EZATULLAH et al v. BUSH et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-01752-RMC
District Judge Rosemary M. Collyer, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo ABDUL WAHID, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Wells Dixon +1 212 614 6423 +1 212 614 6499 wdixon@ccrjustice.org
Space Shayana Devendra Kadidal +1 212 614 6438 +1 212 614 6499 kadidal@ccrjustice.org
No Logo EZATULLAH, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. Wells Dixon +1 212 614 6423 +1 212 614 6499 wdixon@ccrjustice.org
Space Shayana Devendra Kadidal +1 212 614 6438 +1 212 614 6499 kadidal@ccrjustice.org
v.
No Logo DONALD RUMSFELD, Respondent

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Bush, George Walker Bush, George Walker, Respondent
Officially listed as "GEORGE W. BUSH"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo HARRY B. HARRIS, JR., Respondent

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo WADE F. DAVIS, Respondent

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Office Washington, DC
Filed 10/16/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County 99999
Terminated 1/15/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, GITMO, HABEAS, STAYED, TYPE-G
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 26 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 Status Report
STATUS REPORT In Response To Court's July 3, 2008 Order by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew)
    LREF
    Legal Document 25 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/10/2008 Substitution of Counsel
    NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Shayana Devendra Kadidal on behalf of EZATULLAH, ABDUL WAHID Substituting for attorney Barbara J. Olshansky (Kadidal, Shayana)
      LREF
      Legal Document 24 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER by Judge Thomas F. Hogan IN RE: PETITIONERS SEEKING HABEAS CORPUS RELIEF IN RELATION TO PRIOR DETENTIONS AT GUANTANAMO BAY; status reports due by 5:30 p.m. on Monday, July 14, 2008. (gt )
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008 Order
        MINUTE ORDER advising the parties that the Court has been alerted to a number of cases that were identified in the July 3, 2008 order that previously were dismissed by the Judge to whom the case originally was assigned. Accordingly, if a petitioner's case previously was dismissed the parties may disregard the July 3, 2008 order and need not file the required status report. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on July 3, 2008. (lctfh2) (Entered: 07/03/2008)
          LREF
          Legal Document 23 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/13/2008 ~Notice (other)
          NOTICE Of Report Regarding Preservation Filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, et al. (jeb, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 22 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: 1/15/2008 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER dismissing case as moot in light of Petitioner's transfer. This case is closed. See attached Order for further details. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 1/15/08. (lcrmc2)
              LREF
              Legal Document 21 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 ~Notice (other)
              NOTICE Of Transfer Of Petitioner by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS (Warden, Andrew)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: 8/31/2007 Case Stayed
                Case Stayed (cdw)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: 8/28/2007 Order on Motion to Dismiss
                  MINUTE ENTRY ORDER denying [12] Respondents' Motion to Dismiss and to Transfer Case; and denying [20] Respondents' Motion to Dismiss. In light of the Supreme Court's recent grant of certiorari in Boumediene v. Bush, 127 S. Ct. 3078 (2007), the Motions to Dismiss are denied without prejudice. It is further ordered that this case is stayed pending the Supreme Court's resolution of Boumediene on the merits. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 8/28/2007. (lcrmc2)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 20 Filed: 4/19/2007, Entered: 4/19/2007, Terminated: 8/28/2007 Motion to Dismiss
                    MOTION to Dismiss by Respondents. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-Second Declaration of Karen L. Hecker# (2) Exhibit B-List of Released Enemy Combatant Detainees# (3) Exhibit C-List of Released-No Longer Enemy Combatant Detainees# (4) Exhibit D-USCA Judgment-Kiyemba# (5) Exhibit E-USCA Judgment re: Paracha# (6) Exhibit F-Declaration of Matthew C. Waxman# (7) Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK et al.(jeb) (jeb, ).
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 19 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: 2/23/2007 Reply to opposition to Motion
                      REPLY to opposition to motion re [12] MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Transfer Case and Response to Petition (also filed as dkt. no. 11) MOTION to Transfer Case and Response to Petition (also filed as dkt. no. 11) filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS. (Attachments: # (1))(Oldham, Nicholas)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 18 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: 2/12/2007 Response to any document
                        RESPONSE to Motion to Dismiss or Transfer filed by EZATULLAH, ABDUL WAHID. (Dixon, J.)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 17 Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: 2/6/2007 Summons Returned Unexecuted
                          Show Cause Returned Unexecuted as to WADE F. DAVIS. (tg, ).
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 16 Filed: 1/25/2007, Entered: 1/25/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                            NOTICE of Appearance by Judry Laeb Subar on behalf of respondents.
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 15 Filed: 12/29/2006, Entered: 12/29/2006, Terminated: 12/29/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                              Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [12] MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Transfer Case and Response to Petition (also filed as dkt. no. 11) MOTION to Transfer Case and Response to Petition (also filed as dkt. no. 11) by EZATULLAH, ABDUL WAHID. (Dixon, J.)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 14 Filed: 12/29/2006, Entered: 12/29/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                NOTICE of Appearance by J. Wells Dixon on behalf of EZATULLAH, ABDUL WAHID (Dixon, J.)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 12/29/2006, Entered: 12/29/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                                  MINUTE ENTRY ORDER granting [15] Petitioner's Motion for Extension of Time. Petitioner shall file his response to Respondents' Motion to Dismiss no later than February 12, 2007. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 12/29/2006. (ses)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 13 Filed: 12/27/2006, Entered: 12/28/2006 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                    RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to HARRY B. HARRIS, JR served on 12/18/2006, answer due 2/16/2007. (tg, )
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 12 Filed: 12/22/2006, Entered: 12/22/2006, Terminated: 8/28/2007 Motion to Dismiss
                                      MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Transfer Case and Response to Petition (also filed as dkt. no. 11) by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Notification# (2) Exhibit B - Excerpts of Second Sweigart Decl.# (3) Exhibit C - Iqbal ABA Form# (4) Exhibit D - Hecker Decl.)(Oldham, Nicholas)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 11 Filed: 12/22/2006, Entered: 12/22/2006 Response to Petition for Habeas Corpus
                                        RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR HABEAS CORPUS re [1] Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Motion to Dismiss or for Transfer filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Notification# (2) Exhibit B - Excerpts of Second Sweigart Decl.# (3) Exhibit C - Iqbal ABA Form# (4) Exhibit D - Hecker Decl.)(Oldham, Nicholas)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 10 Filed: 12/22/2006, Entered: 12/22/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Andrew Oldham on behalf of GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS (Oldham, Nicholas)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 9 Filed: 12/19/2006, Entered: 12/19/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Terry Marcus Henry on behalf of Respondents
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 8 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: 12/19/2006 Show Cause Returned Executed
                                              SHOW CAUSE Executed as to U. S. Attorney General pursuant to Order to Show Cause [3] (tg, )
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 7 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: 12/19/2006 Show Cause Returned Executed
                                                SHOW CAUSE Executed as to GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD pursuant to Order to Show Cause [3] (tg, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: 12/11/2006 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                  ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to EZATULLAH served on 12/7/2006, answer due 2/5/2007; ABDUL WAHID served on 12/7/2006, answer due 2/5/2007. (Olshansky, Barbara) Modified on 12/11/2006 (tg, ).
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: 12/11/2006 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                                                    ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 10/7/06. (Olshansky, Barbara) Modified on 12/11/2006 (tg, ).
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: 12/11/2006 Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
                                                      NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRIES: re [6] Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant, [5] Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General were entered in error. The filings do not conform to this Court's local rules of filing pleadings. Also, the return receipt cards or affidavits of service were not included. Counsel was instructed to refile said pleadings. (tg, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/8/2006, Entered: 12/8/2006 Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
                                                        NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. [4] was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading. (nmw, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 12/7/2006, Entered: 12/7/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                          ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Certificate of Service by EZATULLAH, ABDUL WAHID (Olshansky, Barbara) Modified on 12/8/2006 (nmw, ).
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 12/4/2006, Entered: 12/5/2006 Show Cause Issued
                                                            SHOW CAUSE (5) Issued as to GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS and U.S. Attorney General pursuant to Order to Show Cause [3] (tg, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 3 Filed: 11/29/2006, Entered: 11/29/2006 Order to Show Cause Court Filing
                                                              ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Respondents, by counsel, shall, within 20 days of service of a copy of this Order and the Petition, file with the Court and serve on the Petitioner a statement showing why the writ of Habeas Corpus should not issue. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 11/29/2006. (ses) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/29/2006 (lcrmc2, ).
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 10/18/2006, Entered: 10/19/2006 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                Case Reassigned to Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly no longer assigned to the case. (td, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: 10/17/2006 Notice of Related Case
                                                                  NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by EZATULLAH, ABDUL WAHID. Case related to Case No. 05-313. (td, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: 10/17/2006 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
                                                                    PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 139299.)filed by EZATULLAH, ABDUL WAHID. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(td, )
                                                                      LREF

                                                                      Statistics

                                                                      This case has been viewed 191 times.

                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                      Space
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                       
                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                      Need Password Help?