LEE v. GATES
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-01088-HHK
District Judge Henry H. Kennedy, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2017 at 12:21 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ROBERT E. LEE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ROBERT E. LEE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Edwin Lee +1 716 852 2611
v.
Gates, Robert M. Gates, Robert M., Defendant
Officially listed as "ROBERT M. GATES"
Nacco Industries, Inc. Unknown Role, Nacco Industries, Inc.
Starbucks Corporation Unknown Role, Starbucks Corporation

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The District Of Columbia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Secretary, Department of Defense John C. Truong +1 202 307 0406 +1 202 514 8780 john.truong@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John C. Truong +1 202 307 0406 +1 202 514 8780 john.truong@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 6/18/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand $2400000
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 551 Administrative Procedure Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Transfer/Remand - Transfer to Another District
County 99999
Terminated 12/18/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, PROSE-NP, TRANSFERRED, TYPE-C
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 2/12/2008, Entered: 2/12/2008 Receipt for Transfer Papers
Receipt on 01/24/2008 of Transfer Papers. Other Court Number 1:08-cv-00062 sent by Eastern District of Virginia. (lc, )
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 1/23/2008, Entered: 1/23/2008 Case Transferred Out
    Case transferred out to the USDC of Eastern District of Virginia, pursuant to Court Order entered 12/17/2007. Sent to Court by ECF 3.0. (lc, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 10 Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: 12/17/2007 Order on Motion to Dismiss
      ORDER granting Motion to Transfer Case [4] (Kennedy, Henry)
        LREF
        Legal Document 9 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/24/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
        Memorandum in opposition to re [7] MOTION for Judgment By Default filed by ROBERT M. GATES. (Truong, John)
          LREF
          Legal Document 8 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/24/2007 Reply to opposition to Motion
          REPLY to opposition to motion re [4] MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue Or, In the Alternative MOTION to Transfer Case filed by ROBERT M. GATES. (Truong, John)
            LREF
            Legal Document 7 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: 9/14/2007 ~Motion for Judgment
            MOTION for Judgment By Default by ROBERT E. LEE (lc, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 6 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: 9/14/2007 Memorandum in Opposition
              Memorandum in opposition to re [4] MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue Or, In the Alternative MOTION to Transfer Case filed by ROBERT E. LEE. (lc, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 5 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007 Fox/Neal OrderCourt Filing
                Order re [4] advising plaintiff to respond or court may deem matter as conceded.Responses due by October 5, 2007. Signed by Judge Henry H. Kennedy, Jr., on September 4, 2007. (FL, )
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: 9/12/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                  Reset Deadlines: Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/5/2007. (tj )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: 8/31/2007, Terminated: 12/17/2007 Motion to Dismiss
                    MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue Or, In the Alternative, MOTION to Transfer Case by ROBERT M. GATES (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Truong, John)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/20/2007 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                      RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to ROBERT M. GATES served on 7/2/2007, answer due 8/31/2007. RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on Attorney General. Date of Service Upon Attorney General 7/2/07. RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the US Attorney served on 7/2/2007, answer due 8/31/2007 (tg, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/19/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                        NOTICE of Appearance by John C. Truong on behalf of ROBERT M. GATES (Truong, John)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/18/2007, Entered: 6/19/2007 Complaint
                          COMPLAINT against ROBERT M. GATES ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616004981) filed by ROBERT E. LEE. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(lc, )
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 6/18/2007, Entered: 6/19/2007 Summons Issued as to AUSA
                            SUMMONS (3) Issued as to ROBERT M. GATES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (lc, )
                              LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 49 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?