GONZALES v. GONZALES
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-00676-PLF
District Judge Paul L. Friedman, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ADA GONZALES, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by KATOR, PARKS & WEISER, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cathy A. Harris +1 202 898 4800 +1 202 289 1389 charris@katorparks.com
Space Michael J. Kator +1 202 898 4800 +1 202 289 1389 mkator@katorparks.com
Space Adrienne Martha Tranel +1 202 898 4800 +1 202 289 1389 atranel@katorparks.com
v.
No Logo Alberto Gonzales, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wyneva Johnson +1 202 514 7224 +1 202 514 8780 wyneva.johnson@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 4/13/2007
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $300000
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags JURY, TYPE-H
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery due by 8/30/2008. Status Conference set for 9/4/2008 09:15 AM in Courtroom 29A before Judge Paul L. Friedman. (mm)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: 6/6/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete
    MINUTE ORDER granting [11] plaintiff's unopposed motion for extension of time up to and including August 30, 2008 to complete discovery. the status conference formerly scheduled for June 19, 2008 is continued to September 4, 2008 at 9:15 a.m. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on June 6, 2008. (MA)
      LREF
      Legal Document 11 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: 6/5/2008, Terminated: 6/6/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by ADA GONZALES (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Tranel, Adrienne)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: 4/25/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
        Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery due by 6/16/2008. Status Conference set for 6/19/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 29A before Judge Paul L. Friedman. (mm)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete
          MINUTE ORDER granting [10] Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time [10]. The discovery period will be extended to June 16, 2008. The status conference currently scheduled for May 13, 2008 is hereby CANCELLED. The parties will appear for a status conference on June 19, 2008 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on April 24, 2008. (MA)
            LREF
            Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: 4/23/2008, Terminated: 4/24/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by ALBERTO GONZALES (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Johnson, Wyneva)
              LREF
              Legal Document 9 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: 1/30/2008 Notice of Change of Address
              NOTICE of Change of Address by Adrienne Martha Tranel (Tranel, Adrienne)
                LREF
                Legal Document 8 Filed: 11/8/2007, Entered: 11/8/2007 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on November 8, 2007. (MA)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 11/8/2007, Entered: 11/9/2007 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines
                  Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Amended Pleadings and Joinder of Parties by 11/26/2007; Discovery due by 5/2/2008; Plaintiff's Rule 26a2 Disclosures due by 3/4/2008; Defendant's Rule 26a2 Disclosures due by 4/3/2008; Status Conference set for 5/13/2008 @ 09:30 AM in Courtroom 29A before Judge Paul L. Friedman. (mm)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 11/5/2007, Entered: 11/5/2007 Meet and Confer Hearing
                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul L. Friedman: Meet and Confer Status Conference held on 11/5/2007. Discovery due by 5/2/2008. Status Conference set for 5/13/2008 @ 09:30 AM in Courtroom 29A before Judge Paul L. Friedman. Scheduling Order to issue. (Court Reporter Linda Russo) (mm)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: 11/2/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                      MINUTE ORDER granting [6] parties' consent motion for extension of time up to and including October 30, 2007 to file their joint Local Rule 16.3 statement. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on November 2, 2007. (MA)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 7 Filed: 10/30/2007, Entered: 10/30/2007 Meet and Confer Statement
                        MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Tranel, Adrienne)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 6 Filed: 10/30/2007, Entered: 10/30/2007, Terminated: 11/2/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to
                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Local Rule 16.3 Statement by ADA GONZALES (Tranel, Adrienne)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 5 Filed: 10/30/2007, Entered: 10/30/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                            NOTICE of Appearance by Adrienne Martha Tranel on behalf of ADA GONZALES (Tranel, Adrienne)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 4 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                              NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Kator on behalf of ADA GONZALES (Kator, Michael)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007 Order
                                MINUTE ORDER: Meet and Confer Status Conference set for 11/5/2007 @ 01:45 PM in Courtroom 29A before Judge Paul L. Friedman. The parties shall meet, confer and file a Joint Report pursuant to Local Rule 16.3 no later than 10/29/2007. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/10/2007. (mm)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/24/2007 Answer
                                  ANSWER to Complaint by ALBERTO GONZALES. Related document: [1] Complaint filed by ADA GONZALES.(Johnson, Wyneva)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: 8/14/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Wyneva Johnson on behalf of ALBERTO GONZALES (Johnson, Wyneva)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: 4/17/2007 Complaint
                                      COMPLAINT against ALBERTO GONZALES ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616003582) filed by ADA GONZALES. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(td, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: 4/17/2007 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                        SUMMONS (2) Issued as to ALBERTO GONZALES, U.S. Attorney (td, )
                                          LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 138 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?