CELIKGOGUS et al v. RUMSFELD et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-01996-HHK
District Judge Henry H. Kennedy, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo ABU MUHAMMAD, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carolyn P. Blum +1 646 644 3887 +1 212 614 6499 pblum@ccr-ny.org
Space Shayana Devendra Kadidal +1 212 614 6438 +1 212 614 6499 kadidal@ccrjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Heller Ehrman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Russell P. Cohen +1 415 772 6000 +1 415 772 6268 russell.cohen@hellerehrman.com
Space Kit Adelman Pierson +1 202 912 2000 +1 202 912 2020 kpierson@hewm.com
Space Neil A.F. Popovic +1 415 772 6000 +1 415 772 6268 neil.popovic@sheppardmullin.com
Space Robert A. Rosenfeld +1 415 772 6000 +1 415 772 6268 bob.rosenfeld@hellerehrman.com
No Logo IBRAHIM SEN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carolyn P. Blum +1 646 644 3887 +1 212 614 6499 pblum@ccr-ny.org
Space Shayana Devendra Kadidal +1 212 614 6438 +1 212 614 6499 kadidal@ccrjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Heller Ehrman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Russell P. Cohen +1 415 772 6000 +1 415 772 6268 russell.cohen@hellerehrman.com
Space Kit Adelman Pierson +1 202 912 2000 +1 202 912 2020 kpierson@hewm.com
Space Neil A.F. Popovic +1 415 772 6000 +1 415 772 6268 neil.popovic@sheppardmullin.com
Space Robert A. Rosenfeld +1 415 772 6000 +1 415 772 6268 bob.rosenfeld@hellerehrman.com
No Logo NURI MERT, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carolyn P. Blum +1 646 644 3887 +1 212 614 6499 pblum@ccr-ny.org
Space Shayana Devendra Kadidal +1 212 614 6438 +1 212 614 6499 kadidal@ccrjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Heller Ehrman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Russell P. Cohen +1 415 772 6000 +1 415 772 6268 russell.cohen@hellerehrman.com
Space Kit Adelman Pierson +1 202 912 2000 +1 202 912 2020 kpierson@hewm.com
Space Neil A.F. Popovic +1 415 772 6000 +1 415 772 6268 neil.popovic@sheppardmullin.com
Space Robert A. Rosenfeld +1 415 772 6000 +1 415 772 6268 bob.rosenfeld@hellerehrman.com
No Logo YUKSEL CELIKGOGUS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carolyn P. Blum +1 646 644 3887 +1 212 614 6499 pblum@ccr-ny.org
Space Shayana Devendra Kadidal +1 212 614 6438 +1 212 614 6499 kadidal@ccrjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Heller Ehrman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Russell P. Cohen +1 415 772 6000 +1 415 772 6268 russell.cohen@hellerehrman.com
Space Kit Adelman Pierson +1 202 912 2000 +1 202 912 2020 kpierson@hewm.com
Space Robert A. Rosenfeld +1 415 772 6000 +1 415 772 6268 bob.rosenfeld@hellerehrman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sheppard Mullin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Neil A.F. Popovic +1 415 772 6000 +1 415 772 6268 neil.popovic@sheppardmullin.com
No Logo ZAKIRJAN HASAM, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carolyn P. Blum +1 646 644 3887 +1 212 614 6499 pblum@ccr-ny.org
Space Shayana Devendra Kadidal +1 212 614 6438 +1 212 614 6499 kadidal@ccrjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Heller Ehrman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Russell P. Cohen +1 415 772 6000 +1 415 772 6268 russell.cohen@hellerehrman.com
Space Kit Adelman Pierson +1 202 912 2000 +1 202 912 2020 kpierson@hewm.com
Space Neil A.F. Popovic +1 415 772 6000 +1 415 772 6268 neil.popovic@sheppardmullin.com
Space Robert A. Rosenfeld +1 415 772 6000 +1 415 772 6268 bob.rosenfeld@hellerehrman.com
v.
No Logo ADOLPH MCQUEEN, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo BANTZ CRADDOCK, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo DONALD RUMSFELD, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo ESTEBAN RODRIGUEZ, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo GEOFFREY MILLER, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo HARRY B. HARRIS, JR., Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo JAMES T. HILL, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo JAY HOOD, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo John Does 1-100, Defendant
No Logo Michael E. Dunlavey, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo MICHAEL LEHNERT, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo MIKE BUMGARNER, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo NELSON J. CANNON, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo PETER PACE, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James George Bartolotto +1 202 616 4174 +1 202 616 4314 james.bartolotto@usdoj.gov
No Logo RICHARD, MYERS &., Defendant
Officially listed as "RICHARD MYERS"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo TERRY CARRICO, Defendant

Represented by United States Department of Justice

No Logo Wade, Dennis, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James George Bartolotto +1 202 616 4174 +1 202 616 4314 james.bartolotto@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 11/21/2006
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 99999
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case
Related Case
104-cv-01864-RMU
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags JURY, STAYED, TYPE-L
  Entries (62) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: None USCA Mandate
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 54 Filed: 2/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    MEMORANDUM OPINION granting defendants' motions to dismiss in Celikgogus 43 and in case # 08cv1677 Al Laithi 10. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on February 1, 2013. (lcrcl5) Modified on 2/1/2013 (rje, ).
      LREF
      Legal Document 39 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: 6/12/2008 Notice of Appearance/
      NOTICE of Appearance by James George Bartolotto on behalf of WADE DENNIS (Bartolotto, James)
        LREF
        Legal Document 38 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: 6/12/2008 Notice of Appearance/
        NOTICE of Appearance by James George Bartolotto on behalf of PETER PACE (Bartolotto, James)
          LREF
          Legal Document 37 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: 4/2/2008 Amended Complaint
          SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against PETER PACE, WADE DENNIS, MICHAEL E. DUNLAVEY, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL LEHNERT, NELSON J. CANNON, TERRY CARRICO, JOHN DOES 1-100, BANTZ CRADDOCK, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, ADOLPH MCQUEEN, MIKE BUMGARNER, ESTEBAN RODRIGUEZ, DONALD RUMSFELD, RICHARD MYERS, GEOFFREY MILLER, JAMES T. HILL filed by YUKSEL CELIKGOGUS, IBRAHIM SEN, NURI MERT, ZAKIRJAN HASAM, ABU MUHAMMAD.(nmw, )
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
            Case reassigned to Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth. Judge Henry H. Kennedy no longer assigned to the case. (ds) (Entered: 12/16/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: 4/1/2008 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
              MINUTE ORDER granting [26] Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on April 1, 2008. (NP)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/13/2011, Entered: None
                NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to YUKSEL CELIKGOGUS, ZAKIRJAN HASAM, NURI MERT, ABU MUHAMMAD, IBRAHIM SEN. Attorney Neil A.F. Popovic terminated. (Popovic, Neil) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: 4/1/2008 Order on Motion to Stay
                  MINUTE ORDER granting [25] Plaintiffs' Motion for Further Stay. Accordingly, all further proceedings in this case are stayed, until the later of (A) the date of decision by the United States Supreme Court in Boumediene v. Bush, Nos. 06-1195/06-1196; or (B) the final resolution of appeals in Rasul v. Rumsfeld, Nos. 06-5209, 06-5222 (D.C. Cir.). Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy on April 1, 2008. (NP)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/21/2010, Entered: None
                    REPLY to opposition to motion re 43 MOTION to Dismiss filed by MIKE BUMGARNER, NELSON J. CANNON, TERRY CARRICO, BANTZ CRADDOCK, WADE DENNIS, MICHAEL E. DUNLAVEY, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, JAMES T. HILL, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL LEHNERT, ADOLPH MCQUEEN, GEOFFREY MILLER, RICHARD MYERS, PETER PACE, ESTEBAN RODRIGUEZ, DONALD RUMSFELD. (Bartolotto, James) (Entered: 05/21/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: 4/1/2008 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                      MINUTE ORDER granting [34] Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice re Russell P. Cohen. Accordingly, Mr. Cohen is admitted to appear pro hac vice in this action on behalf of plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on April 1, 2008. (NP)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None
                        Memorandum in opposition to re 43 MOTION to Dismiss filed by YUKSEL CELIKGOGUS, ZAKIRJAN HASAM, NURI MERT, ABU MUHAMMAD, IBRAHIM SEN. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Russell) (Entered: 04/19/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document 36 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: 3/31/2008 Reply to opposition to Motion
                          REPLY to opposition to motion re [26] MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by YUKSEL CELIKGOGUS, IBRAHIM SEN, NURI MERT, ZAKIRJAN HASAM, ABU MUHAMMAD. (Popovic, Neil)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None
                            ENTERED IN ERROR.....Memorandum in opposition to re 43 MOTION to Dismiss filed by YUKSEL CELIKGOGUS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Russell) Modified on 4/20/2010 (rdj). (Entered: 04/19/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document 35 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: 3/31/2008 Reply to opposition to Motion
                              REPLY to opposition to motion re [25] MOTION to Stay filed by YUKSEL CELIKGOGUS, IBRAHIM SEN, NURI MERT, ZAKIRJAN HASAM, ABU MUHAMMAD. (Popovic, Neil)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: None
                                MOTION to Dismiss by MIKE BUMGARNER, NELSON J. CANNON, TERRY CARRICO, BANTZ CRADDOCK, WADE DENNIS, MICHAEL E. DUNLAVEY, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, JAMES T. HILL, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL LEHNERT, ADOLPH MCQUEEN, GEOFFREY MILLER, RICHARD MYERS, PETER PACE, ESTEBAN RODRIGUEZ, DONALD RUMSFELD (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Scope of Employment, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bartolotto, James) (Entered: 02/19/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document 34 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: 3/31/2008, Terminated: 4/1/2008 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Russell P. Cohen, :Firm- Heller Ehrman LLP, :Address- 333 Bush Street, San Francisco, CA 94104. Phone No. - 415-772-6000. Fax No. - 415-772-6268 by YUKSEL CELIKGOGUS, IBRAHIM SEN, NURI MERT, ZAKIRJAN HASAM, ABU MUHAMMAD (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Russell P. Cohen)(Pierson, Kit)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE of Change of Firm by YUKSEL CELIKGOGUS (Rosenfeld, Robert) (Entered: 12/30/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: 3/25/2008 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                      MINUTE ORDER granting [33] Motion for Neil A.F. Popovi to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Accordingly, attorney Neil A.F. Popovi is permitted to appear pro hac vice on behalf of plaintiffs in this matter. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on March 25, 2008. (NP)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/22/2009, Entered: None
                                        STIPULATION Joint Stipulation on the Schedule for a Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint by YUKSEL CELIKGOGUS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Russell) (Entered: 12/22/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: 3/25/2008 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                          MINUTE ORDER granting [32] Motion for Robert A. Rosenfeld to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Accordingly, attorney Robert A. Rosenfeld is permitted to appear pro hac vice on behalf of plaintiffs in this matter. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on March 25, 2008. (NP)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/22/2009, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE of Change of Firm by YUKSEL CELIKGOGUS (Cohen, Russell) (Entered: 12/22/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document 33 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: 3/24/2008, Terminated: 3/25/2008 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Neil A.F. Popovic, :Firm- Heller Ehrman LLP, :Address- 333 Bush Street, San Francisco, CA 94104. Phone No. - 415-772-6000. Fax No. - 415-772-6268 by YUKSEL CELIKGOGUS, IBRAHIM SEN, NURI MERT, ZAKIRJAN HASAM, ABU MUHAMMAD (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Neil A.F. Popovic)(Pierson, Kit)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 32 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: 3/24/2008, Terminated: 3/25/2008 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Robert A. Rosenfeld, :Firm- Heller Ehrman LLP, :Address- 333 Bush Street, San Francisco, CA 94104. Phone No. - 415-772-6000. Fax No. - 415-772-6268 by YUKSEL CELIKGOGUS, IBRAHIM SEN, NURI MERT, ZAKIRJAN HASAM, ABU MUHAMMAD (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Robert A. Rosenfeld)(Pierson, Kit)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 31 Filed: 3/19/2008, Entered: 3/19/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                  Memorandum in opposition to re [26] MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by MICHAEL E. DUNLAVEY, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL LEHNERT, NELSON J. CANNON, TERRY CARRICO, BANTZ CRADDOCK, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, ADOLPH MCQUEEN, MIKE BUMGARNER, DENNIS WADE, ESTEBAN RODRIGUEZ, DONALD RUMSFELD, RICHARD MYERS, GEOFFREY MILLER, JAMES T. HILL. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Bartolotto, James)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 30 Filed: 3/19/2008, Entered: 3/19/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                    Memorandum in opposition to re [25] MOTION to Stay for Further Stay filed by MICHAEL E. DUNLAVEY, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL LEHNERT, NELSON J. CANNON, TERRY CARRICO, BANTZ CRADDOCK, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, ADOLPH MCQUEEN, MIKE BUMGARNER, DENNIS WADE, ESTEBAN RODRIGUEZ, DONALD RUMSFELD, RICHARD MYERS, GEOFFREY MILLER, JAMES T. HILL. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Proposed Order)(Bartolotto, James)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 29 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: 3/17/2008 ERRATA
                                                      ERRATA re: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by MICHAEL E. DUNLAVEY, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL LEHNERT, NELSON J. CANNON, TERRY CARRICO, BANTZ CRADDOCK, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, ADOLPH MCQUEEN, MIKE BUMGARNER, DENNIS WADE, ESTEBAN RODRIGUEZ, DONALD RUMSFELD, RICHARD MYERS, GEOFFREY MILLER, JAMES T. HILL [27] MOTION to Dismiss filed by MICHAEL LEHNERT, RICHARD MYERS, JAY HOOD, DENNIS WADE, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR., MIKE BUMGARNER, NELSON J. CANNON, ESTEBAN RODRIGUEZ, ADOLPH MCQUEEN, MICHAEL E. DUNLAVEY, DONALD RUMSFELD, BANTZ CRADDOCK, GEOFFREY MILLER, JAMES T. HILL, TERRY CARRICO. (Bartolotto, James)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: 3/14/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                        Reset Deadlines: Response to Dispositive Motions due by 4/23/2008. (tj )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: 3/14/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                                                          MINUTE ORDER granting [28] Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Accordingly, plaintiffs' response is due on or before April 23, 2008. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on March 14, 2008. (NP)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 28 Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: 3/13/2008, Terminated: 3/14/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [27] MOTION to Dismiss by YUKSEL CELIKGOGUS, IBRAHIM SEN, NURI MERT, ZAKIRJAN HASAM, ABU MUHAMMAD (Kadidal, Shayana)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 27 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: 3/10/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                                              MOTION to Dismiss by MICHAEL E. DUNLAVEY, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL LEHNERT, NELSON J. CANNON, TERRY CARRICO, BANTZ CRADDOCK, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, ADOLPH MCQUEEN, MIKE BUMGARNER, DENNIS WADE, ESTEBAN RODRIGUEZ, DONALD RUMSFELD, RICHARD MYERS, GEOFFREY MILLER, JAMES T. HILL (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Certification of Scope of Employment, # (2) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bartolotto, James)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 26 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008, Terminated: 4/1/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by YUKSEL CELIKGOGUS, IBRAHIM SEN, NURI MERT, ZAKIRJAN HASAM, ABU MUHAMMAD (Attachments: # (1) Appendix A: Second Amended Complaint, # (2) Appendix B: Redlined version of Second Amended Complaint (showing only pages containing alterations), # (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Kadidal, Shayana)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 25 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008, Terminated: 4/1/2008 Motion to Stay
                                                                  MOTION to Stay by YUKSEL CELIKGOGUS, IBRAHIM SEN, NURI MERT, ZAKIRJAN HASAM, ABU MUHAMMAD (Attachments: # (1) Appendix A: Petition for Rehearing en banc in Rasul v. Myers, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Kadidal, Shayana)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 24 Filed: 1/24/2008, Entered: 1/24/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by James George Bartolotto on behalf of MICHAEL E. DUNLAVEY, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL LEHNERT, NELSON J. CANNON, TERRY CARRICO, BANTZ CRADDOCK, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, ADOLPH MCQUEEN, MIKE BUMGARNER, DENNIS WADE, ESTEBAN RODRIGUEZ, DONALD RUMSFELD, RICHARD MYERS, GEOFFREY MILLER, JAMES T. HILL (Bartolotto, James)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 23 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: 1/22/2008, Terminated: 1/22/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Amended Complaint by MICHAEL E. DUNLAVEY, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL LEHNERT, NELSON J. CANNON, TERRY CARRICO, BANTZ CRADDOCK, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, ADOLPH MCQUEEN, MIKE BUMGARNER, DENNIS WADE, ESTEBAN RODRIGUEZ, DONALD RUMSFELD, RICHARD MYERS, GEOFFREY MILLER, JAMES T. HILL (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Whitman, James)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: 1/22/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' answer due by 3/11/2008. (NP)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: 1/22/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                          MINUTE ORDER granting [23] Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Amended Complaint. Accordingly, defendants' response to the amended complaint is due on or before March 11, 2008. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on January 22, 2008. (NP)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 22 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                            NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to YUKSEL CELIKGOGUS, IBRAHIM SEN, NURI MERT, ZAKIRJAN HASAM, ABU MUHAMMAD. Attorney William Goodman terminated. (Goodman, William)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 21 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Whitman on behalf of BANTZ CRADDOCK, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, ADOLPH MCQUEEN, MIKE BUMGARNER, DENNIS WADE, ESTEBAN RODRIGUEZ (Whitman, James)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 20 Filed: 5/22/2007, Entered: 5/22/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time toCourt Filing
                                                                                Order denying as moot [18] defendants' motion for extension of time to file answers or other responsive pleadings. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on May 22, 2007. (FL, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 19 Filed: 5/22/2007, Entered: 5/22/2007 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
                                                                                  Order granting [13] defendants' motion to stay re [12]. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on May 22, 2007. (FL, ) Modified on 5/22/2007 (FL, ).
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 18 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: 5/18/2007, Terminated: 5/22/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answers or Other Responsive Pleadings by MICHAEL E. DUNLAVEY, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL LEHNERT, NELSON J. CANNON, TERRY CARRICO, DONALD RUMSFELD, RICHARD MYERS, GEOFFREY MILLER, JAMES T. HILL (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Whitman, James)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 17 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: 5/7/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance of Carolyn Patty Blum on behalf of all Plaintiffs by YUKSEL CELIKGOGUS, IBRAHIM SEN, NURI MERT, ZAKIRJAN HASAM, ABU MUHAMMAD (Kadidal, Shayana)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 16 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: 4/13/2007 Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                        REPLY to opposition to motion re [13] MOTION to Stay and [12] Notice of Related Case filed by MICHAEL E. DUNLAVEY, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL LEHNERT, NELSON J. CANNON, TERRY CARRICO, DONALD RUMSFELD, RICHARD MYERS, GEOFFREY MILLER, JAMES T. HILL. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A)(Whitman, James)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 15 Filed: 4/9/2007, Entered: 4/9/2007 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                          Order granting [8] plaintiffs' motion for continued use of pseudonyms. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on April 9, 2007. (FL, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 14 Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: 4/3/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                            Memorandum in opposition to re [13] MOTION to Stay and in [12] Opposition to Defendants' Notice of Related Case filed by YUKSEL CELIKGOGUS, IBRAHIM SEN, NURI MERT, ZAKIRJAN HASAM, ABU MUHAMMAD. (Kadidal, Shayana) Modified on 4/4/2007 (zlc, ). Modified on 4/4/2007 (zlc, ).
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 13 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: 3/23/2007, Terminated: 5/22/2007 Motion to Stay
                                                                                              MOTION to Stay by MICHAEL E. DUNLAVEY, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL LEHNERT, NELSON J. CANNON, TERRY CARRICO, DONALD RUMSFELD, RICHARD MYERS, GEOFFREY MILLER, JAMES T. HILL (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order granting defendants' motion to stay)(Whitman, James)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 12 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: 3/23/2007 Notice of Related Case
                                                                                                NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by MICHAEL E. DUNLAVEY, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL LEHNERT, NELSON J. CANNON, TERRY CARRICO, DONALD RUMSFELD, RICHARD MYERS, GEOFFREY MILLER, JAMES T. HILL. Case related to Case No. 04-cv-1864. (Whitman, James)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 10 Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: 3/22/2007 ERRATA
                                                                                                  ERRATA by Plaintiffs Hasam and Muhammad by YUKSEL CELIKGOGUS, IBRAHIM SEN [8] MOTION Motion for Continued Use of Pseudonyms in Amended Complaint of March 21, 2007, by Plainitffs Hasam and Muhammed filed by IBRAHIM SEN, YUKSEL CELIKGOGUS. (Kadidal, Shayana)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 9 Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: 3/22/2007 Memorandum
                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM re [8] MOTION Motion for Continued Use of Pseudonyms in Amended Complaint of March 21, 2007, by Plainitffs Hasam and Muhammed filed by IBRAHIM SEN, YUKSEL CELIKGOGUS by YUKSEL CELIKGOGUS, IBRAHIM SEN. (Kadidal, Shayana)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document 8 Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: 3/22/2007, Terminated: 4/9/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                      MOTION Motion for Continued Use of Pseudonyms in Amended Complaint of March 21, 2007, by Plainitffs Hasam and Muhammed by YUKSEL CELIKGOGUS, IBRAHIM SEN (Kadidal, Shayana)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: 3/22/2007 Notice of Related Case
                                                                                                        NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by MICHAEL E. DUNLAVEY, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL LEHNERT, NELSON J. CANNON, TERRY CARRICO, DONALD RUMSFELD, RICHARD MYERS, GEOFFREY MILLER, JAMES T. HILL. Case related to Case No. 04-cv-1864. (Whitman, James)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: 3/22/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Whitman on behalf of NELSON J. CANNON, TERRY CARRICO (Whitman, James)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: 3/22/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Whitman on behalf of MICHAEL E. DUNLAVEY, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL LEHNERT, DONALD RUMSFELD, RICHARD MYERS, GEOFFREY MILLER, JAMES T. HILL (Whitman, James)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: 3/22/2007 Summons Issued
                                                                                                              Summons (15) Issued as to MICHAEL E. DUNLAVEY, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL LEHNERT, NELSON J. CANNON, TERRY CARRICO, BANTZ CRADDOCK, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, ADOLPH MCQUEEN, MIKE BUMGARNER, DENNIS WADE, ESTEBAN RODRIGUEZ, DONALD RUMSFELD, RICHARD MYERS, GEOFFREY MILLER, JAMES T. HILL. (lc, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 11 Filed: 3/21/2007, Entered: 3/22/2007 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT against MICHAEL E. DUNLAVEY, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL LEHNERT, NELSON J. CANNON, TERRY CARRICO, WILLIAM CLINE, JOHN DOES 1-100, BANTZ CRADDOCK, HARRY B. HARRIS, JR, ADOLPH MCQUEEN, MIKE BUMGARNER, DENNIS WADE, ESTEBAN RODRIGUEZ, DONALD RUMSFELD, RICHARD MYERS, GEOFFREY MILLER, JAMES T. HILL filed by YUKSEL CELIKGOGUS, IBRAHIM SEN, NURI MERT, ZAKIRJAN HASAM, ABU MUHAMMAD.(lc, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 3/21/2007, Entered: 3/21/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Shayana Devendra Kadidal on behalf of all plaintiffs (Kadidal, Shayana)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/21/2007, Entered: 3/21/2007 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                    Summons Issued (9) as to MICHAEL E. DUNLAVEY, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL LEHNERT, NELSON J. CANNON, TERRY CARRICO, DONALD RUMSFELD, RICHARD MYERS, GEOFFREY MILLER, JAMES T. HILL. (ls, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/4/2007, Entered: 1/4/2007 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      Order granting [2] plaintiff's motion to correct the filing date of their complaint. The filing date of plaintiffs? complaint shall be corrected on the electronic docket to November 21, 2006. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr. on January 4, 2007. (FL, )
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: 12/11/2006, Terminated: 1/4/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                        MOTION to Correct Filing Date by YUKSEL CELIKGOGUS, IBRAHIM SEN. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit)(Goodman, William)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: 11/27/2006 Complaint
                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against MICHAEL E. DUNLAVEY, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL LEHNERT, NELSON J. CANNON, TERRY CARRICO, WILLIAM CLINE, JOHN DOES 1-100, DONALD RUMSFELD, RICHARD MYERS, GEOFFREY MILLER, JAMES T. HILL ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 4616000369.)filed by YUKSEL CELIKGOGUS, IBRAHIM SEN. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(lc, )
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: 11/27/2006 Summons Not Issued
                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Not Issued as to MICHAEL E. DUNLAVEY, JAY HOOD, MICHAEL LEHNERT, NELSON J. CANNON, TERRY CARRICO, WILLIAM CLINE, JOHN DOES 1-100, DONALD RUMSFELD, RICHARD MYERS, GEOFFREY MILLER, JAMES T. HILL (lc, ) Modified on 1/4/2007 (ztj, ).
                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 150 times.

                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?