SEALIFT INC v. REILLY et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-02110-RJL
District Judge Richard J. Leon, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Sealift, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy B. Shea +1 202 835 0300 +1 202 835 0306 timbshea@aol.com
v.
No Logo ROBERT D. REILLY, JR.,, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter S. Smith +1 202 514 7065 +1 202 514 8779 peter.smith@usdoj.gov
United States of America United States of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter S. Smith +1 202 514 7065 +1 202 514 8779 peter.smith@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 12/12/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 120 - Contract: Marine
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1333 Admiralty
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Transfer to Another District
County 88888
Terminated 5/23/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, TRANSFERRED, TYPE-M
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: 8/28/2007 Receipt for Transfer Papers
Receipt on August 23, 2007 of Transfer Papers. Other Court Number: 07-627 C sent by US Court of Federal Claims. (jf, )
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: 7/18/2007 Case Transferred Out
    Case transferred out to the U.S. Court of Federal Claims, pursuant to Court Order entered 5/23/2007. Sent to Court by USPS-Certified Mail. (lc, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 11 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: 5/23/2007 Order Transfering CaseCourt Filing
      ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 5/22/07. (whb)
        LREF
        Legal Document 10 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: 5/23/2007 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
        MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 5/22/07. (whb)
          LREF
          Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: 4/3/2007 ~Notice (other)
          NOTICE of Filing by SEALIFT INC re [8] Notice (Other) (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Shea, Timothy)
            LREF
            Legal Document 8 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: 3/23/2007 ~Notice (other)
            NOTICE (Joint) Concerning Schedule by ROBERT D. REILLY, JR, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re Order (Smith, Peter)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 3/21/2007, Entered: 3/21/2007 Order
              MINUTE ORDER. The parties are hereby ORDERED to submit a joint proposed scheduling order within 14 days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 3/21/07. (lcrjl2)
                LREF
                Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/19/2007, Entered: 3/19/2007 ~Notice (other)
                NOTICE and Joint Case Management Statement by ROBERT D. REILLY, JR, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Smith, Peter)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/7/2007, Entered: 3/7/2007 Reply to opposition to Motion
                  REPLY to opposition to motion re [4] MOTION to Transfer Case filed by ROBERT D. REILLY, JR, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Smith, Peter)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 2/27/2007, Entered: 2/27/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                    Memorandum in opposition to re [4] MOTION to Transfer Case filed by SEALIFT INC. (Shea, Timothy)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: 2/16/2007, Terminated: 5/23/2007 Motion to Transfer Case
                      MOTION to Transfer Case by ROBERT D. REILLY, JR, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit GAO Decision on Sealift's Bid Protest# (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Peter)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: 2/16/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                        NOTICE of Appearance by Peter S. Smith on behalf of ROBERT D. REILLY, JR, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Smith, Peter)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 12/14/2006, Entered: 12/14/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                          STANDING ORDER.Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 12/14/2006. (CMcP, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/12/2006, Entered: 12/14/2006 Complaint
                            COMPLAINT against ROBERT D. REILLY, JR, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 4616000872.)filed by SEALIFT INC. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(td, )
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 12/12/2006, Entered: 12/14/2006 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                              SUMMONS (3) Issued as to ROBERT D. REILLY, JR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (td, )
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 84 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?