HAKMAT et al v. BUSH et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-01753-EGS
District Judge Emmet G. Sullivan, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo ADBULAH HAKMAT, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shayana Devendra Kadidal +1 212 614 6438 +1 212 614 6499 kadidal@ccrjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by moment.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Thomas Ratliff +1 512 232 4857 +1 512 471 6988 jratliff@moment.net
Space Scott Sullivan +1 512 232 4857 +1 512 471 6988
No Logo AL HAAJ ALLAHDAD, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shayana Devendra Kadidal +1 212 614 6438 +1 212 614 6499 kadidal@ccrjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by moment.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Thomas Ratliff +1 512 232 4857 +1 512 471 6988 jratliff@moment.net
Space Scott Sullivan +1 512 232 4857 +1 512 471 6988
v.
No Logo DONALD RUMSFELD, Respondent

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Bush, George Walker Bush, George Walker, Respondent
Officially listed as "GEORGE W. BUSH"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo HARRY B. HARRIS, JR., Respondent

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo WADE F. DAVIS, Respondent

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Office Washington, DC
Filed 10/16/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Want of Prosecution
County 88888
Terminated 12/6/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, GITMO, HABEAS, STAYED, TYPE-G
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 28 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 Status Report
STATUS REPORT In Response To Court's July 3, 2008 Order by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew)
    LREF
    Legal Document 27 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/10/2008 Substitution of Counsel
    NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Shayana Devendra Kadidal on behalf of ADBULAH HAKMAT, AL HAAJ ALLAHDAD Substituting for attorney Barbara J. Olshansky (Kadidal, Shayana)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
      Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 7/14/2008 (clv, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 26 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER by Judge Thomas F. Hogan IN RE: PETITIONERS SEEKING HABEAS CORPUS RELIEF IN RELATION TO PRIOR DETENTIONS AT GUANTANAMO BAY; status reports due by 5:30 p.m. on Monday, July 14, 2008. (gt )
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008 Order
          MINUTE ORDER advising the parties that the Court has been alerted to a number of cases that were identified in the July 3, 2008 order that previously were dismissed by the Judge to whom the case originally was assigned. Accordingly, if a petitioner's case previously was dismissed the parties may disregard the July 3, 2008 order and need not file the required status report. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on July 3, 2008. (lctfh2) (Entered: 07/03/2008)
            LREF
            Legal Document 25 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/13/2008 ~Notice (other)
            NOTICE Of ReportRegarding Preservation by GEORGE W. BUSH,et al. (jeb, )
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: 12/6/2007 Order
              MINUTE ORDER. In view of the failure of the petitioner to respond to the Court's Order to Show Cause by November 27, 2007, this case is DISMISSED from the active calendar of the court. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on December 6, 2007. (lcegs1)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                Set/Reset Deadlines: Show Cause due by 11/27/2007.,Response to Show Cause due by 11/30/2007. (clv, )
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Order
                  MINUTE ORDER. In view of [24] the notice provided by the government on November 13, 2007, that the United States government has relinquished custody of Hakmat and transferred him to the control of the government of Afghanistan, plaintiff shall show cause by no later than November 27, 2007 why this case should not be dismissed. Any response by defendant shall be filed by no later than November 30, 2007. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on November 20, 2007. (lcegs1)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 24 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 ~Notice (other)
                    NOTICE Of Transfer Of Petitioner by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS (Warden, Andrew)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: 8/20/2007 Case Stayed
                      Case Stayed (clv, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 23 Filed: 8/17/2007, Entered: 8/17/2007 Order on Motion for Order to Show CauseCourt Filing
                        ORDER staying case pending a decision by the Supreme Court; denying without prejudice [9] [11] Petitioner's Motion for a Writ or Order to Show Cause; denying without prejudice [15] Respondents' Motion to Dismiss; denying [10] Petitioner's Motion for an Order Requiring 30-Days Notice of a Transfer; and denying [21] Petitioner's Motion for Entry of the Amended Protective Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on August 17, 2007. (lcegs1)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 22 Filed: 8/2/2007, Entered: 8/2/2007 Response to any document
                          RESPONSE to Notice of Recent Activity and Request for Ruling on Motions for Entry of Protective Order and Advance Notice of Transfer filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3# (4) Exhibit 4# (5) Exhibit 5# (6) Exhibit 6)(Henry, Terry)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 21 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/19/2007 ~Notice (other)
                            NOTICE Of Recent Activity in Guantanamo cases and Request for Ruling on Motion for Entry of Amended Protective Order and Motion for Order Requiring 30-Days Notice of Removal of Petitioner from Guantanamo by ADBULAH HAKMAT (Ratliff, John)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 20 Filed: 5/21/2007, Entered: 5/21/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                              NOTICE of Appearance by John Thomas Ratliff on behalf of AL HAAJ ALLAHDAD (Ratliff, John)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 19 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: 5/14/2007 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                REPLY to opposition to motion re [15] MOTION to Dismiss filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Luh, James)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 18 Filed: 5/6/2007, Entered: 5/6/2007 Response to any document
                                  RESPONSE to Motion to Dismiss [15] filed by ADBULAH HAKMAT. (Ratliff, John).
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 17 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: 5/3/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                    NOTICE of Filing by ADBULAH HAKMAT (Ratliff, John)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: 4/27/2007 Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
                                      NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re [16] Notice of Appearance was entered in error and counsel was instructed to review LCvR 83.2.(jf, )
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 16 Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: 4/26/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                        ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Appearance by John Thomas Ratliff on behalf of ADBULAH HAKMAT (Ratliff, John) Modified on 4/27/2007 (jf, ).
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 15 Filed: 4/19/2007, Entered: 4/19/2007, Terminated: 8/17/2007 Motion to Dismiss
                                          MOTION to Dismiss by Respondents. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-Second Declaration of Karen L. Hecker# (2) Exhibit B-List of Released Enemy Combatant Detainees# (3) Exhibit C-List of Released-No Longer Enemy Combatant Detainees# (4) Exhibit D-USCA Judgment-Kiyemba# (5) Exhibit E-USCA Judgment re: Paracha# (6) Exhibit F-Declaration of Matthew C. Waxman# (7) Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK et al.(jeb) (jeb, ).
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 14 Filed: 3/31/2007, Entered: 3/31/2007 Memorandum
                                            MEMORANDUM by ADBULAH HAKMAT. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Amended Protective Order And Procedures for Counsel)(Ratliff, John)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 13 Filed: 3/16/2007, Entered: 3/16/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                              Memorandum in opposition to re [10] First MOTION for Order REQUIRING RESPONDENTS TO PROVIDE COUNSEL FOR PETITIONER AND THE COURT WITH 30-DAYS? ADVANCE NOTICE OF ANY INTENDED REMOVAL OF PETITIONER FROM GUANTANAMO filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Waxman Decl.# (2) Exhibit 2 - Prosper Decl.# (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Oldham, Nicholas)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 12 Filed: 3/16/2007, Entered: 3/16/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                Memorandum in opposition to re [9] First MOTION for Order to Show Cause, [11] First MOTION for Writ of Habeas CorpusFirst MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Luh, James)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 11 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: 3/12/2007, Terminated: 8/17/2007 ~Motion for Writ
                                                  First MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, First MOTION for Order to Show Cause by ADBULAH HAKMAT. (Ratliff, John)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 10 Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: 3/6/2007, Terminated: 8/17/2007 Motion for Order
                                                    First MOTION for Order REQUIRING RESPONDENTS TO PROVIDE COUNSEL FOR PETITIONER AND THE COURT WITH 30-DAYS? ADVANCE NOTICE OF ANY INTENDED REMOVAL OF PETITIONER FROM GUANTANAMO by ADBULAH HAKMAT. (Ratliff, John)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 9 Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: 3/6/2007, Terminated: 8/17/2007 ~Motion for Order to Show Cause
                                                      First MOTION for Order to Show Cause by ADBULAH HAKMAT. (Ratliff, John)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 1/25/2007, Entered: 1/25/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Judry Laeb Subar on behalf of respondents.
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 7 Filed: 12/19/2006, Entered: 12/19/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Terry Marcus Henry on behalf of Respondents
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 6 Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: 12/11/2006 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC
                                                            ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney. (Olshansky, Barbara) Modified on 12/11/2006 (tg, ).
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 5 Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: 12/11/2006 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                              ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to ADBULAH HAKMAT served on 12/7/2006, answer due 2/5/2007; AL HAAJ ALLAHDAD served on 12/7/2006, answer due 2/5/2007. (Olshansky, Barbara) Modified on 12/11/2006 (tg, ).
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 4 Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: 12/11/2006 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                                                                ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 12/7/06. (Olshansky, Barbara) Modified on 12/11/2006 (tg, ).
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: 12/11/2006 Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
                                                                  NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRIES: re [4] Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General, [6] Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC, [5] Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant, were entered in error. The filings do not conform to this Court's local rules of filing pleadings. Also, the return receipt cards or affidavits of service were not included. Counsel was instructed to refile said pleadings. (tg, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 12/7/2006, Entered: 12/7/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                                    NOTICE of Certificate of Service by ADBULAH HAKMAT, AL HAAJ ALLAHDAD (Olshansky, Barbara)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 10/18/2006, Entered: 10/19/2006 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                      Case Reassigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly no longer assigned to the case. (td, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: 10/17/2006 Notice of Related Case
                                                                        NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ADBULAH HAKMAT, AL HAAJ ALLAHADAD. Case related to Case No. 05-313. (td, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: 10/17/2006 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
                                                                          PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 139301.)filed by ADBULAH HAKMAT, AL HAAJ ALLAHADAD. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(td, )
                                                                            LREF

                                                                            Statistics

                                                                            This case has been viewed 134 times.

                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                            Space
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                             
                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                            Need Password Help?