GRESHAM v. NORTON
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-01859-JR
District Judge James Robertson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo RAYMOND GRESHAM, JR., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donna Williams Rucker +1 301 496 0400 +1 202 496 0404 ruck92@aol.com
v.
No Logo GALE A. NORTON, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen L. Melnik +1 202 307 0338 karen.melnik@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 10/31/2006
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County 11001
Terminated 7/24/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, JURY, TYPE-H
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 9 Filed: 3/28/2007, Entered: 3/28/2007 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal by RAYMOND GRESHAM, JR. (Rucker, Donna)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: 3/15/2007 Set/Reset Hearings
    Set Hearing: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/30/2007 04:30 PM in Courtroom 23A before Judge James Robertson. (alr)
      LREF
      Legal Document 8 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: 2/21/2007 Answer to Amended Complaint
      ANSWER to Amended Complaint by GALE A. NORTON. Related document: [2] Amended Complaint filed by RAYMOND GRESHAM, JR..(Melnik, Karen)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 2/8/2007, Entered: 2/8/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines:
        Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 2/22/2007. (alr, )
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: 1/12/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
          MINUTE ORDER granting [7] defendant's consented motion for extension of time [7] to February 22, 2007. Signed by Judge James Robertson on January 12, 2007. (MT)
            LREF
            Legal Document 7 Filed: 1/11/2007, Entered: 1/11/2007, Terminated: 1/12/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by GALE A. NORTON. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Melnik, Karen)
              LREF
              Legal Document 6 Filed: 1/11/2007, Entered: 1/11/2007 Notice of Appearance/
              NOTICE of Appearance by Karen L. Melnik on behalf of GALE A. NORTON (Melnik, Karen)
                LREF
                Legal Document 5 Filed: 12/1/2006, Entered: 12/1/2006 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to GALE A. NORTON served on 11/27/2006, answer due 1/26/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Green Card)(Rucker, Donna)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 12/1/2006, Entered: 12/1/2006 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC
                  RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney. GALE A. NORTON served on 11/24/2006, answer due 1/23/2007 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Green Card)(Rucker, Donna)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 12/1/2006, Entered: 12/1/2006 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                    RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General November 24, 2006. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Green Card)(Rucker, Donna)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 11/3/2006, Entered: 11/3/2006 Summons Reissued as to USA
                      SUMMONS (3) REISSUED as to GALE A. NORTON, and non-parties U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (lc, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 11/2/2006, Entered: 11/3/2006 Amended Complaint
                        AMENDED COMPLAINT against GALE A. NORTON filed by RAYMOND GRESHAM, JR.(lc, )
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: 11/2/2006 Complaint
                          COMPLAINT against GALE A. NORTON ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 4616000012.)filed by RAYMOND GRESHAM, JR. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(lc, )
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: 11/2/2006 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                            SUMMONS (3) Issued as to GALE A. NORTON, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (lc, )
                              LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 96 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?