AMERICAN-ARAB ANTI DISCRIMINATION COMMITTEE v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-01770-JR
District Judge James Robertson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 29, 2017 at 8:38 PM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo AMERICAN-ARAB ANTI-DISCRIMINATION COMMITTEE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael D. Shumsky +1 202 879 5228 +1 202 654 9628 mshumsky@kirkland.com
Space Tefft Weldon Smith +1 202 879 5212 +1 202 879 5200 tsmith@kirkland.com
v.
United States Department of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement United States Department of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Defendant
Officially listed as "IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marcia Kay Sowles +1 202 514 4960 +1 202 616 8470 marcia.sowles@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Homeland Security United States Department of Homeland Security, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marcia Kay Sowles +1 202 514 4960 +1 202 616 8470 marcia.sowles@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 10/17/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County 11001
Terminated 9/28/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, TYPE-I
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 26 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 9/28/2007 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
ORDER granting defendant's motion for summary judgment [14]; denying plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment [18]. Signed by Judge James Robertson on September 28, 2007. (MT)
    LREF
    Legal Document 25 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 9/28/2007 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
    MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge James Robertson on September 28, 2007. (MT)
      LREF
      Legal Document 24 Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: 6/11/2007 Reply to opposition to Motion
      REPLY to opposition to motion re [18] Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by AMERICAN-ARAB ANTI DISCRIMINATION COMMITTEE. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Shumsky, Michael)
        LREF
        Legal Document 23 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: 6/4/2007 Reply to opposition to Motion
        REPLY to opposition to motion re [14] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # (1) Defendants' Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Statement of Material Facts as to Which There is No Genuine Issue# (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Sowles, Marcia)
          LREF
          Legal Document 22 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: 6/4/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
          Memorandum in opposition to re [18] Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # (1) Defendants' Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Statement of Material Facts as to Which There is No Genuine Issue# (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Sowles, Marcia)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: 5/2/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
            MINUTE ORDER granting defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time [21] toJune 24, 2007. Signed by Judge James Robertson on May 2, 2007. (MT)
              LREF
              Legal Document 21 Filed: 4/24/2007, Entered: 4/24/2007, Terminated: 5/2/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to
              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Sowles, Marcia)
                LREF
                Legal Document 20 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: 4/17/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                Memorandum in opposition to re [14] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by AMERICAN-ARAB ANTI DISCRIMINATION COMMITTEE. (Attachments: # (1) Errata Notice)(Shumsky, Michael)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 19 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: 4/17/2007 ERRATA
                  ERRATA To Memorandum In Opposition to Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment And In Support Of Plaintiff's Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment by AMERICAN-ARAB ANTI DISCRIMINATION COMMITTEE [18] Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by AMERICAN-ARAB ANTI DISCRIMINATION COMMITTEE. (Attachments: # (1) Corrected Memorandum In Opposition to Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment And In Support Of Plaintiff's Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment# (2) Exhibit 1 (2004 ICE Annual Report)# (3) Exhibit 2 (Letter from G. Marshall to J. OQuinn, Jan. 18, 2007))(Shumsky, Michael) Modified on 4/18/2007 (lc, ).
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 18 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: 4/16/2007, Terminated: 9/28/2007 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
                    Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by AMERICAN-ARAB ANTI DISCRIMINATION COMMITTEE (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and in Support of Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment# (2) Declaration of Vincent Cannistraro# (3) Response to Defendants' Statement of Facts# (4) Text of Proposed Order)(Shumsky, Michael) Modified on 4/17/2007 (lc, ).
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: 3/20/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                      MINUTE ORDER granting plaintiff's unopposed motion for extension of time [16] to April 15, 2007. Signed by Judge James Robertson on March 20, 2007. (MT)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: 3/9/2007 Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
                        NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re [17] Errata, was entered in error because it was not filed with a notice of errata, and the document has been added to docket entry [16]. (lc, )
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 17 Filed: 3/8/2007, Entered: 3/8/2007 ERRATA
                          ENTERED IN ERROR.....ERRATA Providing A Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time by AMERICAN-ARAB ANTI DISCRIMINATION COMMITTEE [16] Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by AMERICAN-ARAB ANTI DISCRIMINATION COMMITTEE,. (Shumsky, Michael) Modified on 3/9/2007 (lc, ).
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 16 Filed: 3/8/2007, Entered: 3/8/2007, Terminated: 3/20/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by AMERICAN-ARAB ANTI DISCRIMINATION COMMITTEE. (Shumsky, Michael) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/9/2007 (lc, ).
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: 2/6/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                              Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/15/2007. (alr, )
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: 1/31/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                                MINUTE ORDER granting plaintiff's unopposed motion for extension of time [15] to March 15, 2007. Signed by Judge James Robertson on January 31, 2007. (MT)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 15 Filed: 1/29/2007, Entered: 1/29/2007, Terminated: 1/31/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to [14] Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by AMERICAN-ARAB ANTI DISCRIMINATION COMMITTEE. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Shumsky, Michael) Modified on 1/30/2007 (zlc, ).
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 14 Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: 1/18/2007, Terminated: 9/28/2007 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                    MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment# (2) Exhibit A -- Declaration of John P. Clark# (3) Exhibit B -- 9/11 Commission Report (cited pages)# (4) Statement of Facts Statement of Material Facts as to Which There is No Genuine Issue# (5) Text of Proposed Order)(Sowles, Marcia)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: 1/12/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                                      MINUTE ORDER granting defendants' motion for extension of time [13] to January 18, 2007. Signed by Judge James Robertson on January 12, 2007. (MT)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 13 Filed: 12/12/2006, Entered: 12/12/2006, Terminated: 1/12/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Sowles, Marcia)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 12 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: 11/20/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER that defendants have 30 days from the date of this order within which to file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, to file a document production schedule. Signed by Judge James Robertson on November 20, 2006. (MT)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 11 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: 11/16/2006 Answer
                                            Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. Related document: [1] Complaint, filed by AMERICAN-ARAB ANTI DISCRIMINATION COMMITTEE,.(Sowles, Marcia)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 10 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: 11/16/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Marcia Kay Sowles on behalf of all defendants (Sowles, Marcia)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 9 Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: 10/23/2006 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC
                                                RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney. (Shumsky, Michael)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: 10/23/2006 Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
                                                  NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re [5] Affidavit, [6] Affidavit, [4] Affidavit, [3] Affidavit were entered in error and have been refiled in the correct category by the Court. (zlc, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 8 Filed: 10/20/2006, Entered: 10/23/2006 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 10/17/2006, answer due 12/18/2006; IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT served on 10/17/2006, answer due 12/18/2006. (zlc, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 7 Filed: 10/20/2006, Entered: 10/23/2006 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 10/17/2006. (zlc, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 6 Filed: 10/20/2006, Entered: 10/20/2006 Affidavit
                                                        ENTERED IN ERROR.....AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint Executed Upon the Department of Homeland Security on 10/18/06 by AMERICAN-ARAB ANTI DISCRIMINATION COMMITTEE. (Shumsky, Michael) Modified on 10/23/2006 (zlc, ).
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 5 Filed: 10/20/2006, Entered: 10/20/2006 Affidavit
                                                          ENTERED IN ERROR.....AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint Executed Upon Immigration and Customs Enforcement on 10/18/06 by AMERICAN-ARAB ANTI DISCRIMINATION COMMITTEE. (Shumsky, Michael) Modified on 10/23/2006 (zlc, ).
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 4 Filed: 10/20/2006, Entered: 10/20/2006 Affidavit
                                                            ENTERED IN ERROR.....AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint Executed Upon U.S. Attorney for D.C. Jeffrey Taylor on 10/18/06 by AMERICAN-ARAB ANTI DISCRIMINATION COMMITTEE. (Shumsky, Michael) Modified on 10/23/2006 (zlc, ).
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 3 Filed: 10/20/2006, Entered: 10/20/2006 Affidavit
                                                              ENTERED IN ERROR.....AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint Executed Upon U.S. Attorney General Alberto Gonzales on 10/18/06 by AMERICAN-ARAB ANTI DISCRIMINATION COMMITTEE. (Shumsky, Michael) Modified on 10/23/2006 (zlc, ).
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 2 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: 10/18/2006 LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Aff
                                                                LCvR 7.1 - CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN-ARAB ANTI DISCRIMINATION COMMITTEE (lc, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: 10/18/2006 Complaint
                                                                  COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 139343.)filed by AMERICAN-ARAB ANTI DISCRIMINATION COMMITTEE. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet # (2) Exhibit 1# (3) Exhibit 2# (4) Exhibit 3# (5) Exhibit 4# (6) Exhibit 5# (7) Exhibit 6# (8) Exhibit 7# (9) Exhibit 8)(lc, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: 10/18/2006 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                                                    SUMMONS (4) Issued as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (lc, )
                                                                      LREF

                                                                      Statistics

                                                                      This case has been viewed 136 times.

                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                      Space
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                       
                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                      Need Password Help?