SULLIVAN v. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-00685-RWR
District Judge Richard W. Roberts, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo John F. Sullivan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by MARK S. ZAID, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bradley P. Moss +1 202 907 7945 +1 202 330 5610 brad@markzaid.com
Space Mark Steven Zaid +1 202 454 2809 +1 202 330 5610 Mark@MarkZaid.com
v.
United States Central Intelligence Agency United States Central Intelligence Agency, Defendant
Officially listed as "CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter Bryce +1 202 616 8335 +1 202 616 8470 peter.bryce@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Justice United States Department of Justice, Defendant
Officially listed as "DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter Bryce +1 202 616 8335 +1 202 616 8470 peter.bryce@usdoj.gov
No Logo DOES 1-10, Defendant
Hayden, Michael V. Hayden, Michael V., Defendant
Officially listed as "MICHAEL V. HAYDEN"
Motorola, Inc. Unknown Role, Motorola, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter Bryce +1 202 616 8335 +1 202 616 8470 peter.bryce@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 4/5/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TYPE-I
  Entries (39) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 27 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: 7/29/2009 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
    LREF
    Legal Document 15 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: 4/28/2008 Reply to opposition to Motion
    REPLY to opposition to motion re [9] MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN. (Bryce, Peter)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/16/2009, Entered: 7/16/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document 14 Filed: 3/27/2008, Entered: 3/27/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
        Memorandum in opposition to re [9] MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by JOHN F. SULLIVAN. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Sullivan Declaration, # (2) Exhibit 1-A -- Sullivan Credit Statement, # (3) Exhibit 2 - Zaid Declaration, # (4) Exhibit 2A - Zaid Letter to Bryce - Nov 4, 2007, # (5) Exhibit 2B - Bryce Letter to Zaid -- Nov 15, 2007, # (6) Exhibit 2C - Zaid Letter to Bryce -- Nov 20, 2007, # (7) Exhibit 2D - Zaid Letter to Bryce -- Nov 21, 2007, # (8) Exhibit 2E - Zaid Letter to Bryce -- Dec 26, 2007, # (9) Exhibit 2F - Zaid E-mail to Bryce -- Jan 2, 2008, # (10) Exhibit 2G - Bryce Letter to Zaid -- Jan 3, 2008, # (11) Exhibit 2H - Zaid Letter to Bryce -- Jan 17, 2008, # (12) Exhibit 2I - Zaid Letter to Bryce -- Jan 21, 2008, # (13) Exhibit 2J - Redacted Investigative Pages, # (14) Exhibit 3 - CIA Letter to Sullivan, # (15) Text of Proposed Order)(Zaid, Mark)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: 6/29/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: 3/26/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
            Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Dispositive Motions due by 3/27/2008. (lin, )
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/12/2009, Entered: 6/12/2009 Motion for Summary Judgment
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: 3/26/2008 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff's consent motion [13] for leave to file excess pages be, and hereby is, GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 3/26/08. (lcrwr2)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/18/2009, Entered: 5/18/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document 13 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: 3/25/2008, Terminated: 3/26/2008 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                    Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by JOHN F. SULLIVAN (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Zaid, Mark)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: 4/17/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: 3/24/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                        MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff's consent motion [12] for an extension of time until March 27, 2008 to respond to defendants' motion to dismiss be, and hereby is, GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 3/24/08. (lcrwr2)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/13/2009, Entered: 4/13/2009 Answer to Amended Complaint
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document 12 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: 3/10/2008, Terminated: 3/24/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [9] MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by JOHN F. SULLIVAN (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Zaid, Mark)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/24/2009, Entered: 3/24/2009 Memorandum in Opposition
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: 2/14/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 3/13/2008 (zlin, )
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/24/2009, Entered: 3/24/2009 Meet and Confer Statement
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/12/2008, Entered: 2/12/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                                    MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff's consent motion [11] for an extension of time until March 13, 2008 to respond to defendants' motion to dismiss be, and hereby is, GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 2/12/08. (lcrwr2)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/17/2009, Entered: 3/17/2009 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document 11 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: 2/11/2008, Terminated: 2/12/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [9] MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by JOHN F. SULLIVAN (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Zaid, Mark)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: 3/13/2009 Motion for Reconsideration
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document 10 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley P. Moss on behalf of JOHN F. SULLIVAN (Moss, Bradley)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/6/2009, Entered: 3/6/2009 Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document 9 Filed: 1/31/2008, Entered: 1/31/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                                MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Declaration Tormey Declaration, # (3) Declaration Bryce Declaration, # (4) Exhibit A, # (5) Exhibit B, # (6) Exhibit C)(Bryce, Peter)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/11/2008, Entered: 1/11/2008 Summons Reissued as to USA
                                                  SUMMONS REISSUED as to U.S. Attorney (tg, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: 11/26/2007 Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                    MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the unopposed Motion [8] of defendants Central Intelligence Agency and Michael V. Hayden (defendants) for an extension of time to respond to plaintiffs first amended complaint be, and hereby is, GRANTED. Defendants shall file their answer or other response to the first amended complaint on the date that the answer or response of putative defendant Department of Justice becomes due under the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and in any event, not later than January 31, 2008. Since an amended complaint has been filed, it is further ORDERED that defendants Motion [4] to dismiss the complaint be, and hereby is, DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 11/26/07. (lcrwr2)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 8 Filed: 11/8/2007, Entered: 11/8/2007, Terminated: 11/26/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond To Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN (Bryce, Peter)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 7 Filed: 11/5/2007, Entered: 11/5/2007 ERRATA
                                                        ERRATA Substituting Redacted Exhibits to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN [4] MOTION to Dismiss filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Redacted Exhibit A to Tormey Declaration# (2) Exhibit Redacted Exhibit B to Tormey Declaration# (3) Exhibit Redacted Exhibit C to Tormey Declaration)(Bryce, Peter)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 6 Filed: 11/5/2007, Entered: 11/5/2007 Amended Complaint
                                                          FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, DOES 1-10 filed by JOHN F. SULLIVAN.(nmw, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/5/2007, Entered: 11/5/2007 Summons Issued
                                                            Summons (1) Issued as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (jf, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: 10/9/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Dispositive Motions due by 11/5/2007. (zlin, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                                                                MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff's consent Motion [5] for an extension of time until November 5, 2007 to respond to defendants' Motion [4] to Dismiss be, and hereby is, GRANTED. Defendants shall have thirty days from the time plaintiff's response is filed with the Court to submit any further responsive document. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 10/4/07. (lcrwr2)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 5 Filed: 9/30/2007, Entered: 9/30/2007, Terminated: 10/4/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [4] MOTION to Dismiss by JOHN F. SULLIVAN (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Zaid, Mark)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: 8/31/2007, Terminated: 11/26/2007 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order # (2) Declaration of Kathleen Tormey# (3) (SEALED) Exhibit A to Tormey Declaration# (4) (SEALED) Exhibit B to Tormey Declaration# (5) (SEALED) Exhibit C to Tormey Declaration)(Bryce, Peter) Modified on 11/5/2007 (jf, ).
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: 7/24/2007 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                      MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the joint motions to set a briefing schedule, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion [3] be, and hereby is, GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that this case shall proceed with the following deadlines: Defendants' dispositive motion due by August 31, 2007; Response to dispositive motion due by September 30, 2007; Reply due by October 30, 2007. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 7/24/07. (lcrwr3 )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: 7/11/2007, Terminated: 7/24/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                        Joint MOTION To Set Briefing Schedule by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN (Bryce, Peter)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 4/19/2007, Entered: 4/19/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                          NOTICE of Filing of Letter to CIA OGC by JOHN F. SULLIVAN (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Letter to CIA OGC dated April 4, 2007)(Zaid, Mark)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/5/2007, Entered: 4/18/2007 Complaint
                                                                            COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, DOES 1-10 ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616003605) filed by JOHN F. SULLIVAN. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/5/2007, Entered: 4/18/2007 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                                                              SUMMONS (4) Issued as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, MICHAEL V. HAYDEN, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf, )
                                                                                LREF

                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                This case has been viewed 174 times.

                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                Space
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                 
                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                Need Password Help?