Computer-assisted Sales System For Utilities

Patent Application United States Patent and Trademark Office, Patent Application No. 08290190
Examiner Diane D Mizrahi, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Examiner Diane D Mizrahi
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Johnson, Jerome D., Applicant

Represented by Hershikovitz & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian Berman +1 703 370 4800
Space Brian Hearn +1 540 899 6218
Space ABRAHAM HERSHKOVITZ +1 703 370 4800
Space Leila Naghibi +1 703 370 4800
Space Dinh X. Nguyen +1 703 370 4800 jbarsky@hershkovitz.net
Space EUGENE RZUCIDLO +1 703 370 4800
Space Joseph Scafetta +1 703 370 4800
Attributes
Patent Type Utility
First Named Inventor Johnson, Jerome D., North Mankato, MN (US)
Filing Date August 15, 1994
Status Patented Case
Status Date Unknown
Location File Repository (franconia)
USPTO Customer Number Unknown
Attorney Docket Number P63324
Confirmation Number 2408
Group Art Unit 2771
Class / Sub-Class 705 / 412
Timeline
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Assignments (14) Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail-Petition Decision - Granted
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Petition Entered
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Change in Power of Attorney (May Include Associate POA)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: None Transaction History
Correspondence Address Change
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/5/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Change in Power of Attorney (May Include Associate POA)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/5/2006, Entered: None Transaction History
Correspondence Address Change
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/9/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Change in Power of Attorney (May Include Associate POA)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/8/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Correspondence Address Change
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/19/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Change in Power of Attorney (May Include Associate POA)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/18/2004, Entered: None Transaction History
Correspondence Address Change
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/28/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Recordation of Patent Grant Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/18/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Amendment after Notice of Allowance (Rule 312)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 5/18/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 4/20/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Notification Mailed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/24/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Drawing(s) Matched to Application
LREF
Blank  Filed: 3/24/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Drawing(s) Processing Completed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/14/1998, Entered: None Transaction History
Drawing(s) Received at Publications
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/15/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Mailroom Date of Drawing(s)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/15/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Issue Fee Payment Verified
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/24/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Notice of Allowance Data Verification Completed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/24/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Notice of Allowance
LREF
Blank  Filed: 10/20/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Examiner Interview Summary Record (PTOL - 413)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/29/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Final Rejection (PTOL - 326)
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/26/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 8/5/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Date Forwarded to Examiner
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/27/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Request for Extension of Time - Granted
LREF
Blank  Filed: 6/27/1997, Entered: None Transaction History
Response after Non-Final Action
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/24/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
Mail Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 12/23/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
Non-Final Rejection
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/5/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/23/1996, Entered: None Transaction History
Miscellaneous Incoming Letter
LREF
Blank  Filed: 2/3/1995, Entered: None Transaction History
Case Docketed to Examiner in GAU
LREF
Blank  Filed: 1/23/1995, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Captured on Microfilm
LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: None Transaction History
Application Is Now Complete
LREF
Blank  Filed: 11/23/1994, Entered: None Transaction History
Information Disclosure Statement (IDS) Filed
LREF
Blank  Filed: 9/22/1994, Entered: None Transaction History
Notice Mailed--Application Incomplete--Filing Date Assigned
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 2 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?