BREDELL v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, et al.
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-01857-RCL
District Judge Royce C. Lamberth, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JOYCE B. BREDELL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Reuben B. Collins, II +1 301 934 4366 +1 301 934 1668 rburtonc@yahoo.com
v.
No Logo DIRK KEMPTHORNE, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Office Washington, DC
Filed 10/31/2006
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $750000
Nature of Suit 445 - Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Transfer to Another District
County 88888
Terminated 7/11/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, JURY, TRANSFERRED, TYPE-L
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: 7/30/2008 Receipt for Transfer Papers
Receipt on 7/24/2007 of Transfer Papers. Other Court Number 07cv718 sent by USDC Eastern District of Virginia. (tg, )
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: 7/23/2007 Case Transferred Out
    Case transferred out to the USDC Eastern District of Virginia, pursuant to Court Order entered 7/10/07. Sent to Court by ECF electronic transfer. (tg, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 19 Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: 7/10/2007 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
      ORDER DENYING [16] Motion to Dismiss; GRANTING Motion to Transfer Case [17]; and ORDERING that The transferee Court shall set a date for a response to the complaint herein after the complaint is docketed in the transferee district; and further ORDERING that this action shall be TRANSFERRED to the Eastern District of Virginia. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/10/07. (lcrcl2, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 18 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
        Memorandum in opposition to re [17] MOTION to Transfer Case [16] motion to dismiss filed by JOYCE B. BREDELL. (Collins, Reuben) Modified on 6/4/2007 (tg, ).
          LREF
          Blank 17 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: 5/21/2007 Motion to Transfer Case
          MOTION (in the alternative) to Transfer Case by DIRK KEMPTHORNE. (See Docket Entry [16] to view document). (nmw, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 16 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: 5/18/2007, Terminated: 7/10/2007 Motion to Dismiss
            MOTION to Dismiss Or, In The alternative, To Transfer Venue by DIRK KEMPTHORNE (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Declaration of Carl Renville, Jr.)(Kidwell, Judith)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: 5/15/2007 Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
              NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re [15] Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint for Damages and Equitable Relief was entered in error. The Motion was not uploaded. Counsel was instructed to refile said pleading. (tg, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 15 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: 5/8/2007, Terminated: 7/11/2007 Motion to Amend/Correct
                ENTERED IN ERROR.....Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint for Damages and Equitable Relief by JOYCE B. BREDELL (Collins, Reuben) Modified on 5/15/2007 (tg, ).
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 5/4/2007, Entered: 5/4/2007 Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
                  NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re [13] Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct First Amended Complaint was entered in error. The clerk properly filed the Amended Complaint under docket entry number [14]. (tg, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 14 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: 5/4/2007 Amended Complaint
                    First AMENDED COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, DIRK KEMPTHORNE filed by JOYCE B. BREDELL.(tg, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 13 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: 5/3/2007, Terminated: 5/4/2007 Motion to Amend/Correct
                      ENTERED IN ERROR.....Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct First Amended Complaint by JOYCE B. BREDELL (Collins, Reuben) Modified on 5/4/2007 (tg, ).
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: 4/3/2007 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                        ORDER DENYING [7] Motion to Dismiss; DENYING [8] Motion for a more definite statement, and ORDERING that plaintiff shall file her amended complaint within 30 days of this date. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/3/07. (lcrcl2, )
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: 4/3/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting nunc pro tunc [9] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, and ORDERING that plaintiff's response to defendant's motion to dismiss or for more definite statement may be filed by March 30, 2007. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/3/07. (lcrcl2, )
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: 4/3/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                            Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Amended Complaint due by 5/3/2007. (rje)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 10 Filed: 3/30/2007, Entered: 3/30/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                              Memorandum in opposition to re [7] MOTION to Dismiss or In the Alternative, Motion for a More Definite Statement filed by JOYCE B. BREDELL. (Collins, Reuben)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 9 Filed: 3/16/2007, Entered: 3/16/2007, Terminated: 4/3/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, or In the Alternative, Motion for a more Definite Statement by JOYCE B. BREDELL (Collins, Reuben)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 8 Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: 3/6/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                  MOTION for a More Definite Statement by DIRK KEMPTHORNE. (tg, )(See docket number [7] for scanned document).
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: 3/5/2007, Terminated: 4/3/2007 Motion to Dismiss
                                    MOTION to Dismiss or In the Alternative, Motion for a More Definite Statement by DIRK KEMPTHORNE. (Attachments: # (1))(Kidwell, Judith)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: 2/12/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Kidwell on behalf of DIRK KEMPTHORNE (Kidwell, Judith)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 1/26/2007, Entered: 1/26/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to DIRK KEMPTHORNE served on 1/25/2007, answer due 3/26/2007. (Attachments: # (1))(Collins, Reuben)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/26/2007, Entered: 1/26/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                          RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA served on 1/25/2007, answer due 3/26/2007. (Attachments: # (1))(Collins, Reuben)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/26/2007, Entered: 1/26/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                                            RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 1/25/07. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Return of Service)(Collins, Reuben)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: 1/19/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                              Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Proof of Service or Status Memorandum due by 1/31/2007. (rje) Modified on 1/19/2007 (rje, ).
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/17/2007, Entered: 1/17/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER that plaintiff shall, within the next ten (10) days, file with the Clerk of Court either proof of service or a status memorandum indicating all steps taken to date to effect service. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 1/17/2007. (ASB )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: 11/1/2006 Complaint
                                                  COMPLAINT against DIRK KEMPTHORNE ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 139900.)filed by JOYCE B. BREDELL. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(lc, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: 11/1/2006 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                                    SUMMONS (3) Issued as to DIRK KEMPTHORNE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (lc, )
                                                      LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 143 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?