RIVERA v. U. S. SECRETARY OF DEFENSE et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-00525-UNA

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo VINCENT FAUSTINO RIVERA, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo ALCEE HASTINGS, Defendant
No Logo ALEXIS SINK, Defendant
Bernanke, Ben Shalom Bernanke, Ben Shalom, Defendant
Officially listed as "BEN BERNANKE"
No Logo BILL MCCOLLUM, Defendant
No Logo BOB GATES, Defendant
No Logo CARLOS GUTTERRES, Defendant
No Logo CHARLES RANGEL, Defendant
No Logo CHARLIE CRUST, Defendant
No Logo CONDELEEZA RICE, Defendant
No Logo DEBORAH PLATT, Defendant
No Logo GEORGE BUSH, Defendant
No Logo HARRY PAULSON, Defendant
No Logo JAMES MCDONOUGH, Defendant
Biden Jr., Joseph R. Biden Jr., Joseph R., Defendant
Officially listed as "JOSEPH BIDEN"
No Logo KENT CONRAD, Defendant
No Logo MAX BAUCUS, Defendant
No Logo RANDALL BRYANT, Defendant
Cheney, Richard B. Cheney, Richard B., Defendant
Officially listed as "RICHARD B. CHENEY"
No Logo SUSAN C. SCHWAB, Defendant
Office Washington, DC
Filed 3/19/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand $9999000
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County 88888
Terminated 3/19/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case '07-5136'['USCA']
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, PROSE-PR, TYPE-F
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 8 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/10/2008 Order on Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
ORDER denying [7] Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on March 31, 2008. (jf, )
    LREF
    Blank 7 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/10/2008, Terminated: 4/3/2008 Motion for Reconsideration
    MOTION for Reconsideration re [4] Order Dismissing Case by VINCENT FAUSTINO RIVERA (jf, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 6 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 USCA Mandate
      MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to [5] Notice of Appeal filed by VINCENT FAUSTINO RIVERA it is OREDER that the motion for reconsideration be denied; it is FURTHER ORDERED, on the court's own motion, that this appeal be dismissed for lack of prosecution. (USCA No. 07-5136) (kb)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: 5/4/2007 USCA Case Number
        USCA Case Number 07-5136 for [5] Notice of Appeal filed by VINCENT FAUSTINO RIVERA. (ls, )
          LREF
          Blank 5 Filed: 3/30/2007, Entered: 4/2/2007 Notice of Appeal
          NOTICE OF APPEAL as to [4] Order Dismissing Case by VINCENT FAUSTINO RIVERA. Parties have been notified. No fee paid. (ls, )
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 3/30/2007, Entered: 4/2/2007 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet
            Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re [5] Notice of Appeal (ls, )
              LREF
              Blank 4 Filed: 3/19/2007, Entered: 4/2/2007 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
              ORDER DISMISSING CASE; Further ordered that plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3/8/07. (ls, )
                LREF
                Blank 3 Filed: 3/19/2007, Entered: 4/2/2007 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3/8/07. (ls, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 2 Filed: 3/19/2007, Entered: 4/2/2007 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                  MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by VINCENT FAUSTINO RIVERA (ls, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 1 Filed: 3/19/2007, Entered: 4/2/2007 Complaint
                    COMPLAINT against KENT CONRAD, MAX BAUCUS, DEBORAH PLATT, HARRY PAULSON, CARLOS GUTTERRES, JOSEPH BIDEN, CONDELEEZA RICE, CHARLIE CRUST, ALEXIS SINK, BILL MCCOLLUM, JAMES MCDONOUGH, RANDALL BRYANT, ALCEE L. HASTINGS, BOB GATES, GEORGE BUSH, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CHARLES RANGEL, SUSAN C. SCHWAB, BEN BERNANKE filed by VINCENT FAUSTINO RIVERA.(ls, )
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 3/19/2007, Entered: 4/2/2007 Summons Not Issued
                      SUMMONS Not Issued as to KENT CONRAD, MAX BAUCUS, DEBORAH PLATT, HARRY PAULSON, CARLOS GUTTERRES, JOSEPH BIDEN, CONDELEEZA RICE, CHARLIE CRUST, ALEXIS SINK, BILL MCCOLLUM, JAMES MCDONOUGH, RANDALL BRYANT, ALCEE L. HASTINGS, BOB GATES, GEORGE BUSH, RICHARD B. CHENEY, CHARLES RANGEL, SUSAN C. SCHWAB, BEN BERNANKE (ls, )
                        LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 15 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?