USA v. ZACHARES
Criminal Case District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:07-cr-00106-ESH

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard C. Pilger +5141 514 514 1412 +1 202 514 3003

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew L. Stennes +1 202 307 2788 +1 202 514 3003 matthew.stennes@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo MARK DENNIS ZACHARES, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Edward B MacMahon Jr.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward B. MacMahon +1 540 687 3902 +1 540 687 6366 ebmjr@macmahon-law.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Washington, DC
Filed 4/23/2007
County 11001
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
18371 - CONSPIRACY TO DEFRAUD THE UNITED STATES; Conspiracy.
Def Custody Status Released
Flag CAT A
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: 4/30/2008 Set/Reset Hearings
Set/Reset Hearings as to MARK DENNIS ZACHARES:Status Conference set for 9/18/2008 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 14 before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. (gdf)
    LREF
    Legal Document 14 Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: 4/30/2008 Order on Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
    ORDER granting [13] Motion to Continue Status Hearing as to MARK DENNIS ZACHARES (1). New Status hearing set for 9/18/08 at 9:30 a.m. before Judge Huvelle. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 4/24/08. (gdf)
      LREF
      Legal Document 13 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: 4/23/2008, Terminated: 4/24/2008 Motion to Continue
      Joint MOTION to Continue Status Conference by USA as to MARK DENNIS ZACHARES. (Stennes, Matthew)
        LREF
        Legal Document 12 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: 2/5/2008 Order on Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
        ORDER granting [11] Motion to Continue Status Hearing as to MARK DENNIS ZACHARES (1). New Status Hearing set 5/2/08 at 9:15 a.m. in courtroom 14. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 2/1/08. (gdf)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: 2/6/2008 Set/Reset Hearings
          Set/Reset Hearings as to MARK DENNIS ZACHARES: Status Conference set for 5/2/2008 at 09:15 AM in Courtroom 14 before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. (tnr, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 11 Filed: 1/31/2008, Entered: 1/31/2008, Terminated: 2/5/2008 Motion to Continue
            Joint MOTION to Continue Status Conference by USA as to MARK DENNIS ZACHARES. (Stennes, Matthew)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: 10/31/2007 Set/Reset Hearings
              Set/Reset Hearings as to MARK DENNIS ZACHARES: Status Conference set for 2/7/2008 09:30 AM in Courtroom 14 before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. (gdf)
                LREF
                Legal Document 10 Filed: 10/30/2007, Entered: 10/31/2007 Order on Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
                ORDER granting [9] Motion to Continue status conference as to MARK DENNIS ZACHARES (1). New Status Hearing set 2/7/08 at 9:30 a.m. before Judge Huvelle in courtroom 14 on the 4th floor. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 10/26/07. (gdf)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 9 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: 10/26/2007, Terminated: 10/30/2007 Motion to Continue
                  Joint MOTION to Continue Status Conference by MARK DENNIS ZACHARES, USA as to MARK DENNIS ZACHARES. (Stennes, Matthew)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/19/2007 Notice of Hearing.
                    NOTICE OF HEARING as to MARK DENNIS ZACHARES Status Conference reset for 11/2/2007 09:30 AM in Courtroom 14 before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. (gdf)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: 4/26/2007 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Edward B. MacMahon, Jr appearing for MARK DENNIS ZACHARES (MacMahon, Edward)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/24/2007, Entered: 4/26/2007 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                        ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to MARK DENNIS ZACHARES (1) : Personal recognizance. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 4/24/07. (cp, )
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/24/2007, Entered: 4/26/2007 Order for Routine ProcessingCourt Filing
                          ORDER FOR ROUTINE PROCESSING as to MARK DENNIS ZACHARES. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 4/24/07. (cp, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 6 Filed: 4/24/2007, Entered: 4/26/2007 Plea Agreement
                            PLEA AGREEMENT as to MARK DENNIS ZACHARES. (cp, )
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 5 Filed: 4/24/2007, Entered: 4/26/2007 Factual Proffer
                              FACTUAL Bais for the Plea by USA as to MARK DENNIS ZACHARES. (cp, )
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/24/2007, Entered: 4/26/2007 Waiver of Trial by JuryCourt Filing
                                WAIVER of Right to Trial by Jury as to MARK DENNIS ZACHARES approved by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 4/24/07. (cp, )
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/24/2007, Entered: 4/26/2007 Waiver of IndictmentCourt Filing
                                  WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by MARK DENNIS ZACHARES signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 4/24/07. (cp, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/24/2007, Entered: 4/26/2007 Arraignment
                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle : Arraignment as to MARK DENNIS ZACHARES (1) held on 4/24/2007 on Count 1. Plea of Guilty entered by MARK DENNIS ZACHARES (1) as to Count 1. REFERRAL TO PROBATION OFFICE for Presentence Investigation as to MARK DENNIS ZACHARES. Status Conference set for 8/3/2007 10:30 AM in Courtroom 14 before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. Bond Status of Defendant: Defendant on PR Bond; Court Reporter: Bryan Wayne Defense Attorney: Edward B. MacMahon, Jr.; US Attorney: Richard Pilgrer and Matthew Stennes; (cp, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/24/2007, Entered: 4/24/2007 Set/Reset Hearings
                                      Set/Reset Hearings as to MARK DENNIS ZACHARES: Plea Agreement Hearing set for 4/24/2007 03:00 PM in Courtroom 14 before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. (gdf)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: 4/23/2007 Information - Felony
                                        INFORMATION as to MARK DENNIS ZACHARES (1) count(s) 1. (cp, )
                                          LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 35 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?