REYNOLDS v. GONZALES
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-00499-RCL
District Judge Royce C. Lamberth, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo GARY IRVING REYNOLDS, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo MICHAEL MUKASEY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cindy S. Owens +1 202 616 2257 cindy.owens@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 3/15/2007
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Transfer to Another District
County 88888
Terminated 8/20/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, JURY, TRANSFERRED, TYPE-H
  Entries (51) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: 9/4/2008 Case Transferred Out
Case transferred out to the USDC for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania, pursuant to Court Order entered 8/13/2008. Sent to Court by CM/ECF Electronic Transfer. (tg, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 35 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: 8/13/2008 Order on Motion to Transfer CaseCourt Filing
    ORDER granting Motion to Transfer Case [31]. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 08/13/2008. (lcrcl2, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 34 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: 8/13/2008 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
      MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 08/13/2008. (lcrcl2, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 33 Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: 7/23/2008 Substitution of Counsel
        NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Cindy S. Owens on behalf of MICHAEL MUKASEY Substituting for attorney Raymond A. Martinez (Owens, Cindy)
          LREF
          Legal Document 32 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/11/2008, Terminated: 8/20/2008 Motion to Stay
          MOTION to Hold Defendant's Motion to Dismiss/Motion for Summary Judgment in Abeyance Pending Determination of Plaintiff's Pro Se Motion to Transfer Venue by GARY IRVING REYNOLDS (tg, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 31 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/11/2008, Terminated: 8/13/2008 Motion to Transfer Case
            MOTION to Transfer Venue by GARY IRVING REYNOLDS (tg, )
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: 6/17/2008 Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
              NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re Docket Entry [30] Mail Returned was entered in error and has been corrected to show the correct recipient. (rje)
                LREF
                Legal Document 30 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008 Mail Returned
                Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to GARY IRVING REYNOLDS. (rje) Modified on 6/17/2008 (rje, ).
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: 6/13/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                  Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response due by 7/12/2008. (rje)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 29 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: 6/12/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time toCourt Filing
                    ORDER granting [28] Motion for Extension of Time to file Opposition. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 06/12/2008. (lcrcl2, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 28 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/4/2008, Terminated: 6/12/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to
                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by GARY IRVING REYNOLDS (tg, )
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's opposition to defendant's motion due by 6/9/2008. (rje)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 27 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: 5/29/2008 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting [25] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Camilla C. McKinney terminated. Fox/Neal Order advising pro se plaintiff that if he does not respond to defendant's motion by June 9, the Court will treat the motion as conceded and may dismiss the case. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 05/29/2008. (lcrcl2, )
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: 5/2/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                            Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response due by 6/9/2008. (rje)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: 5/1/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                              MINUTE ORDER granting [26] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall have until June 9, 2008, to file his response. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 05/01/2008. (lcrcl2, )
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 26 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: 4/25/2008, Terminated: 5/1/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [23] MOTION for Summary Judgment, [22] MOTION to Dismiss by GARY IRVING REYNOLDS (McKinney, Camilla)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 25 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: 4/11/2008, Terminated: 5/29/2008 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                  MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by GARY IRVING REYNOLDS (McKinney, Camilla)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/4/2008, Entered: 3/4/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response due by 4/25/2008 (rje)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: 3/3/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                                      MINUTE ORDER granting [24] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiff shall have until April 25, 2008, to file response. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 03/03/2008. (lcrcl2, )
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 24 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: 2/26/2008, Terminated: 3/3/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [23] MOTION for Summary Judgment, [22] MOTION to Dismiss by GARY IRVING REYNOLDS (McKinney, Camilla)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 23 Filed: 2/12/2008, Entered: 2/13/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                          MOTION for Summary Judgment by MICHAEL MUKASEY (tg, ) (See Docket Entry [22] to view document)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 22 Filed: 2/12/2008, Entered: 2/12/2008, Terminated: 8/19/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                            MOTION to Dismiss by MICHAEL MUKASEY (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit 1 through 7)(Martinez, Raymond)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 21 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: 2/5/2008 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion
                                              NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by MICHAEL MUKASEY re [9] MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment without prejudice (Martinez, Raymond)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 20 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: 2/5/2008 Substitution of Counsel
                                                NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Raymond A. Martinez on behalf of MICHAEL MUKASEY Substituting for attorney Andrea McBarnette (Martinez, Raymond)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 19 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: 1/22/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time toCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER granting [18] Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 01/22/2008. (lcrcl2, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: 1/22/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Response due by 2/27/2008. (rje)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 18 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: 1/18/2008, Terminated: 1/22/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Ameneded Complaint by ALBERTO GONZALES, MICHAEL MUKASEY (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(McBarnette, Andrea)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: 1/16/2008 Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
                                                        NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re [16] MOTION to Amend/Correct [1] Complaint was entered in error. Counsel was instructed how to properly use the Motion ECF event. The clerk terminated the improperly filed motion and docketed the Amended Complaint. (tg, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 17 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: 1/16/2008 Amended Complaint
                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT against MICHAEL MUKASEY filed by GARY IRVING REYNOLDS.(tg, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 16 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: 1/15/2008, Terminated: 1/16/2008 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                            ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION to Amend/Correct [1] Complaint by GARY IRVING REYNOLDS (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Amended Complaint)(McKinney, Camilla) Modified on 1/16/2008 (tg, ).
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: 1/4/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response due by 1/11/2008. (rje)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 15 Filed: 1/3/2008, Entered: 1/3/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER granting [14] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 01/03/2008. (lcrcl2, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 14 Filed: 12/28/2007, Entered: 12/28/2007, Terminated: 1/3/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [9] MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment by GARY IRVING REYNOLDS (McKinney, Camilla)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: 12/6/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response due by 12/28/2007 (rje)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 13 Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: 12/5/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting [12] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/05/2007. (lcrcl2, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 12 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: 11/29/2007, Terminated: 12/5/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [9] MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment by GARY IRVING REYNOLDS (McKinney, Camilla)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 11 Filed: 10/23/2007, Entered: 10/23/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER granting [10] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/23/2007. (lcrcl2, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 10 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007, Terminated: 10/23/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [9] MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment by GARY IRVING REYNOLDS (McKinney, Camilla)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 9 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007, Terminated: 2/5/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION for Summary Judgment by ALBERTO GONZALES (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1-7# (2) Text of Proposed Order)(McBarnette, Andrea)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Response to complaint due by 10/1/2007. (rje)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 8 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time toCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER granting [7] Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 09/25/2007. (lcrcl2, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: 9/13/2007, Terminated: 9/25/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by ALBERTO GONZALES (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(McBarnette, Andrea)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 7/26/2007, Entered: 7/26/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea McBarnette on behalf of ALBERTO GONZALES (McBarnette, Andrea)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: 7/23/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC
                                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt# (2) Exhibit Return Mail Receipt)(McKinney, Camilla)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: 7/23/2007 Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
                                                                                          NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re [4] Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC, was entered in error. A pleading containing the caption of the case and a heading describing the nature of the pleading is missing. Counsel was instructed to refile said pleading. (tg, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 4 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: 7/20/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC
                                                                                            ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney. ALBERTO GONZALES served on 7/18/2007, answer due 9/17/2007 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt# (2) Exhibit Return Mail Receipt)(McKinney, Camilla) Modified on 7/23/2007 (tg, ).
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: 7/20/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                                                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 07/16/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt# (2) Exhibit Return Mail Receipt)(McKinney, Camilla)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: 7/11/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's proof of service or status memorandum due by 7/20/2007. (rje)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: 7/10/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER: There is nothing on the docket of the Clerk of Court reflecting service on defendant Alberto Gonzales, United States Attorney General. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff shall, within the next ten (10) days, file with the Clerk of Court either proof of service or a status memorandum indicating all steps taken to date to effect service. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/10/07. (lcrcl2, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: 3/16/2007 Complaint
                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against ALBERTO GONZALES ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616002933) filed by GARY IRVING REYNOLDS. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(lc, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: 3/16/2007 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                                                                                      SUMMONS (2) Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (lc, )
                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 65 times.

                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                         
                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                        Need Password Help?