LEGSEIREIN et al v. BUSH et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-01754-GK
District Judge Gladys Kessler, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo AL-HASAN LEGSEIREIN, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shayana Devendra Kadidal +1 212 614 6438 +1 212 614 6499 kadidal@ccrjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew John O'Hara +1 312 207 1000 +1 312 207 6400 mohara@reedsmith.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sachnoff & Weaver, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adam R. Chiss +1 312 207 1000 +1 312 207 6400 achiss@sachnoff.com
Space Lowell E. Sachnoff +1 312 207 1000 +1 312 207 6400 lsachnoff@sachnoff.com
No Logo JUMAH AL DOSSARI, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shayana Devendra Kadidal +1 212 614 6438 +1 212 614 6499 kadidal@ccrjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew John O'Hara +1 312 207 1000 +1 312 207 6400 mohara@reedsmith.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sachnoff & Weaver, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adam R. Chiss +1 312 207 1000 +1 312 207 6400 achiss@sachnoff.com
Space Lowell E. Sachnoff +1 312 207 1000 +1 312 207 6400 lsachnoff@sachnoff.com
v.
No Logo DONALD RUMSFELD, Respondent

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Bush, George Walker Bush, George Walker, Respondent
Officially listed as "GEORGE W. BUSH"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo HARRY B. HARRIS, JR., Respondent

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo WADE F. DAVIS, Respondent

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Office Washington, DC
Filed 10/16/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County 88888
Terminated 1/11/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, GITMO, HABEAS, TYPE-G
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 15 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 Status Report
STATUS REPORT In Response To Court's July 3, 2008 Order by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew)
    LREF
    Legal Document 14 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/10/2008 Substitution of Counsel
    NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Shayana Devendra Kadidal on behalf of AL-HASAN LEGSEIREIN, JUMAH AL DOSSARI Substituting for attorney Barbara J. Olshansky (Kadidal, Shayana)
      LREF
      Legal Document 13 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER by Judge Thomas F. Hogan IN RE: PETITIONERS SEEKING HABEAS CORPUS RELIEF IN RELATION TO PRIOR DETENTIONS AT GUANTANAMO BAY; status reports due by 5:30 p.m. on Monday, July 14, 2008. (gt )
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008 Order
        MINUTE ORDER advising the parties that the Court has been alerted to a number of cases that were identified in the July 3, 2008 order that previously were dismissed by the Judge to whom the case originally was assigned. Accordingly, if a petitioner's case previously was dismissed the parties may disregard the July 3, 2008 order and need not file the required status report. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on July 3, 2008. (lctfh2) (Entered: 07/03/2008)
          LREF
          Legal Document 12 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/13/2008 ~Notice (other)
          N0TICE Of Report Regarding Preservation Filed by GEORGE BUSH, et al.(jeb, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 11 Filed: 1/4/2007, Entered: 1/4/2007 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
            NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by AL-HASAN LEGSEIREIN (O'Hara, Matthew)
              LREF
              Legal Document 10 Filed: 12/19/2006, Entered: 12/19/2006 Notice of Appearance/
              NOTICE of Appearance by Terry Marcus Henry on behalf of Respondents
                LREF
                Legal Document 9 Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: 12/11/2006 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to AL-HASAN LEGSEIREIN served on 12/7/2006, answer due 2/5/2007; JUMAH AL DOSSARI served on 12/7/2006, answer due 2/5/2007. (Olshansky, Barbara) Modified on 12/11/2006 (tg, ).
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 8 Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: 12/11/2006 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                  ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 12/7/06. (Olshansky, Barbara) Modified on 12/11/2006 (tg, ).
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: 12/11/2006 Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
                    NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRIES: re [8] Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General, [9] Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant, were entered in error. The filings do not conform to this Court's local rules of filing pleadings. Also, the return receipt cards or affidavits of service were not included. Counsel was instructed to refile said pleadings. (tg, )
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 12/8/2006, Entered: 12/8/2006 Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
                      NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. [7] was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading. (nmw, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 7 Filed: 12/7/2006, Entered: 12/7/2006 ~Notice (other)
                        ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Certificate of Service by AL-HASAN LEGSEIREIN, JUMAH AL DOSSARI (Olshansky, Barbara) Modified on 12/8/2006 (nmw, ).
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 6 Filed: 11/27/2006, Entered: 11/27/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER: Respondents shall show cause by January 10, 2007 why the Petitioner for Writ of Habeas Corpus should not be granted . Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 11/27/06. (CS, )
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 11/27/2006, Entered: 11/27/2006 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                            Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Show Cause due by 1/10/2007. (CS, )
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 5 Filed: 11/7/2006, Entered: 11/7/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                              NOTICE of Appearance by Adam R. Chiss on behalf of AL-HASAN LEGSEIREIN, JUMAH AL DOSSARI (nmw, )
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 4 Filed: 11/7/2006, Entered: 11/7/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                NOTICE of Appearance by Lowell E. Sachnoff on behalf of AL-HASAN LEGSEIREIN, JUMAH AL DOSSARI (nmw, )
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: 11/7/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. O'Hara on behalf of AL-HASAN LEGSEIREIN, JUMAH AL DOSSARI (nmw, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/18/2006, Entered: 10/19/2006 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                    Case Reassigned to Judge Gladys Kessler. Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly no longer assigned to the case. (td, )
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: 10/17/2006 Notice of Related Case
                                      NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by AL-HASAN LEGSEIREIN, JUMAH DOSSARI. Case related to Case No. 05-313. (td, )
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: 10/17/2006 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
                                        PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 139302.)filed by AL-HASAN LEGSEIREIN, JUMAH DOSSARI. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(td, )
                                          LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 104 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?