BANKS v. LAPPIN et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-00309-EGS
District Judge Emmet G. Sullivan, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Banks, Frederick H., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "FREDERICK H. BANKS"
v.
No Logo Alberto Gonzales, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen L. Melnik +1 202 307 0338 karen.melnik@usdoj.gov
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
No Logo Allen, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen L. Melnik +1 202 307 0338 karen.melnik@usdoj.gov
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
No Logo CHARLES SHUMER, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen L. Melnik +1 202 307 0338 karen.melnik@usdoj.gov
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
No Logo D. GREEN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen L. Melnik +1 202 307 0338 karen.melnik@usdoj.gov
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Justice United States Department of Justice, Defendant
Officially listed as "DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen L. Melnik +1 202 307 0338 karen.melnik@usdoj.gov
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
Federal Bureau of Prisons Federal Bureau of Prisons, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen L. Melnik +1 202 307 0338 karen.melnik@usdoj.gov
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
No Logo HANK PAULSON, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen L. Melnik +1 202 307 0338 karen.melnik@usdoj.gov
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
No Logo HARLEY LAPPIN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen L. Melnik +1 202 307 0338 karen.melnik@usdoj.gov
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
No Logo J. MIOSI, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen L. Melnik +1 202 307 0338 karen.melnik@usdoj.gov
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
No Logo PATRICIA R. STANSBERRY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen L. Melnik +1 202 307 0338 karen.melnik@usdoj.gov
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
No Logo R. DODSON, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen L. Melnik +1 202 307 0338 karen.melnik@usdoj.gov
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
No Logo The Library Of Congress, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen L. Melnik +1 202 307 0338 karen.melnik@usdoj.gov
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
No Logo THE SENATE, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen L. Melnik +1 202 307 0338 karen.melnik@usdoj.gov
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
No Logo TRANSPORTATION SECURITY AGENCY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen L. Melnik +1 202 307 0338 karen.melnik@usdoj.gov
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
United States Department of the Treasury United States Department of the Treasury, Defendant
Officially listed as "TREASURY DEPARTMENT"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen L. Melnik +1 202 307 0338 karen.melnik@usdoj.gov
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
United States House of Representatives United States House of Representatives, Defendant
Officially listed as "U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen L. Melnik +1 202 307 0338 karen.melnik@usdoj.gov
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
United States of America United States of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen L. Melnik +1 202 307 0338 karen.melnik@usdoj.gov
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
No Logo UNITED STATES PASSPORT OFFICE, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen L. Melnik +1 202 307 0338 karen.melnik@usdoj.gov
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
No Logo WALTER HARRIS, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen L. Melnik +1 202 307 0338 karen.melnik@usdoj.gov
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 2/9/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand $138000000000
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags PROSE-PR, TYPE-F
  Entries (41) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 34 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008 Reply to opposition to Motion
REPLY to opposition to motion re [33] MOTION for Summary Judgment, [28] MOTION for Summary Judgment (Renewed) MOTION for Summary Judgment (Renewed) MOTION for Summary Judgment (Renewed) filed by ALBERTO GONZALES, TRANSPORTATION SECURITY AGENCY, UNITED STATES PASSPORT OFFICE, THE LIBRARY OF CONGRESS, CHARLES SHUMER, U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, THE SENATE, PATRICIA R. STANSBERRY, R. DODSON, ALLEN, J. MIOSI, WALTER HARRIS, D. GREEN, HARLEY LAPPIN, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(President), UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(Vice President), HANK PAULSON, TREASURY DEPARTMENT. (Natiello, Christian)
    LREF
    Legal Document 33 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: 5/28/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
    RENEWED CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment by FREDERICK H. BANKS. (jf, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 32 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: 5/28/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
      Memorandum in opposition to re [28] MOTION for Summary Judgment (Renewed) filed by FREDERICK H. BANKS. (jf, ) 33 Filed: 05/27/2008Entered: 05/28/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment RENEWED CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment by FREDERICK H. BANKS. (jf, ) 34 Filed & Entered: 06/02/2008 Reply to opposition to Motion REPLY to opposition to motion re [33] MOTION for Summary Judgment, [28] MOTION for Summary Judgment (Renewed) MOTION for Summary Judgment (Renewed) MOTION for Summary Judgment (Renewed) filed by ALBERTO GONZALES, TRANSPORTATION SECURITY AGENCY, UNITED STATES PASSPORT OFFICE, THE LIBRARY OF CONGRESS, CHARLES SHUMER, U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, THE SENATE, PATRICIA R. STANSBERRY, R. DODSON, ALLEN, J. MIOSI, WALTER HARRIS, D. GREEN, HARLEY LAPPIN, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(President), UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(Vice President), HANK PAULSON, TREASURY DEPARTMENT. (Natiello, Christian)
        LREF
        Legal Document 31 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: 5/21/2008 Response to Order of the Court
        RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re [29] Fox/Neal Order filed by FREDERICK H. BANKS. (jf, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 30 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: 5/15/2008 ~Notice (other)
          NOTICE of Amended Certificate of Service by ALBERTO GONZALES, TRANSPORTATION SECURITY AGENCY, UNITED STATES PASSPORT OFFICE, THE LIBRARY OF CONGRESS, CHARLES SHUMER, U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, THE SENATE, PATRICIA R. STANSBERRY, R. DODSON, ALLEN, J. MIOSI, WALTER HARRIS, D. GREEN, HARLEY LAPPIN, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(President), UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(Vice President), HANK PAULSON, TREASURY DEPARTMENT re [28] MOTION for Summary Judgment (Renewed) MOTION for Summary Judgment (Renewed) MOTION for Summary Judgment (Renewed) (Natiello, Christian)
            LREF
            Legal Document 29 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: 5/5/2008 Fox/Neal OrderCourt Filing
            Order advising plaintiff to respond defendants' renewed summary judgment motion by 6/3/2008 or the Court may deem the motion conceded. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 5/5/08. (ms, )
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: 5/23/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
              Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment due by 6/3/200. (dot, )
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: 5/7/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                ENTERED IN ERRORR.....Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Response to Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment due by 6/30/2008. (dot, ) Modified on 5/23/2008 (dot, ).
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 28 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: 4/22/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
                  MOTION for Summary Judgment (Renewed) by ALBERTO GONZALES, TRANSPORTATION SECURITY AGENCY, UNITED STATES PASSPORT OFFICE, THE LIBRARY OF CONGRESS, CHARLES SHUMER, U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, THE SENATE, PATRICIA R. STANSBERRY, R. DODSON, ALLEN, J. MIOSI, WALTER HARRIS, D. GREEN, HARLEY LAPPIN, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(President), UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(Vice President), HANK PAULSON, TREASURY DEPARTMENT (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Exhibit A (Gilmore), # (2) Declaration Exhibit B (Fernandezlopez), # (3) Declaration Exhibit C (Boseker))(Natiello, Christian)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 27 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: 3/24/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                    ORDER granting [22] nunc pro tunc defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File a Reply; granting in part and denying in part without prejudice defendants' [17] Motion to Dismiss and [17] Motion for Summary Judgment; denying without prejudice [17] defendants' Motion for More Definite Statement. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3/22/08. (ms, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 26 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: 3/24/2008 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                      MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3/22/08. (ms, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 25 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: 10/3/2007 Reply to opposition to Motion
                        REPLY to opposition to motion re [17] MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative MOTION for More Definite Statement or, in the Alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ALBERTO GONZALES, TRANSPORTATION SECURITY AGENCY, UNITED STATES PASSPORT OFFICE, THE LIBRARY OF CONGRESS, CHARLES SHUMER, U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, THE SENATE, PATRICIA R. STANSBERRY, R. DODSON, ALLEN, J. MIOSI, WALTER HARRIS, D. GREEN, HARLEY LAPPIN, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(President), UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(Vice President), HANK PAULSON, TREASURY DEPARTMENT. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Action No. 07cv321 Memorandum Opinion)(Melnik, Karen)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 23 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: 9/17/2007 Response to Order of the Court
                          RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re [20] Order on Motion for Extension of Time to, filed by FREDERICK BANKS. (jf, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 22 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: 9/5/2007, Terminated: 3/24/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by ALBERTO GONZALES, TRANSPORTATION SECURITY AGENCY, UNITED STATES PASSPORT OFFICE, THE LIBRARY OF CONGRESS, CHARLES SHUMER, U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, THE SENATE, PATRICIA R. STANSBERRY, R. DODSON, ALLEN, J. MIOSI, WALTER HARRIS, D. GREEN, HARLEY LAPPIN, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(President), UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(Vice President), HANK PAULSON, TREASURY DEPARTMENT (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Melnik, Karen)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 21 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007 ~Notice (other)
                              NOTICE of Service by ALBERTO GONZALES, TRANSPORTATION SECURITY AGENCY, UNITED STATES PASSPORT OFFICE, THE LIBRARY OF CONGRESS, CHARLES SHUMER, U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, THE SENATE, PATRICIA R. STANSBERRY, R. DODSON, ALLEN, J. MIOSI, WALTER HARRIS, D. GREEN, HARLEY LAPPIN, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(President), UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(Vice President), HANK PAULSON, TREASURY DEPARTMENT (Melnik, Karen)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 10/9/2007 (clv, )
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 24 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007 Response to Document
                                  RESPONSE re [17] MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative MOTION for More Definite Statement or, in the Alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by FREDERICK BANKS. (jf, )
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 20 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: 8/31/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time toCourt Filing
                                    ORDER granting [19] plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time, directing defendant to re-serve a copy of its dispositive motion, and setting October 9, 2007 as the new filing deadline for plaintiff's opposition to that motion. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/30/07. (ms, )
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 19 Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: 8/28/2007, Terminated: 8/31/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to file response to defendants' motion to dismiss by FREDERICK BANKS (jf, )
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 18 Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: 8/10/2007 Fox/Neal OrderCourt Filing
                                        Order advising plaintiff to respond to defendants' motion to dismiss, or for a more definite statement, or for summary judgment, or the Court may deem the motion conceded. Plaintiff's opposition or other response is due by 9/7/2007. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/9/07. (ms, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: 8/10/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                          Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 9/7/2007 (clv, )
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 17 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/7/2007, Terminated: 3/24/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                            MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, MOTION for More Definite Statement or, in the Alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment by ALBERTO GONZALES, TRANSPORTATION SECURITY AGENCY, UNITED STATES PASSPORT OFFICE, THE LIBRARY OF CONGRESS, CHARLES SHUMER, U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, THE SENATE, PATRICIA R. STANSBERRY, R. DODSON, ALLEN, J. MIOSI, WALTER HARRIS, D. GREEN, HARLEY LAPPIN, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(President), UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(Vice President), HANK PAULSON, TREASURY DEPARTMENT (Attachments: # (1) Statement of Facts # (2) Certification# (3) Cox Declaration# (4) Stansberry Declaration# (5) Miosi Declaration# (6) Greene Declaration# (7) Harris Declaration# (8) Allen Declaration# (9) Dodson Declaration# (10) Peppe Declaration# (11) Gilmore Declaration# (12) Janet Declaration# (13) Ramsey Declaration)(Melnik, Karen)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 16 Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: 7/10/2007 Notice of Change of Address
                                              NOTICE of Change of Address by FREDERICK BANKS (td, )
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 15 Filed: 6/21/2007, Entered: 6/25/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to CHARLES SHUMER served on 6/11/2007, answer due 8/10/2007. (jf, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 12 Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: 6/13/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Karen L. Melnik on behalf of all defendants (Melnik, Karen)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 14 Filed: 6/12/2007, Entered: 6/18/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to PATRICIA R. STANSBERRY served on 6/8/2007, answer due 8/7/2007; HANK PAULSON served on 6/8/2007, answer due 8/7/2007; TREASURY DEPARTMENT served on 6/8/2007, answer due 8/7/2007. (jf, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 13 Filed: 6/12/2007, Entered: 6/18/2007 Summons Returned Executed
                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. R. DODSON; ALLEN served; J. MIOSI; WALTER HARRIS & D. GREEN served on 6/8/2007, answer due 6/28/2007 (jf, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 9 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: 6/8/2007 Summons Returned Executed
                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES PASSPORT OFFICE served on 6/6/2007, answer due 6/26/2007 (jf, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 11 Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: 6/11/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, HARLEY LAPPIN and DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 6/5/2007, answer due 8/6/2007. (jf, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 10 Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: 6/11/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                                                            RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 6/5/07., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney. ALBERTO GONZALES; TRANSPORTATION SECURITY AGENCY; THE LIBRARY OF CONGRESS; U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES; THE SENATE; FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS; DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE; UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(President) ; UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(Vice President); TREASURY DEPARTMENT served on 6/5/2007, answer due 8/6/2007 (jf, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: 6/5/2007 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                                              SUMMONS (15) Issued as to ALBERTO GONZALES, TRANSPORTATION SECURITY AGENCY, UNITED STATES PASSPORT OFFICE, THE LIBRARY OF CONGRESS, CHARLES SHUMER, PATRICIA R. STANSBERRY, ALLEN, J. MIOSI, WALTER HARRIS, D. GREEN, HARLEY LAPPIN, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(President), UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(Vice President), HANK PAULSON, TREASURY DEPARTMENT and U.S. Attorney. (jf, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/22/2007, Entered: 5/31/2007 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
                                                                PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by FREDERICK BANKS (jf, )
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 7 Filed: 5/22/2007, Entered: 5/31/2007 Order Directing Prisoner PaymentCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER Directing Monthly Payments in the amount of $1.96 be made from Prison Account of Frederick Banks; further ordered, granting [2] MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and [5] MOTION for Extension of Time to file inmate account statement. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on May 4, 2007. (jf, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 6 Filed: 5/22/2007, Entered: 5/31/2007 Notice of Related Case
                                                                    NOTICE OF RELATED CASE. Case related to Case No. 06-1950. (jf, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 5 Filed: 5/22/2007, Entered: 5/31/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to file inmate account statement by FREDERICK BANKS (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Account Statement)(jf, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/22/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                        Case Reassigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. Judge Unassigned no longer assigned to the case. (jf, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: 2/27/2007 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                          NOTICE of Change of Address by FREDERICK BANKS (ls, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: 2/12/2007 Pro Se Order Directing Prisoner StatementCourt Filing
                                                                            PRO SE ORDER directing within 30 days of this Order, unless an extension of time is granted, plaintiff to provide a six month trust fund prisoner account statement and failure to comply will result in dismissal of case. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 1/26/07. (ls, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/31/2007 (jf, ).
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: 2/12/2007, Terminated: 5/22/2007 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by FREDERICK BANKS. (ls, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/31/2007 (jf, ).
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: 2/12/2007 Complaint
                                                                                COMPLAINT against ALBERTO GONZALES, TRANSPORTATION SECURITY AGENCY, UNITED STATES PASSPORT OFFICE, THE LIBRARY OF CONGRESS, CHARLES SHUMER, U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, THE SENATE, PATRICIA R. STANSBERRY, LSCJ BUTNER, R. DODSON, ALLEN, J. MIOSI, WALTER HARRIS, D. GREEN, HARLEY LAPPIN, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(President), UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(Vice President), HANK PAULSON, TREASURY DEPARTMENT filed by FREDERICK BANKS.(ls, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/31/2007 (jf, ).
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: 2/12/2007 Summons Not Issued
                                                                                  SUMMONS Not Issued as to ALBERTO GONZALES, TRANSPORTATION SECURITY AGENCY, UNITED STATES PASSPORT OFFICE, THE LIBRARY OF CONGRESS, CHARLES SHUMER, U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES, THE SENATE, PATRICIA R. STANSBERRY, LSCJ BUTNER, R. DODSON, ALLEN, J. MIOSI, WALTER HARRIS, D. GREEN, HARLEY LAPPIN, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(President), UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(Vice President), HANK PAULSON, TREASURY DEPARTMENT (ls, )
                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                    This case has been viewed 184 times.

                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                    Space
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                     
                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                    Need Password Help?