MOGENHAN v. NICHOLSON
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-02041-GK
District Judge Gladys Kessler, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ANN M. MOGENHAN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Myrrel C. Hendricks +1 202 577 8909 myrrelh@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Tom Weathered

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph D. Gebhardt +1 202 496 0400 +1 202 496 0404 jgebhardt@gebhardtlaw.com
v.
No Logo R. JAMES NICHOLSON, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth Adebonojo +1 202 514 7157 +1 202 514 8780 kenneth.adebonojo@usdoj.gov
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
Space Megan Mary Weis +1 202 514 5134 megan.Weis@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 11/29/2006
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $300000
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
106-cv-02041-GK None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CONSOL, ENE, JURY, TYPE-H
  Entries (62) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 36 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008 Reply to opposition to Motion
REPLY to opposition to motion re [34] MOTION to Dismiss filed by JAMES B. PEAKE. Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-02041-GK, 1:08-cv-00391-GK(Natiello, Christian) Modified on 7/16/2008 To enhance docket text (tr).
    LREF
    Legal Document 35 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: 7/2/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
    Memorandum in opposition to re (34 in 1:06-cv-02041-GK) MOTION to Dismiss filed by ANN M. MOGENHAN. Associated Cases: 1:06-cv-02041-GK, 1:08-cv-00391-GK(Hendricks, Myrrel)
      LREF
      Legal Document 34 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: 6/19/2008 Motion to Dismiss
      MOTION to Dismiss by R. JAMES NICHOLSON (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Natiello, Christian)
        LREF
        Legal Document 33 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: 6/18/2008 Order on Motion to Consolidate CasesCourt Filing
        ORDER granting [27] Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate Cases; these cases (06-2041 and 08-391) are hereby referred to the Court's mediation for a period of thirty days. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 6/18/08. (CL, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 32 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008 Status Report
          STATUS REPORT by R. JAMES NICHOLSON. (Adebonojo, Kenneth)
            LREF
            Legal Document 31 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/9/2008 Notice of Appearance/
            NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Mary Weis on behalf of R. JAMES NICHOLSON (Weis, Megan)
              LREF
              Legal Document 30 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: 5/6/2008 Reply to opposition to Motion
              REPLY to opposition to motion re [27] MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by ANN M. MOGENHAN. (Hendricks, Myrrel)
                LREF
                Legal Document 29 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: 4/28/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                Memorandum in opposition to re [27] MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by R. JAMES NICHOLSON. (Adebonojo, Kenneth)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: 4/21/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                  Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Praecipe due by 6/16/2008. (tth)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 28 Filed: 4/17/2008, Entered: 4/17/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER: The dispositive motions deadline is hereby cancelled; the parties shall submit a joint praecipe by June 16, 2008. See the Order for further details. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 04/17/2008. (lcgk3, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 27 Filed: 4/17/2008, Entered: 4/17/2008, Terminated: 6/18/2008 Motion to Consolidate Cases
                      MOTION to Consolidate Cases by ANN M. MOGENHAN (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Hendricks, Myrrel)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 4/17/2008, Entered: 4/17/2008 Status Conference
                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gladys Kessler: Status Conference held on 4/17/2008. (Court Reporter Susan Tyner.) (tth)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: 4/1/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                          MINUTE ORDER granting [26] Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to to Take Plaintiff's Deposition. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 4/1/08. (CL, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 26 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: 3/31/2008, Terminated: 4/1/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to
                            MOTION for Extension of Time to Take Plaintiff's Deposition by R. JAMES NICHOLSON (Adebonojo, Kenneth)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: 3/12/2008 Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
                              NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRIES: re [23] Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant, [24] Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General, [25] Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC were entered in error at the request of counsel. (tg, )
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 25 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC
                                ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 3)(Hendricks, Myrrel) Modified on 3/12/2008 (tg, ).
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 24 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                                  ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 03/06/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 2)(Hendricks, Myrrel) Modified on 3/12/2008 (tg, ).
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 23 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                    ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to ANN M. MOGENHAN served on 3/6/2008, answer due 5/5/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Hendricks, Myrrel) Modified on 3/12/2008 (tg, ).
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 22 Filed: 1/3/2008, Entered: 1/3/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER: Defendant's responses to written discovery are due no later than January 11, 2008; Plaintiff's responses to written discovery are due no later than January 18, 2008; discovery shall close on March 30, 2008; dispositive motions are due on May 8, 2008; a further Status Conference shall be held on April 17, 2008 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 1/3/08. (CL, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/3/2008, Entered: 1/3/2008 Status Conference
                                        Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Gladys Kessler: Status Conference held on 1/3/2008. (Court Reporter Annie Shaw.) (tth)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/3/2008, Entered: 1/3/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                          Set Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery due by 3/30/2008.,Dispositive Motions due by 5/8/2008.,Status Conference set for 4/17/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26A before Judge Gladys Kessler. (CL, )
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 21 Filed: 1/2/2008, Entered: 1/2/2008, Terminated: 3/31/2008 Motion to Continue
                                            MOTION to Continue Status Conference and for Extension of Time for Discovery by ANN M. MOGENHAN (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Hendricks, Myrrel)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 20 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER: Discovery shall be extended for a period of ninety days; a further Status Conference shall be held on January 3, 2008 at 10:15 a.m. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 10/4/07. (CL, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007 Status Conference
                                                Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Gladys Kessler: Status Conference held on 10/4/2007. (Court Reporter Susan Tyner.) (tth,)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                  Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 1/3/2008 10:15 AM in Courtroom 26A before Judge Gladys Kessler. (CL, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                    Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 10/4/2007 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26A before Judge Gladys Kessler. (CL, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007 Order
                                                      MINUTE ORDER: The time for the Status Conference on Thursday, October 4, 2007, is hereby changed to 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 10/1/07. (CL, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: 9/5/2007 Settlement Conference
                                                        Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alan Kay: Settlement Conference held on 8/28/2007. (DM)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/15/2007, Entered: 8/15/2007 Case Referred to Magistrate Judge
                                                          CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson for discovery.(jeb, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/15/2007, Entered: 8/15/2007 Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
                                                            NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re Case Referred to Magistrate Judge Kay was entered in error. Case was randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Deborah Robinson.(jeb, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 19 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: 8/14/2007 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER REFERRING CASE to a Magistrate Judge for discovery purposes. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 8/14/07. (CL, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: 8/15/2007 Case Referred to Magistrate Judge
                                                                CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Alan Kay for discovery. (jeb, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/13/2007, Entered: 8/13/2007 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                  Set/Reset Hearings : Settlement Conference reset for 8/28/07 at 3:30 PM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alan Kay. (kk)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: 8/3/2007 Order
                                                                    MINUTE ORDER re-setting mediation for 3:30 p.m. on August 28, 2007, per the request of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 08/03/07. (DM)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/1/2007, Entered: 8/1/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                      MINUTE ORDER granting [18] Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time; the parties shall complete the three depositions set forth in the Scheduling Order by September 4, 2007; on September 4, 2007, the parties shall file a Praecipe informing the Court that the depositions have been completed; all other dates set forth in the Scheduling Order remain unchanged. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 8/1/07. (CL, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 18 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: 7/31/2007, Terminated: 8/1/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Take Depositions by R. JAMES NICHOLSON (Adebonojo, Kenneth)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 17 Filed: 7/27/2007, Entered: 7/27/2007 Memorandum
                                                                          MEMORANDUM by R. JAMES NICHOLSON. (Adebonojo, Kenneth)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 16 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/19/2007 Substitution of Counsel
                                                                            NOTICE of Subtitution of Counsel by Kenneth Adebonojo on behalf of R. JAMES NICHOLSON Substituting for attorney John Henault (Adebonojo, Kenneth)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 15 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: 7/16/2007 ERRATA
                                                                              ERRATA by ANN M. MOGENHAN [14] Memorandum filed by ANN M. MOGENHAN. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Hendricks, Myrrel)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 14 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: 7/13/2007 Memorandum
                                                                                MEMORANDUM by ANN M. MOGENHAN. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3# (4) Exhibit 4# (5) Exhibit 5# (6) Errata 6# (7) Exhibit 7)(Hendricks, Myrrel)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 13 Filed: 6/14/2007, Entered: 6/14/2007 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 8/2/2007, at 10:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alan Kay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 06/14/07. (DM)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/6/2007 Case Referred to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                    CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Alan Kay for settlement discussions. (jeb, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 12 Filed: 5/30/2007, Entered: 5/30/2007 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER REFERRING CASE (following depositions) to Magistrate Judge Kay for settlement discussions. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 5/30/07. (CS, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 11 Filed: 5/30/2007, Entered: 5/30/2007 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Written discovery due by 7/1/2007. Depositions of Ann Mogenhan, David Rutledge, and Jimmy Norris shall be taken by 8/1/07. Status Conference set for 10/4/2007 09:45 AM in Courtroom 26A before Judge Gladys Kessler.. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 5/30/07. (CS, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/30/2007, Entered: 5/30/2007 Meet and Confer Hearing
                                                                                          Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Gladys Kessler: Meet and Confer Hearing held on 5/30/2007. Scheduling Order entered. Status Conference set for 10/4/2007 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 26A before Judge Gladys Kessler. (Court Reporter Susan Tyner.) (tth,)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 10 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: 5/23/2007 Meet and Confer Statement
                                                                                            MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Hendricks, Myrrel)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 9 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: 5/7/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER setting an Initial Scheduling Conference for May 29, 2007 at 10:15 a.m. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 5/7/07. (CS, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 8 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: 5/7/2007 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                ANSWER to Amended Complaint by R. JAMES NICHOLSON. Related document: [2] Amended Complaint filed by ANN M. MOGENHAN.(Henault, John)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: 5/7/2007 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                  Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 5/29/2007 10:15 AM in Courtroom 26A before Judge Gladys Kessler. (CS, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/19/2007, Entered: 4/19/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 5/7/2007. (CS, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/19/2007, Entered: 4/19/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER granting [7] Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time; Defendant shall have up to and including May 7, 2007 in which to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 4/19/07. (CS, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: 4/18/2007, Terminated: 4/19/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by R. JAMES NICHOLSON (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Henault, John)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: 3/22/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                          Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 4/23/2007. (CS, )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: 3/22/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER granting [6] Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time; Defendant shall have up to and including April 23, 2007 in which to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 3/22/07. (CS, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/21/2007, Entered: 3/21/2007, Terminated: 3/22/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by R. JAMES NICHOLSON (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Henault, John)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 5 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: 1/30/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC
                                                                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Hendricks, Myrrel)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: 1/30/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                                                                                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 1/22/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Hendricks, Myrrel)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: 1/30/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                                                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to R. JAMES NICHOLSON served on 1/22/2007, answer due 3/23/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Hendricks, Myrrel)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: 1/18/2007 Summons Reissued as to USA
                                                                                                                      SUMMONS (3) REISSUED as to R. JAMES NICHOLSON, and non-parties U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (tg )
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/17/2007, Entered: 1/17/2007 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT against R. JAMES NICHOLSON filed by ANN M. MOGENHAN.(jf, )
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/29/2006, Entered: 12/1/2006 Complaint
                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against R. JAMES NICHOLSON ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 4616000574.)filed by ANN M. MOGENHAN. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(tg, )
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/29/2006, Entered: 12/1/2006 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                            Summons (3) Issued as to R. JAMES NICHOLSON, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (tg, )
                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 126 times.

                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?