FEDERAL CURE v. LAPPIN
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-00843-RBW
District Judge Reggie B. Walton, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 8, 2017 at 12:26 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo FEDERAL CURE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by KLIMASKI & ASSOCIATES, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Robert Klimaski +1 202 296 5600 +1 202 296 5601 Klimaski@Klimaskilaw.com
Space Lynn Ilene Miller +1 202 296 5600 +1 202 296 5601 miller@klimaskilaw.com
v.
No Logo HARLEY G. LAPPIN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Health and Human Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan C. Brumer +1 202 205 8703 +1 202 401 1405 jonathan.brumer@hhs.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 5/7/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TYPE-I
  Entries (53) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 20 Filed: 4/18/2008, Entered: 4/18/2008 Reply to opposition to Motion
REPLY to opposition to motion re [8] MOTION for Summary Judgment -- Plaintiff Here Replying to Defendant's Opposition to Its Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment filed by FEDERAL CURE. (Klimaski, James)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: 3/24/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
    Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply due by 4/18/2008. (mpt, )
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: 3/24/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
      MINUTE ORDER granting [19] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Reply is due by 4/18/2008. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 03/24/08. (TH, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 19 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 3/21/2008, Terminated: 3/24/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to April 18, 2008, to Defendant's 3-13-08 opposition to plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment by FEDERAL CURE (Klimaski, James)
          LREF
          Legal Document 18 Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: 3/13/2008 Reply to opposition to Motion
          REPLY to opposition to motion re [8] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by HARLEY G. LAPPIN. (Kidwell, Judith)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 2/22/2008, Entered: 2/22/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
            Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply to opposition to motion for summary judgement due by 3/14/2008. (mpt, )
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
              MINUTE ORDER granting [17]Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition and Motion for Summary Judgment. Replies are due by 3/14/2008. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 2/21/08. (TH, )
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply due by 2/22/2008. (mpt, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 17 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: 2/20/2008, Terminated: 2/21/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition and Motion for Summary Judgment by HARLEY G. LAPPIN (Kidwell, Judith)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: 2/20/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                    MINUTE ORDER granting [16] Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply. Reply is now due by 2/22/2008. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 2-20-08. (TH, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 16 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: 2/15/2008, Terminated: 2/20/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by HARLEY G. LAPPIN (Kidwell, Judith)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 15 Filed: 1/11/2008, Entered: 1/11/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
                        Memorandum in opposition to re [8] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by FEDERAL CURE. (Attachments: # (1) Statement of Facts Genuine Issues of Material Fact Not in Dispute# (2) Ex. A# (3) Ex. B# (4) Ex. C# (5) Ex. D# (6) Ex. E# (7) Ex. F# (8) Ex. G# (9) Ex. H# (10) Ex. I# (11) Ex. J)(Klimaski, James)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: 1/9/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                          Set/Reset Deadlines: Opposition due by 1/11/2008,Reply due by 2/19/2008. (mpt, )
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: 1/8/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                            MINUTE ORDER granting [14] Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to the Motion for Summary Judgment. Opposition is due: January 11,2008 and the Reply is due: February 19, 2008. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 01-08-08. (TH, )
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: 1/8/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                              Set/Reset Deadlines: Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 1/7/2008.,Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/11/2008. (mpt, )
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/14/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                STIPULATION AND ORDER for Payment of Interim Attorney's Fees and Costs. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 5/14/09. (mpt, ) (Entered: 05/14/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: 1/8/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                                  MINUTE ORDER granting [13] Motion for Extension of Time to File opposition to the Motion for Summary Judgment. Opposition due: January 7, 2008 and Reply is due: February 11, 2008. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 01-07-2008. (TH, )
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/13/2009, Entered: None
                                    STIPULATION and Order For Payment of Interim Attorney Fees and Costs by HARLEY G. LAPPIN. (Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 05/13/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document 14 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: 1/7/2008, Terminated: 1/8/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [8] MOTION for Summary Judgment up to and including Jan. 11, 2008, by FEDERAL CURE (Klimaski, James)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/29/2009, Entered: None
                                        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by HARLEY G. LAPPIN (Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 04/29/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: 1/7/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                                          ORDER granting [12] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response nunc pro tunc. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on January 7, 2008. (MDW, )
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None
                                            MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs by FEDERAL CURE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Atty Fees & Costs Summary Page, # 4 Atty Fees Itemized, # 5 Case Costs Itemized, # 6 James Klimaski Resume, # 7 Lynn Miller Resume)(Klimaski, James) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document 13 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: 1/4/2008, Terminated: 1/8/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                              Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [8] MOTION for Summary Judgment up to and including Jan. 7, 2008 by FEDERAL CURE (Klimaski, James)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 25 Filed: 3/18/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 03/18/09. (TH, ) (Entered: 03/18/2009)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 12 Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: 12/12/2007, Terminated: 1/7/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [8] MOTION for Summary Judgment up to and including Jan. 4, 2008 by FEDERAL CURE (Klimaski, James)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/18/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 03/18/09. (TH, ) (Entered: 03/18/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: 11/29/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/12/2007.,Reply due by 1/11/2008. (mpt, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                        SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to the Court: Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Response to the Show Cause Order, filed by FEDERAL CURE. (Klimaski, James) (Entered: 10/30/2008)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: 11/27/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                                                          MINUTE ORDER granting [11] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re [11] Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to [8] MOTION for Summary Judgment to Dec. 12, 2007. Responses due by 12/12/2007 Replies due by 1/11/2008. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on November 27, 2007. (MDW, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                            RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT To Show Cause filed by HARLEY G. LAPPIN. (Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 10/29/2008)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document 11 Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: 11/26/2007, Terminated: 11/27/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                              Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [8] MOTION for Summary Judgment to Dec. 12, 2007. by FEDERAL CURE (Klimaski, James)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/30/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER denying 8 Motion for Summary Judgment and ordering the defendant to show cause. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 09/30/08. (TH, ) (Entered: 09/30/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: 11/2/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 11/27/2007,Replies due by 12/27/2007. (mpt, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                                                                    MINUTE ORDER granting [10] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion for Summary Judgment. The response is due by November 27, 2007, and the defendant's reply is due by December 27, 2007. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on November 1, 2007. (MDW, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 10 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: 10/31/2007, Terminated: 11/1/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [8] MOTION for Summary Judgment (with a draft Order appended if needed) by FEDERAL CURE (Klimaski, James)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: 10/3/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Opposition due by 10/31/2007,Replies due by 11/30/2007. (mpt, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/2/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                          MINUTE ORDER granting [9] Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition and Reply to the Motion for Summary Judgment. The opposition is due no later than October 31, 2007 and the reply is due no later than November 30, 2007. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on October 2, 2007. (MDW, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 9 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007, Terminated: 10/2/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                            Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Opposition to the Motion for Summary Judgment and a Reply to the Opposition by FEDERAL CURE (Klimaski, James)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: 9/19/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                              Set Deadlines/Hearings: Answer due by 9/18/2007. (jwd)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: 9/19/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                MINUTE ORDER finding as moot [7] Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on September 19, 2007. (MDW, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 8 Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: 9/18/2007 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                  MOTION for Summary Judgment by HARLEY G. LAPPIN (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3# (4) Exhibit 4# (5) Exhibit 5# (6) Exhibit 6# (7) Exhibit 7# (8) Exhibit 8# (9) Exhibit 9# (10) Text of Proposed Order)(Brumer, Jonathan)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: 9/14/2007, Terminated: 9/19/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by HARLEY G. LAPPIN (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Brumer, Jonathan)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/7/2007, Entered: 9/7/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer or response to complaint due by 9/14/2007. (mpt, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: 9/5/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER granting [6] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. The answer or response is due on or before September 14, 2007. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on September 5, 2007. (MDW, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 6 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: 8/29/2007, Terminated: 9/5/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by HARLEY G. LAPPIN (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Brumer, Jonathan)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 5 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: 8/28/2007 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                            NOTICE of Change of Address by James R. Klimaski (Klimaski, James)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 7/27/2007, Entered: 7/27/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer or response to complaint due by 8/29/2007. (mpt, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/26/2007, Entered: 7/26/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER finding as moot [3] Motion for Enlargement of Time; granting [4] Motion for Extension of Time. The response to the complaint is due on or before August 29, 2007. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 26, 2007. (MDW, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: 7/23/2007, Terminated: 7/26/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by HARLEY G. LAPPIN (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Brumer, Jonathan)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: 6/4/2007, Terminated: 7/26/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to
                                                                                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by HARLEY G. LAPPIN (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Brumer, Jonathan)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 5/17/2007, Entered: 5/17/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan C. Brumer on behalf of HARLEY G. LAPPIN (Brumer, Jonathan)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: 5/8/2007 Complaint
                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against HARLEY G. LAPPIN ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616004095) filed by FEDERAL CURE. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: 5/8/2007 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                                                                                                          SUMMONS (3) Issued as to HARLEY G. LAPPIN, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf, )
                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 167 times.

                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                             
                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                            Need Password Help?