY to opposition to motion re [13] MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer filed by MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Sowles, Marcia)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: None
                                              MOTION for Summary Judgment by MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Exhibit A - Declaration of Angela Pierson, # 2 Attachment 1 to Pierson Declaration, # 3 Attachment 2 to Pierson Declaration, # 4 Declaration Exhibit B Declaration of William Wilbourn, # 5 Statement of Facts, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 11/06/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/2/2007, Entered: 8/2/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 8/15/2007 (zlin, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 11/3/09. (lcrwr2) (Entered: 11/03/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/19/2007 Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                    MINUTE ORDER: In light of the newly filed Motion [13] to Dismiss, it is hereby ORDERED that defendant CIA's Motion [6] to Dismiss be, and hereby is, DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 7/19/07. (lcrwr3 )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER SETTING INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE for November 3, 2009, at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 10/20/09. (lcrwr2) (Entered: 10/20/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/19/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                                                        MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's Unopposed Motion [21] for Extension of Time to 8/15/07 to File Response/Reply be, and hereby is, GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 7/19/07. (lcrwr3 )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                          Consent MOTION Reschedule Initial Scheduling Conference by PETER B. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zaid, Mark) (Entered: 10/19/2009)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/19/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                                                            MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the Consent Motion [17] for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply be, and hereby is, GRANTED nunc pro tunc. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 7/19/07. (lcrwr3)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                              MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 10/13/2009)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: 7/5/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                                                                MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the Consent Motion [18] for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply be, and hereby is, GRANTED nunc pro tunc. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 7/5/07. (lcrwr3)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER SETTING INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE for October 20, 2009 at 10:00 a.m. Joint LCvR 16.3 report due five business days prior. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 9/10/09. (lcrwr2, ) (Entered: 09/14/2009)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 21 Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: 6/27/2007, Terminated: 7/19/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [13] MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer by MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Sowles, Marcia)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                      ANSWER to 10 Amended Complaint by MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. Related document: 10 Amended Complaint filed by PETER B..(Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 08/11/2009)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 20 Filed: 6/21/2007, Entered: 6/21/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                        Memorandum in opposition to re [13] MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer filed by PETER B.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Contractor E-mail# (2) Exhibit 2 - Zaid Declaration# (3) Exhibit 2a - CIA Secrecy Agreements# (4) Exhibit 3 - Doe v. Goss)(Zaid, Mark)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                          RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re 26 Order filed by PETER B.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zaid, Mark) (Entered: 07/29/2009)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 19 Filed: 6/18/2007, Entered: 6/18/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                            NOTICE of Submission of Opposition for Classification Review by PETER B. (Zaid, Mark)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 10 Amended Complaint by MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 07/28/2009)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 18 Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: 6/6/2007, Terminated: 7/5/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [14] MOTION to Transfer Case by PETER B. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Zaid, Mark)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/20/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER requiring the plaintiff to show cause in writing by July 30, 2009 why this case should not be dismissed for want of prosecution. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 7/17/09. (lcrwr2) (Entered: 07/20/2009)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 17 Filed: 5/30/2007, Entered: 5/30/2007, Terminated: 7/19/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [13] MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer by PETER B. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Zaid, Mark)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley P. Moss on behalf of PETER B. (Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 06/02/2009)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: 5/9/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Dispositive Motions due by 5/31/2007. (lin, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER granting in part and denying in part the defendant's motion 13 to dismiss, or in the alternative, to transfer venue. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 6/1/09. (lcrwr2) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 16 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: 5/7/2007, Terminated: 5/7/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [13] MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer by PETER B. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Zaid, Mark)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: 5/7/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's Consent Motion [16] for Extension of Time to Oppose Defendants' Motion to Dismiss be, and hereby is, GRANTED. Opposition is due by May 31, 2007. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 5/7/07. (lcrwr3)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: 4/18/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Dispositive Motions due by 5/7/2007. (lin, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: 4/17/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's Nunc Pro Tunc Consent Motion [15] for Extension of Time to Oppose Defendants' Motion to Dismiss be, and hereby is, GRANTED. Plaintiff's opposition is due by 5/7/07. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 4/17/07. (lcrwr3)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 15 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: 4/11/2007, Terminated: 4/17/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by PETER B. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Zaid, Mark)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: 3/27/2007 Motion to Transfer Case
                                                                                                      MOTION to Transfer Case by MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (to view document, click on link # [13] ) (jf, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 13 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: 3/26/2007 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer by MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration of Linda Dove# (2) Exhibit 1 to Dove Declaration# (3) Exhibit 2 to Dove Declaration# (4) Exhibit 3 to Dove Declaration# (5) Text of Proposed Order)(Sowles, Marcia)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 12 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: 3/26/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Marcia Kay Sowles on behalf of MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Sowles, Marcia)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: 2/22/2007 Summons Issued
                                                                                                            Summons (2) Issued as to MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, MARGARET PEGGY LYONS. (jf, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: 2/5/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 3/26/2007. (lin, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: 2/1/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the Unopposed Motion [11] for Extension of Time to 3/26/07 for Defendant to Respond to the Amended Complaint be, and hereby is, GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 1/31/07. (lcrwr3)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 11 Filed: 1/26/2007, Entered: 1/26/2007, Terminated: 2/1/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Sowles, Marcia)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 10 Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: 1/17/2007 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT against MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, MARGARET PEGGY LYONS, DOES #1-10 filed by PETER B..(jf, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 9 Filed: 1/8/2007, Entered: 1/8/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing of Responsive Pleading For Classification Review by PETER B. (Zaid, Mark)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/29/2006, Entered: 12/29/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion [8] for Extension of Time to Submit His Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss be, and hereby is, GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 12/29/06. (lcrwr3)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 8 Filed: 12/21/2006, Entered: 12/21/2006, Terminated: 12/29/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Document by PETER B.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Zaid, Mark)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: 12/12/2006 Motion to Transfer Case
                                                                                                                            MOTION to Transfer Case by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Please see Document No. [6] for scanned image). (nmw, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 6 Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: 12/11/2006, Terminated: 7/19/2007 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support of Defendant CIA's Motion to Dismiss or Transfer# (2) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Dismiss# (3) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Transfer Case)(Sowles, Marcia)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 5 Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: 12/11/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Marcia Kay Sowles on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Sowles, Marcia)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 9/19/2006, Entered: 10/3/2006 Notice of Related Case
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by PETER B.. Case related to: Case No. 05-2189. (jf, )
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 9/19/2006, Entered: 10/3/2006 Complaint
                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, MARGARET PEGGY LYONS, DOES #1-10 ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 138764.)filed by PETER B..(jf, )
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 9/19/2006, Entered: 10/3/2006 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [1] MOTION for Leave to File Complaint with Plaintiff's last name omitted and use Counsel's address instead. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 9/19/06. (jf, ) Modified on 10/4/2006 (zlc, ).
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/19/2006, Entered: 10/3/2006, Terminated: 9/19/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Complaint with Plaintiff's last name omitted and use Counsel's address instead in violation of LCVR 5.1 (e) by PETER B.. (jf, )
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 9/19/2006, Entered: 10/3/2006 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS (4) Issued as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, MARGARET PEGGY LYONS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf, )
                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 145 times.

                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?