Wireless Communications Privacy Method And System
Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 08226717
Examiner David C Cain, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Stewart, Brett B., Applicant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pepper Hamilton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Russell J. Barron +1 617 204 5127 barronr@pepperlaw.com
Space William David Belanger +1 617 204 5101 +1 617 204 5150 belangerw@pepperlaw.com
Space John Brancolini +1 412 391 6431
Space Stephen P. Cole +1 617 348 1605 +1 617 204 5150 colesp@pepperlaw.com
Space MARK DELUCA. +1 610 640 7855
Space Kurt L. Ehresman +1 717 257 7572 ehresmank@pepperlaw.com
Space N. Endejann +1 215 981 4077
Space Bryan Giles +1 302 281 3664
Space Joseph Theodore Helmsen +1 412 454 5804 +1 412 281 0717 helmsenj@pepperlaw.com
Space KATHLEEN A. JOHNSON +1 215 981 4000
Space Michael K Jones +1 215 981 4405 +1 215 981 4750 jonesmk@pepperlaw.com
Space PAUL K. LEGAARD. +1 610 640 7859
Space Gregory D. Len +1 617 204 5100 +1 617 204 5150 leng@pepperlaw.com
Space Frank D. Liu +1 617 204 5117 +1 617 204 5150 liuf@pepperlaw.com
Space Alison L McCarthy +1 617 204 5100 +1 617 204 5150 mccartha@pepperlaw.com
Space Raymond A. Miller +1 412 454 5000
Space Jay R Mitchell +1 617 970 2658 +1 215 981 4750 mitchejr@pepperlaw.com
Space Aparna Nemlekar +1 412 454 5021
Space Michael A. Patane +1 215 981 4997 patanem@pepperlaw.com
Space Michael T Renaud +1 617 204 5103 +1 617 204 5150 renaudm@pepperlaw.com
Space Daniel M. Scolnick,. +1 610 640 7820
Space FENG SHAO. +1 215 981 4142
Space Neda Sharifi +1 904 415 9552
Space Anne M Shyjan +1 617 204 5100 +1 617 204 5150 shyjana@pepperlaw.com
Space James M. Singer +1 412 454 5000 +1 412 281 0717 singerj@pepperlaw.com
Space JOSHUA R. SLAVITT +1 215 981 4680 +1 215 981 2750 slavittj@pepperlaw.com
Space Brienne Terril +1 412 454 5882
Space ERIK N. VIDELOCK +1 215 981 4027 +1 215 981 4750 videlocke@pepperlaw.com
Space Curtis Wadsworth +1 412 454 5000
Space JOHN A. ZURAWSKI. +1 610 640 7852
Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Stewart, Brett B., Austin, TX (US)
Filing Date April 12, 1994
Status Patented Case
Status Date Unknown
Location Electronic
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number 133757.16301
Confirmation Number 1709
Group Art Unit 2202
Class / Sub-Class 380 / 49
  Entries (91) Tab Overlap Assignments (9) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 2/3/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
Change in Power of Attorney (May Include Associate POA)
    LREF
    Blank  Filed: 2/3/2010, Entered: None 1 - N570
    Communication - Re: Power of Attorney (PTOL-308) (08226717-2010-02-03-00001-N570.pdf Pages)
      LREF
      Blank  Filed: 2/3/2010, Entered: None 1 - N570
      Communication - Re: Power of Attorney (PTOL-308) (08226717-2010-02-03-00002-N570.pdf Pages)
        LREF
        Blank  Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: None Transaction History
        Correspondence Address Change
          LREF
          Blank  Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None 2 - N417
          EFS Acknowledgment Receipt (08226717-2010-01-25-00001-N417.pdf Pages)
            LREF
            Blank  Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None 1 - R3.73B
            Assignee showing of ownership per 37 CFR 3.73(b). (08226717-2010-01-25-00002-R3.73B.pdf Pages)
              LREF
              Blank  Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None 1 - PA..
              Power of Attorney (08226717-2010-01-25-00003-PA...pdf Pages)
                LREF
                Blank  Filed: 12/4/2009, Entered: None 1 - RXOGNOTC
                Notice of Reexam Published in Official Gazette (08226717-2009-12-04-00001-RXOGNOTC.pdf Pages)
                  LREF
                  Blank  Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: None 1 - SOL.NTC.SUIT
                  Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (08226717-2009-07-07-00001-SOL.NTC.SUIT.pdf Pages)
                    LREF
                    Blank  Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: None 1 - SOL.NTC.SUIT
                    Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (08226717-2008-07-01-00001-SOL.NTC.SUIT.pdf Pages)
                      LREF
                      Blank  Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: None 1 - SOL.NTC.SUIT
                      Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (08226717-2008-01-29-00001-SOL.NTC.SUIT.pdf Pages)
                        LREF
                        Blank  Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: None 1 - SOL.NTC.SUIT
                        Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (08226717-2008-01-17-00001-SOL.NTC.SUIT.pdf Pages)
                          LREF
                          Blank  Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: None 1 - SOL.NTC.SUIT
                          Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent. (08226717-2008-01-17-00002-SOL.NTC.SUIT.pdf Pages)
                            LREF
                            Blank  Filed: 1/7/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
                            Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
                              LREF
                              Blank  Filed: 1/7/1997, Entered: None 1 - CTMS
                              Miscellaneous Action with SSP (08226717-1997-01-07-00001-CTMS.pdf Pages)
                                LREF
                                Blank  Filed: 12/2/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
                                Issue Notification Mailed
                                  LREF
                                  Blank  Filed: 11/2/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
                                  Drawing(s) Processing Completed
                                    LREF
                                    Blank  Filed: 10/31/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
                                    Application Received to Match Drawing(s)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank  Filed: 10/31/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
                                      Drawing(s) Matched to Application
                                        LREF
                                        Blank  Filed: 10/30/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
                                        Drawing(s) Received at Publications
                                          LREF
                                          Blank  Filed: 10/30/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
                                          Application Ordered to Match Drawing(s)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank  Filed: 10/22/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
                                            Mailroom Date of Drawing(s)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank  Filed: 10/22/1996, Entered: None 4 - DRW
                                              Drawings-only black and white line drawings (08226717-1996-10-22-00001-DRW.pdf Pages)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank  Filed: 10/22/1996, Entered: None 1 - TRAN.LET
                                                Transmittal Letter (08226717-1996-10-22-00002-TRAN.LET.pdf Pages)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank  Filed: 10/22/1996, Entered: None 2 - LET.
                                                  Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (08226717-1996-10-22-00003-LET..pdf Pages)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank  Filed: 10/22/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                    Change in Power of Attorney (May Include Associate POA)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank  Filed: 10/8/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                      Drawing(s) Processing Completed
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank  Filed: 10/2/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                        Drawing(s) Matched to Application
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank  Filed: 9/18/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                          Application Received to Match Drawing(s)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank  Filed: 9/11/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                            Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank  Filed: 9/11/1996, Entered: None 2 - NOA
                                                              Notice of Allowance and Fees Due (PTOL-85) (08226717-1996-09-11-00001-NOA.pdf Pages)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank  Filed: 9/11/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                Mail Notice of Allowance
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank  Filed: 8/7/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                  Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank  Filed: 7/27/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                    Response after Non-Final Action
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank  Filed: 7/22/1996, Entered: None 5 - REM
                                                                      Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (08226717-1996-07-22-00001-REM.pdf Pages)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank  Filed: 7/22/1996, Entered: None 27 - CLM
                                                                        Claims (08226717-1996-07-22-00002-CLM.pdf Pages)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank  Filed: 7/22/1996, Entered: None 1 - A...
                                                                          Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (08226717-1996-07-22-00003-A....pdf Pages)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank  Filed: 4/17/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                            Letter Restarting Period for Response (i.e. Letter re: References)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank  Filed: 4/17/1996, Entered: None 1 - 1449
                                                                              List of References cited by applicant and considered by examiner (08226717-1996-04-17-00001-1449.pdf Pages)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank  Filed: 4/17/1996, Entered: None 1 - 892
                                                                                List of references cited by examiner (08226717-1996-04-17-00002-892.pdf Pages)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 4/17/1996, Entered: None 8 - CTNF
                                                                                  Non-Final Rejection (08226717-1996-04-17-00003-CTNF.pdf Pages)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 4/17/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                    Mail Notice of Restarted Response Period
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 4/15/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                      Mail Non-Final Rejection
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 4/15/1996, Entered: None 1 - CTNF
                                                                                        Non-Final Rejection (08226717-1996-04-15-00001-CTNF.pdf Pages)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 4/12/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                          Withdrawal of Notice of Allowance
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 4/12/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                            Non-Final Rejection
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 4/12/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                              Withdrawal of Allowance Action Count
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 4/12/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 3/25/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                  Mail-Petition Decision - Granted
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 3/25/1996, Entered: None 1 - N416
                                                                                                    Notice of Withdrawal from Issue Branch (PTOL-67) (08226717-1996-03-25-00001-N416.pdf Pages)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 3/21/1996, Entered: None 1 - LET.
                                                                                                      Miscellaneous Incoming Letter (08226717-1996-03-21-00001-LET..pdf Pages)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 3/20/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                        Petition Entered
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 12/22/1995, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                          Application Ordered to Match Drawing(s)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 12/21/1995, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                            Drawing(s) Received at Publications
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 12/8/1995, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                              Mailroom Date of Drawing(s)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 12/8/1995, Entered: None 4 - DRW
                                                                                                                Drawings-only black and white line drawings (08226717-1995-12-08-00001-DRW.pdf Pages)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 12/8/1995, Entered: None 3 - TRAN.LET
                                                                                                                  Transmittal Letter (08226717-1995-12-08-00002-TRAN.LET.pdf Pages)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 12/8/1995, Entered: None 2 - IFEE
                                                                                                                    Issue Fee Payment (PTO-85B) (08226717-1995-12-08-00003-IFEE.pdf Pages)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 12/5/1995, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                      Issue Fee Payment Verified
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 9/13/1995, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                        Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 9/13/1995, Entered: None 3 - NOA
                                                                                                                          Notice of Allowance and Fees Due (PTOL-85) (08226717-1995-09-13-00001-NOA.pdf Pages)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 9/13/1995, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                            Mail Notice of Allowance
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 9/7/1995, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                              Date Forwarded to Examiner
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 8/7/1995, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                Request for Extension of Time - Granted
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 8/7/1995, Entered: None 1 - XT/
                                                                                                                                  Extension of Time (08226717-1995-08-07-00001-XT-.pdf Pages)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 8/7/1995, Entered: None 4 - REM
                                                                                                                                    Applicant Arguments/Remarks Made in an Amendment (08226717-1995-08-07-00002-REM.pdf Pages)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 8/7/1995, Entered: None 2 - CLM
                                                                                                                                      Claims (08226717-1995-08-07-00003-CLM.pdf Pages)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 8/7/1995, Entered: None 1 - A...
                                                                                                                                        Amendment/Req. Reconsideration-After Non-Final Reject (08226717-1995-08-07-00004-A....pdf Pages)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 8/7/1995, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                          Response after Non-Final Action
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 3/30/1995, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                            Mail Non-Final Rejection
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 3/30/1995, Entered: None 1 - NFDR
                                                                                                                                              Notice of Formal Drawings Required (08226717-1995-03-30-00001-NFDR.pdf Pages)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 3/30/1995, Entered: None 1 - 892
                                                                                                                                                List of references cited by examiner (08226717-1995-03-30-00002-892.pdf Pages)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 3/30/1995, Entered: None 3 - CTNF
                                                                                                                                                  Non-Final Rejection (08226717-1995-03-30-00003-CTNF.pdf Pages)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 3/29/1995, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                    Non-Final Rejection
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 9/12/1994, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                      Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 9/12/1994, Entered: None 2 - TRAN.LET
                                                                                                                                                        Transmittal Letter (08226717-1994-09-12-00001-TRAN.LET.pdf Pages)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 6/16/1994, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                          Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 6/14/1994, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                            Transfer Inquiry
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 5/14/1994, Entered: None Transaction History
                                                                                                                                                              Application Captured on Microfilm
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 4/12/1994, Entered: None 1 - FWCLM
                                                                                                                                                                Index of Claims (08226717-1994-04-12-00001-FWCLM.pdf Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 4/12/1994, Entered: None 1 - IIFW
                                                                                                                                                                  Issue Information including classification, examiner, name, claim, renumbering, etc. (08226717-1994-04-12-00002-IIFW.pdf Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 4/12/1994, Entered: None 1 - SRFW
                                                                                                                                                                    Search information including classification, databases and other search related notes (08226717-1994-04-12-00003-SRFW.pdf Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 4/12/1994, Entered: None 1 - IIFW
                                                                                                                                                                      Issue Information including classification, examiner, name, claim, renumbering, etc. (08226717-1994-04-12-00004-IIFW.pdf Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 4/12/1994, Entered: None 1 - WFEE
                                                                                                                                                                        Fee Worksheet (PTO-875) (08226717-1994-04-12-00005-WFEE.pdf Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 4/12/1994, Entered: None 1 - WFEE
                                                                                                                                                                          Fee Worksheet (PTO-875) (08226717-1994-04-12-00006-WFEE.pdf Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 4/12/1994, Entered: None 3 - OATH
                                                                                                                                                                            Oath or Declaration filed (08226717-1994-04-12-00007-OATH.pdf Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 4/12/1994, Entered: None 1 - ABST
                                                                                                                                                                              Abstract (08226717-1994-04-12-00008-ABST.pdf Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 4/12/1994, Entered: None 17 - CLM
                                                                                                                                                                                Claims (08226717-1994-04-12-00009-CLM.pdf Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 4/12/1994, Entered: None 1 - SPEC
                                                                                                                                                                                  Specification (08226717-1994-04-12-00010-SPEC.pdf Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 4/12/1994, Entered: None 4 - DRW
                                                                                                                                                                                    Drawings-only black and white line drawings (08226717-1994-04-12-00011-DRW.pdf Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 4/12/1994, Entered: None 2 - TRNA
                                                                                                                                                                                      Transmittal of New Application (08226717-1994-04-12-00012-TRNA.pdf Pages)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 51 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?