FRIEDMAN v. U.S. SECRET SERVICE
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-02125-RWR
District Judge Richard W. Roberts, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 28, 2020 at 9:17 PM DT (9 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DONALD M. FRIEDMAN, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo U.s. Secret Service, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth Adebonojo +1 202 514 7157 +1 202 514 8780 kenneth.adebonojo@usdoj.gov
Space Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 12/14/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags PROSE-PR, TYPE-I
  Entries (137) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 10/28/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 8/25/2020, Entered: None Reconsideration
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 1/5/2020, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: None Order to Show Cause
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 2/20/2019, Entered: None Status Report
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 2/6/2019, Entered: None Letter
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Reconsideration
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: None Mail Returned
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 12/7/2015, Entered: None Case Assigned/Reassigned
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank 100 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              MOTION to Continue by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN (jf, ) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Mail Returned as undeliverable. sent to Donald M. Friedman; Type of Document Returned: Order, Document 97 filed on 10/23/13; Resent at new address: 340 Travis Blvd, Ste 2, Fairfield, CA 94533-3836. (gdf) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Mail Returned as undeliverable sent to Donald M. Friedman. Type of Document Returned: Minute Order filed on 10/18/13; Resent at new address: 340 Travis Blvd, Ste 2, Fairfied, CA 94533-3836. (gdf) (Entered: 10/28/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    Order advising plaintiff to respond by 11/22/2013 to Defendant's Second Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment, or the Court may deem the motion conceded. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 10/23/13. (ms, ) (Entered: 10/23/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      MOTION for Summary Judgment (Second Renewed) by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Exhibit A-C)(Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Final MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Final MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/17/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Final MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment, MOTION to Stay by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Mail Returned as undeliverable. sent to Donald M. Friedman; Type of Document Returned: Minute Order filed on 8/30/13; Resent to address: 340 Travis Blvd, Ste 2, Fairfied, CA 94533-3836. (gdf) (Entered: 09/19/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/29/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Renewed Dispositive Motion by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/03/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document 87 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        MEMORANDUM AND OPINION and ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment [Dkt. #72]; denying plaintiff's Motion for Order Related to the Defendant=s Misuse of the (c)(1) Exclusion, and Motion for In Camera Review of All Records [Dkt. #76]; and granting plaintiff's Motion for More Expeditious Treatment of the Aforecaptioned Case [Dkt. #83] and Motion for Immediate Relief [Dkt. #85]. Not later than April 1, 2013, defendant shall file a renewed motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 2/14/13. (ms, ) (Entered: 02/15/2013)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          NOTICE of Change of Address by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN (jf, ) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            MOTION for immediate relief by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN (jf, ) (Entered: 12/27/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER denying 76 plaintiffs Motion for Order Related to AgencysMisuse of FOIA (c)(1) Exclusion and Motion for In Camera Review of All Agency Records. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 3/30/11. (ms, ) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                MOTION for more expeditious treatment of the aforecaptioned case by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN (jf, ) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  REPLY to opposition to motion re 72 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. SECRET SERVICE. (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 03/05/2010)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 2/12/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 02/12/2010)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/27/2010)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/19/2010)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 12/21/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/21/2009)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/18/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            First MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 11/18/2009)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              MOTION for Order related to the defendant's misuse of the (c)(1) exclusion, for in camera review of all records by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN. (jf, ) (Entered: 11/09/2009)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 53 Filed: 9/1/2008, Entered: 9/1/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Memorandum in opposition to re 72 Renewed MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(jf, ) (Entered: 11/09/2009)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Replies due by 9/2/2008. (lin, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/19/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 72 RENEWED MOTION for Summary Judgment by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN (jf, ) (Entered: 10/20/2009)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER: Defendant's unopposed [52] Motion for Extension of Time is granted, and its Reply is due by September 2, 2008. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 8/19/08. (ms, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                          Order advising plaintiff to respond to defendant's renewed motion for summary judgment by 10/16/2009, or the Court will treat the motion as conceded. Defendant shall file its reply, if any, by 10/30/09. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 9/18/09. (ms, ) (Entered: 09/18/2009)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 52 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 7/31/2008, Terminated: 8/20/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              RENEWED MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Exhibit 1-4, # 3 Exhibit 5-10)(Adebonojo, Kenneth) . (Entered: 09/14/2009)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Replies due by 8/1/2008. (lin, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/03/2009)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER: Defendant's consent [51] motion for an extension of time is granted, and defendant's reply shall be filed by August 1, 2008. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 7/2/08. (ms, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/19/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/19/2009)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 51 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: 7/1/2008, Terminated: 7/3/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/20/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/20/2009)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: 6/10/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                            Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply due by 7/2/2008. (lin, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/29/2009)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: 6/10/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER: Defendant's unopposed [50] Motion for Extension of Time is granted nunc pro tunc, and the Reply shall be filed by July 2, 2008. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 6/9/08. (ms, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/11/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/11/2009)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 50 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: 5/22/2008, Terminated: 6/10/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                    First MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Renew Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/26/2009)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 49 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: 5/13/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        MOTION for in camera review of records by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN. "Let this be filed" Judge Richard W. Roberts. (See Docket Entry [47] to view document) (jf, )
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/18/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Renew Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/18/2009)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 48 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: 5/13/2008 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Change of Address by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN. (See Page #41 of Docket Entry [47] to view document). (jf, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/4/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 47 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: 5/13/2008 Memorandum in OppositionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                Memorandum in opposition to re [40] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN. "Let this be filed" by Judge Richard W. Roberts (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(jf, )
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/17/2008, Entered: 4/17/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff's [46] Motion for Extension of Time is granted nunc pro tunc, and his opposition to defendant's summary judgment motion is due by May 30, 2008. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 4/17/08. (ms, )
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/13/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 46 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: 4/2/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to file a response to defendants' motion for summary judgment by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN. (jf, )
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/17/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 03/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: 3/31/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff's unopposed [45] Motion for Extension of Time is granted nunc pro tunc, and his opposition shall be filed by 3/28/08. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 3/28/08. (ms, )
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/6/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 03/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: 3/17/2008 Order on Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff's [27] Motion to Compel is denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 3/17/08. (ms, )
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to Renew Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 02/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 45 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [27] MOTION to Compel, and [40] MOTION for Summary Judgment by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN (jf, )
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Renew Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 02/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: 2/15/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 3/7/2008 (lin, )
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/7/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          First MOTION for Extension of Time to Renew Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: 2/15/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff's unopposed [43] Motion for Extension of Time is granted nunc pro tunc, and his opposition to defendant's motion shall be filed by March 7, 2008. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 2/15/08. (ms, )
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 56 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying without prejudice defendant's 40 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying without prejudice plaintiff's 49 Motion in camera review; granting nunc pro tunc defendant's 53 Motion for Extension of Time, and ordering defendant to file a renewed summary judgment motion within 45 days of entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 11/21/08. (ms, ) (Entered: 11/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 44 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/5/2008 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Change of Address by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN (jf, )
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  ERRATA by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN. (jf, ) (Entered: 09/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 43 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/5/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to defendant's motion for summary judgment and opposition to plaintiff's motion to compel by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN. (jf, )
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/16/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to opposition to motion re 49 MOTION for in camera review of records, 40 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. SECRET SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Craig W. Ulmer)(Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/28/2008, Entered: 1/28/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 2/4/2008 (lin, )
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/28/2008, Entered: 1/28/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff's unopposed [42] Motion for Extension of Time is granted, and his opposition to defendant's motion is due by February 4, 2008. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 1/25/08. (ms, )
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 42 Filed: 1/3/2008, Entered: 1/4/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to defendant's motion for summary judgment and defendant's opposition to plaintiff's motion to compel by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN (td, )
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 41 Filed: 12/20/2007, Entered: 12/20/2007 Fox/Neal OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              Order advising plaintiff to respond to defendant's motion for summary judgment by 1/22/2008, or Court may deem the motion conceded. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 12/20/07. (ms, )
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 12/20/2007, Entered: 12/20/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER: Defendant's [37] Motion for Extension of Time is granted nunc pro tunc. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 12/20/07. (ms, )
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 40 Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: 12/6/2007 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Attachments: # (1) Statement of Facts # (2) Exhibit A# (3) Exhibit B# (4) Exhibit C)(Adebonojo, Kenneth)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 39 Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: 12/5/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in opposition to re [27] MOTION to Compel filed by U.S. SECRET SERVICE. (See Docket Entry [40] to view document). (nmw, ) Modified on 12/6/2007 (nmw, ). Modified link on 12/10/2007 (nmw, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 38 Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: 12/4/2007, Terminated: 12/4/2007 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                      ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Attachments: # (1) Statement of Facts # (2) Exhibit A# (3) Exhibit B# (4) Exhibit C)(Adebonojo, Kenneth) Modified on 12/6/2007 (ztd, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: 12/6/2007 Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re [38] MOTION for Summary Judgment was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading attaching the motion as the main document. (td, )
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 37 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: 11/27/2007, Terminated: 12/20/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Response by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 36 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/16/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF RESERVICE OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER AND DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR AN ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 35 Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: 11/9/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time toCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting the parties' unopposed [33] [34] Motions for Extensions of Time, denying as moot defendant's [32] Motion to Amend/Correct, and setting new filing deadlines for motions, oppositions, and replies. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 11/9/07. (ms, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 34 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time for reservice by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN. (jf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Address by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN (See Docket Entry [34] to view document). (jf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/24/2007, Entered: 10/24/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER: Defendant's [30] Motion for Extension of Time is granted nunc pro tunc. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 10/23/07. (ms, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 33 Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: 10/22/2007, Terminated: 11/9/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: 10/3/2007 Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Docket Entry [31] was entered in error as an errata and has been refiled as Docket Entry [32] MOTION to Amend Briefing Schedule. (nmw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 32 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/3/2007 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION (Corrected) to Amend Briefing Schedule by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (nmw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 31 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/2/2007 ERRATA
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENTERED IN ERROR.....ERRATA to Motion for Extension by U.S. SECRET SERVICE [30] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition and Dispositive Motion filed by U.S. SECRET SERVICE. (Adebonojo, Kenneth) Modified on 10/3/2007 (nmw, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 30 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 9/28/2007, Terminated: 10/24/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition and Dispositive Motion by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: 9/27/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Dispositive Motions due by 9/28/2007.,Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/26/2007.,Reply to Dispositive Motions due by 11/16/2007.,Response to motion to compel due by 9/28/07; Reply due by 10/26/2007. (lin, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 29 Filed: 9/22/2007, Entered: 9/22/2007 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denyinging as moot [22] plaintiff's motion re-service and granting [28] defendant's motion to amend the scheduling order. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 9/21/07. (ms, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 28 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: 8/31/2007, Terminated: 9/22/2007 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Adebonojo, Kenneth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 27 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: 8/29/2007 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Compel by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(jf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 26 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: 8/29/2007 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Address by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN (jf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 25 Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: 7/11/2007 Substitution of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Subtitution of Counsel by Kenneth Adebonojo on behalf of U.S. SECRET SERVICE Substituting for attorney Beverly Russell (Adebonojo, Kenneth)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 24 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: 7/2/2007 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Change of Address by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN (jf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 23 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: 6/28/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE to the Court Regarding Re-Service on Plaintiff of Defendant's Proposed Briefing Schedule by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Russell, Beverly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 22 Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: 6/12/2007, Terminated: 9/22/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Re-service by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN (tg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 21 Filed: 5/30/2007, Entered: 5/30/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [9] nunc pro tunc defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to file an Answer, denying [14] defendant's Motion to Stay, granting [17] nunc pro tunc defendant's Motion for Extension of Time, and setting schedule for dispositive motions. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 5/29/07. (ms, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 20 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: 5/24/2007 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Change of Address by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN (jf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 19 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: 5/21/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in opposition to re [17] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion or Proposed Order, [14] MOTION to Stay filed by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN. (jf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 18 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: 5/18/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing Proposed Schedule Pursuant to the Court's May 1, 2007 Order by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Russell, Beverly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 17 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: 5/3/2007, Terminated: 5/30/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion or Proposed Order by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Kidwell, Judith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 16 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: 5/3/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Kidwell on behalf of U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Kidwell, Judith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: 5/2/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines: Dispositive Motions due by 5/6/2007. (lin, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 15 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: 5/1/2007 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying [11] defendant's Motion to Stay, and granting plaintiff's [13] Motion for Leave to File his opposition to defendant's motion to stay. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 4/30/07. (ms, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 14 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: 4/30/2007, Terminated: 5/30/2007 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Stay by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 13 Filed: 4/2/2007, Entered: 4/4/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Late File opposition to defendant's motion for 45 day stay by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Opposition)(td, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 12 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: 3/16/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in opposition to re [9] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN. (jf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 11 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: 3/15/2007, Terminated: 5/1/2007 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Stay and Memorandum in Support Thereof by U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 10 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: 3/5/2007 ERRATA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ERRATA by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN [8] Amended Complaint filed by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN,. (jf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 9 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: 3/2/2007, Terminated: 5/30/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Memorandum in Support Thereof by U.S. SECRET SERVICE. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/27/2007, Entered: 2/27/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 2/28/2007. (lin, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: 2/23/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER: Defendant's [7] Motion for Extension of Time is granted nunc pro tunc. The U.S. SECRET SERVICE's answer or other response to the complaint, as amended, is due by 2/28/2007. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 2/22/07. (ms, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 8 Filed: 2/7/2007, Entered: 2/7/2007 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT against U.S. SECRET SERVICE filed by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A thru D)(jf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: 1/19/2007, Terminated: 2/23/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Memorandum in Support Therof by U.S. SECRET SERVICE. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Russell, Beverly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 12/28/2006, Entered: 1/3/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 12/22/06., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to U.S. SECRET SERVICE served on 12/22/2006, answer due 2/20/2007., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney. U.S. SECRET SERVICE served on 12/22/2006, answer due 2/20/2007 (jf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 12/14/2006, Entered: 12/18/2006 Order Directing Prisoner PaymentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Directing Monthly Payments in the amount of $ 4.40 be made from Prison Account of Donald M. Friedman; further ordered, granting [2] MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 10/23/06. (jf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/14/2006, Entered: 12/18/2006 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN (jf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 12/14/2006, Entered: 12/18/2006 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN. (jf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 12/14/2006, Entered: 12/18/2006, Terminated: 12/14/2006 Notice of Related Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF RELATED CASE. Case related to: Case No. CA-06-169. (jf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/14/2006, Entered: 12/18/2006 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT against U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Filing fee $ 0.00) filed by DONALD M. FRIEDMAN. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - C# (2) Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 12/14/2006, Entered: 12/18/2006 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS (3) Issued as to U.S. SECRET SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 133 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?