GUL, et al. v. BUSH
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-01760-RMU
District Judge Ricardo M. Urbina, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo ABDUL HADI, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shayana Devendra Kadidal +1 212 614 6438 +1 212 614 6499 kadidal@ccrjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by scs-law.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Scanlan, Jr. +1 210 224 4491 wscanlan@scs-law.com
No Logo MOHAMMED GUL, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shayana Devendra Kadidal +1 212 614 6438 +1 212 614 6499 kadidal@ccrjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by moment.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Thomas Ratliff +1 512 232 4857 +1 512 471 6988 jratliff@moment.net

Toggle Switch Represented by scs-law.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Scanlan, Jr. +1 210 224 4491 wscanlan@scs-law.com
v.
No Logo DONALD RUMSFELD, Respondent

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Bush, George Walker Bush, George Walker, Respondent
Officially listed as "GEORGE W. BUSH"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo HARRY B. HARRIS, JR., Respondent

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo WADE F. DAVIS, Respondent

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Office Washington, DC
Filed 10/16/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County 99999
Terminated 8/27/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case
Related Case
105-cv-00313-CKK
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, GITMO, HABEAS, TYPE-G
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 25 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 Status Report
STATUS REPORT In Response To Court's July 3, 2008 Order by GEORGE W. BUSH, JR. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit)(Warden, Andrew)
    LREF
    Legal Document 24 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/10/2008 Substitution of Counsel
    NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Shayana Devendra Kadidal on behalf of MOHAMMED GUL, ABDUL HADI Substituting for attorney Barbara J. Olshansky (Kadidal, Shayana)
      LREF
      Legal Document 23 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER by Judge Thomas F. Hogan IN RE: PETITIONERS SEEKING HABEAS CORPUS RELIEF IN RELATION TO PRIOR DETENTIONS AT GUANTANAMO BAY; status reports due by 5:30 p.m. on Monday, July 14, 2008. (gt )
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008 Order
        MINUTE ORDER advising the parties that the Court has been alerted to a number of cases that were identified in the July 3, 2008 order that previously were dismissed by the Judge to whom the case originally was assigned. Accordingly, if a petitioner's case previously was dismissed the parties may disregard the July 3, 2008 order and need not file the required status report. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on July 3, 2008. (lctfh2) (Entered: 07/03/2008)
          LREF
          Legal Document 22 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/13/2008 ~Notice (other)
          N0TICE Of Report Regarding Preservation Filed by GEORGE BUSH, et al.(jeb, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 21 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: 8/27/2007 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
            ORDER granting [20] Petitioner's Motion to Dismiss without prejudice. Signed by Judge Ricardo M. Urbina on August 27, 2007. (jwd)
              LREF
              Legal Document 20 Filed: 8/9/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007, Terminated: 8/27/2007 Motion to Dismiss
              First MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by MOHAMMED GUL (Ratliff, John)
                LREF
                Legal Document 19 Filed: 8/2/2007, Entered: 8/2/2007 Response to any document
                RESPONSE to [18] Notice of Recent Activity and Request for Ruling on Motions for Entry of Protective Order and Advance Notice of Transfer filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS. (Henry, Terry) Modified on 8/3/2007 (nmw, ).
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 18 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/19/2007 ~Notice (other)
                  NOTICE Of Recent Activity in Guantanamo cases and Request for Ruling on Motion for Entry of Amended Protective Order and Motion for Order Requiring 30-Days Notice of Removal of Petitioner from Guantanamo by GEORGE W. BUSH (Ratliff, John)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 17 Filed: 5/21/2007, Entered: 5/21/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                    NOTICE of Appearance by William Scanlan, Jr. on behalf of MOHAMMED GUL (Ratliff, John) Modified on 5/22/2007 (nmw, ).
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 16 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: 5/14/2007 Reply to opposition to Motion
                      REPLY to opposition to motion re [12] MOTION to Dismiss filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Luh, James)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 15 Filed: 5/6/2007, Entered: 5/6/2007 Response to any document
                        RESPONSE to [12] Motion to Dismiss filed by MOHAMMED GUL. (Ratliff, John) Modified on 5/7/2007 (nmw, ).
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 14 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: 5/3/2007 ~Notice (other)
                          NOTICE of Filing by MOHAMMED GUL (Ratliff, John)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 13 Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: 4/26/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                            ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Appearance by John Ratliff on behalf of MOHAMMED GUL (Ratliff, John) Modified on 4/27/2007 (nmw, ).
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/19/2007, Entered: 4/19/2007, Terminated: 8/27/2007 Motion to Dismiss
                              MOTION to Dismiss by Respondents. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-Second Declaration of Karen L. Hecker# (2) Exhibit B-List of Released Enemy Combatant Detainees# (3) Exhibit C-List of Released-No Longer Enemy Combatant Detainees# (4) Exhibit D-USCA Judgment-Kiyemba# (5) Exhibit E-USCA Judgment re: Paracha# (6) Exhibit F-Declaration of Matthew C. Waxman# (7) Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:02-cv-00299-CKK et al.(jeb) (jeb, ).
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 11 Filed: 3/31/2007, Entered: 3/31/2007 Memorandum
                                MEMORANDUM by MOHAMMED GUL. (Ratliff, John)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 10 Filed: 3/16/2007, Entered: 3/16/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                  Memorandum in opposition to re [7] First MOTION for Order REQUIRING RESPONDENTS TO PROVIDE COUNSEL FOR PETITIONER AND THE COURT WITH 30-DAYS? ADVANCE NOTICE OF ANY INTENDED REMOVAL OF PETITIONER FROM GUANTANAMO filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Waxman Decl.# (2) Exhibit 2 - Prosper Decl.# (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Oldham, Nicholas)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 9 Filed: 3/16/2007, Entered: 3/16/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                    Memorandum in opposition to re [8] First MOTION for Order to Show CauseSecond MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by GEORGE W. BUSH, DONALD RUMSFELD, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, WADE F. DAVIS. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Luh, James)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 8 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: 3/12/2007, Terminated: 8/27/2007 ~Motion for Order to Show Cause
                                      First MOTION for Order to Show Cause, Second MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by MOHAMMED GUL. (Ratliff, John)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/7/2007, Entered: 3/7/2007 Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
                                        NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. [6] was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading. (nmw, )
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: 3/6/2007, Terminated: 8/27/2007 Motion for Order
                                          First MOTION for Order REQUIRING RESPONDENTS TO PROVIDE COUNSEL FOR PETITIONER AND THE COURT WITH 30-DAYS? ADVANCE NOTICE OF ANY INTENDED REMOVAL OF PETITIONER FROM GUANTANAMO by MOHAMMED GUL. (Ratliff, John)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: 3/6/2007, Terminated: 3/7/2007 ~Motion for Order to Show Cause
                                            ENTERED IN ERROR.....First MOTION for Order to Show Cause by MOHAMMED GUL. (Ratliff, John) Modified on 3/7/2007 (nmw, ).
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 5 Filed: 1/25/2007, Entered: 1/25/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Judry Laeb Subar on behalf of respondents.
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 4 Filed: 12/19/2006, Entered: 12/19/2006 Notice of Appearance/
                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Terry Marcus Henry on behalf of Respondents
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 12/8/2006, Entered: 12/8/2006 Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
                                                  NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. [3] was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading. (nmw, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 12/7/2006, Entered: 12/7/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                                    ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Certificate of Service by MOHAMMED GUL, ABDUL HADI (Olshansky, Barbara) Modified on 12/8/2006 (nmw, ).
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 10/19/2006, Entered: 10/20/2006 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                      Case Reassigned to Judge Ricardo M. Urbina. Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly no longer assigned to the case. (td, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: 10/19/2006 Notice of Related Case
                                                        NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by MOHAMMED GUL, ABDUL HADI. Case related to Case No. 05-313. (td, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: 10/19/2006 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
                                                          PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 139317.)filed by MOHAMMED GUL, ABDUL HADI. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(td, )
                                                            LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 215 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?