GARDNER v. GATES
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-00802-RWR
District Judge Richard W. Roberts, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JACK GARDNER, JR., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by KALIJARVI, CHUZI & NEWMAN & FITCH, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George Michael Chuzi +1 202 331 9260 +1 866 455 1504 gchuzi@kcnlaw.com
Space Michelle L. Perry +1 202 331 9260 +1 202 872 9562 perry.michelle@gmail.com
v.
No Logo ROBERT GATES, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
Space Jane M. Lyons +1 202 514 7161 +1 202 514 8780 jane.lyons@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 5/2/2007
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $3000000
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags JURY, TYPE-H
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 23 Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: 8/15/2008 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal and Settlement (Signature Needed) by ROBERT GATES. (Lyons, Jane)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: 7/30/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
    Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 8/12/2008 (lin, )
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
      MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that defendant's [22] motion for extension of time to file a response be, and hereby is, GRANTED. The defendant's response may be filed on or before August 12, 2008. Issued by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 7/28/2008. (DCL)
        LREF
        Legal Document 22 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: 7/25/2008, Terminated: 7/28/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by ROBERT GATES (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Lyons, Jane)
          LREF
          Legal Document 21 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/11/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [20] MOTION for Discovery Status Conference by ROBERT GATES (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Lyons, Jane)
            LREF
            Legal Document 20 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008 Motion for Discovery
            MOTION for Discovery Status Conference by JACK GARDNER, JR (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Perry, Michelle)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: 6/25/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
              Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery due by 10/17/2008. Status Conference set for 10/24/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Richard W. Roberts. (lin, )
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: 6/25/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete
                MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties' joint motion [18] for extension of time to complete discovery until October 17, 2008 be, and hereby is, GRANTED. The post discovery status conference is RESCHEDULED to occur on October 24, 2008, at 10:00 a.m. Issued by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 6/24/2008. (DCL)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 19 Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: 6/24/2008 Protective OrderCourt Filing
                  PROTECTIVE ORDER setting forth procedures for handling confidential material; allowing designated material to be filed under seal. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 6/19/08. (lin, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 18 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: 5/2/2008, Terminated: 6/25/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                    Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and to Amend the Scheduling Order by ROBERT GATES (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Lyons, Jane)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 17 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: 4/25/2008, Terminated: 6/24/2008 Motion for Protective Order
                      Joint MOTION for Protective Order by ROBERT GATES (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Lyons, Jane)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: 3/17/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                        Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery due by 8/21/2008. Status Conference set for 9/2/2008 03:30 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Richard W. Roberts. Dispositive Motions due by 10/2/2008. (lin, )
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: 3/14/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete
                          MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties' joint motion [16] for time through August 21, 2008 to complete discovery be, and hereby is, GRANTED. The post-discovery status conference is RESET to September 2, 2008 at 3:30 p.m.; the dispositive motions deadline is RESET to October 2, 2008. Issued by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 3/14/08. (EHS)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 16 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: 3/5/2008, Terminated: 3/14/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                            Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by ROBERT GATES (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Lyons, Jane)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 15 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: 1/29/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Court Filing
                              ORDER granting [14] Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 1/28/08. (lin, )
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: 1/29/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                Set Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery due by 6/20/2008. Status Conference set for 6/23/2008 09:45 AM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Richard W. Roberts. Dispositive Motions due by 8/7/2008. Response to Dispositive Motions due by 9/9/2008. Reply to Dispositive Motions due by 9/30/2008. (lin, )
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 14 Filed: 1/28/2008, Entered: 1/28/2008, Terminated: 1/29/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                  Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and to Amend the Scheduling Order by ROBERT GATES (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Lyons, Jane)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 11/21/2007, Entered: 11/21/2007 Notice of Hearing.
                                    NOTICE of Hearing:Status Conference reset for 4/4/2008 09:15 AM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Richard W. Roberts. (Previously set for 3/28/07)(lin, )
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 13 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: 10/16/2007 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: All discovery to close March 27, 2008; post-discovery conference set for March 28, 2008 at 9:15 a.m. See order for additional information. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 10/16/2007. (EHS)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: 10/17/2007 Scheduling Conference
                                        Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Richard W. Roberts : Scheduling Conference held on 10/16/2007.Discovery due by 3/27/2008.,Dispositive Motions due by 4/28/2008.,Status Conference set for 3/28/2008 09:15 AM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Richard W. Roberts. (Court Reporter Scott Wallace.) (lin, )
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 12 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: 10/3/2007 Meet and Confer Statement
                                          MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Lyons, Jane)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: 8/31/2007 Set/Reset Hearings
                                            Set/Reset Hearings: Scheduling Conference reset for 10/16/2007 09:15 AM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Richard W. Roberts. (zlin, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: 8/31/2007 Order on Motion to Continue
                                              MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff's consent motion [11] to continue the initial scheduling conference be, and hereby is, GRANTED. The scheduling conference is rescheduled from 10/10/07 to 10/16/07 at 9:15 a.m. Issued by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 8/31/07. (EHS)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 11 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: 8/28/2007, Terminated: 8/31/2007 Motion to Continue
                                                Consent MOTION to Continue Status Conference by JACK GARDNER, JR (Chuzi, George)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: 8/28/2007 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                  Set/Reset Hearings: Scheduling Conference set for 10/10/2007 09:15 AM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Richard W. Roberts. (zlin, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 10 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: 8/27/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Jane M. Lyons on behalf of ROBERT GATES (Lyons, Jane)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 9 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: 8/27/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER setting initial scheduling conference for October 10, 2007 at 9:15 a.m. See order for additional information. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 8/27/07. (EHS)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: 7/31/2007 Answer
                                                        Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by ROBERT GATES. Related document: [1] Complaint filed by JACK GARDNER, JR..(Kidwell, Judith)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: 7/20/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                          MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED tht defendant's consent motion [7] for extension of time to answer be, and hereby is, GRANTED. ROBERT GATES' answer is due 7/31/2007. Issued by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 7/20/07. (EHS)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 7 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: 7/12/2007, Terminated: 7/20/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by ROBERT GATES (Kidwell, Judith)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 6 Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: 6/5/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Kidwell on behalf of ROBERT GATES (Kidwell, Judith)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 5 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: 5/23/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney for DC
                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Certificate of Service)(Perry, Michelle)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: 5/23/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to JACK GARDNER, JR served on 5/16/2007, answer due 7/16/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Certificate of Service)(Perry, Michelle)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: 5/23/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to Attorney General
                                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General May 16, 2007. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Certificate of Service)(Perry, Michelle)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: 5/8/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by George Michael Chuzi on behalf of JACK GARDNER, JR (Chuzi, George)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: 5/2/2007 Complaint
                                                                        COMPLAINT against ROBERT GATES ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616003985) filed by JACK GARDNER, JR. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: 5/4/2007 Summons Issued
                                                                          Summons (3) Issued as to ROBERT GATES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (tg, )
                                                                            LREF

                                                                            Statistics

                                                                            This case has been viewed 104 times.

                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                            Space
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                             
                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                            Need Password Help?