MIANULLI v. POTTER
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-01129-RMC
District Judge Rosemary M. Collyer, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 29, 2017 at 3:40 PM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo PAUL MIANULLI, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Etowah County Detention Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul V Bennett +1 410 974 6000 +1 410 224 4590 pbennett@paulvbennett.com
v.
No Logo JOHN E. POTTER, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by LeClairRyan-VA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sarah E. Moffett +1 703 647 5930 +1 703 647 5980 sarah.moffett@leclairryan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mercedeh Momeni +1 202 305 4851 +1 202 514 8780 mercedeh.momeni@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 6/25/2007
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $300000
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags JURY, TYPE-H
  Entries (41) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 7/31/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Summary Judgment motion due by 9/15/2008. Plaintiff's Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/15/2008. Defendant's Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 11/5/2008. (cdw)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: 7/31/2008 Status Conference
    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer: Status Conference held on 7/30/2008. (Court Reporter: Crystal Pilgim) (cdw)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: 7/30/2008 Order
      MINUTE ENTRY ORDER. Pursuant to the post-discovery status conference held in open Court on July 30, 2008, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file briefs in accordance with the following schedule: the Defendant shall file his motion for summary judgment no later than September 15, 2008; Plaintiff shall file his response no later than October 15, 2008; and Defendant may file a reply no later than November 5, 2008. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 07/30/08.(lcrmc1)
        LREF
        Legal Document 23 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: 7/22/2008 Order on Motion to QuashCourt Filing
        ORDER granting [19] Motion by Simmons Bedding Company to Quash Plaintiff Paul Mianulli's Subpoena. See attached Order for further details. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 07/22/08. (lcrmc1)
          LREF
          Legal Document 22 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: 6/23/2008 Memorandum in Opposition
          Memorandum in opposition to re [19] MOTION to Quash Plaintiff's Subpoena, Filed By and For Simmons Bedding Company filed by PAUL MIANULLI. (Bennett, Paul)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: 6/23/2008 Notice of Hearing.
            NOTICE of Hearing: The Post-Discovery Status Conference is reset for 7/30/2008 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (cdw)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/23/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
              Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Fact Discovery closes by 7/24/2008. (cdw)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete
                MINUTE ENTRY ORDER granting [21] Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. It is hereby ORDERED that fact discovery shall be completed no later than July 24, 2008. It is further ORDERED that the post-discovery status conference set for June 26, 2008 at 2:00 p.m. is vacated. A new date for a post-discovery status conference shall be set by the Deputy Clerk of the Court. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 06/20/08. (lcrmc1)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 21 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: 6/19/2008, Terminated: 6/20/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by JOHN E. POTTER (Momeni, Mercedeh)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 20 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: 6/19/2008 Rule 26a1 Statement
                    RULE 26a1 STATEMENT. (Bennett, Paul)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 19 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008, Terminated: 7/22/2008 Motion to Quash
                      MOTION to Quash Plaintiff's Subpoena, Filed By and For Simmons Bedding Company by JOHN E. POTTER (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support, # (2) Text of Proposed Order, # (3) Exhibit)(Moffett, Sarah)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 18 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                        NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah E. Moffett on behalf of all parties (Moffett, Sarah)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/18/2008 Notice of Hearing.
                          NOTICE of Hearing: A Post-discovery Status Conference is set for 6/26/2008 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2, main building, 2nd floor, before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (cdw)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: 3/12/2008 Order on Motion for Protective Order
                            MINUTE ENTRY ORDER granting [17] Defendant's Consent Motion for Protective Order. See [16] Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 3/12/08. (lcrmc1)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 17 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008, Terminated: 3/12/2008 Motion for Protective Order
                              Consent MOTION for Protective Order by JOHN E. POTTER (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Momeni, Mercedeh)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
                                NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: The document image has been added to the entry for the [16] Stipulated Protective Order. (cdw)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
                                  NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re [15] Joint MOTION for Protective Order was entered in error. The Motion is missing from the filing. Counsel was instructed to refile a complete pleading. (tg, )
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 16 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                    STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on March 10, 2008. (cdw) (zcdw, ).
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 15 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: 3/10/2008, Terminated: 3/10/2008 Motion for Protective Order
                                      ENTERED IN ERROR.....Joint MOTION for Protective Order by JOHN E. POTTER (Momeni, Mercedeh) Modified on 3/11/2008 (tg, ).
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 14 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008 Amended Complaint
                                        First AMENDED COMPLAINT against JOHN E. POTTER filed by PAUL MIANULLI.(tg, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: 2/15/2008 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
                                          MINUTE ENTRY ORDER granting as conceded [8] Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Complaint and granting the parties' [13] Consent Motion for an Amended Scheduling Order. Plaintiff's amended complaint is hereby accepted for filing. The Scheduling Order in this case is hereby amended as follows: fact discovery shall be completed no later than June 24, 2008; designation of experts by the proponent shall be made no later than March 19, 2008; and designation of experts by the opponent shall be made no later than April 21, 2008. A post-discovery status conference will be set by the Deputy Clerk of the Court. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 2/15/08. (lcrmc1)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 13 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: 2/14/2008, Terminated: 2/15/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                            Consent MOTION Revised Scheduling Order re [11] Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings by JOHN E. POTTER (Momeni, Mercedeh)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 12 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: 2/14/2008 Answer
                                              ANSWER to Complaint (Amended Complaint, Doc. No. 8) by JOHN E. POTTER. Related document: [1] Complaint filed by PAUL MIANULLI.(Momeni, Mercedeh)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 11 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: 1/29/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER setting forth deadlines in this matter. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on January 28, 2008. (cdw)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 10 Filed: 1/23/2008, Entered: 1/23/2008, Terminated: 2/15/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                  Joint MOTION for an Amended Scheduling Order re [5] Meet and Confer Statement, [7] Scheduling Order, by JOHN E. POTTER (Momeni, Mercedeh)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 9 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: 1/22/2008, Terminated: 1/22/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [8] First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by JOHN E. POTTER (Momeni, Mercedeh)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: 1/24/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                      Set Deadlines/Hearings: Response to Motion to Amend Complaint due by 2/14/2008. (cdw)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: 1/22/2008 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                                                        MINUTE ENTRY ORDER granting [9] Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File an Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Amend His Complaint. Defendant shall file his opposition to Plaintiff's motion to amend his complaint no later than February 14, 2008. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 1/22/08. (lcrmc1)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 8 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: 1/10/2008, Terminated: 2/15/2008 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                          First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by PAUL MIANULLI (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibits A and B# (2) Text of Proposed Order # (3) Red Line Version of Amended Complaint# (4) First Amended Complaint)(Bennett, Paul)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 7 Filed: 10/24/2007, Entered: 10/24/2007 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER. All fact discovery shall be completed no later than April 24, 2008. A post-discovery status conference is scheduled for 4:30 p.m. on April 29, 2008. See attached Order for further details. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 10/24/07. (lcrmc1)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 10/24/2007, Entered: 10/26/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                              Set Deadlines/Hearings: Fact Discovery closes 4/24/2008. Status Conference set for 4/29/2008 04:30 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (cdw)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 10/24/2007, Entered: 10/25/2007 Scheduling Conference
                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 10/24/2007. (Court Reporter: Crystal Pilgrim) (cdw)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: 10/16/2007 Meet and Confer Statement
                                                                  MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Momeni, Mercedeh)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/24/2007 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                    NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Scheduling Conference reset for 10/24/2007 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, main building, 2nd floor, before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (cdw)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 5 Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: 9/19/2007 Meet and Confer Statement
                                                                      MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Momeni, Mercedeh)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 4 Filed: 9/7/2007, Entered: 9/7/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER FOR INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. An initial scheduling conference is set for October 19, 2007 at 10:30 a.m. See attached Order for further details. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 09/07/07. (lcrmc1)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 9/7/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                          Set Deadlines/Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/19/2007 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 2, main building, 2nd floor, before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (cdw)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007 Answer
                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint by JOHN E. POTTER. Related document: [1] Complaint filed by PAUL MIANULLI.(Momeni, Mercedeh)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: 7/13/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Mercedeh Momeni on behalf of JOHN E. POTTER (Momeni, Mercedeh)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/25/2007, Entered: 6/26/2007 Complaint
                                                                                COMPLAINT against JOHN E. POTTER ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616005133) filed by PAUL MIANULLI. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(tg, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/25/2007, Entered: 6/26/2007 Summons Issued
                                                                                  Summons (3) Issued as to JOHN E. POTTER, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (tg, )
                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                    This case has been viewed 154 times.

                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                    Space
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                     
                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                    Need Password Help?