MATTICOLA v. DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-00338-CKK
District Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo CHRISTINE L. MATTICOLA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICE OF DAVID P. SHELDON

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Patrick Sheldon +1 202 546 9575 +1 202 546 0135 davidsheldon@davidsheldonlaw.com
v.
No Logo United States Air Force, Defendant
Officially listed as "DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 2/13/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 552 Right to Privacy Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County 88888
Terminated 8/2/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, TYPE-I
  Entries (33) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 23 Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: 8/20/2007 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal and Settlement by DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE. (Kidwell, Judith) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/22/2007 (td, ). Additional attachment(s) added on 8/22/2007 (td, ).
    LREF
    Legal Document 22 Filed: 8/2/2007, Entered: 8/2/2007 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER: The court has been notified by counsel for the Plaintiff that this case has settled in principle. Accordingly, the case is hereby dismissed without prejudice for a period of 30 days (until September 4, 2007). Should counsel fail to move to extend or reopen within the prescribed period, the case will, without further order, be dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 2, 2007. (SM)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 8/2/2007, Entered: 8/2/2007 Order
      MINUTE ENTRY ORDER: The Initial Scheduling Conference previously set for August 7, 2007 is hereby vacated; the parties have settled the case in principle (see previous docket entry and order). Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on August 2, 2007. (SM)
        LREF
        Legal Document 21 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/19/2007 Meet and Confer Statement
        MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Sheldon, David)
          LREF
          Legal Document 20 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: 7/9/2007 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
          ORDER denying without prejudice Plaintiff's [4] Motion for Partial Summary Judgment pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 56(f) and for failure to comply with Local Civil Rules 7(h) and 56.1. As a result of the Court's denial of Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Defendant's [14] Motion For a Continuance pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 56(f) and [17] Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply are DENIED AS MOOT. Plaintiff may re-file her Motion for Partial Summary Judgment after discovery in this matter, provided that she fully complies with Local Civil Rule 7(h) and 56.1. As the parties will be required to re-brief Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Defendant's [16] Motion to Strike in Part Plaintiff's Declaration and [19] Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Exhibits A & B to the Little Declaration are DENIED AS MOOT. Finally, the parties shall appear for an Initial Scheduling Conference in this matter at 9:15 a.m. on Tuesday, August 7, 2007 in Courtroom 28A of the Sixth Floor of the Courthouse Annex. A separate scheduling order shall follow. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on July 9, 2007. (lcckk2)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: 7/10/2007 Set/Reset Hearings
            Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/7/2007 09:15 AM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (dot, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 19 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: 6/29/2007, Terminated: 7/9/2007 Motion to Strike
              MOTION to Strike [11] Memorandum in Opposition, specifically Exhibit A & B of Little Declaration by CHRISTINE L. MATTICOLA (Sheldon, David)
                LREF
                Legal Document 18 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: 6/29/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                Memorandum in opposition to re [16] MOTION to Strike In Part, Plaintiff's Declaration filed by CHRISTINE L. MATTICOLA. (Sheldon, David)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 17 Filed: 6/18/2007, Entered: 6/18/2007, Terminated: 7/9/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE (Kidwell, Judith)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 16 Filed: 6/18/2007, Entered: 6/18/2007, Terminated: 7/9/2007 Motion to Strike
                    MOTION to Strike In Part, Plaintiff's Declaration by DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE (Kidwell, Judith)
                      LREF
                      Blank 15 Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: 6/7/2007 Response to Document
                      RESPONSE re [14] MOTION to Continue filed by CHRISTINE L. MATTICOLA. (See Docket Entry [13] to view document). (nmw, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 13 Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: 6/6/2007 Reply to opposition to Motion
                        REPLY to opposition to motion re [4] First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CHRISTINE L. MATTICOLA. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Matticola Declaration# (2) Exhibit Kelley v. Eli Lilly & Co.# (3) Exhibit AFI 51-202, Paragraph 3.4)(Sheldon, David)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                          Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 6/6/2007. (dot, )
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: 5/16/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                            MINUTE ENTRY ORDER (Paperless) granting [12] Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Accordingly, Plaintiff shall have until and including June 6, 2007, to file a Reply. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on May 16, 2007. (SM)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 12 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: 5/7/2007, Terminated: 5/16/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to
                              Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File A reply to Defendant's Oppotion to Plaintiff's Partial Motion for Summary Judgment by CHRISTINE L. MATTICOLA (Sheldon, David)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: 5/3/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                                MINUTE ENTRY ORDER (Paperless) granting nunc pro tunc [9] Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time, until and including May 2, 2007, to File its Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and to Answer or Respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on May 3, 2007. (SM)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 14 Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: 6/7/2007, Terminated: 7/9/2007 Motion to Continue
                                  MOTION (in the alternative) to Continue Briefing Schedule by DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE. (See Docket Entry [11] to view document). (nmw, )
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 11 Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: 5/2/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
                                    Memorandum in opposition to re [4] First MOTION for Summary Judgment OR ALTERNATIVELY, MOTION FOR A CONTINUANCE filed by DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Little Declaration# (2) Exhibit A# (3) Exhibit B# (4) Affidavit Gillett Declaration)(Kidwell, Judith)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 10 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: 5/1/2007 Answer
                                      DEFENDANT'S ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE. Related document: [1] Complaint filed by CHRISTINE L. MATTICOLA.(Kidwell, Judith)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: 4/30/2007, Terminated: 5/3/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Answer by DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE (Kidwell, Judith)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/20/2007, Entered: 4/20/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                                          MINUTE ENTRY ORDER granting nunc pro tunc [8] Defendant's Unopposed Third Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and to File defendant's Answer or Response to Complaint. Accordingly, Defendant shall have until and including April 30, 2007 to file a response to Plaintif's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and to file Defendant's Answer or other response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on April 20, 2007. (SM)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/19/2007, Entered: 4/19/2007, Terminated: 4/20/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial summary Judgment and to file Defendant's Answer by DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE (Kidwell, Judith)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/19/2007, Entered: 4/19/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                                              MINUTE ENTRY ORDER granting nunc pro tunc [7] Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, until and including April 19, 2007. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on April 19, 2007. (SM)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: 4/16/2007, Terminated: 4/19/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE (Kidwell, Judith)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: 3/27/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment due by 4/16/2007. (dot, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: 3/27/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                                                    MINUTE ENTRY ORDER (Paperless) granting [6] Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Accordingly, Defendant shall have until and including April 16, 2007, to respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on March 27, 2007. (SM)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: 3/26/2007, Terminated: 3/27/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE (Kidwell, Judith)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: 3/20/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Kidwell on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE (Kidwell, Judith)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 3/19/2007, Entered: 3/19/2007, Terminated: 7/9/2007 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                          First MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by CHRISTINE L. MATTICOLA (Attachments: # (1) Statement of Facts)(Sheldon, David) Modified on 3/20/2007 (nmw, ).
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: 3/6/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER Establishing Procedures for Electronic Filing for Cases Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Signed by Judge Kollar-Kotelly on March 6, 2007. (SM)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: 3/6/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                              NOTICE OF ERRATA by CHRISTINE L. MATTICOLA (Sheldon, David)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/13/2007, Entered: 2/15/2007 Complaint
                                                                COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 4616002263)filed by CHRISTINE L. MATTICOLA. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/13/2007, Entered: 2/15/2007 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                                                  SUMMONS (3) Issued as to DEPARTMENT OF THE AIR FORCE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf, )
                                                                    LREF

                                                                    Statistics

                                                                    This case has been viewed 209 times.

                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                    Space
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                     
                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                    Need Password Help?