RUCKER v. ARCHITECT OF THE CAPITOL
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-00699-JR
District Judge James Robertson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo PRISCILLA RUCKER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donna Williams Rucker +1 301 496 0400 +1 202 496 0404 ruck92@aol.com
v.
No Logo ARCHITECT OF THE CAPITOL, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christian Alexander Natiello +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 514 8780 christian.natiello@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 4/17/2007
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $450000
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 29 U.S.C. § 791 Job Discrimination (Rehabilitation Act)
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County 11001
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags JURY, TYPE-H
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 20 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 OrderCourt Filing
NOTICE TO COUNSEL. Signed by Judge James Robertson on July 28, 2008. (MT)
    LREF
    Legal Document 19 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: 3/25/2008 Substitution of Counsel
    NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Christian Alexander Natiello on behalf of ARCHITECT OF THE CAPITOL Substituting for attorney Kenneth Adebonojo (Natiello, Christian)
      LREF
      Legal Document 17 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/6/2008 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
      SCHEDULING ORDER: a status conference is set for April 30, 2008 at 4:30 p.m.; a final pretrial conference is set for September 18, 2008 at 4:30 p.m. and a jury trial will commence at 9:30 a.m. on October 1, 2008. All matters will be held in Courtroom 23A before Judge James Robertson. Signed by Judge James Robertson on March 6, 2008. (MT)
        LREF
        Legal Document 16 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: 3/5/2008 Meet and Confer Statement
        MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Adebonojo, Kenneth)
          LREF
          Legal Document 15 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: 3/3/2008 Reply to opposition to Motion
          REPLY to opposition to motion re [11] MOTION to Dismiss filed by ARCHITECT OF THE CAPITOL. (Adebonojo, Kenneth)
            LREF
            Legal Document 18 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 3/19/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
            Memorandum in opposition to re [11] MOTION to Dismiss filed by PRISCILLA RUCKER. (ks, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 13 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
              ORDER granting [12] Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 2/19/2008. (alr, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 14 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: 2/22/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                Memorandum in opposition to re [11] MOTION to Dismiss filed by PRISCILLA RUCKER. (lc, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 12 Filed: 2/18/2008, Entered: 2/18/2008, Terminated: 2/21/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                  Consent MOTION for Leave to File Opposition, Nunc Pro Tunc, to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by PRISCILLA RUCKER (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Rucker, Donna)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 1/23/2008, Entered: 1/23/2008 Set/Reset Hearings
                    Set Hearing: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/5/2008 04:30 PM in CHAMBERS before Judge James Robertson. (alr)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 11 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: 1/22/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                      MOTION to Dismiss by ARCHITECT OF THE CAPITOL (Adebonojo, Kenneth)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 10 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: 1/22/2008 Answer
                        ANSWER to [1] Complaint by ARCHITECT OF THE CAPITOL. Related document: [1] Complaint filed by PRISCILLA RUCKER.(Adebonojo, Kenneth)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: 1/18/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                          MINUTE ORDER granting defendant's consented motion for extension of time [9] to January 22, 2008. Signed by Judge James Robertson on January 18, 2008. (MT)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 9 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: 1/16/2008, Terminated: 1/18/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to
                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Answer or Otherwise Respond by ARCHITECT OF THE CAPITOL (Adebonojo, Kenneth)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: 12/4/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                              MINUTE ORDER granting defendant's motion for extension of time [8] to January 16, 2008. Signed by Judge James Robertson on December 4, 2007. (MT)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 8 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007, Terminated: 12/4/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Answer or Other Response by ARCHITECT OF THE CAPITOL (Adebonojo, Kenneth)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 7 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: 10/3/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                                  RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 10/1/07. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Rucker, Donna)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 6 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: 10/3/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC
                                    RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney. PRISCILLA RUCKER served on 10/3/2007, answer due 12/3/2007 (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit)(Rucker, Donna)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: 10/3/2007 Summons Reissued as to AUSA
                                      SUMMONS (1) REISSUED as to U.S. Attorney. (lc, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/21/2007 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                        SUMMONS (2) Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (lc, )
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 5 Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: 9/19/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                          SECOND NOTICE UNDER RULE 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge James Robertson on September 19, 2007. (MT)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 9/7/2007, Entered: 9/7/2007 Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
                                            NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re [3] Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant was entered in error has been refiled correctly by the Court in docket entry [4]. (lc, )
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 4 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: 9/7/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                              RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to ARCHITECT OF THE CAPITOL served on 5/9/2007, answer due 7/9/2007. (lc, )
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 3 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: 9/6/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to PRISCILLA RUCKER served on 5/9/2007, answer due 7/9/2007. (Rucker, Donna) Modified on 9/7/2007 (lc, ).
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/22/2007, Entered: 8/22/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  NOTICE Under Rule 4M of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge James Robertson on August 22, 2007. (MT)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: 4/18/2007 Complaint
                                                    COMPLAINT against ARCHITECT OF THE CAPITOL ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616003644) filed by PRISCILLA RUCKER. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(lc, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: 4/18/2007 Summons Issued
                                                      Summons (1) Issued as to ARCHITECT OF THE CAPITOL. (lc, )
                                                        LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 148 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?