ENVIRONMENTAL DEFENSE, INC. et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-00605-RMC
District Judge Rosemary M. Collyer, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Environmental Defense, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McGrane Greenfield

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Lisle Miller +1 202 256 2306 +1 202 318 2427 wmiller@williammillergroup.com

Toggle Switch Represented by REED ZARS, ATTORNEY AT LAW

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Reed P. Zars +1 307 745 7979 +1 307 745 7999 rzars@lariat.org
No Logo NEIGHBORS FOR NEIGHBORS, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McGrane Greenfield

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Lisle Miller +1 202 256 2306 +1 202 318 2427 wmiller@williammillergroup.com

Toggle Switch Represented by REED ZARS, ATTORNEY AT LAW

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Reed P. Zars +1 307 745 7979 +1 307 745 7999 rzars@lariat.org
v.
United States Department of Justice United States Department of Justice, Defendant
Officially listed as "U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 3/29/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County 88888
Terminated 8/10/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, TYPE-I
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 13 Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: 8/13/2007 OrderCourt Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on August 10, 2007. (cdw)
    LREF
    Legal Document 12 Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: 8/10/2007 Stipulation of Dismissal
    STIPULATION of Dismissal by ENVIRONMENTAL DEFENSE, INC., NEIGHBORS FOR NEIGHBORS, INC.. (Zars, Reed)
      LREF
      Legal Document 11 Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: 7/11/2007 Status Report
      STATUS REPORT JOINT by ENVIRONMENTAL DEFENSE, INC., NEIGHBORS FOR NEIGHBORS, INC., U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kidwell, Judith)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: 6/12/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
        Set Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 7/11/2007. (cdw)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: 6/11/2007 Order
          MINUTE ENTRY ORDER. In light of [10] Plaintiffs' Notice of Compliance with this Court's Minute Entry Order dated 6/4/07, the parties are instructed to file a Joint Status Report on whether there are any remaining substantive issues in this case no later than 7/11/07. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 06/11/07. (bcs)
            LREF
            Legal Document 10 Filed: 6/10/2007, Entered: 6/10/2007 ~Notice (other)
            NOTICE of Compliance with Minute Order by ENVIRONMENTAL DEFENSE, INC., NEIGHBORS FOR NEIGHBORS, INC. (Zars, Reed)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: 6/4/2007 Order
              MINUTE ENTRY ORDER. Counsel for Plaintiffs are directed to contact counsel for Defendant no later than 6/11/07 to discuss whether this case is moot. Counsel for the parties are directed to contact the Deputy Clerk of this Court to arrange a teleconference immediately thereafter. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 06/04/07. (bcs)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: 6/4/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                MINUTE ENTRY ORDER granting [9] Defendant's Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Answer or Other Response. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file an answer or other response to Plaintiff's complaint no later than 6/29/07. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 06/04/07. (bcs)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 9 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007, Terminated: 6/4/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Kidwell, Judith)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 8 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007 Status Report
                    STATUS REPORT AND PROPOSED ORDER by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kidwell, Judith)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 7 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: 5/3/2007, Terminated: 5/3/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Kidwell, Judith)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: 5/9/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                        Set Deadlines/Hearings: Answer to complaint due by 5/31/2007. (cdw)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: 5/3/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                          MINUTE ENTRY ORDER granting [7] Defendant's Motion for enlargement of time to file an answer or other response. Defendant shall file an answer or other response to Plaintiffs' complaint no later than 5/31/07. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 5/03/07. (bcs)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 6 Filed: 4/24/2007, Entered: 4/24/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                            NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Kidwell on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Kidwell, Judith)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 5 Filed: 4/14/2007, Entered: 4/14/2007 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA case
                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by ENVIRONMENTAL DEFENSE, INC., NEIGHBORS FOR NEIGHBORS, INC.. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 4/6/2007, answer due 5/7/2007. (Zars, Reed)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 4/12/2007, Entered: 4/12/2007 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                MINUTE ENTRY ORDER granting [4] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice and denying as moot [3] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Reed Zars is admitted pro hac vice to represent Plaintiffs in this case. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 4/12/07. (bcs)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/10/2007, Entered: 4/10/2007, Terminated: 4/12/2007 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                  Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct [3] MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Reed Zars, :Firm- Attorney at Law, :Address- 910 E Kearney Street, Laramie, WY 82070. Phone No. - 307-745-7979. Fax No. - 307-745-7999 by ENVIRONMENTAL DEFENSE, INC., NEIGHBORS FOR NEIGHBORS, INC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1# (2) Text of Proposed Order Proposed order)(Miller, William)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/10/2007, Entered: 4/10/2007, Terminated: 4/12/2007 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                    MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Reed Zars, :Firm- Attorney at Law, :Address- 910 E Kearney Street, Laramie, WY 82070. Phone No. - 307-745-7979. Fax No. - 307-745-7999 by ENVIRONMENTAL DEFENSE, INC., NEIGHBORS FOR NEIGHBORS, INC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, William)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: 4/2/2007 LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Aff
                                      LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ENVIRONMENTAL DEFENSE, INC., NEIGHBORS FOR NEIGHBORS, INC. (tg, )
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: 4/2/2007 Complaint
                                        COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616003264) filed by ENVIRONMENTAL DEFENSE, INC., NEIGHBORS FOR NEIGHBORS, INC.. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(tg, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: 4/2/2007 Summons Issued
                                          Summons (3) Issued as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (tg, )
                                            LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 168 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?