LAL et al v. BUSH et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-01763-CKK
District Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo SABAR LAL, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shayana Devendra Kadidal +1 212 614 6438 +1 212 614 6499 kadidal@ccrjustice.org
No Logo ZABARDAST, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shayana Devendra Kadidal +1 212 614 6438 +1 212 614 6499 kadidal@ccrjustice.org
v.
No Logo DONALD RUMSFELD, Respondent

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Bush, George Walker Bush, George Walker, Respondent
Officially listed as "GEORGE W. BUSH"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo HARRY B. HARRIS, JR., Respondent

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo WADE F. DAVIS, Respondent

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Office Washington, DC
Filed 10/16/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County 99999
Terminated 10/30/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, GITMO, HABEAS, TYPE-G
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 25 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: 7/18/2008 Response to Order to Show Cause
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by SABAR LAL, ZABARDAST, PETITIONERS SEEKING HABEAS CORPUS RELIEF IN RELATION TO PRIOR DETENTIONS AT GUANTANAMO BAY re (19 in 1:06-cv-01763-CKK) Order,,. (Kadidal, Shayana)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: 7/18/2008 Order
    MINUTE ORDER (paperless). On June 19, 2008, the Court issued an Order requiring Petitioner to Show Cause why this case should not be dismissed in light of Petitioner's transfer from Guantanamo Bay. On July 18, 2008, Petitioner advised the Court that he does not object to the dismissal of his Petition. Accordingly, after consultation with Judge Thomas F. Hogan, the instant case is DISMISSED in its entirety.Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on July 18, 2008. (lcckk2)
      LREF
      Legal Document 24 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 Status Report
      STATUS REPORT by SABAR LAL, ZABARDAST. (Kadidal, Shayana)
        LREF
        Legal Document 23 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 Status Report
        STATUS REPORT In Response To Court's July 3, 2008 Order by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew)
          LREF
          Legal Document 22 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/10/2008 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
          NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to SABAR LAL, ZABARDAST. Attorney Barbara J. Olshansky terminated. (Olshansky, Barbara)
            LREF
            Legal Document 21 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER by Judge Thomas F. Hogan IN RE: PETITIONERS SEEKING HABEAS CORPUS RELIEF IN RELATION TO PRIOR DETENTIONS AT GUANTANAMO BAY; status reports due by 5:30 p.m. on Monday, July 14, 2008. (gt )
              LREF
              Legal Document 20 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER. Local Civil Rule 40.6(a) permits the judges of this Court to "transfer directly all or part of any case on the judge's docket to any consenting judge." L. Civ. R. 40.6(a). Furthermore, on July 1, 2008, the United States District Court for the District of Columbia adopted a Resolution of the Executive Session, in which the judges agreed to, among other things, transfer cases filed by the detainees held at Guantanamo Bay to Senior Judge Thomas F. Hogan for coordination and management, while retaining the cases for all other purposes. In the interest of facilitating Judge Hogan's case-coordination process, the Court will transfer this case to Judge Hogan for coordination and management as reflected in the July 1, 2008 Resolution of the Executive Session. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on July 3, 2008. (lcckk1)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008 Order
                MINUTE ORDER advising the parties that the Court has been alerted to a number of cases that were identified in the July 3, 2008 order that previously were dismissed by the Judge to whom the case originally was assigned. Accordingly, if a petitioner's case previously was dismissed the parties may disregard the July 3, 2008 order and need not file the required status report. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on July 3, 2008. (lctfh2) (Entered: 07/03/2008)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 19 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: 6/19/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER. On October 5, 2007, Respondents provided the Court with Notice that Petitioner Lal had been transferred from the custody of the United States to the Government of Afghanistan. See Notice, Docket No. [16]. The Court notes that Petitioner Lal, along with his Next Friend, Zabardast, is the only Petitioner in this case. Accordingly, on or before July 18, 2008, Petitioner shall Show Cause as to any reason why this case should not be dismissed. If no response is received, on July 19, 2008, this case shall stand dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on June 19, 2008. (lcckk1)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008 Order
                    MINUTE ORDER granting Respondents Motion for Designation of Paragraph 9 of the February 8, 2008 Declaration of Rear Admiral Mark H. Buzby as Protected Information Under the Protective Orders. The Court notes that no Petitioner has opposed this Motion and that several Petitioners have filed Notices of Non-Opposition. Paragraph 9 of the February 8, 2008 Declaration of Rear Admiral Mark H. Buzby, and any other documents repeating or incorporating its contents or otherwise establishing its protected nature, shall be accorded the status of protected information and subject to the applicable provisions of the protective orders entered in the Guantanamo Bay detainee litigation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 4/2/08. (jeb)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 18 Filed: 3/4/2008, Entered: 3/4/2008 ~Notice (other)
                      NOTICE OF FILING of Motion for designation of Paragraph 9 of the 2/8/08 Declaration of Rear Admiral Mark H. Buzby (filed 2/13/08) as protected information under the protective orders by GEORGE W. BUSH,et al.(jeb, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 17 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/13/2008 ~Notice (other)
                        N0TICE Of Report Regarding Preservation Filed by GEORGE BUSH, et al.(jeb, )
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 16 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007 ~Notice (other)
                          NOTICE Of Transfer Of Petitioner by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS (Warden, Andrew)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 15 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: 5/14/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                            Memorandum in opposition to re [12] MOTION to Stay (see also dkt. no. 10) filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Luh, James)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 14 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: 5/14/2007 Reply to opposition to Motion
                              REPLY to opposition to motion re [8] MOTION to Dismiss filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Luh, James)
                                LREF
                                Blank 13 Filed: 5/4/2007, Entered: 5/7/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                NOTICE of Intent to File Petition Under the Detainee Treatment Act by SABAR LAL, ZABARDAST (Pleasee see Document No. [11] for scanned image). (nmw, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 12 Filed: 5/4/2007, Entered: 5/7/2007 Motion to Stay
                                  MOTION to Stay and Abey by SABAR LAL, ZABARDAST (Please see Document No. [11] for scanned image). (nmw, )
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 11 Filed: 5/4/2007, Entered: 5/4/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                    Memorandum in opposition to re [8] MOTION to Dismiss , Motion for a Stay-and-Abey Order, and Notice of Intent to File Petition under the Detainee Treatment Act (cleared by the CSO for public filing, 5/4/2007) filed by SABAR LAL, ZABARDAST. (Kadidal, Shayana)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 10 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: 5/3/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                      NOTICE of Filing of Opposition to Respondents' Motion to Dismiss, Motion for a Stay-and-Abey Order, and Notice of Intent to File Petition under the Detainee Treatment Act by SABAR LAL, ZABARDAST re [8] MOTION to Dismiss (Kadidal, Shayana)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 9 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: 5/3/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Shayana Devendra Kadidal on behalf of SABAR LAL, ZABARDAST (Kadidal, Shayana)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/19/2007, Entered: 4/19/2007, Terminated: 3/18/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                          MOTION to Dismiss by Respondents. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-Second Declaration of Karen L. Hecker# (2) Exhibit B-List of Released Enemy Combatant Detainees# (3) Exhibit C-List of Released-No Longer Enemy Combatant Detainees# (4) Exhibit D-USCA Judgment-Kiyemba# (5) Exhibit E-USCA Judgment re: Paracha# (6) Exhibit F-Declaration of Matthew C. Waxman# (7) Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK et al.(jeb) (jeb, ).
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: 3/12/2007 Terminate Motions
                                            Motions terminated: (dot, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/8/2007, Entered: 3/8/2007 Order
                                              MINUTE ORDER (PAPERLESS): The Court orders that the stay of this case is extended until further order of the Court. Accordingly, no factual returns are required. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on March 8, 2007. (lcckk1)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/7/2007, Entered: 3/7/2007, Terminated: 3/12/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                MOTION for Clarification or in the alternative for Stay, and request for expedited consideration by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Subar, Judry)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 1/25/2007, Entered: 1/25/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Judry Laeb Subar on behalf of respondents.
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 12/19/2006, Entered: 12/19/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Terry Marcus Henry on behalf of Respondents
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 12/7/2006, Entered: 12/7/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                      NOTICE of Certificate of Service by SABAR LAL, ZABARDAST (Olshansky, Barbara)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 10/29/2006, Entered: 10/29/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER applying protective order and supplemental orders issued by Judge Green to this case; staying this case pending a resolution of the relevant issues by the Court of Appeals; the Government shall file factual returns with respect to Petitioner Lal within 30 calendar days of a ruling on the relevant cases from the Court of Appeals. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on October 29, 2006. (lcckk1)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: 10/18/2006 Notice of Related Case
                                                          NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by SABAR LAL, ZABARDAST. Case related to Case No. 05-313. (td, ).
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: 10/18/2006 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
                                                            PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 139321.)filed by SABAR LAL, ZABARDAST. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(td, ).
                                                              LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 170 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?