Microwave Concentric Mesfet With Inherent Electromagnetic Shielding

Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 08271403
Examiner Courtney Bowers, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Examiner Courtney Bowers
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Yarbrough, Allyson D., Applicant

Represented by The Aerospace Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Derrick Michael Reid, +1 949 497 8800
Space Mark Waddell +1 212 407 4127
Attributes
Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Yarbrough, Allyson D., Hermosa Beach, CA (US)
Filing Date July 6, 1994
Status Patented Case
Status Date Unknown
Location File Repository (franconia)
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number D289
Confirmation Number 7588
Group Art Unit 2503
Class / Sub-Class 257 / 275
Timeline
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Assignments (2) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Statement Filed Indicating a Loss of Entitlement to Small Entity Status
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/11/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/6/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Notification Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/5/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
Response to Amendment under Rule 312
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/5/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Response to 312 Amendment (PTO-271)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/4/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/1/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Fee Payment Verified
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/2/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
Amendment after Notice of Allowance (Rule 312)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/6/1995, Entered: None Transaction History
Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/6/1995, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Notice of Allowance
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/5/1995, Entered: None Transaction History
Examiner's Amendment Communication
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/5/1995, Entered: None Transaction History
Receipt of all Acknowledgement Letters
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/5/1995, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Examiner's Amendment
LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/29/1995, Entered: None Transaction History
Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/19/1995, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Final Rejection (PTOL - 326)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/18/1995, Entered: None Transaction History
Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/16/1995, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/26/1995, Entered: None Transaction History
Response after Non-Final Action
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/1/1995, Entered: None Transaction History
Letter Restarting Period for Response (i.e. Letter re: References)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/1/1995, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Notice of Restarted Response Period
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/23/1995, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/22/1995, Entered: None Transaction History
Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/3/1994, Entered: None Transaction History
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/9/1994, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/29/1994, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Captured on Microfilm
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 5 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?