WASHINGTON v. BROWN COUNTY SHERIFF DEPARTMENT
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-01977-UNA

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 7:01 AM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo LARRY C. WASHINGTON, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo BENJAMIN S. PURSER, JR., Defendant
No Logo BROWARD COUNTY COURT HOUSE, Defendant
No Logo BROWN COUNTY SHERIFF DEPARTMENT, Defendant
No Logo CITY OF FORT LAUDERDALE POLICE DEPARTMENT, Defendant
No Logo DEPARTMENT OF CHILDRENS AND FAMILY SERVICES, Defendant
No Logo EMSA CORRECTIONAL CARE, INC. (EMSA), Defendant
No Logo EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE GOVERNOR, Defendant
No Logo Florida Department of Corrections, Defendant
No Logo JAMES MCDONOUGH, Defendant
No Logo KEN JENNINGS, Defendant
No Logo LUCY HADI, Defendant
No Logo Prison Health Services, Inc., Defendant
Office Washington, DC
Filed 11/17/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Transfer to Another District
County 88888
Terminated 12/14/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, PROSE-PR, TYPE-F
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 5 Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: 11/20/2006 Order Transfering CaseCourt Filing
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the USDC for the Southern District of Florida. Resolution of plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis is left to the transferee court. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/2/06. (ls, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 4 Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: 11/20/2006 ~Notice (other)
    NOTICE re Exigency order of prohibited restraints by LARRY WASHINGTON (ls, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 3 Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: 11/20/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
      MOTION Requesting Judge of the Extraordinary Circumstances of Sensitive Nature of Facts by LARRY WASHINGTON. (ls, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 2 Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: 11/20/2006 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
        MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by LARRY WASHINGTON. (ls, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: 11/20/2006 Complaint
          COMPLAINT against FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, JAMES MCDONOUGH, PRISON HEALTH SERVICES, INC., BENJAMIN S. PURSER, JR, EMSA CORRECTIONAL CARE, INC. (EMSA), BROWN COUNTY SHERIFF DEPARTMENT, KEN JENNINGS, BROWARD COUNTY COURT HOUSE, CITY OF FORT LAUDERDALE POLICE DEPARTMENT, DEPARTMENT OF CHILDRENS AND FAMILY SERVICES, LUCY HADI, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE GOVERNOR filed by LARRY WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2)(ls, )
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: 11/21/2006 Summons Not Issued
            SUMMONS Not Issued as to FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, JAMES MCDONOUGH, PRISON HEALTH SERVICES, INC., BENJAMIN S. PURSER, JR, EMSA CORRECTIONAL CARE, INC. (EMSA), BROWN COUNTY SHERIFF DEPARTMENT, KEN JENNINGS, BROWARD COUNTY COURT HOUSE, CITY OF FORT LAUDERDALE POLICE DEPARTMENT, DEPARTMENT OF CHILDRENS AND FAMILY SERVICES, LUCY HADI, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE GOVERNOR (ls, )
              LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 18 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?